Tyler Winklevoss, et al v. ConnectU, Inc., et al Featured Case
Plaintiff,: THE FACEBOOK, INC. and MARK ZUCKERBERG
Defendant - Appellee,: CONNECTU, INC., FKA ConnectU, LLC
Defendant,: PACIFIC NORTHWEST SOFTWARE, INC., WAYNE CHANG and WINSTON WILLIAMS
Defendant - Appellant,: CAMERON WINKLEVOSS, TYLER WINKLEVOSS and DIVYA NARENDRA
Case Number: 09-17050
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2010 Filing 18 MANDATE ISSUED. (ATG, PAR and RRC) [7183287] (TB)
December 14, 2009 Filing 17 Order filed (ALFRED T. GOODWIN, PAMELA ANN RYMER and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) The court’s October 9, 2009 order to show cause is discharged. This appeal is dismissed as unnecessary because the order appealed herein was issued by the district court on a limited remand pursuant to this court’s July 1, 2009 order in consolidated appeals Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873. The Clerk shall transfer all filings on the docket for appeal No. 09-17050 to consolidated appeal Nos. 08-16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873. The notice of appeal filed in this docket shall be filed as an amended notice of appeal in docket Nos. 08- 16745, 08-16849 and 08-16873. This appeal is dismissed and all pending motions are denied as moot.[7162997] (WL)
December 4, 2009 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss response to motion (Status Report Reqd by Court (ECF Filing) ). Date of service: 12/04/2009. [7152813] (SMS)
November 25, 2009 Filing 15 Added attorney Alison P. Buchanan for ConnectU, Inc. [7143691] (JFF)
November 25, 2009 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alison P. Buchanan for Appellee ConnectU, Inc.. Date of service: 11/25/2009. [7143647] (APB)
November 25, 2009 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellee ConnectU, Inc. status report (as required by Court order dated 07/01/2009). Date of service: 11/25/2009 [7143574] (JET)
November 10, 2009 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) - The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg response to Court order dated 10/09/2009. Date of service: 11/10/2009. [7126951] (YPG)
November 9, 2009 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellee ConnectU, Inc. reply to response to Court order dated 10/09/2009. Date of service: 11/09/2009. [7124573] (JET)
October 30, 2009 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss response to Court order dated 10/09/2009. Date of service: 10/30/2009. [7114894] (SMS)
October 26, 2009 Filing 9 Added attorney John Duchemin for Cameron Winklevoss Tyler Winklevoss Divya Narendra, in case 09-17050. [7108568] (AF)
October 26, 2009 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John P. Duchemin for Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss. Date of service: 10/26/2009. [7108524] (JD)
October 15, 2009 Filing 7 Case rejected from Circuit Mediation Program. [7102854] [09-16444, 09-16532, 09-16535, 09-16626, 09-16676, 09-16753, 09-16775, 09-16822, 09-16874, 09-16924, 09-16956, 09-16967, 09-16972, 09-16996, 09-17001, 09-17002, 09-17050, 09-17076, 09-17098, 09-35606, 09-35685, 09-35711, 09-35756, 09-35773, 09-55327, 09-55425, 09-55829, 09-55907, 09-55913, 09-55937, 09-56035, 09-56047, 09-56050, 09-56283, 09-56337, 09-56447, 09-56461, 09-60031, 09-72713] (SB)
October 9, 2009 Filing 6 Filed order MOATT: (NMG) A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over the appeal because orders disqualifying counsel are not immediately appealable orders. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellants shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellants elect to show cause, a response may be filed within 8 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [7090807] (KD)
September 28, 2009 Filing 5 Filed certificate of record on appeal. RT filed in DC 08/18/2009 [7078626] (JFF)
September 28, 2009 Filing 4 Received copy of transcript designation and ordering form filed in DC. [7077881] (JFF)
September 18, 2009 Filing 3 Filed Appellants Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss and Tyler Winklevoss Civil Appeals Docketing Statement. Served on 09/15/2009. [7066363] (GR)
September 18, 2009 Filing 2 Filed representation notice of Jerome B. Falk, Jr. and Sean M. SeLegue. [7066356] (GR)
September 18, 2009 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND CADS: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript order for Appellant Divya Narendra, Appellant Cameron Winklevoss and Appellant Tyler Winklevoss due 10/15/2009. Transcript due for Orig Clerk USDC, San Jose on 11/16/2009. Certificate of record due 11/23/2009. Appellant Divya Narendra, Appellant Cameron Winklevoss and Appellant Tyler Winklevoss opening brief due 12/31/2009. Appellee ConnectU, Inc. answering brief due 02/01/2010. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7066340] (GR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tyler Winklevoss, et al v. ConnectU, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: THE FACEBOOK, INC.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: MARK ZUCKERBERG
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: CONNECTU, INC., FKA ConnectU, LLC
Represented By: James E. Towery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: PACIFIC NORTHWEST SOFTWARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: WAYNE CHANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant,: WINSTON WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: CAMERON WINKLEVOSS
Represented By: John Duchemin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: TYLER WINKLEVOSS
Represented By: John Duchemin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: DIVYA NARENDRA
Represented By: John Duchemin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?