Nordyke, et al v. King, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant,: RUSSELL ALLEN NORDYKE, ANN SALLIE NORDYKE, dba TS Trade Shows, JESS B. GUY, DUANE DARR, WILLIAM J. JONES, DARYL N. DAVID, TASIANA WESTYSCHYN, JEAN LEE, TODD BALTES and DENNIS BLAIR, R.L. ADAMS; ROGER BAKER; MIKE FOURNIER; VIRGIL MCVICKER
Defendant - Appellee,: MARY V. KING, GAIL STEELE, WILMA CHAN, KEITH CARSON, SCOTT HAGGERTY, COUNTY OF ALAMEDA and COUNTY OF ALAMEDA BOARD OF SUPERVISORS
Amicus Curiae,: PROFESSORS OF LAW, THE NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, CALIFORNIA RIFLE & PISTOL ASSOCIATION, PROFESSORS OF LAW, HISTORY, POLITICAL SCIENCE OR PHILOSOPHY, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., LEGAL COMMUNITY AGAINST VIOLENCE, CITY OF OAKLAND, CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, CALIFORNIA PEACE OFFICERS' ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA POLICE CHIEFS' ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA STATE SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION, COALITION TO STOP GUN VIOLENCE, VIOLENCE POLICY CENTER, YOUTH ALIVE!, CALGUNS FOUNDATION, INC. and GUN OWNERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Case Number: 07-15763
Filed: May 1, 2007
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
July 12, 2010 Nordyke, et al v. King, et al
April 20, 2009 Nordyke, et al v. King, et al
May 2, 2011 Summary Nordyke, et al v. King, et al
November 28, 2011 Summary Nordyke, et al v. King, et al
November 28, 2011 Summary Nordyke, et al v. King, et al
April 4, 2012 Summary NORDYKE V. KING
June 1, 2012 Summary NORDYKE V. KING
June 15, 2012 Summary NORDYKE V KING

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2012 252 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/16/2012. [8106647] (DK)
March 14, 2012 251 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/14/2012. [8103305] (TPP)
March 13, 2012 250 Received letter dated 03/05/2012 from Allan J. Mayer, Esq. [8102837] (LC)
March 12, 2012 249 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/12/2012. [8099728] (DK)
March 12, 2012 248 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/12/2012. [8099721] (DK)
March 12, 2012 247 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/12/2012. [8099717] (DK)
March 12, 2012 246 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/12/2012. [8099707] (DK)
February 23, 2012 245 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/23/2012. [8078904] (DK)
February 23, 2012 244 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Donald Kilmer, Jr. for Appellants Jean Lee, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Russell Allen Nordyke, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Todd Baltes, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Daryl N. David and Tasiana Westyschyn. [8078412] (DK)
February 22, 2012 243 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Gil Peles for Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [8076989] (GP)
February 21, 2012 242 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Mr. Thomas Peter Pierce for Appellees Scott Haggerty, Keith Carson, Mary V. King, Gail Steele, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors and Wilma Chan, Mrs. Sayre Weaver, Esquire for Appellees Scott Haggerty, Keith Carson, Mary V. King, Gail Steele, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors and Wilma Chan and Richard E. Winnie, Esquire for Appellees Scott Haggerty, Keith Carson, Mary V. King, Gail Steele, County of Alameda and Wilma Chan. [8075058] (TPP)
February 17, 2012 241 Notice of Oral Argument on MARCH 19 2012 SF Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8074256] (AW)
February 17, 2012 240 UPDATED CASE CALENDARED: Monday, 03/19/2012 2:30 PM San Francisco, CA Courtroom 1 [8073920] (AW)
February 17, 2012 239 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI) Oral argument in this en banc case will be held at 2:30 p.m. on Monday, March 19, 2012, in Courtroom One of the James R. Browning Courthouse, located at 95 Seventh Street in San Francisco, California 94103. http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/information/locations.php [8073673] (SM)
December 16, 2011 237 Received 17 copies of Supplemental Reply Brief of Appellants RE: Second Amendment Issues filed on 10/07/2008 (Entry 68). (TB)
December 16, 2011 236 Received 17 copies of Supplemental Brief of Appellants Re: Second Amendment Issues filed on 09/12/2008 (Entry 51). (TB)
December 16, 2011 235 Received 17 copies of Appellants' Supplemental Brief (Plaintiff-Appellants' Frap 35(a) Brief) submitted on 06/08/2009 (Entry 88). (TB)
December 14, 2011 238 Received 17 copies of Appellants' Supplemental Brief Pursuant to July 19, 2010 order submitted on 08/18/2010 (Entry 150) and filed on 08/18/2010 (Entry 152). [8006556] (TB)
December 14, 2011 234 Received 17 copies of Appellant's Reply Brief of 11 pages filed on 01/23/2008 (Entry 38). (TB)
December 14, 2011 233 Received paper copies of Appellees' Rule 28(j) letters dated 01/29/2009, 02/04/2009, 09/15/2009, 09/22/2010, 09/28/2010, 01/07/2011, 01/10/2011, 07/12/2011, 07/12/2011, 08/4/2011, 12/13/2011 (ALL COPIES SENT TO RECORDS ONLY). (TB)
December 14, 2011 232 Received 15 copies copies of Appellees' Request for Judicial Notice of Excerpts of Record Filed in Earlier Appeal - Civil No. 99-17551 (with Excerpts of Record attached) filed on 08/25/2009 (Entry 115). (ALL COPIES SENT TO RECORDS ONLY) (TB)
December 14, 2011 231 Received 25 copies of Appellees' Response to Appellants' Petition for Panel Rehearing and for Rehearing Rn Banc filed on 07/11/2011 (Entry 189). (ALL COPIES SENT TO RECORDS ONLY) (TB)
December 14, 2011 230 Received 25 copies of Appellees' Supplemental Brief Regarding the Impact of McDonald v. Chicago submitted on 08/18/10 (Entry 151) and filed on 08/18/2010 (Entry 153). (TB)
December 14, 2011 229 Received 15 copies of Appellees' Brief Regarding Rehearing En Banc submitted on 06/08/2009 (Entry 90). (TB)
December 14, 2011 228 Received 15 copies of Appellees' Brief in Reply to Supplemental Brief of Appellants filed on 10/03/2008 (Entry 58). (TB)
December 14, 2011 227 Received 15 copies of Appellees' Supplemental Brief with Appendices in Support of Supplemental Brief filed on 09/12/2008 (Entry 52). (TB)
December 14, 2011 226 Received 15 copies of Brief of Amicus Curiae Legal Community Against Violence in Support of Defendants-Appellees Urging Affirmance of the Judgement received on 01/16/2008 (Entry 31). (TB)
December 14, 2011 225 Received 15 copies of Appellees' Answering Brief filed on 01/09/2008 (Entry 25). (TB)
December 13, 2011 224 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/13/2011. [7999780] (TPP)
December 13, 2011 223 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [90] submitted by Mary V. King is filed. Party order to submit 25 paper copies per 11/29/11 order [7999769] (TB)
