James Rothery, et al v. County of Sacramento, et al

Plaintiff: DEANNA SYKES, ANDREW WITHAM, ADAM RICHARDS, CALGUNS FOUNDATION, INC. and SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMES ROTHERY and ANDREA HOFFMAN
Defendant / Appellee: COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO, LOU BLANAS, Former Sheriff, JOHN MCGINNIS, Sheriff, TIMOTHY SHEEHAN, Detective, FRED MASON, Detective, SACRAMENTO COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, an independent branch of government of the County of Sacrame, JERRY BROWN, Attorney General of the State of California, DOES 1 THROUGH 225, unknown co-conspirators, KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General and SACRAMENTO COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, an independent branch of government of the County of Sacramento
Case Number: 09-16852
Filed: August 25, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 103 Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 18-121 Filed on: 07/26/2018 Cert Petition Action 1: Pending, 11/05/2018 Ruling: Denied [11072179] (HH) [Entered: 11/05/2018 02:30 PM]
July 30, 2018 102 Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 18-121 Filed on: 07/26/2018 Cert Petition Action 1: Pending [10959177] (RR) [Entered: 07/30/2018 12:38 PM]
May 7, 2018 101 MANDATE ISSUED. (MMM, PJW and MTF) Costs are taxed against Appellant in the amount of $69.00. [10863197] (JFF) [Entered: 05/07/2018 10:06 AM]
April 27, 2018 100 Filed order (M. MARGARET MCKEOWN, PAUL J. WATFORD and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) The panel has voted to deny the petition for panel rehearing. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc and no judge has requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. See Fed. R. App. P. 35. Appellants petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (Docket Entry No. [ # 99 ]) are denied. No further filings will be entertained in this closed case. [10853761] (GB) [Entered: 04/27/2018 12:26 PM]
November 22, 2017 99 Filed (ECF) Appellants Andrea Hoffman and James Rothery petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 11/08/2017 opinion). Date of service: 11/22/2017. [10665615] [09-16852] (Gorski, Gary) [Entered: 11/22/2017 11:55 PM]
November 21, 2017 98 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, John McGinnis and Sacramento County Sheriff's Department bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 101.50 USD. Date of service: 11/21/2017 [10663619] [09-16852] (Lavra, John) [Entered: 11/21/2017 04:02 PM]
November 8, 2017 97 FILED MEMORANDUM (M. MARGARET MCKEOWN, PAUL J. WATFORD and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [10647565] (KMD) [Entered: 11/08/2017 10:20 AM]
December 23, 2016 96 Received 7 paper copies of Reply Brief [ # 94 ] filed by Andrea Hoffman and James Rothery. [10246014] (SD) [Entered: 12/23/2016 04:20 PM]
December 20, 2016 95 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 94 ] submitted by Andrea Hoffman and James Rothery is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10239668] (SML) [Entered: 12/20/2016 09:30 AM]
December 19, 2016 94 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants James Rothery and Andrea Hoffman. Date of service: 12/19/2016. [10239385] [09-16852] (Gorski, Gary) [Entered: 12/19/2016 11:55 PM]
November 21, 2016 93 Streamlined request [90] by Appellants Andrea Hoffman and James Rothery to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: the optional reply brief is due December 19, 2016. [10205825] (LL) [Entered: 11/21/2016 05:02 PM]
November 21, 2016 92 Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 84 ] filed by Lou Blanas, et al. [10205141] (SD) [Entered: 11/21/2016 02:30 PM]
November 21, 2016 91 Filed 4 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [ # 86 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellees Lou Blanas, et al. [10204603] (SML) [Entered: 11/21/2016 11:32 AM]
November 20, 2016 90 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Reply Brief by Appellants James Rothery and Andrea Hoffman. New requested due date is 12/19/2016. [10203836] [09-16852] (Gorski, Gary) [Entered: 11/20/2016 12:31 PM]
November 15, 2016 89 Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 85 ] filed by Kamala D. Harris. [10198232] (SD) [Entered: 11/15/2016 04:32 PM]
November 14, 2016 88 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 85 ] submitted by Kamala D. Harris is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10195014] (SML) [Entered: 11/14/2016 10:52 AM]
November 14, 2016 87 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 84 ] submitted by Lou Blanas, et al., is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [ # 86 ] submitted by Lou Blanas, et al. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10195007] (SML) [Entered: 11/14/2016 10:51 AM]
November 10, 2016 86 Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan. Date of service: 11/10/2016. [10193715] [09-16852] (Lavra, John) [Entered: 11/10/2016 02:45 PM]
November 10, 2016 85 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Kamala D. Harris. Date of service: 11/10/2016. [10193674] [09-16852] (Waters, George) [Entered: 11/10/2016 02:38 PM]
November 10, 2016 84 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan. Date of service: 11/10/2016. [10193586] [09-16852] (Lavra, John) [Entered: 11/10/2016 02:17 PM]
