The Facebook, Inc., et al v. ConnectU, Inc., et al Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant,: THE FACEBOOK, INC. and MARK ZUCKERBERG
Defendant - Appellee,: CONNECTU, INC., FKA ConnectU, LLC, PACIFIC NORTHWEST SOFTWARE, INC., WAYNE CHANG, WINSTON WILLIAMS, CAMERON WINKLEVOSS, TYLER WINKLEVOSS and DIVYA NARENDRA
Case Number: 08-16849
Filed: August 20, 2008
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2010 Filing 133 Order filed (Appellate Commissioner) The motion of Facebook, et al., for voluntary dismissal of Nos. 08-16849 and 09-15133 under Federal Rule of Appellate Practice 42(b) is granted. The cross-appeals are dismissed without prejudice to movants filing later timely appeals from appealable orders. A copy of this order shall act as the mandate of this court as to Nos. 08-16849 and 09-15133 only. The motions for leave to file an overlength answering brief and for leave to file the brief under seal are granted. The previously submitted brief shall be filed under seal. The optional reply brief is now due 14 days after the date of this order. [7372582] [08-16849, 09-15133] (WL)
June 14, 2010 Filing 132 Filed (ECF) Intervenors Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873 Motion to extend time to file a reply until 08/05/2010. Date of service: 06/14/2010. [7371730] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873] (JD)
June 10, 2010 Filing 130 Filed (ECF) Intervenors Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133 response non-opposing motion (). Date of service: 06/10/2010. [7368260] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (JD)
June 3, 2010 Filing 129 Received 7 paper copies of Second Brief on Cross-Appeal [126] filed by ConnectU, Inc.. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [7359848] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (SD)
May 28, 2010 Filing 128 Filed Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16745 motion to file appellees brief UNDER SEAL. Served on 05/26/2010. [7359057] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873] (FT)
May 28, 2010 Filing 127 Filed clerk order: The second brief on cross-appeal [126] submitted by ConnectU, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7353990] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (GLS)
May 26, 2010 Filing 131 Filed Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg's motion 1. to dismiss cross-appeal; and 2. to file appellee's brief in opposition in excess of word limit. Served on 05/26/2010. [7368690] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (EL)
May 26, 2010 Filing 126 Submitted (ECF) Second Brief on Cross-Appeal brief for review. Submitted by Appellee ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16849, - ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133. Date of service: 05/26/2010. [7351381] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of brief. 05/28/2010 by RY] (JET)
May 11, 2010 Filing 125 Received 7 paper copies of (REDACTED VERSION) First Brief on Cross-Appeal [122] filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss. [7334007] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (SD)
May 10, 2010 Filing 124 Filed clerk order: The first brief on cross-appeal (REDACTED VERSION) [122] submitted by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7331109] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (FT)
May 7, 2010 Filing 123 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:TAH): The motion of defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, and Divya Narenda ("the Founders") for leave to file a public, redacted version of the previously filed sealed opening brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the redacted brief. The remainder of the briefing schedule is unchanged. [7329300] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (WL)
May 5, 2010 Filing 122 Filed (ECF) Intervenors Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133 Correspondence: Letter re Public Redacted Version of Appellants'/Cross-Appellees' Opening Brief. Date of service: 05/05/2010 [7326022] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (JD)
April 29, 2010 Filing 121 Filed (UNDER SEAL) original and 7 copies of Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133 first brief on cross-appeal. (Informal: No). 74 pages. Served on: 04/26/2010. [7319569] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133]--[Edited 04/29/2010 by BY] (FT)
April 29, 2010 Filing 120 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:TAH): The motion of defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, and Divya Narenda ("the Founders") to file the substitute opening brief under seal is denied as unnecessary. The brief shall be filed under seal pursuant to the court's March 29, 2010 order. The remainder of the briefing schedule is unchanged. The parties are reminded that if the filing of a document under seal is required by a protective order entered in the lower court, the document should be filed according to the procedures set forth at Ninth Circuit Rule 27-13(a)(b); a motion for relief is not necessary. [7318675] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (WL)
April 26, 2010 Filing 119 Received original and 7 copies of Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, Divya Narendra in 09-15021 first brief on on cross-appeal of 74 pages. (Informal: motion pending). Served on. Major deficiencies: motion pending. Other deficiencies:. [7317841] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133]--[Edited 04/28/2010 by BY] (FT)