December 13, 2011 222 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [88] submitted by Nordyke, et al. on 6/8/2009 is filed. Paper copies have been submitted per 11/29/11 order. [7999758] (TB)
December 13, 2011 221 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele Correspondence: Letter to Clerk re: Appellees' submission of briefs and excerpts in advance of the rehearing en banc pursuant to November 29, 2011 Court Order. Date of service: 12/13/2011 [7999704] (TPP)
December 12, 2011 220 Received 25 copies of Appellants' chronologically compiled additional citations in 4 volumes (Appellants' Table of Supplemental Filings and Fed. R. App. Proc. 28(j) Filings for En Banc Hearing). (TB)
December 12, 2011 219 Received 25 copies of Appellants' Petition for Panel Rehearing and/or En Banc Rehearing filed on 05/23/2011 (Entry 180). (CASEFILES) (TB)
December 12, 2011 218 Received 25 copies of Appellant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Panel Rehearing and/or En Banc Rehearing (with attached Reply Brief ) ECF filed 07/18/11 (Entry 191) and ordered filed on 7/19/11 (Entry 192). (CASEFILES) (TB)
December 12, 2011 217 Received 15 copies of Brief by Amicus Curiae Professors of Law in Support of the Appellants and in Support of Reversal filed on 10/14/2008 (Entry 81) (TB)
December 12, 2011 216 Received 15 copies of Brief (on Second Amendment Issues Only) by Amicus Curiae Professors of Law, History, Political Science or Philosophy filed on 10/03/2008 (Entry 62). (TB)
December 12, 2011 215 Received 15 copies of Appellants' Opening Brief filed on 11/15/2007 and Excerpts of Record in 4 volumes (Entry 22). (TB)
December 12, 2011 214 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn Correspondence: Letter to Clerk re: Appellants' filings for En Banc pursuant to Order at Dkt Entry 198. Date of service: 12/12/2011 [7997642] (DK)
December 9, 2011 213 Received 25 copies of Brief by Amicus Curiae Calguns Foundation, Inc submitted on 08/18/10 (Entry 142) and filed on 08/18/10 (Entry 149). (TB)
December 8, 2011 212 Received 25 copies of Brief by Amici Curiae California Peace Officers' Association, California Police Chiefs' Association, California State Sheriffs' Association, City and County of San Francisco, City of Oakland, Legal Community Against Violence, Violence Policy Center and Youth Alive! submitted on 08/18/10 (Entry 145) and filed on 08/18/10 (Entry 157). (TB)
December 7, 2011 211 Received 25 copies of Brief by Amicus Curiae The National Rifle Association of America submitted on 08/18/10 (Entry 141) and filed on 08/18/10 (Entry 148) . (TB)
December 7, 2011 210 Received 25 copies of Brief by Amicus Curiae California Rifle & Pistol Association submitted on 08/17/10 (Entry 139) and filed on 08/18/10 (Entry 147). (TB)
December 6, 2011 209 Received 25 copies of Brief by Amicus Curiae Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. submitted on 08/18/10 (Entry 144) and filed on 08/18/10 (Entry 156). (TB)
December 6, 2011 208 Received 25 copies of supplemental amicus brief by Amici Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, California Peace Officers' Association, California Police Chiefs' Association, California State Sheriffs' Association, City and County of San Francisco, City of Oakland, Coalition to Stop Gun Violence, Legal Community Against Violence, Violence Policy Center and Youth Alive! filed on 10/16/2008 (Entry 83). (TB)
December 5, 2011 207 Received 25 copies of Brief by Amicus Curiae Gun Owners of California, Inc, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation submitted on 08/18/10 (Entry 154) and filed on 8/18/10 (Entry 159). (TB)
December 1, 2011 206 Received 25 copies of Brief by Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence submitted on 08/18/10 (Entry 160) and filed on 08/19/10 (Entry 161). (TB)
November 29, 2011 198 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI) En banc oral argument will take place during the week of March 19, 2012, in San Francisco, California. The date and time will be determined by separate order. For further information or special requests regarding scheduling, please contact Deputy Clerk Paul Keller at paul_keller@ca9.uscourts.gov or (415) 355-8026. Within seven days from the date of this order, the parties shall forward to the Clerk of Court twenty-five additional paper copies of the original briefs and excerpts of record. [7981447] (SM)
November 28, 2011 197 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (ALEX KOZINSKI) Upon the vote of a majority of nonrecused active judges, it is ordered that this case be reheard en banc pursuant to Circuit Rule 35-3. The three-judge panel opinion shall not be cited as precedent by or to any court of the Ninth Circuit. Judge Rawlinson did not participate in the deliberations or vote in this case. [7980838] (RP)
October 11, 2011 196 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/11/2011. [7922414] (DK)
August 4, 2011 195 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/04/2011. [7844318]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF of citation (searchable). Resent NDA. 08/05/2011 by TW] (TPP)
August 2, 2011 194 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/02/2011. [7841204] (DK)
July 27, 2011 193 COURT DELETED ENTRY (Correct entry: #53 in 10-36094). Original text: Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 07/27/2011. [7834821] (GP)
July 19, 2011 192 Filed order (ARTHUR L. ALARCON, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and RONALD M. GOULD) Appellants’ motion dated July 18, 2011 for leave to file a reply brief in support of panel rehearing and/or en banc rehearing is GRANTED. The Reply Brief attached to the motion shall be deemed filed as of the date of this order. [7825590] (WL)
July 18, 2011 191 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Rehearing]. Date of service: 07/18/2011. [7823369] (DK)
July 12, 2011 190 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/12/2011. [7816405] (TPP)
July 11, 2011 189 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele response to Combo PFR Panel and En Banc (ECF Filing) , for panel and en banc rehearing (statistical entry),Combo PFR Panel and En Banc (ECF Filing) for panel and en banc rehearing. Date of service: 07/11/2011. [7814694]. (TPP)
July 6, 2011 188 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/06/2011. [7810274] (DK)
July 6, 2011 187 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/06/2011. [7810160] (DK)
July 6, 2011 186 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/06/2011. [7809375] (DK)
June 24, 2011 185 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/24/2011. [7797297] (DK)
June 17, 2011 184 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN) Appellees’ request for a six-day extension to file a response to Appellant’s Petition for Rehearing and Petition for Rehearing En Banc is GRANTED. [7789629] (WL)