November 10, 2016 83 Added attorney Amanda L. McDermott for John McGinnis Timothy Sheehan County of Sacramento Lou Blanas, in case 09-16852. [10193545] (JFF) [Entered: 11/10/2016 02:05 PM]
November 10, 2016 82 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Amanda Lynn McDermott for Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan. Date of service: 11/10/2016. [10193516] [09-16852] (McDermott, Amanda) [Entered: 11/10/2016 01:57 PM]
October 4, 2016 81 Streamlined request [80] by Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, John McGinnis and Sacramento County Sheriff's Department answering brief due 11/10/2016. The optional reply brief is due 14 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [10148047] (LKK) [Entered: 10/04/2016 12:38 PM]
October 4, 2016 80 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan. New requested due date is 11/10/2016. [10147827] [09-16852] (Lavra, John) [Entered: 10/04/2016 11:42 AM]
September 28, 2016 79 Streamlined request [78] by Appellee Kamala D. Harris to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellee Kamala D. Harris, Attorney General answering brief due 11/10/2016. The optional reply brief is due 14 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [10141201] (LKK) [Entered: 09/28/2016 04:52 PM]
September 27, 2016 78 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee Kamala D. Harris. New requested due date is 11/10/2016. [10139352] [09-16852] (Waters, George) [Entered: 09/27/2016 02:45 PM]
July 6, 2016 77 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The appellees motion (Docket Entry [ # 76 ]) to further stay appellate proceedings pending Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971, is granted as follows. Appellate proceedings are stayed until October 11, 2016. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after the last-served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice.(Pro Mo) [10039636] (MS) [Entered: 07/06/2016 08:11 AM]
June 27, 2016 76 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Joint Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 06/27/2016. [10030803] [09-16852] (Waters, George) [Entered: 06/27/2016 03:50 PM]
April 14, 2016 75 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The appellees motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971, is granted as follows. Appellate proceedings are stayed until July 13, 2016. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after the last-served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. (Pro Mo) [9939931] (MS) [Entered: 04/14/2016 11:34 AM]
March 16, 2016 74 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Joint Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 03/16/2016. [9904049] [09-16852] (Waters, George) [Entered: 03/16/2016 01:58 PM]
January 6, 2016 73 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The appellees motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971, is granted as follows. Appellate proceedings are stayed until April 6, 2016. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after the last-served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. (Pro Mo) [9817846] (OC) [Entered: 01/06/2016 03:20 PM]
December 15, 2015 72 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 12/15/2015. [9793832] [09-16852] (Waters, George) [Entered: 12/15/2015 03:52 PM]
September 17, 2015 71 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The appellees motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971, is granted as follows. Appellate proceedings are stayed until December 29, 2015. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after the last-served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. (Pro Mo) [9686944] (OC) [Entered: 09/17/2015 01:55 PM]
September 10, 2015 70 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 09/10/2015. [9678673] [09-16852] (GW) [Entered: 09/10/2015 03:51 PM]
August 6, 2015 69 Terminated Jeri Lynn Pappone for Timothy Sheehan, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department, John McGinnis, Fred Mason, County of Sacramento and Lou Blanas in 09-16852 (csl no longer with firm) [9637858] (ASW) [Entered: 08/06/2015 04:02 PM]
August 6, 2015 68 Added attorney John A. Lavra for County of Sacramento, in case 09-16852 (court correction of docket). [9637856] (ASW) [Entered: 08/06/2015 04:02 PM]
June 17, 2015 67 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The appellees motion to further stay appellate pending Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971, proceedings is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until September 30, 2015. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after the last-served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. (Pro Mo) [9578074] (MS) [Entered: 06/17/2015 01:12 PM]
June 11, 2015 66 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 06/11/2015. [9570406] [09-16852] (GW) [Entered: 06/11/2015 09:57 AM]
March 11, 2015 65 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): The appellees unopposed motion to stay appellate proceedings pending the resolution of Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971, is granted in part. Appellate proceedings are stayed until June 30, 2015. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering brief is filed, the optional reply brief will be due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [9453999] (OC) [Entered: 03/11/2015 04:18 PM]
