Sarei, et al v. Rio Tinto, PLC, et al
Plaintiff - Appellant,: PHILLIP MIRIORI, GREGORY KOPA, ALEXIS HOLYWEEK SAREI, PAUL E. NERAU, THOMAS TAMAUSI, METHODIUS NESIKO, ALOYSIUS MOSES, RAPHEAL NINIKU, GABRIEL TAREASI and LINUS TAKINU, LEO WUIS; MICHAEL AKOPE; BENEDICT PISI; THOMAS KOBUKO; JOHN TAMUASI; NORMAN MOUVO; JOHN OSANI; BEN KORUS; NAMIRA KAWONA; JOANNE BOSCO; JOHN PIGOLO; MAGDALENE PIGOLO, individually and on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Defendant - Appellee,: RIO TINTO, PLC and RIO TINTED LIMITED
Amicus Curiae,: SIR NINIAN M. STEPHEN & JUDGE STEPHEN M. SCHWEBEL, CHEVRON CORPORATION, THE NATIONAL FOREIGN TRADE COUNCIL, THE GOVERNMENT OF UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND THE COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA, INTERNATIONAL LAW PROFESSORS, CONSTITUTIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL LAW PROFESSORS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, THE FEDERATION OF GERMAN INDUSTRIES, CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNATIONAL LAW SCHOLARS, INTERNATIONAL LAW SCHOLARS - PHILIP ALSTON, MICHAEL J. BAZYLER, DOUG CASSEL, ROGER S. CLARK, LAWRENCE DOUGLAS, JOHN DUGARD, BRUCE J. EINHORN, GREGORY S. GORDON, VED NANDA, SHERI ROSENBERG, MICHAEL P. SCHARF, DINAH SHELTON, U.S. DIPLOMATS and EARTHRIGHTS INTERNATIONAL
Amicus,: COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA
Case Number: 02-56256
Filed: July 26, 2002
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 26, 2010 Sarei, et al v. Rio Tinto, PLC, et al
December 16, 2008 Sarei, et al v. Rio Tinto, PLC, et al
August 20, 2007 Sarei, et al v. Rio Tinto, PLC, et al
October 25, 2011 Summary Sarei, et al. v. Rio Tinto, PLC, et al.
June 28, 2013 Summary SAREI V. RIO TINTO, PLC

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 920101026 Opinion
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 920081216 Opinion
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 920070820 Opinion
April 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 920070411 Opinion
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 920060807 Opinion
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sarei, et al v. Rio Tinto, PLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: PHILLIP MIRIORI
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: GREGORY KOPA
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: ALEXIS HOLYWEEK SAREI
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: PAUL E. NERAU
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: THOMAS TAMAUSI
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: METHODIUS NESIKO
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: ALOYSIUS MOSES
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: RAPHEAL NINIKU
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: GABRIEL TAREASI
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: LINUS TAKINU, LEO WUIS; MICHAEL AKOPE; BENEDICT PISI; THOMAS KOBUKO; JOHN TAMUASI; NORMAN MOUVO; JOHN OSANI; BEN KORUS; NAMIRA KAWONA; JOANNE BOSCO; JOHN PIGOLO; MAGDALENE PIGOLO, individually and on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: RIO TINTO, PLC
Represented By: James J. Brosnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: RIO TINTED LIMITED
Represented By: James J. Brosnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: SIR NINIAN M. STEPHEN & JUDGE STEPHEN M. SCHWEBEL
Represented By: Stephen M. Schwebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: CHEVRON CORPORATION
Represented By: Craig Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: THE NATIONAL FOREIGN TRADE COUNCIL
Represented By: Daniel Paul Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: THE GOVERNMENT OF UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND THE COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA
Represented By: Donald Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: INTERNATIONAL LAW PROFESSORS
Represented By: Rebekka Martorano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: CONSTITUTIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL LAW PROFESSORS
Represented By: Chimene Keitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Lewis Yelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: THE FEDERATION OF GERMAN INDUSTRIES
Represented By: Matthew James Kemner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Rhett Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: INTERNATIONAL LAW SCHOLARS
Represented By: William Aceves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: INTERNATIONAL LAW SCHOLARS - PHILIP ALSTON, MICHAEL J. BAZYLER, DOUG CASSEL, ROGER S. CLARK, LAWRENCE DOUGLAS, JOHN DUGARD, BRUCE J. EINHORN, GREGORY S. GORDON, VED NANDA, SHERI ROSENBERG, MICHAEL P. SCHARF, DINAH SHELTON
Represented By: Susan Hannah Farbstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: U.S. DIPLOMATS
Represented By: Richard R. Wiebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: EARTHRIGHTS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Marco Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus,: COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA
Represented By: Donald Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?