June 15, 2011 183 COURT DELETED ENTRY : Correct entry above [182]. Original text: Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele Motion to extend time to file a resp (TPP)
June 15, 2011 182 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele Motion to extend time to file a response until 07/11/2011. Date of service: 06/15/2011. [7786227]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF of motion (searchable). Attached Certificate of Service. Resent NDA. 06/16/2011 by TW] (TPP)
June 13, 2011 181 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN) Appellees are directed to file a response to Appellant’s Petition for Rehearing and Petition for Rehearing En Banc filed with this Court on May 23, 2011. Petitioner’s response shall be filed within 21 days of the date of this order and shall not exceed fifteen pages in length. Parties who are registered with ECF must file the response electronically. Parties who are not registered ECF filers must file the original response plus 50 paper copies. [7783688] (BJB)
May 23, 2011 180 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 05/02/2011 opinion). Date of service: 05/23/2011. [7761846] (DK)
May 23, 2011 179 COURT DELETED ENTRY. Correct entry below: [180]. Original text: Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn petition for rehearing en banc (from 05/02/2011 opinion). Date of service: 05/23/2011. [7761767] (DK)
May 12, 2011 178 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GV): Granting Appellants' motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 05/23/2011 [7750642] (GV)
May 12, 2011 177 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn Motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 05/23/2011 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 05/12/2011. [7750290] (DK)
May 2, 2011 176 Featured Case FILED OPINION (ARTHUR L. ALARCON, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and RONALD M. GOULD) AFFIRMED IN PART; VACATED IN PART; REMANDED. Each party shall bear its own costs on appeal. Judge: DFO Authoring, Judge: RMG Concurring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [7735914] (RP)
January 19, 2011 175 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/19/2011. [7617828] (DK)
January 10, 2011 174 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/10/2011. [7606271] (TPP)
January 7, 2011 173 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/07/2011. [7603987]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced searchable version of response letter. Resent NDA. 01/10/2011 by TT] (TPP)
January 5, 2011 172 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/05/2001. [7600111] (DK)
October 19, 2010 171 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO Judges ARTHUR L. ALARCON, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and RONALD M. GOULD. [7514480] [07-15763] (AT)
September 28, 2010 170 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/28/2010. [7490211] (TPP)
September 24, 2010 169 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7486371] (DK)
September 22, 2010 168 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele Amended citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/22/2010. [7484134]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket to reflect content of filing (not Letter brief). Resent notice. 09/24/2010 by RY] (TPP)
September 22, 2010 167 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/22/2010. [7483381]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket to reflect content of filing (not Letter brief). Resent notice. 09/22/2010 by RY] (TPP)
September 13, 2010 166 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/13/2010. [7471236] (DK)
September 9, 2010 165 Notice of Oral Argument on OCTOBER 19 2010 SF Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [7468178] (AW)
September 9, 2010 164 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:AF): Oral argument will be held on Tuesday, October 19, 2010, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom One of the James R. Browning United States Courthouse, 95 Seventh Street, San Francisco, California. Each side will be allotted fifteen (15) minutes of argument. [7467645] (AF)
September 8, 2010 163 UPDATED CASE CALENDARED: 10/19/2010 1:30 PM San Francisco, CA Courtroom 1 [7467546] (AW)
August 19, 2010 162 Filed (ECF) Errata to Supplemental Brief ([139] Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing) ,[139] Motion (ECF Filing) ,[139] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus). Filed by Amicus Curiae California Rifle & Pistol Association. Date of service: 08/19/2010. [7446010] (CDM)
August 19, 2010 161 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [160] submitted by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence on 8/18/10 is ordered filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7445207] (LC)
August 18, 2010 160 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 08/18/2010. [7445017]--[COURT UPDATE: replaced brief with corrected certificate of service. 08/19/2010 by MS] (GP)
August 18, 2010 159 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [154] submitted by Gun Owners of California, Inc, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7444976] (TB)
August 18, 2010 158 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Gun Owners of California, Inc, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation. [7444972] (TB)
August 18, 2010 157 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [145] submitted by Legal Community Against Violence is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7444957] (TB)
August 18, 2010 156 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [144] submitted by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7444937] (TB)
August 18, 2010 155 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. [7444931] (TB)
August 18, 2010 154 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Gun Owners of California, Inc., Gun Owners of America, Inc., and Gun Owners Foundation. Date of service: 08/18/2010. [7444879] (HWT)
August 18, 2010 153 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [151] submitted by Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7444875] (TB)
August 18, 2010 152 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [150] submitted by Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7444862] (TB)
August 18, 2010 151 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele. Date of service: 08/18/2010. [7444839] (TPP)
August 18, 2010 150 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn. Date of service: 08/18/2010. [7444768] (DK)
August 18, 2010 149 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [142] submitted by Calguns Foundation, Inc. is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7444701] (TB)
August 18, 2010 148 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [141] submitted by The National Rifle Association of America is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7444692] (TB)