March 10, 2015 64 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 03/10/2015. [9451467] [09-16852] (GMW) [Entered: 03/10/2015 10:56 AM]
December 23, 2014 63 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): The appellees motion to stay appellate proceedings pending resolution of the petition for rehearing en banc in Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971, is granted in part. Appellate proceedings are stayed until March 31, 2015. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after the last served answering brief.[9360001] (WL) [Entered: 12/23/2014 11:30 AM]
December 18, 2014 62 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 12/18/2014. [9355404] [09-16852] (GMW) [Entered: 12/18/2014 03:56 PM]
September 25, 2014 61 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): The appellees motion to stay appellate proceedings pending resolution of the petition for rehearing en banc in Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971, is granted in part. Appellate proceedings are stayed until December 30, 2014. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after the last served answering brief. [9253899] (WL)
September 23, 2014 60 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 09/23/2014. [9250466] (GMW)
July 11, 2014 59 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): The appellees motion to stay appellate proceedings pending resolution of the petition for rehearing en banc in Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971, is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until October 1, 2014. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after the last served answering brief. [9165411] (HC)
June 26, 2014 58 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 06/26/2014. [9146891] (GMW)
March 25, 2014 57 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): The appellees motion to stay appellate proceedings pending resolution of the petition for rehearing en banc in Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971, is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until July 3, 2014. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after the last served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [9030827] (RT)
March 21, 2014 56 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 03/21/2014. [9026601] (GMW)
November 22, 2013 55 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): The appellees motion to stay appellate proceedings is granted in part. This appeal is stayed until April 4, 2014. On or before the expiration of the stay, the appellees shall file the answering briefs, or file a motion that requests appropriate relief. If the appellees file the answering briefs, the reply brief shall be due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Failure to file a motion shall terminate the stay. [8874815] (AF)
November 21, 2013 54 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, Kamala D. Harris, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 11/21/2013. [8873376] (GMW)
August 13, 2013 53 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellees joint unopposed motion to stay appellate proceedings pending resolution of the pending petition for review in Mehl v. County of Sacramento, no. 08-15773, is granted in part. Appellate proceedings are stayed until December 2, 2013. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [8741412] (WL)
August 9, 2013 52 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, Kamala D. Harris, John McGinnis, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department and Timothy Sheehan Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 08/09/2013. [8738098] (GMW)
May 15, 2013 51 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellees joint motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Mehl v. County of Sacramento, no. 08-15773, is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until September 3, 2013. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice.[8630074] (WL)
May 13, 2013 50 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, Kamala D. Harris and John McGinnis Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 05/13/2013. [8627385] (GMW)
February 19, 2013 49 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Appellees County of Sacramento, et al.s motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Mehl v. County of Sacramento, No. 08-15773, is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until June 3, 2013. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [8518763] (WL)
February 15, 2013 48 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 02/15/2013. [8516453] (GMW)
November 30, 2012 47 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Appellees County of Sacramento, et al.s motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Mehl v. County of Sacramento, No. 08-15773, is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until March 5, 2013. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [8421431] (WL)
November 29, 2012 46 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, Kamala D. Harris, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 11/29/2012. [8419563] (GMW)
