American Civil Liberties Union, et al v. John Kroger, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant,: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF OREGON, CANDACE MORGAN, PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF THE COLUMBIA/WILLAMETTE, INC. and CASCADE AIDS PROJECT
Plaintiff,: POWELL'S BOOKS, INC., OLD MULTNOMAH BOOK STORE, LTD., DBA Annie Bloom's Books, DARK HORSE COMICS, INC., COLETTE'S: GOOD FOOD HUNGRY MINDS, LLC, BLUEJAY, INC., DBA Paulina Springs Books, ST. JOHN'S BOOKSELLERS, LLC, AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, INC. and COMIC BOOK LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Defendant - Appellee,: HARDY MYERS, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Oregon, MATT SHIRTCLIFF, Baker County District Attorney, in his official capacity, JOHN HAROLDSON, Benton County District Attorney, in his official capacity, JOHN FOOTE, Clackamas County District Attorney, in his official capacity, JOSHUA MARQUIS, Clatsop County District Attorney, in his official capacity, STEVE ATCHISON, Columbia County District Attorney, in his official capacity, PAUL FRASIER, Coos County District Attorney, in his official capacity, GARY WILLIAMS, Crook County District Attorney, in his official capacity, EVERETT DIAL, Curry County District Attorney, in his official capacity, MICHAEL DUGAN, Deschutes County District Attorney, in his official capacity, JACK BANTA, Douglas County District Attorney, in his official capacity, MARION WEATHERFORD, Gilliam County District Attorney, in his official capacity, RYAN JOSLIN, Grant County District Attorney, in his official capacity, TIM COLAHAN, Harney County District Attorney, in his official capacity, JOHN SEWELL, Hood River County District Attorney, in his official capacity, MARK HUDDLESTON, Jackson County District Attorney, in his official capacity, PETER L. DEUEL, Jefferson County District Attorney, in his official capacity, STEPHEN D. CAMPBELL, Josephine County District Attorney, in his official capacity, EDWIN I. CALEB, Klamath County District Attorney, in his official capacity, DAVID A. SCHUTT, Lake County District Attorney, in his official capacity, DOUGLASS HARCLEROAD, Lane County District Attorney, in his official capacity, BERNICE BARNETT, Lincoln County District Attorney, in her official capacity, JASON CARLILE, Linn County District Attorney, in his official capacity, DAN NORRIS, Malheur County District Attorney, in his official capacity, WALTER M. BEGLAU, Marion County District Attorney, in his official capacity, ELIZABETH BALLARD, Morrow County District Attorney, in her official capacity, MICHAEL D. SCHRUNK, Multnomah County District Attorney, in his official capacity, JOHN FISHER, Polk County District Attorney, in his official capacity, WADE M. MCLEOD, Sherman County District Attorney, in his official capacity, WILLIAM BRYAN PORTER, Tillamook County District Attorney, in his official capacity, DEAN GUSHWA, Umatilla County District Attorney, in his official capacity, TIM THOMPSON, Union County District Attorney, in his official capacity, DANIEL OUSLEY, Wallowa County District Attorney, in his official capacity, ERIC J. NISLEY, Wasco County District Attorney, in his official capacity, ROBERT HERMANN, Washington County District Attorney, in his official capacity, THOMAS W. CUTSFORTH, Wheeler County District Attorney, in his official capacity, BRAD BERRY, Yamhill County District Attorney, in his official capacity and JOHN R. KROGER, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Oregon
Case Number: 09-35154
Filed: March 2, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2011 70 Filed order (FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and RICHARD A. PAEZ) Plaintiffs filed timely motions seeking attorneys’ fees in this matter. Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys’ fees on appeal. We leave for the district court the issue of fees in that court. Plaintiffs’ request for an enhanced hourly rate for fees sought on appeal by Michael A. Bamberger and Rachael Balaban is denied. See Camacho v. Bridgeport Financial, Inc., 523 F.3d 973, 979 (9th Cir. 2008) (the general rule is that a reasonable hourly rate is based on the prevailing rate in the community in which the district court sits). The determination of the amount of the attorneys’ fees is transferred to the district court. See 9th Cir. R. 39-1.8; Am. Jewish Cong. v. City of Beverly Hills, 90 F.3d 379, 386 (9th Cir.1996) (en banc). [7613041] [09-35153, 09-35154] (WL)
January 10, 2011 69 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. reply to response (,motion for attorney fees). Date of service: 01/10/2011. [7606599] (PKR)
December 28, 2010 68 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. Motion for attorney fees in the amount of $129,288.50. Date of service: 12/28/2010. [7594211] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 12/28/2010 02:33 PM]
December 22, 2010 67 MANDATE ISSUED.(FFF, MMM and RAP) Cost awarded to APPELLANT in the amount of $90.01. [7589085] [09-35153, 09-35154] (TB) [Entered: 12/22/2010 08:56 AM]