August 18, 2010 147 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [139] submitted by California Rifle & Pistol Association is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. [7444686] (TB)
August 18, 2010 146 Deleted Incorrect Docket Entry. (TB)
August 18, 2010 145 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Amicus Curiae Legal Community Against Violence. Date of service: 08/18/2010. [7444635] (CMD)
August 18, 2010 144 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Amicus Curiae Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Date of service: 08/18/2010. [7444616] (AG)
August 18, 2010 143 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Calguns Foundation, Inc.. [7444606] (TB)
August 18, 2010 142 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by The Calguns Foundation, Inc.. Date of service: 08/18/2010. [7444276] (JD)
August 18, 2010 141 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review. Submitted by Amicus Curiae The National Rifle Association of America. Date of service: 08/18/2010. [7444162] (JSB)
August 18, 2010 140 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending California Rifle & Pistol Association. [7443668] (TB)
August 17, 2010 139 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by California Rifle & Pistol Association. Date of service: 08/17/2010. [7443501] (CDM)
August 17, 2010 138 Added attorney Jeffrey S. Bucholtz for The National Rifle Association of America. [7442682] (RL)
August 17, 2010 137 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeffrey S. Bucholtz for Amicus Curiae The National Rifle Association of America. Date of service: 08/17/2010. [7442672] (JSB)
August 17, 2010 136 Added attorney Paul D. Clement for The National Rifle Association of America. [7442664] (RL)
August 17, 2010 135 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Paul D. Clement for Amicus Curiae The National Rifle Association of America. Date of service: 08/17/2010. [7442656] (PDC)
August 17, 2010 134 Added attorney Gil Peles for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [7442088] (RL)
August 16, 2010 133 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gil N. Peles for Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 08/16/2010. [7441881] (GP)
August 16, 2010 132 Added attorney Charles M. Dyke for Legal Community Against Violence. [7441860] (RL)
August 16, 2010 131 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Charles M. Dyke for Amicus Curiae Legal Community Against Violence. Date of service: 08/16/2010. [7441854] (CMD)
July 22, 2010 130 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of C.D. Michel, Michel & Associates, P.C. for Amicus Curiae The National Rifle Association of America. Date of service: 07/22/2010. [7414083] (CDM)
July 19, 2010 129 Filed order (ARTHUR L. ALARCON, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and RONALD M. GOULD): The parties are ordered to file supplemental briefs addressing: (1) the impact of McDonald v. City of Chicago, No. 08-1521, 2010 WL 2555188 (U.S. June 28, 2010), on the disposition of this case; and (2) any other issue properly before this court, including the level of scrutiny that should be applied to the ordinance in question. Such briefs shall be no longer than fifteen (15) pages each and shall be filed simultaneously no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any amicus curiae brief addressing the issues identified above shall be no longer than fifteen (15) pages, shall be filed simultaneously with the parties’ supplemental briefs, and shall otherwise comply with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 29. Parties and amici who are registered for ECF must file their briefs electronically without submission of paper copies. Parties and amici who are not registered ECF filers must file their original briefs plus seven (7) paper copies. The time and location of oral argument, if any, will be set by separate order of the court. The Appellants’ Motion for Supplemental Briefing, filed with this court on July 13, 2010, is DENIED as moot. [7409806] (AF)
July 13, 2010 128 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn Motion to file supplemental brief. Date of service: 07/13/2010. [7402120] (DK)
July 12, 2010 127 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (ALEX KOZINSKI, HARRY PREGERSON, STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, PAMELA ANN RYMER, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS, SUSAN P. GRABER, RONALD M. GOULD, RICHARD C. TALLMAN, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and SANDRA S. IKUTA) The panel opinion in Nordyke v. King, 563 F.3d 439 (9th Cir. 2009), is vacated and the case is remanded to that panel for further consideration in light of McDonald v. City of Chicago, No. 08-1521, slip op. (U.S. June 28, 2010). [7400281] (RP)
July 9, 2010 126 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/09/2010. [7398952] (DK)
April 2, 2010 125 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI) Appellant’s motion for supplemental briefing is denied. [7288884] (SC)
April 1, 2010 124 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn reply to response (, ,motion to supplement record on appeal). Date of service: 04/01/2010. [7287037] (DK)
March 31, 2010 123 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele response to motion (,motion to supplement record on appeal). Date of service: 03/31/2010. [7285488] (TPP)
March 22, 2010 122 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn Motion to supplement record on appeal. Date of service: 03/22/2010. [7273638] (DK)
September 24, 2009 121 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI): Submission is vacated pending the Supreme Court’s disposition of Maloney v. Rice, No. 08-1592, McDonald v. City of Chicago, No. 08-1521, and National Rifle Ass’n of Am., Inc. v. City of Chicago, No. 08-1497. [7074146] (AF)
September 24, 2009 120 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO ALEX KOZINSKI, HARRY PREGERSON, STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, PAMELA ANN RYMER, MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS, SUSAN P. GRABER, RONALD M. GOULD, RICHARD C. TALLMAN, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and SANDRA S. IKUTA. [7073642] (LKK)
September 22, 2009 119 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:pa): NRA News applied to video-record in digital format the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, CA, on Thursday, September 24, 2009. The majority of the judges on the panel have voted to grant the application. NRA New's request to video-record is GRANTED. [7071217] (PA)