April 26, 2010 Filing 118 Filed Appellants Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, Appellant Divya Narendra in 09-15021 motion to fileOpening brief UNDER SEAL.. Served on 04/26/2010. [7317646] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (FT)
March 29, 2010 Filing 116 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner)On December 11, 2009, the motions panel referred plaintiff Facebook's motion to dismiss portions of case Nos. 08-16745 and 08-16873 to the merits panel. The request of defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, and Divya Narenda ("the Founders") to withdraw their March 5, 2009 opposition to Facebook's motion to dismiss, in order to allow the movants to include a revised opposition to the motion in the first cross-appeal brief, is denied. The opposed motion of defendants Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, and Divya Narenda ("the Founders") for leave to file an oversized first brief on cross-appeal of 20,609 words is granted in part. The defendants shall file a substitute first brief on cross-appeal not to exceed 17,500 words on or before April 26, 2010. The second cross-appeal brief is due May 26, 2010. The third cross-appeal brief is due June 25, 2010. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the third cross-appeal brief. Volumes Four and Five of the Founders' excerpts of record shall be filed under seal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 27-13. The defendants may also file the substitute opening brief under seal. 9th Cir. R. 27-13.. (Pro Mo) [7281420] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (KKW)
March 24, 2010 Filing 115 Filed (ECF) Intervenors Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133 Correspondence: Scheduling of Oral Argument. Date of service: 03/24/2010 [7277450] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (JBF)
March 11, 2010 Filing 114 Filed (ECF) Intervenors Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133 Correspondence: Public Redacted Version of Appellants'/Cross-Appellees' Opening Brief. Date of service: 03/11/2010 [7262829] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (JD)
March 8, 2010 Filing 113 Filed (ECF) Intervenors Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133 reply to response (). Date of service: 03/08/2010. [7257155] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (SMS)
February 26, 2010 Filing 111 Filed (ECF) Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg Correspondence: Status of the Appeal and Briefing Schedule.. Date of service: 02/26/2010 [7246978]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to consolidated cases. 02/26/2010 by MA] (YPG)
February 24, 2010 Filing 112 Received UNDER SEAL Exhibit 1: Declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in support of Facebook Inc.'s opposition to appellants/croos-appellee's motion to file over-lenght opening brief and to withdraw opposition to Facebook's motion to dismiss . [7247433] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873] (JFF)
February 24, 2010 Filing 108 Filed (ECF) Appellee The Facebook, Inc. in 08-16745 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Notification and Motion to Seal Ex. 1 to Declaration of Theresa Sutton In Support of Facebook's Opposition to Appellants Motion to File Over-Length Opening Brief and Withdraw Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Dismiss]. Date of service: 02/24/2010. [7243464] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873] (INC)
February 24, 2010 Filing 107 Filed (ECF) Appellee The Facebook, Inc. in 08-16745 response opposing motion to file over-length brief . Date of service: 02/24/2010. [7243444] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text to reflect content of filing. 02/24/2010 by MA] (INC)
February 19, 2010 Filing 106 Added attorney Noah S. Rosenthal for Cameron Winklevoss Tyler Winklevoss Divya Narendra. [7237908] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (EL)
February 19, 2010 Filing 105 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Noah S. Rosenthal for Intervenors Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133. Date of service: 02/19/2010. [7237781] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (NSR)
February 16, 2010 Filing 117 Received 1 (proposed) copy of Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873 first brief on on cross-appeal of 86 pages. (Informal: motion pending). Served on. Major deficiencies: motion pending. Other deficiencies:. [7281445] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (FT)
February 16, 2010 Filing 110 Filed Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021 (Notification) of need to file under seal Volumes 4 & 5 excerpts of record; Served on 02/12/2010. [7246772] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (FT)
February 16, 2010 Filing 109 Filed Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021 motion to file oversized brief; file brief understal; withdraw opposition to motion to dismiss. Served on 02/12/2010. [7246754] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (FT)
February 16, 2010 Filing 104 Filed Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849 excerpts of record in 5 volumes. [7237531] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (FT)