August 30, 2012 45 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Appellees County of Sacramento, et al.s motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Mehl v. County of Sacramento, No. 08-15773, is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until December 5, 2012. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [8305155] (WL)
August 23, 2012 44 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 08/23/2012. [8297074] (GMW)
May 14, 2012 43 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Appellees County of Sacramento, et al.s motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Mehl v. County of Sacramento, No. 08-15773, is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until September 6, 2012. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [8177132] (WL)
May 10, 2012 42 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, Kamala D. Harris, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 05/10/2012. [8173643] (GMW)
April 18, 2012 41 Attorneys Amanda Lynn Butts substituted by Attorneys John A. Lavra in 09-16852 [8145329] (JFF)
April 18, 2012 40 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John A. Lavra for Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, John McGinnis, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department and Timothy Sheehan. Date of service: 04/18/2012. [8145263] (JAL)
February 10, 2012 39 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GSS): Appellees County of Sacramento, et al.s motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Mehl v. County of Sacramento, No. 08-15773, is granted in part. Appellate proceedings are stayed until June 8, 2012. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice.[8065092] (WL)
February 9, 2012 38 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 02/09/2012. [8063641] (GMW)
November 15, 2011 37 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GSS): Appellees County of Sacramento, et al.s motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Mehl v. County of Sacramento, No. 08-15773, is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until March 5, 2012. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering briefs are filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the last served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [7966031] (WL)
November 7, 2011 36 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, Kamala D. Harris, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7957044] (GMW)
August 30, 2011 35 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GSS): Appellees County of Sacramento, et al.s motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Mehl v. County of Sacramento, No. 08-15773, is granted in part. Appellate proceedings are stayed until December 6, 2011. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering brief or file a motion for appropriate relief. If he answering brief is filed, the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [7875600] (WL)
August 11, 2011 34 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, Kamala D. Harris, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 08/11/2011. [7854829] (GMW)
August 11, 2011 33 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Correct Entry: [ # 34 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, Kamala D. Harris, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 08/11/2011. [7854824] (GMW)
June 27, 2011 32 Terminated Appellee Jerry Brown in 09-16852 [7799158] (JFF)
June 27, 2011 31 Entered appearance of Appellee Kamala D. Harris. [7799151] (JFF)
June 27, 2011 30 Filed (ECF) Appellee Jerry Brown Correspondence: Notice of Substitution of party. Date of service: 06/27/2011. [7798269]--[COURT UPDATE : Edited docket text to reflect content of filing.Resent NDA 06/27/2011 by TW] (GMW)
June 24, 2011 29 Attorneys Geoffrey L. Graybill and Timothy Lee Rieger substituted by Attorneys George Michael Waters and George Michael Waters [7797324] (JFF)
June 24, 2011 28 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of George Waters for Appellee Jerry Brown. Date of service: 06/24/2011. [7797299] (GMW)
June 8, 2011 27 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GSS): The appellees motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Mehl v. County of Sacramento, et al., Case No. 08-15773, is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until September 6, 2011. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering brief is filed, the optional reply brief will be due within 14 days after service of the last served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice.[7778447] (WL)
May 23, 2011 26 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, John McGinnis, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department and Timothy Sheehan Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 05/23/2011. [7761826] (JLP)
March 24, 2011 25 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:GSS): The appellees motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Nordyke v. King, Case No. 07-15763, and Mehl v. County of Sacramento, et al., Case No. 08- 15773, is granted. Appellate proceedings are stayed until May 23, 2011. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering brief is filed, the optional reply brief will be due within 14 days after service of the last served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [7693072] (SM)