September 15, 2009 118 Filed (ECF) - Community Against Violence, Amici Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, California Peace Officers' Association, California Police Chiefs' Association, California Rifle & Pistol Association, California State Sheriffs' Association, City and County of San Francisco, City of Oakland, Coalition to Stop Gun Violence, Legal Community Against Violence, Professors of Law, Professors of Law, History, Political Science or Philosophy, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., The National Rifle Association of America, Violence Policy Center, Youth Alive!, Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke, Tasiana Westyschyn and Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele Correspondence: Appellees' Response to Appellants' Rule 28(j) Letter dated September 14, 2009. Date of service: 09/15/2009 [7062908]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced document with searchable version. 09/17/2009 by MA] (TPP)
September 14, 2009 117 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/14/2009. [7061002] (DK)
September 8, 2009 116 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:PA)Courtroom View Network applied to video-record in digital format the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, CA, on Thursday, September 24, 2009. The majority of the judges on the panel have voted to grant the application. Courtroom View Network's request to video-record is GRANTED. [7054449] (PA)
August 31, 2009 114 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn Correspondence: Appellants' Objection to Request for Judicial Notice of Excerpt of Record Filed in Earlier Appeal # 99-17551. Date of service: 08/31/2009 [7045863]--[COURT replaced document with searchable version. 08/31/2009 by MA] (DK)
August 25, 2009 115 Filed Appellees'' request to take judicial notice of excerpts of record filed in earlier appeal.. Served on 08/25/2009. [doc. requested to Aple faxed to Clerk's Office; faxed to en banc Panel by Paul Keller 9/8/09] [7053749. [7053749] (GV)
August 22, 2009 112 Notice of Oral Argument on SEPTEMBER 24 2009 San Francisco Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [7037540] (AW)
August 21, 2009 113 Received 30 copies of additional citations by Appellees County of Alameda, et al. (En Banc Panel) (HH)
August 21, 2009 110 UPDATED CASE CALENDARED: 09/24/2009 10:00 AM San Francisco, CA Courtroom 1 [7035729] (AW)
August 21, 2009 111 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI) Oral argument in this en banc case will be held at 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, September 24, 2009, in Courtroom One at the James R. Browning Courthouse, located at 95 Seventh Street in San Francisco, California 94103. http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/information/locations.php [7037456] (SC)
August 13, 2009 109 Received 30 additional copies of Brief of Amicus curiae Legal Community Against Violence received 1/16/09 (GV)
August 13, 2009 108 Received 30 copies of Supplemenatl brief of amicus curiae Legal Community Against Violence, et al (GV)
August 10, 2009 107 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI) Appellees’ Request for Clarification of Court’s Order is denied. [7021328] (SC)
August 7, 2009 106 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele response opposing motion ( Order ). Date of service: 08/07/2009. [7020773] (TPP)
August 6, 2009 105 Filed Appellants additional citations. Served on 08/04/2009. (panel) [7018958] (NEW)
August 5, 2009 104 Received 30 copies of Appellees' Answering Brief. Appellees' Supplemental Brief. Appellees' Appendices in Support of Supplemental Brief. Appellees' Brief in Reply of Supplemental Brief of Appellants. (GV)
August 5, 2009 103 Received 30 copies of Amicus Brief Professors of Law filed on 10/1/2008. Amicus Brief NRA filed 10/1/2008. Amicus Brief Professors of Law, Histroy & Political Science filed 10/3/2008. Amicus Brief Second Amendment Foundation, filed 10/3/2008. (GV)
August 5, 2009 102 Received 30 copies of Appellants' Supplemental Second Amendment Brieff" and Appellants' Supplemental Reply Brief (Corrected) from Appellants. (GV)
August 5, 2009 101 Received 30 copies of Opening Brief, Excerpts of Record in 4 Vols. and Reply brief. by Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn. (GV)
July 30, 2009 100 CALENDARED: week of 09/21/2009 in San Francisco, CA Courtroom 1 exact date and time to be determined [7009607] (AW)
July 29, 2009 99 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI) En banc oral argument will take place during the week of September 21, 2009, in San Francisco, California. The date and time will be determined by separate order. For further information or special requests regarding scheduling, please contact Deputy Clerk Paul Keller at paul_keller@ca9.uscourts.gov or (415) 355-8026. Within seven days from the date of this order, the parties shall forward to the Clerk of Court thirty additional paper copies of the original briefs and excerpts of record. [7008741] (SC)
July 29, 2009 98 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (CHIEF JUDGE KOZINSKI) Upon the vote of a majority of nonrecused active judges, it is ordered that this case be reheard en banc pursuant to Circuit Rule 35-3. The three-judge panel opinion shall not be cited as precedent by or to any court of the Ninth Circuit. Judge Rawlinson did not participate in the deliberations or vote in this case. [7008480] (RP)
July 9, 2009 97 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/09/2009. [6986673] (DK)
July 9, 2009 96 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/09/2009. [6986655] (DK)
June 15, 2009 95 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/15/2009. [6955745] (DK)
June 10, 2009 94 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/10/2009. [6952533] (DK)
June 10, 2009 93 Filed original and 50 copies amicus curiae brief of The National Rifle Association of America, Incc., and The California Rifle & Pistol Association in opposition to en banc review; of 17 pages. Served on 06/08/2009 Panel - All Active Judges - All Interested Senior Judges. (GV)
June 10, 2009 92 Filed motion for leave to file amicus brief on behalf of the National Rifle Association, Inc., and The California Rifle and Pistol Association in opposition to en banc review; served on 06/08/2009 Panel -All Active Judges - All interested Senior Judges (GV)
June 9, 2009 91 Filed (ECF) Errata to Supplemental Brief ([89] Additional Citations 28j Filed (ECF Filing) ). Filed by Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn. Date of service: 06/09/2009. [6949739] (DK)
June 8, 2009 90 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele (in response to Court order dated 05/18/2009). Date of service: 06/08/2009. [6949117]--[COURT UPDATE: Changed entry text to reflect content of filing--06/08/2009 by ASW] (TPP)
June 8, 2009 89 Filed (ECF) Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/08/2009. [6948680] (DK)