February 12, 2010 Filing 103 Filed (ECF) Intervenors Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133 Motion to take judicial notice of certain filings in the related litigation between the Founders and ConnectU (as plaintiffs) and Facebook and Mark Zuckerberg (as defendants) in the United States District Court in the District of Massachusetts.. Date of service: 02/12/2010. [7231629] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (JD)
January 22, 2010 Filing 102 Filed (ECF) Intervenors Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133 Correspondence: confirm oral request of extension of time per rule 31-2.2(a). Date of service: 01/22/2010 [7205523] [08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133] (JBF)
December 14, 2009 Filing 101 Order filed (ALFRED T. GOODWIN, PAMELA ANN RYMER and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) The court’s October 9, 2009 order to show cause is discharged. This appeal is dismissed as unnecessary because the order appealed herein was issued by the district court on a limited remand pursuant to this court’s July 1, 2009 order in consolidated appeals Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873. The Clerk shall transfer all filings on the docket for appeal No. 09-17050 to consolidated appeal Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873. The notice of appeal filed in this docket shall be filed as an amended notice of appeal in docket Nos. 08- 16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873. This appeal is dismissed and all pending motions are denied as moot.[7162997] (WL)
December 11, 2009 Filing 78 Filed order (ALFRED T. GOODWIN, PAMELA ANN RYMER and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) The motion of Appellants and Cross-Appellees Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narenda (“the Founders”) to consolidate these appeals is granted. Previously consolidated appeal Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873 are now consolidated with appeal and cross-appeal Nos. 09-15021 and 09-15133. The stay of proceedings in these consolidated appeals is lifted. The motion to withdraw the opening brief filed on November 4, 2008 in consolidated appeal Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873 is granted. The brief is withdrawn. The Founders’ opposition to ConnectU, Inc.’s motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 08-16745 is construed as a motion to intervene in appeal No. 08-16745. So construed, the motion is granted. ConnectU, Inc.’s motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 08-16745 is construed as a motion to withdraw from that appeal. So construed, the motion is granted. The Facebook, Inc.’s February 18, 2009 motion to dismiss portions of appeal Nos. 08-16745 and 08-16873 is referred to the panel that will decide the merits of this appeal. The Founders’ motion to reset the briefing schedule is granted in part. The first brief in these consolidated cross-appeals is due February 1, 2010; the second brief is due March 3, 2010; the third brief is due April 2, 2010; and the fourth brief is due within 14 days after service of the third brief. All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the greatest extent practicable. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. [7161285] [08-16745, 08-16873, 09-15021, 09-15133, 08-16849] (WL)
December 4, 2009 Filing 99 Filed (ECF) Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss response to motion (Status Report Reqd by Court (ECF Filing) ). Date of service: 12/04/2009. [7152813] (SMS)
November 25, 2009 Filing 98 Added attorney Alison P. Buchanan for ConnectU, Inc. [7143691] (JFF)
November 25, 2009 Filing 95 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alison P. Buchanan for Appellee ConnectU, Inc.. Date of service: 11/25/2009. [7143647] (APB)
November 25, 2009 Filing 94 Filed (ECF) Appellee ConnectU, Inc. status report (as required by Court order dated 07/01/2009). Date of service: 11/25/2009 [7143574] (JET)
November 10, 2009 Filing 92 Filed (ECF) - The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg response to Court order dated 10/09/2009. Date of service: 11/10/2009. [7126951] (YPG)
November 9, 2009 Filing 90 Filed (ECF) Appellee ConnectU, Inc. reply to response to Court order dated 10/09/2009. Date of service: 11/09/2009. [7124573] (JET)
October 30, 2009 Filing 88 Filed (ECF) Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss response to Court order dated 10/09/2009. Date of service: 10/30/2009. [7114894] (SMS)
October 30, 2009 Filing 77 Filed (ECF) - Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873 response to Court order dated 10/09/2009. Date of service: 10/30/2009. [7114888] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (SMS)
October 26, 2009 Filing 87 Added attorney John Duchemin for Cameron Winklevoss Tyler Winklevoss Divya Narendra, in case 09-17050. [7108568] (AF)
October 26, 2009 Filing 85 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John P. Duchemin for Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss. Date of service: 10/26/2009. [7108524] (JD)
October 26, 2009 Filing 76 Added attorney John Duchemin for Cameron Winklevoss Tyler Winklevoss Divya Narendra, in case 08-16745. [7108548] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (AF)