March 23, 2011 24 Filed (ECF) Appellee Jerry Brown Amended Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 03/23/2011. [7692094] (GLG)
March 22, 2011 23 Filed (ECF) Appellee Jerry Brown Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 03/22/2011. [7690959] (GLG)
January 18, 2011 22 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:GSS): The appellees motion to stay appellate proceedings pending Nordyke v. King, Case No. 07-15763, and Mehl v. County of Sacramento, et al., Case No. 08- 15773, is granted in part. Appellate proceedings are stayed until March 23, 2011. At or prior to the expiration of the stay of appellate proceedings, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a motion for appropriate relief. If the answering brief is filed, the optional reply brief will be due within 14 days after service of the last served answering brief. In the absence of a motion, the stay of appellate proceedings will terminate without further notice. [7614611] (AF)
January 13, 2011 21 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, Fred Mason, John McGinnis, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department and Timothy Sheehan Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 01113/10. [7611739] (JLP)
October 18, 2010 20 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:TAH): The appellees joint motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending this courts disposition of Nordyke v. King, case No. 07-15763, and Mehl v. County of Sacramento, et al, case No. 08-15773, is granted. This case is stayed until January 21, 2011. On or before the expiration of the stay, the appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a status report and motion for appropriate relief. If the appellees file the answering brief, the reply brief shall be due within14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. The filing of the answering briefs or the failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. This order was issued prior to the expiration of time within which a response may be filed. Fed. R. App. P. 27(b). The appellees are reminded that a request for relief from this court should state the position of opposing counsel. See Circuit Advisory Committee Note to Ninth Circuit Rule 27-1, paragraph (5). [7512154] (WL)
October 13, 2010 19 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, Fred Mason, John McGinnis, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department and Timothy Sheehan Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 10/13/2010. [7507299] (JLP)
August 16, 2010 18 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:LBS): Appellees joint motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending this courts disposition of Nordyke v. King, no. 07-15763 is granted. This case is stayed until October 15, 2010. On or before the expiration of the stay, appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a status report and an appropriate motion. If appellees file the answering brief, the reply brief is due within14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. The filing of the answering briefs or failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. [7441113] (WL)
August 16, 2010 17 Filed (ECF) Appellants Andrea Hoffman and James Rothery response opposing motion (,motion to stay proceedings). Date of service: 08/16/2010. [7440631] (GWG)
August 12, 2010 16 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, John McGinnis, Sacramento County Sheriff's Department and Timothy Sheehan Joint Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 08/12/2010. [7437370] (JLP)
May 24, 2010 15 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:LBS): Appellees joint motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is construed as a motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending this courts disposition of Nordyke v. King, no. 07-15763. So construed, the motion is granted. This case is stayed until August 16, 2010. On or before the expiration of the stay, appellees shall file the answering briefs or file a status report and an appropriate motion. If appellees file the answering brief, the reply brief is due within14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. The filing of the answering briefs or failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. [7347341] (WL)
May 17, 2010 14 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lou Blanas, County of Sacramento, John McGinnis and Timothy Sheehan Joint Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 08/03/2010 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 05/17/2010. [7339909] (JLP)
May 12, 2010 13 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [ # 10 ] filed by Andrea Hoffman and James Rothery. [7335601] (SD)
May 6, 2010 12 Filed Appellants Andrea Hoffman and James Rothery excerpts of record in 2 volumes. [7330217] (FT)
May 6, 2010 11 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 10 ] submitted by Andrea Hoffman and James Rothery is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7328421] (FT)
May 5, 2010 10 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Andrea Hoffman and James Rothery. Date of service: 05/05/2010. [7326970] (GWG)