December 14, 2010 66 Filed order (FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and RICHARD A. PAEZ) The panel has voted to deny the petition for panel rehearing. Judges McKeown and Paez vote to deny the petition for rehearing en banc and Judge Fernandez so recommends. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc and no judge has requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The petition for panel rehearing and the petition for rehearing en banc are denied. [7580147] [09-35153, 09-35154] (WL) [Entered: 12/14/2010 01:11 PM]
November 8, 2010 65 Filed (ECF) Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35153, Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John R. Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35154 petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 09/20/2010 opinion). Date of service: 11/08/2010. [7539074] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Joyce, Anna) [Entered: 11/08/2010 03:28 PM]
November 8, 2010 64 COURT DELETED ENTRY. Corrected filing below [65]. Original text: Filed (ECF) Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35153, Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John R. Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35154 petition for panel rehearing (from 09/20/2010 opinion). Date of service: 11/08/2010. [7538561] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Joyce, Anna) [Entered: 11/08/2010 12:59 PM]
October 25, 2010 63 Filed order (FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and RICHARD A. PAEZ) Appellees’ Motion to Certify Question to Oregon Supreme Court is DENIED as moot. [7521531] [09-35153, 09-35154] (WL) [Entered: 10/25/2010 02:11 PM]
October 19, 2010 62 Filed order (FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and RICHARD A. PAEZ) Appellees’ “Motion for Extension of Time” is GRANTED. The petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc is now due on November 8, 2010. Appellants’ “Motion for an Extension of Time to File Requests for Attorneys’ Fees” is DENIED as moot. See 9th Cir. R. 39-1.6 (request for attorneys fees). [7515008] [09-35153, 09-35154] (WL) [Entered: 10/19/2010 04:23 PM]
October 18, 2010 61 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. in 09-35154 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Plaintiffs-Appellants' Motion for an Extension of Time to File Requests for Attorneys' Fees]. Date of service: 10/18/2010. [7512642] [09-35154, 09-35153] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 10/18/2010 03:17 PM]
October 4, 2010 60 Added attorney Anna Joyce for Daniel Ousley William Bryan Porter Elizabeth Ballard Marion Weatherford Michael D. Schrunk John Fisher Eric J. Nisley Thomas W. Cutsforth Joshua Marquis Peter L. Deuel David A. Schutt Ryan Joslin Stephen D. Campbell Tim Thompson Matt Shirtcliff Dean Gushwa Paul Frasier John Kroger Jason Carlile Edwin I. Caleb Michael Dugan Robert Hermann Wade M. McLeod John Foote Brad Berry Bernice Barnett Mark Huddleston Everett Dial Dan Norris Jack Banta Tim Colahan Steve Atchison John Haroldson Gary Williams Douglass Harcleroad John Sewell Walter M. Beglau, in case 09-35153 and 09-35154. [7495986] [09-35153, 09-35154] (TB) [Entered: 10/04/2010 02:46 PM]
October 4, 2010 59 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Anna M. Joyce for Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35153, Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John R. Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35154. Date of service: 10/04/2010. [7495950] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Joyce, Anna) [Entered: 10/04/2010 02:38 PM]
September 29, 2010 58 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 239 USD. Date of service: 09/29/2010 [7490981] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 09/29/2010 11:23 AM]
September 24, 2010 57 Filed (ECF) Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35153, Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John R. Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35154 Motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 11/08/2010 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 09/24/2010. [7486380] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Casper, Michael) [Entered: 09/24/2010 12:31 PM]
September 20, 2010 56 Featured Case FILED OPINION (FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and RICHARD A. PAEZ) REVERSED. , Judge: MMM Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [7479136] [09-35153, 09-35154] (RMM) [Entered: 09/20/2010 08:32 AM]
June 30, 2010 55 Filed (ECF) Appellees Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroeger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35153, Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John R. Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35154 reply to response (). Date of service: 06/30/2010. [7390428] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Lagesen, Erin) [Entered: 06/30/2010 04:33 PM]