October 26, 2009 Filing 75 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John P. Duchemin for - Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873. Date of service: 10/26/2009. [7108508] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (JD)
October 9, 2009 Filing 84 Filed order MOATT: (NMG) A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over the appeal because orders disqualifying counsel are not immediately appealable orders. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellants shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellants elect to show cause, a response may be filed within 8 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [7090807] (KD)
October 9, 2009 Filing 74 Filed (ECF) - Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873 reply to response (Response to Motion (ECF Filing) , Response to Motion (ECF Filing) ). Date of service: 10/09/2009. [7091556] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (SMS)
September 28, 2009 Filing 83 Filed certificate of record on appeal. RT filed in DC 08/18/2009 [7078626] (JFF)
September 28, 2009 Filing 82 Received copy of transcript designation and ordering form filed in DC. [7077881] (JFF)
September 28, 2009 Filing 73 Filed (ECF) Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16745 response to motion (Status Report Reqd by Court (ECF Filing) ). Date of service: 09/28/2009. [7077378] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (INC)
September 28, 2009 Filing 72 Filed (ECF) Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745, Appellee ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16849, - ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16873 response opposing motion (Status Report Reqd by Court (ECF Filing) ). Date of service: 09/28/2009. [7077340] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (JET)
September 18, 2009 Filing 81 Filed Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss Civil Appeals Docketing Statement. Served on 09/15/2009. [7066363] (GR)
September 18, 2009 Filing 80 Filed representation notice of Jerome B. Falk, Jr. and Sean M. SeLegue. [7066356] (GR)
September 18, 2009 Filing 79 Pursuant to this court's order filed 12/14/09. Appeal No. 09-17050 is dismissed as unnecessary and all filings are transferred to consolidated appeal Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873. (See order for full text) [7163030] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (EU)
September 14, 2009 Filing 71 Filed (ECF) Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, - Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849 status report (as required by Court order dated 07/01/2009). Date of service: 09/14/2009 [7061253] [08-16873, 08-16745, 08-16849] (SMS)
September 11, 2009 Filing 70 Added attorney Jerome B. Falk Jr., Sean Selegue for Cameron Winklevoss Tyler Winklevoss Divya Narendra, in case 08-16873. [7058572] [08-16849, 08-16873] (JFF)
September 11, 2009 Filing 69 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sean M. SeLegue for Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849. Date of service: 09/11/2009. [7058514] [08-16873, 08-16849] (SMS)
September 11, 2009 Filing 68 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jerome B. Falk, Jr. for Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849. Date of service: 09/11/2009. [7058455] [08-16873, 08-16849] (JBF)
September 9, 2009 Filing 67 Filed (ECF) Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745, Appellee ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16849, - ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16873 status report (as required by Court order dated 07/01/2009). Date of service: 09/09/2009 [7056168] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (JET)
August 28, 2009 Filing 66 Filed (ECF) Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745, Appellee ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16849, - ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16873 status report (as required by Court order dated 07/01/2009). Date of service: 08/28/2009 [7045040] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (JET)
July 1, 2009 Filing 65 Filed order (ALEX KOZINSKI, RICHARD A. PAEZ and RICHARD C. TALLMAN) The motion of ConnectU, Inc. to substitute new counsel in consolidated appeals Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873 is granted. These consolidated and related appeals and cross-appeals are remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of enabling the district court to consider the issues raised in ConnectU, Inc.’s motion to disqualify counsel, the opposition thereto and the reply filed in support of the motion. The Clerk shall forward to the district court ConnectU, Inc.’s motion to disqualify counsel, the Founders’ response thereto and ConnectU, Inc.’s reply, received on January 20, 2009, February 13, 2009 and February 26, 2009, respectively. Proceedings in these consolidated and related appeals are stayed pending further order of the court. Within 60 days of the filing date of this order or within 7 days of the district court’s ruling on the motion to disqualify, whichever occurs first, the parties shall file a report on the status of district court proceedings and motion for appropriate relief. [6976558] [08-16745, 09-15021, 09-15133, 08-16873, 08-16849] (WL)
July 1, 2009 Filing 64 Deleted Incorrect Docket Entry (WL)