June 8, 2009 88 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn (in response to Court order dated 05/18/2009). Date of service: 06/08/2009. [6948526]--[COURT UPDATE: Changed entry text to reflect content of filing--06/08/2009 by ASW] (DK)
May 18, 2009 87 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN) A judge of this court has called for a vote to determine whether this case will be reheard en banc pursuant Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 35(a). Within 21 days of the filing of this order, the parties are requested to file simultaneous briefs addressing whether this case should be reheard en banc. Parties who are registered for ECF must file the response electronically without submission of paper copies. Parties who are not registered ECF filers must file the original response plus 50 paper copies. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SC)
May 1, 2009 86 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele Correspondence: Letter re errors in published Opinion. Date of service: 04/28/2009 [6904631] (TPP)
May 1, 2009 85 Filed (ECF) Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of $471.60 USD. Date of service: 04/29/2009 [6904606] (TPP)
April 20, 2009 84 Featured Case FILED OPINION (ARTHUR L. ALARCON, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and RONALD M. GOULD) AFFIRMED. Judge: ALA Judge: DFO Authoring, Judge: RMG Concurring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. (PH)
February 9, 2009 80 Filed Appellants additional citations. Served on 02/06/2009. (panel) (JFF)
February 5, 2009 79 Filed Appellees additional citations. Served on 02/04/2009. (panel) (JFF)
January 29, 2009 78 Filed Appellees County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty, Mary V. King and Gail Steele additional citations. Served on 01/28/2009. (panel) (JFF)
January 26, 2009 77 Filed Appellants additional citations. Served on 01/20/2009. ( faxed to panel) (JFF)
January 15, 2009 76 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO ARTHUR L. ALARCON, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and RONALD M. GOULD. (SC)
January 6, 2009 75 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:pi ): C-Span applied to videotape for later broadcast the case captioned above, scheduled to be heard in San Francisco, California, Thursday, January 15, 2009. The judges on the panel have voted to grant the application. C-Span’s request to videotape is GRANTED. (PA)
December 4, 2008 74 Notice of Oral Argument on JANUARY 15, 2009 Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. (AM)
November 12, 2008 73 CALENDARED: 01/15/2009 1:30 PM San Francisco, CA Courtroom 1 (AM)
October 20, 2008 71 Filed Appellees reply to objection to citations (panel). served on 10/17/2008 (JFF)
October 20, 2008 70 Filed Appellees response opposition to contingent motion to enlarge record. Served on 10/17/2008. (JFF)
October 16, 2008 83 Filed original and 15 copies of Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, California Peace Officers' Association, California Police Chiefs' Association, California State Sheriffs' Association, City and County of San Francisco, City of Oakland, Coalition to Stop Gun Violence, Legal Community Against Violence, Violence Policy Center and Youth Alive! supplemental amicus brief of 20 pages (all parties have consented per 10/16/08 notice). Served on 10/02/2008. (Panel already served)--[Edited 08/13/2009 by HH] (LA)
October 16, 2008 72 Received Amici Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, California Peace Officers' Association, California Police Chiefs' Association, California Rifle & Pistol Association, California State Sheriffs' Association, City and County of San Francisco, City of Oakland, Coalition to Stop Gun Violence, Legal Community Against Violence, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., The National Rifle Association of America, Violence Policy Center and Youth Alive! Notice of consent of all parties to filing of supplemental brief of amici curiae. Served on 10/16/2008 (JFF)
October 14, 2008 82 Filed original and 15 copies of California Rifle & Pistol Association and The National Rifle Association of America amicus brief of 30 pages. Served on 09/30/2008 (LA)
October 14, 2008 81 Filed original and 15 copies of Professors of Law amicus brief of 30 pages. Served on 09/30/2008 (LA)
October 14, 2008 69 Filed order (ARTHUR L. ALARCON, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and RONALD M. GOULD): The Motion of Law Professors For Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of The Appellants and In Support of Reversal is GRANTED. The Motion For Leave to File Amicus Brief on Behalf of California Rifle and Pistol Association & National Rifle Association in Support of Appellants and in Support of Reversal is GRANTED. (AF)
October 7, 2008 68 Filed original and 15 copies of Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn (Informal: No) substitute/corrected Supplemental reply brief of 28 pages.. Served on 10/06/2008. ( Prev brief rec'd brief sent to Panel) (FT)
October 7, 2008 67 Filed Appellants' contingent motion to enlarge record. (fedex to panel) Served on 10/03/2008. (JFF)
October 6, 2008 66 Filed Appellants objection to appellees' citations to extraneous opinion polls and dubious medical students (panel). Served on 10/02/2008. (JFF)
October 6, 2008 65 Received original and 15 copies of Amicus Curiaes Legal Community Against Violence, City of Oakland, City and County of San Francisco, Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, California Peace Officers' Association, California Police Chiefs' Association, California State Sheriffs' Association, Coalition to Stop Gun Violence, Violence Policy Center and Youth Alive! supplemental amici brief of 20 pages. Deficiency: Motion to file amici brf required (only Community Against Violence has previously submitted mtn, filed 1/16/08, which is still pending with panel). Served on 10/02/2008. Notified counsel. (FEDEX TO PANEL)--[Edited 08/13/2009 by HH] (LA)
October 3, 2008 64 Filed original and 15 copies of Amicus Curiae Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. amicus brief of 31 pages in support of aplts (parties have consented). Served on 10/02/2008. (FEDEX TO PANEL) (LA)
October 3, 2008 63 Received Amicus Curiae Professors of Law, History, Political Science or Philosophy motion to file amicus curiae brief (on second amendment issues only) in support of Aplts served on 10/02/2008. NAN--parties have consented. (casefiles) (LA)
October 3, 2008 62 ENTRY UPDATED. Filed original and 15 copies of Amicus Curiae Professors of Law, History, Political Science or Philosophy amicus brief (on Second Amendment issues only) of 18 pages in support of aplts (parties have consented). Served on 10/02/2008. (FEDEX TO PANEL)--[Edited 10/06/2008 by LA] (LA)
October 3, 2008 61 Received Appellants' amended certificate of service of: Appellant's supplemental reply brief re: second amendment issues. (JFF)