April 20, 2010 8 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file Appellants Andrea Hoffman and James Rothery brief. Appellant Andrea Hoffman opening brief due 05/05/2010, and Appellant James Rothery opening brief due 12/02/2009. Appellee Lou Blanas, Appellee Jerry Brown, Appellee County of Sacramento, Appellee Does 1 through 225, Appellee Fred Mason, Appellee John McGinnis, Appellee Sacramento County Sheriff's Department and Appellee Timothy Sheehan answering brief due 06/04/2010. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [7308268] (CB)
December 30, 2009 9 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 09-16852: pd] ). [7312093] (EU)
December 30, 2009 7 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:LBS): A review of the district court docket shows that appellants have paid the appeal fees on August 25, 2009. The Clerk shall update this court's docket to reflect that appellants have paid the appeal fees. The parties stipulation to stay appellate proceedings pending this courts disposition of Nordyke v. King, no. 07-15763, is granted. This case is stayed until March 22, 2010. On or before the expiration of the stay, the parties may stipulate for further appropriate relief. In the absence of a stipulation from the parties, the stay will expire and the following briefing schedule will govern: the opening brief will be due April 21, 2010; the answering brief will be due May 21, 2010; and the optional reply brief will be due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7179132] (WL)
November 9, 2009 6 Filed (ECF) Appellee Jerry Brown Stipulated Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 11/09/2009. [7123243] (GLG)
October 29, 2009 5 Received Attorney Alan Gura for - Deanna Sykes, Andrew Witham, Adam Richards, Calguns Foundation, Inc. and Second Amendment Foundation letter dated 10/26/2009 re: correction to case caption. [7114494] (JFF)
October 22, 2009 4 Filed order MEDIATION (AJ): The court has determined that this appeal will not be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [7105156] (WL)
October 21, 2009 3 Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel for all parties to this appeal are requested to inform Circuit Mediator Ann Julius of their clients views on whether... This communication shall not be served on the opposing party and shall not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect pending the determination whether the case will be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program.[7102269] (WL)
August 25, 2009 2 Filed Appellants James Rothery and Andrea Hoffman Civil Appeals Docketing Statement. Served on 08/24/2009. [7039354] (EB)
August 25, 2009 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND CADS: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript order for Appellants James Rothery, et al., due 09/23/2009. Transcript due for Orig Clerk USDC, Sacramento on 10/23/2009. Certificate of record due 10/30/2009. Appellants James Rothery, et al., opening brief due 12/09/2009. Appellees Lou Blanas, et al., answering brief due 01/08/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7039343] (EB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Rothery, et al v. County of Sacramento, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES ROTHERY
Represented By: Gary William Gorski
Represented By: Daniel Michael Karalash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDREA HOFFMAN
Represented By: Gary William Gorski
Represented By: Daniel Michael Karalash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA SYKES
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW WITHAM
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM RICHARDS
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALGUNS FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Represented By: John A. Lavra Esquire
Represented By: Amanda L. McDermott Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOU BLANAS, Former Sheriff
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Represented By: John A. Lavra Esquire
Represented By: Amanda L. McDermott Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN MCGINNIS, Sheriff
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Represented By: John A. Lavra Esquire
Represented By: Amanda L. McDermott Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY SHEEHAN, Detective
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Represented By: John A. Lavra Esquire
Represented By: Amanda L. McDermott Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRED MASON, Detective
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Represented By: John A. Lavra Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SACRAMENTO COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, an independent branch of government of the County of Sacrame
Represented By: Jeri Lynn Pappone
Represented By: John A. Lavra Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERRY BROWN, Attorney General of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES 1 THROUGH 225, unknown co-conspirators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General
Represented By: George Michael Waters
Represented By: George Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SACRAMENTO COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, an independent branch of government of the County of Sacramento
Represented By: John A. Lavra Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?