March 12, 2009 Filing 62 Filed (ECF) Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16745, Appellants The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16849, 08-16873, 09-15021 reply to response (Appellee Motion ,Appellee Motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 03/12/2009. [6843770] [08-16745, 09-15021, 08-16873, 08-16849] (TAS)
March 5, 2009 Filing 61 ENTRY UPDATED. Filed UNDER SEAL Evan Parke's declaration and volume II of exhibits I and J in support of Connectu Founders' opposition to facebook's motion to dismiss, served on 03/04/2009 [08-16745, 09-15021, 08-16873, 08-16849] (NEW)
March 5, 2009 Filing 60 Filed Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss notice of sealed filing anf motion to seal declaration of Evan Parke and volume II in support of Connectu Founders' opposition to Facebook's motion to dismiss. Served on 03/05/2009. [08-16745, 09-15021, 08-16873, 08-16849] (NEW)
March 5, 2009 Filing 59 Filed (ECF) - Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021 response motion (Response to Motion (ECF Filing) ). Date of service: 03/05/2009. [6835065] [08-16745, 09-15021, 08-16873, 08-16849] (EAP)
March 5, 2009 Filing 58 Filed (ECF) - Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, 09-15021 response opposing motion (Appellee Motion ,Appellee Motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 03/05/2009. [6834968] [08-16745, 09-15021, 08-16873, 08-16849] (EAP)
February 26, 2009 Filing 57 Filed (ECF) Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745, Appellee ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16849, - ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16873 reply to response (Motion (ECF Filing) ). Date of service: 02/26/2009. [6824471] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (APB)
February 19, 2009 Filing 56 Received Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg addendum to Motion to Dismiss portions of the Appeal (Declaration of Theresa Sutton in Support of Motion to Dismiss- Vol. 2 Exhibits K to U) Served on 02/18/2009 [08-16745, 09-15021, 08-16873, 08-16849] (NEW)
February 18, 2009 Filing 55 Received UNDER SEAL declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in support of moton to dismiss; exhibits; Served on 02/18/2009 [08-16745, 09-15021, 08-16873, 08-16849] (NEW)
February 18, 2009 Filing 54 ENTRY UPDATED TO CORRECT EVENT: Filed Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg notification and motion to seal exhibits A-J to the declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in suuport of motion to dismiss. Served on 02/18/2009 [08-16745, 09-15021, 08-16873, 08-16849]--[Edited 02/25/2009 by HH] (NEW)
February 18, 2009 Filing 53 Filed Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg Motion to Dismiss Portions of Appeals, Served on 02/18/2009. [08-16745, 09-15021, 08-16873, 08-16849] (NEW)
February 13, 2009 Filing 52 Filed (ECF) - Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873 response opposing motion (Motion (ECF Filing) , motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 02/13/2009. [6809160] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (EAP)
January 29, 2009 Filing 51 Filed order MOATT: (NMG) The unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to Appellant Connectu, Inc.’s motion to disqualify is granted. The response is due February 13, 2009. Any reply is due five days after service of the response. All other pending motions will be addressed by separate order. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (KD)
January 28, 2009 Filing 50 Received Attorney Evan Andrew Parke for Appellant ConnectU, Inc. letter dated 01/27/2009 re: a recently filed motion to extend time is now unopposed. Dated on 01/27/2009 [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (NEW)
January 23, 2009 Filing 49 Filed (ECF) - Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873 Motion to extend time to file a response until 02/13/2009. Date of service: 01/23/2009. [6783300] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (EAP)
January 20, 2009 Filing 48 Filed (ECF) Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16745, Appellants The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16849, 08-16873 response joining motion (Appellant Motion ,Appellant Motion to dismiss the case pursuant to rule 42b). Date of service: 01/20/2009. [6776507] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (INC)
January 20, 2009 Filing 47 Filed (ECF) Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Appellant ConnectU, Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify Counsel ]. Date of service: 01/20/2009. [6775710] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (JET)
January 16, 2009 Filing 46 Filed (ECF) Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745 reply to response (Notice of Appearance (ECF Filing) , Notice of Appearance (ECF Filing) , Transcript Designation (ECF Filing) ). Date of service: 01/16/2009. [6774775] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (JET)
January 16, 2009 Filing 45 Added attorney Alison P. Buchanan and James E. Towery for ConnectU, Inc. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (NEW)
January 16, 2009 Filing 44 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of for Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745. Date of service: 01/16/2009. [6774702] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (JET)