October 3, 2008 60 Filed Appellants and Appellees stipulation re: amicus curiae briefs. no service date. (JFF)
October 3, 2008 59 Received original and 15 copies of Appellants' supplemental brief (Informal: No) of 28 pages in reply to aples' supp. brf per 7/28/08 order. Served on 10/02/2008. Deficiency: Footnotes font too small. Notified counsel. (FEDEX TO PANEL) (LA)
October 3, 2008 58 Filed original and 15 copies of Appellees' (Informal: No) supplemental brief of 38 pages in reply to aplts' supp. brf per 7/28/08 order. Served on 10/02/2008. (FEDEX TO PANEL) (LA)
October 1, 2008 57 ENTRY UPDATED. Filed Amici Curiae California Rifle & Pistol Association and The National Rifle Association of America motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief, served on 09/30/2008--[Edited 10/06/2008 by LA] (Faxed to panel per 1/23/08 and 7/18/08 orders) (FT)
October 1, 2008 56 ENTRY UPDATED. Received original and 15 copies of Amicus Curiaes The National Rifle Association of America and California Rifle & Pistol Association brief in 30 pages. Deficiency: Motion pending. Served on. 09/30/2008--[Edited 10/06/2008 by LA] (FEDEX TO PANEL) (FT)
October 1, 2008 55 ENTRY UPDATED. Filed Amicus Curiae Professors of Law motion to file/ become amicus curiae in support of the appellants and in support of reversal ; served on 09/30/2008--[Edited 10/06/2008 by LA] (Faxed to panel per 1/23/08 and 7/18/08 orders) (FT)
October 1, 2008 54 ENTRY UPDATED. Received original and 15 copies of Amicus Curiae Professors of Law brief in 30 pages. Deficiency: Motion pending Served on. 09/30/2008 Notified counsel.--[Edited 10/06/2008 by LA] (FEDEX TO PANEL) (FT)
September 12, 2008 53 Filed appearance notice of Attorney(s) Don B. Kates for party(s) Appellant Todd Baltes Tasiana Westyschyn Russell Allen Nordyke Dennis Blair Jess B. Guy Duane Darr Ann Sallie Nordyke Jean Lee William J. Jones Daryl N. David, in case 07-15763.. Served on 09/11/2008. (CW)
September 12, 2008 52 Filed original and 15 copies of Appellees Keith Carson, Wilma Chan, County of Alameda, County of Alameda Board of Supervisors, Scott Haggerty and Mary V. King (Informal: No) supplmental brief of 73 pages w/ appendices in support. Served on 09/11/2008. (PANEL) (FT)
September 12, 2008 51 Filed original and 15 copies of Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn (Informal: No) supplmental brief of 58 pages. Served on 09/11/2008. (PANEL) (FT)
August 22, 2008 50 Filed order (ARTHUR L. ALARCON, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and RONALD M. GOULD) The “Joint Motion for Amicus Curiae Briefing Schedule” is GRANTED. Any amicus curiae brief shall be filed and served on or before the deadline for the parties’ optional reply briefs, as established by this court’s July 28, 2008 order in this case. Except for the filing deadline established by this order, any amicus curiae brief shall comply with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 29. (SC)
August 8, 2008 49 Filed JOINT motion for amicus curiae briefing schedule; Served on 08/07/2008. (Faxed to PANEL) (AF)
July 28, 2008 48 Filed order (ARTHUR L. ALARCON, RONALD M. GOULD and DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN) The “Joint Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing on Second Amendment and Suggestion for Briefing Schedule” is GRANTED. The parties shall file and serve simultaneous opening briefs 45 days from the date of this order. The parties may file and serve optional reply briefs 21 days after the filing of their opening briefs. Oral argument shall be set by further order of the court. The lengths of the parties’ opening and reply briefs shall comply with Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 32(a)(7)(A) and 32(a)(7)(B). (SC)
July 18, 2008 47 Filed order (ARTHUR L. ALARCON, RONALD M. GOULD and DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN) The panel will retain jurisdiction. (SC)
July 18, 2008 46 Materials sent to previous panel #99-17551 ALA DFO RMG. (AM)
July 9, 2008 45 Filed - Appellants and Appelles joint motion for leave to file supplemental briefing on second amendment and suggestion for briefing schedule. Served on 07/08/2008. (MT)
July 9, 2008 44 Calendar check performed. (MW)
March 17, 2008 42 Filed Appellants Todd Baltes, Dennis Blair, Duane Darr, Daryl N. David, Jess B. Guy, William J. Jones, Jean Lee, Ann Sallie Nordyke, Russell Allen Nordyke and Tasiana Westyschyn additional citations. Served on 03/14/2008. (records for merits panel) (RC)
March 13, 2008 43 Mail returned addressed to Attorney Richard E. Winnie, Esq. for Appellees Scott Haggerty, Keith Carson, Mary V. King, Gail Steele, County of Alameda and Wilma Chan, re: Order. (resent to new located address @ 1221 Oak St., #463, Oakland, CA 94612) (RC)
March 7, 2008 41 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:LBS): The court is in receipt of appellants' document entitled, "motion for stay, declaration of counsel, request for judicial notice" and appellees opposition thereto. To the extent appellants are requesting that this court take judicial notice of the Supreme Court's grant of certiorari in District of Columbia v. Heller, the motions are denied without prejudice to submission of a Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 28(j) letter. Appellants' Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 28(j) letter is due 7 days after the date of this order. Appellants' motion for stay of appellate proceedings is denied without prejudice to a motion for leave to file a supplemental brief upon the Supreme Court's decision in District of Columbia v. Heller. Any motion for leave to file a supplemental brief and related filings shall be referred to the merits panel for resolution. (LC)
February 8, 2008 40 Filed Aples' opposition to Aplts' motion for stay; served on 2/7/08 [Aplt's mtn to stay not in docketing] (MOATT) [07-15763] (GV)
January 25, 2008 37 Receivedd parties' stipulation regarding excerpts of record exhibit facsimile signature (Casefile) [07-15763] (GV)
January 25, 2008 36 Filed Aplts' motion to take judicial notice; served on 1/24/08 (PROMO) [6410315] [07-15763] (GV)
January 23, 2008 38 Filed original & 15 copies Aplts' reply brief (Informal: n) 11 pages; served on 1/22/08 [07-15763] (GV)
January 23, 2008 34 Filed order (Deputy Clerk/PROMO: lbs) The motion of Legal Community Against Violence for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of the appellees, any response thereto, and any further such request shall be referred to the merits panel for such treatment the panel deems appropriate. Any future requests to file friend of the court briefs shall be treated in the same fashion. [07-15763] (RT)
January 18, 2008 32 Filed Comm. Against Violence Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement. Served on 1/18/08 (Casefile) [07-15763] (GV)