January 16, 2009 Filing 43 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of for Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745. Date of service: 01/16/2009. [6774643] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (JET)
January 6, 2009 Filing 42 Filed (ECF) Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, - Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16745, Appellees Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849 response motion (42b Dispositive Motion , Appellant Motion ,Appellant Motion to withdraw as counsel, Appellant Motion ,Appellant Motion to dismiss the case pursuant to rule 42b). Date of service: 01/06/2009. [6758862] [08-16873, 08-16745, 08-16849] (EAP)
December 29, 2008 Filing 41 Filed (ECF) Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745, Appellee ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16849, - ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16873 Motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 12/29/2008. [6751410] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (SRM)
December 29, 2008 Filing 40 Filed (ECF) courtesy copy of transcript designation forms. Date of service: 12/29/2008. [6750885] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (EAP)
December 22, 2008 Filing 39 Filed stipulation to voluntarily dismiss appeal and [proposed] order. Dated on 12/19/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (RL)
December 22, 2008 Filing 38 Filed Appellant ConnectU, Inc. motion for withdrawal and appointment of substitiute counsel for defendant-appellant ConnectU, Inc. Served on 12/22/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (MT)
December 22, 2008 Filing 37 Filed Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745 motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal pursuant to frap 42 (b). Served on 12/22/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (MT)
December 12, 2008 Filing 36 Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY, EDWARD LEAVY and ANDREW J. KLEINFELD) Appellants/Cross-Appellees’ unopposed motion to file under seal their “emergency motion to stay and alternative petition for writ of mandamus” and exhibits and reply in support of that motion is granted. Appellees/Cross-Appellants’ unopposed motion to file under seal their opposition to the emergency motion and exhibits in support of that opposition is granted. Appellants/Cross-Appellees’ “emergency motion to stay and alternative petition for writ of mandamus” is denied. Appellees/Cross-Appellants’ motion to dismiss is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the second cross-appeal brief. The second cross-appeal brief is due 30 days after the filing date of this order; the third cross-appeal brief is due 30 days after the filing date of the second cross-appeal brief; and the optional reply cross-appeal brief is due 14 days after service of the third cross-appeal brief. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (WL)
December 10, 2008 Filing 34 Filed Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16745, Appellants The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16849, 08-16873 reply to the response to the dispositive motion w/vol. 1 declaration of Yvonne P. Greer and vol. 2 declaration of Yvonne P. Greer UNDER SEAL w/notification of filing under seal. Served on 12/09/2008 [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (CW)
December 9, 2008 Filing 35 Filed Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745, Appellee ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16849 reply to response to emerg mtn to stay and alternative petn for writ of mandamus, w/separate declaration of `Evan A. Parke in support, served on 12/08/2008 [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (CW)
December 9, 2008 Filing 33 Filed (ECF) - Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745, Appellees ConnectU, Inc., Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, - ConnectU, Inc. and Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873 reply to response (Emergency Motion ,Emergency Motion to stay lower court action, Response to Motion ). Date of service: 12/09/2008. [6732991] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (EAP)
December 9, 2008 Filing 32 Electronically-filed document [31] Reply to Response to Motion (ECF Filing) is stricken because there is an error in the document. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-74104, 08-16849] Not in a searchable PDF format, linked to related case 08-74104 in error. (CW)
December 9, 2008 Filing 31 Filed (ECF) - Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745, Appellees ConnectU, Inc., Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16849, - ConnectU, Inc. and Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-16873, Real Parties in Interest ConnectU, Inc., Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss in 08-74104 reply to response (Emergency Motion ,Emergency Motion to stay lower court action, Response to Motion ). Date of service: 12/09/2008. [6732459] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-74104, 08-16849] (EAP)
December 5, 2008 Filing 30 Filed Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16745, Appellants The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16849, 08-16873 opposition to aplts 4th emergency motion to stay, w/v.1 declaration of Monte Copper in support, and v.2 declaration of Monte Cooper UNDER SEAL, with copy of protective order Served on 12/05/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] MOATT VIA front counter) (CW)
December 2, 2008 Filing 29 Filed defendants response opposing Dispositive Motion , Dispositive Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction w/separate declaration. Served on 12/02/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (CW)
November 25, 2008 Filing 28 Filed UNDER SEAL Aplts/x-aples ConnectU, Inc., et al. emergency motion to stay and alternative petition for writ of mandamus; declaration and exhibits in 3 Vols. (Vol. II SEALED; Vols. I & III not sealed); served on 11/25/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (HH)
November 25, 2008 Filing 27 Filed Aplts/x-aples ConnectU, Inc., et al. motion to seal emergency motion to stay/petition for writ of mandamus; served on 11/25/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (HH)
November 18, 2008 Filing 26 Filed certificate of record on appeal. RT filed in DC 11/14/08 [08-16745, 08-16849] (CW)
November 14, 2008 Filing 25 Filed Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16745, Appellants The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16849, 08-16873 dispositive motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction.. Served on 11/14/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (CW)
November 4, 2008 Filing 63 Filed UNDER SEAL original and 15 copies of ConnectU, Inc.'s first brief on cross-appeal (Informal: No) of 57 pages. Five copies Excerpts of record in 3 volumes (Vols. 2 & 3 FILED UNDER SEAL). Served on 10/06/2008. [6968358] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (LA)
November 4, 2008 Filing 24 Filed order (STEPHEN S. TROTT, RONALD M. GOULD and RICHARD C. TALLMAN) CNET Networks, Inc.’s (“CNET”) motion to intervene is granted. CNET’s motion to unseal documents filed in the district court is denied. Defendants-Appellants/Cross-Appellees’ (“Appellants”) motion to file under seal Appellants’ brief and volumes II and III of excerpts of record is granted. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (WL)
October 27, 2008 Filing 23 14 day oral extenstion by phone to file Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16745 2ND cross-appeal brief. 2nd xap brief due 11/19/08. 3rd xap brief due 12/19/08. The optional reply cross-appeal brief is due 14 days after service of the third cross-appeal brief. . [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (TH)
October 24, 2008 Filing 22 Filed (ECF) Intervenor CNET Networks, Inc. in 08-16745 reply to response ( Response to Motion ). Date of service: 10/24/2008. [6685730] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (RRM)
October 21, 2008 Filing 21 Filed Appellees/Cross-Appellants The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg opposition to motion of CNET to intervene and unseal. Served on 10/21/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (NEW)
October 15, 2008 Filing 20 Received corrected deficiency of addtional brief copies from Appellant ConnectU, Inc. served on 10/14/2008. Deficiency: Motion to file UNDER SEAL still pending. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (GLS)
October 14, 2008 Filing 19 Electronically-filed document [15] Response to Motion (ECF Filing) is stricken because there is an error in the document. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-74104, 08-16849] Incorrecly added 08-74104 to motion. (CW)
October 10, 2008 Filing 17 Filed order MOATT: (RB)Appellees/Cross-Appellants Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg’s (“Appellees”) request for an extension of time to file their response to the motion to Cnet Networks, Inc. to intervene and to unseal documents (the “Motion”) is granted. Appellees’ response to the Motion is now due October 21, 2008. Any reply to Appellees’ response is due October 24, 2008. The briefing schedule established previously shall remain in effect. (KD)
October 10, 2008 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Intervenor CNET Networks, Inc. in 08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873 response opposing motion (Cross-Appeal Motion to extend time to file opposition). Date of service: 10/10/2008. [6671825] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (RRM)
October 9, 2008 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Intervenor CNET Networks, Inc. in 08-16745, 08-16849, 08-16873 response opposing motion (Cross-Appeal Motion to extend time to file opposition). Date of service: 10/09/2008. [6671708] [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-74104, 08-16849] (RRM)
October 9, 2008 Filing 14 Filed original and 4 copies of Appellant ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16745, Appellee ConnectU, Inc. in 08-16849 motion to file UNDER SEAL vols 2 and 3 of excerpts of record.. Served on 10/06/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (CW)
October 7, 2008 Filing 18 Received ( UNDER SEAL ) original and 3 copies of ConnectU, Inc. first brief on on cross-appeal of 57 pages. 3 volumes of excerpts of record volumes 2 and 3 Under seal. (Informal: No). Served on 10/06/2008. Deficiency: Motion pending. Other deficiencies: 12 more copies of the brief are required. Notificed counsel. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (WP)