January 16, 2008 31 Received Comm. Against's brief in original & 15 copies of 12 pages; deficient: (mtn to becm am pending); served on 1/15/08 [07-15763] (GV)
January 16, 2008 30 Filed Comm. Against Violence's motion to file brief as amicus curiae in support of Aples; served on 1/15/08 (PROMO) [6401798] [07-15763] (GV)
January 9, 2008 25 Filed original & 15 copies Aples' 57 pages ans brief; served on 1/8/08 [07-15763] (GV)
November 29, 2007 24 Filed certificate of record on appeal RT filed in DC none [07-15763] (KKW)
November 27, 2007 23 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: lbs) The parties stipulation for an ext of time is granted. [11] The opening br received on 11/15/07 has been filed. The answering br is now due 1/8/08. The opt rpy br is due 14 days after service of the answering br. Court records do not currently reflect that the dc has issued hte cert of record. Aplts shall monitor the issuance of the certificate. [07-15763] (BJB)
November 15, 2007 22 Filed original & 15 copies Aplts' opening brief (Informal: N) 64 pages & 5 Excs. in 4 Vols.; served on 11/13/07 [07-15763] (GV)
November 13, 2007 21 Denied Appellant's phone request for 10 day extension of time to file opening brief. One previous extension of time to file the opening briefs. [07-15763] (CG)
August 10, 2007 13 Filed order MOATT: (Appellate Commissioner) The ct has received and reviewed the response to this ct's order to show cause. The order to show cause is discharged. The parties' request for an ex.tm.f the brs and ecs is granted. The opening br and excs are now due 11/13/07; the ans br is due 12/31/07; and the optional rpy br is due within 14 days after service of the ans br. The panel declines to accept the case as a comeback case under Gen. Order 3.7., vacating order Order to show cause [6] [07-15763] (GV)
August 3, 2007 20 Case rejected from Circuit Mediation Program. (SB)
July 16, 2007 11 Filed stipulation of the parties request of extension of time to file briefs and excs.; served on 7/13/07 (MOATT) [6235417] (GV)
July 16, 2007 10 Received from Aplts General order 3.7 notice "Comeback Case 99-17551t); served on 7/13/07 (MOATT) (GV)
June 5, 2007 9 Filed Aplts amended civil appeals docketing statement, served on 5/24/07 (to CONFATT) [07-15763] (GV)
June 4, 2007 8 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court (MOATT) (GV)
May 25, 2007 7 Filed aplts response to order to show cause ,served on 5/25/07 MOATT [07-15763] (CW)
May 9, 2007 6 Filed order MOATT (CP) ... within 21 days from the date of this order, aplt shall file either a mtn to stay appellate proceedings pending the dc's disposition fo the mtn to amend, or show cause why a stay of appellate proceedings would not be appropriate. ... In addition, aplts shall address wheter the dc's order entered 4/17/07 is a final appealable order because it fully adjudicated the issues and clearly evidence the judge's intentions that it be the ct's fianl act in the matter. ... aple may respond within 8 days after service of aplts' memorandum. If aplt fails to comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute. ... [07-15763] (GV)
May 1, 2007 3 Filed Donald E.J. Kilmer Civil Appeals Docketing Statement served on 4/23/07 (to CONFATT) [07-15763] [07-15763] (GR)
May 1, 2007 2 filed notice of representation of Donald E. J. Kilmer, Jr. as counsel for aplts [07-15763] (GR)
May 1, 2007 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. CADS SENT (Y/N): n. setting schedule as follows: appellant's designation of RT is due 5/4/07,, ; appellee's designation of RT is due 5/14/07,, ; appellant shall order transcript by 5/24/07,, ; court reporter shall file transcript in DC by 6/25/07; certificate of record shall be filed by 7/2/07 ; appellant's opening brief is due 8/10/07,, ; appellees' brief is due 9/10/07,, ; appellants' reply brief is due 9/24/07,, ; [07-15763] (GR)

Search for this case: Nordyke, et al v. King, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: RUSSELL ALLEN NORDYKE
Represented By: Donald Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: ANN SALLIE NORDYKE, dba TS Trade Shows
Represented By: Donald Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: JESS B. GUY
Represented By: Donald Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: DUANE DARR
Represented By: Donald Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: WILLIAM J. JONES
Represented By: Donald Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: DARYL N. DAVID
Represented By: Donald Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: TASIANA WESTYSCHYN
Represented By: Donald Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: JEAN LEE
Represented By: Donald Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: TODD BALTES
Represented By: Donald Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: DENNIS BLAIR, R.L. ADAMS; ROGER BAKER; MIKE FOURNIER; VIRGIL MCVICKER
Represented By: Donald Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: MARY V. KING
Represented By: Thomas Peter Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: GAIL STEELE
Represented By: Thomas Peter Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: WILMA CHAN
Represented By: Thomas Peter Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: KEITH CARSON
Represented By: Thomas Peter Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: SCOTT HAGGERTY
Represented By: Thomas Peter Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: COUNTY OF ALAMEDA
Represented By: Thomas Peter Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: COUNTY OF ALAMEDA BOARD OF SUPERVISORS
Represented By: Thomas Peter Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: PROFESSORS OF LAW
Represented By: Tracy Duell-Cazes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: THE NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: CALIFORNIA RIFLE & PISTOL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Stephen Porter Halbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: PROFESSORS OF LAW, HISTORY, POLITICAL SCIENCE OR PHILOSOPHY
Represented By: Vanessa A. Zecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: LEGAL COMMUNITY AGAINST VIOLENCE
Represented By: Charles M. Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: CITY OF OAKLAND
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: CALIFORNIA PEACE OFFICERS' ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: CALIFORNIA POLICE CHIEFS' ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: CALIFORNIA STATE SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: COALITION TO STOP GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: VIOLENCE POLICY CENTER
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: YOUTH ALIVE!
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: CALGUNS FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: Jason Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae,: GUN OWNERS OF CALIFORNIA, INC, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?