October 6, 2008 Filing 13 Filed original and 4 copies of Appellees The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16745, req for continuance pursuant to FRAP 26b and 27a3A of date on which opp is due to mtn of Cnet to intervene and unseal. Served on 10/06/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (CW)
September 26, 2008 Filing 11 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:VLS ): These cases are under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. A settlement assessment conference will be held by telephone on October 20, 2008, at 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC (San Francisco) Time. The briefing schedules previously set by the court remain in effect. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (SC)
September 25, 2008 Filing 12 Filed proposed Intervenor CNET Networks, Inc. motion to intervene and unseal memorandum of points and authorities; with 2 vols of exhibits. Served on 09/25/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (CW)
September 23, 2008 Filing 10 Filed certificate of record on appeal. RT filed in DC 7/2/08 7/3/08 8/21/08 [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (CW)
August 29, 2008 Filing 8 Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): These cases are under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform Stephen Liacouras, Circuit Mediator, in writing, by fax at (415) 355-8566, of their clients’ views on whether... This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, from the other parties in the case. This communication shall not be served on the opposing party and shall not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedules remain in effect pending the determination whether the case will be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (WL)
August 29, 2008 Filing 7 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:TAH ): The defendants' motion to consolidate case Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849, and 08-16873 is granted. The motion includes the defendants' notice under Ninth Circuit Rule 28-4 that the defendants intend to file joint briefs. The defendants’ principal brief and excerpts of record are due October 6, 2008; this due date includes the 21-day enlargement of time provided for under Ninth Circuit Rule 28-4. The plaintiff's principal and response brief is due November 5, 2008. The defendants' response and reply brief is due December 5, 2008. The plaintiff's optional reply brief is due 14 days from service of the response and reply brief. Court records do not currently reflect that the district court has issued the certificates of record for case Nos. 08-16745 and 08-16849. The parties shall monitor the issuance of the certificates. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (WL)
August 27, 2008 Filing 6 Received Appellant ConnectU, Inc.'s notice of designation of reporter's transcript. [08-16745, 08-16849] (EL)
August 27, 2008 Filing 5 Filed Appellants' ConnectU, Inc. unopposed motion to consolidate appeals. Served on 08/27/2008. [08-16745, 08-16873, 08-16849] (EL)
August 26, 2008 Filing 9 Filed certificate of record on appeal. RT filed in DC 8/22/08 [08-16745, 08-16849] (CW)
August 21, 2008 Filing 4 Received aples x-Appellants The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg in 08-16849 notice of designation of reporter's transcript, stmt of issues, objection to Connectu, Inc initial notice and statement of issues.. [08-16745, 08-16849] (CW)
August 20, 2008 Filing 3 Filed Appellants The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg Civil Appeals Docketing Statement. Served on 08/13/2008. (GR)
August 20, 2008 Filing 2 Filed representation notice of Sean Lincoln, I. Neel Chatterjee, Monte Cooper, Theresa A. Sutton, Yvonne P. Greer (GR)
August 20, 2008 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND CADS: No. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: First cross appeal brief due 09/15/2008 for ConnectU, Inc.. Second brief on cross appeal due 10/15/2008 for The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg. Third brief on cross appeal due 11/14/2008 for Wayne Chang, ConnectU, Inc., Divya Narendra, Pacific Northwest Software, Inc., Winston Williams, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss. Optional cross-appeal reply brief is due 14 days from service of 3rd cross-appeal brief. [08-16849, 08-16745] (GR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: The Facebook, Inc., et al v. ConnectU, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: THE FACEBOOK, INC.
Represented By: Warrington Samuel Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: MARK ZUCKERBERG
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: CONNECTU, INC., FKA ConnectU, LLC
Represented By: Alison P. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: PACIFIC NORTHWEST SOFTWARE, INC.
Represented By: Scott R. Mosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: WAYNE CHANG
Represented By: Scott R. Mosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: WINSTON WILLIAMS
Represented By: Scott R. Mosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: CAMERON WINKLEVOSS
Represented By: Mark A. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: TYLER WINKLEVOSS
Represented By: Mark A. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: DIVYA NARENDRA
Represented By: Mark A. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?