June 24, 2010 54 Added attorney Erin C. Lagesen for Appellees. [7384260] [09-35153, 09-35154] (JFF) [Entered: 06/24/2010 04:35 PM]
June 24, 2010 53 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. in 09-35154, - American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. in 09-35153 response to motion (,motion for certification to state supreme court, ). Date of service: 06/24/2010. [7384213] [09-35154, 09-35153] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 06/24/2010 04:18 PM]
June 24, 2010 52 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Erin C. Lagesen for Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroeger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35153, Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John R. Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35154. Date of service: 06/24/2010. [7383955] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Lagesen, Erin) [Entered: 06/24/2010 03:05 PM]
June 14, 2010 51 Filed (ECF) Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroeger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35153 Motion for certification to Oregon State Supreme Court. Date of service: 06/14/2010. [7371016] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Casper, Michael) [Entered: 06/14/2010 01:44 PM]
June 8, 2010 50 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and RICHARD A. PAEZ. [7364078] [09-35153, 09-35154] (ME) [Entered: 06/08/2010 11:32 AM]
May 27, 2010 49 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/27/2010. [7353087]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread entry to 09-35153, resent notice. 05/28/2010 by ASW] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 05/27/2010 05:10 PM]
May 26, 2010 48 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:WL): The motion to grant Plaintiffs-Appellants’ separate counsel each 15 minutes of oral argument is denied. Plaintiffs-Appellants’ separate counsel will share a total of 20 minutes of oral argument time, and Defendants-Appellees’ separate counsel will share a total of 20 minutes of oral argument time. [7350367] [09-35153, 09-35154] (WL) [Entered: 05/26/2010 10:03 AM]
May 21, 2010 47 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Bluejay, Inc., Colette's: Good Food Hungry Minds, LLC, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Dark Horse Comics, Inc., Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd., Powell's Books, Inc. and St. John's Booksellers, LLC in 09-35153 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion Of Plaintiffs-Appellants In Nos. 09-35153 and 09-35154 For The Grant Of 15 Minutes Oral Argument To Counsel In Each Of The Cases]. Date of service: 05/21/2010. [7346105] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Bamberger, Michael) [Entered: 05/21/2010 12:44 PM]
May 21, 2010 46 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Bluejay, Inc., Colette's: Good Food Hungry Minds, LLC, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Dark Horse Comics, Inc., Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd., Powell's Books, Inc. and St. John's Booksellers, LLC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/21/2010. [7345545]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of 28j Letter and spread to consolidated case, 09-35154. 05/21/2010 by RY] (Bamberger, Michael) [Entered: 05/21/2010 09:40 AM]
April 30, 2010 45 Notice of Oral Argument on JUNE 8, 2010, Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PORTLAND Office. Attention: The Notice of Docket Activity may not list your case number. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [7320378] [09-35153, 09-35154] (ME) [Entered: 04/30/2010 10:16 AM]
April 14, 2010 44 Received Attorney Michael A. Bamberger for Appellants letter dated 04/13/2010 re: dates available for oral argument. Served on [7303703] [09-35153, 09-35154] (JFF) [Entered: 04/15/2010 04:21 PM]
March 30, 2010 42 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:AF): Plaintiffs-Appellants’ motion to postpone argument to a later date is GRANTED. The case, currently scheduled for oral argument in Portland, Oregon, on May 5, 2010, is ordered removed from the calendar. Argument will be re-scheduled to a date convenient for the court and the parties. [7283358] [09-35153, 09-35154] (AF) [Entered: 03/30/2010 11:47 AM]
March 23, 2010 41 Notice of Oral Argument on MAY 5, 2010, Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PORTLAND Office. Attention: The Notice of Docket Activity may not list your case number. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [7275973] [09-30048, 09-30211, 09-30272, 09-35739, 09-35653, 09-35153, 09-35154] (ME) [Entered: 03/23/2010 03:54 PM]
February 9, 2010 40 Received 10 paper copies of Answering brief [32] filed by Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroeger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35153, Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John R. Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams. [7225738] [09-35153, 09-35154] (SD) [Entered: 02/09/2010 02:42 PM]
October 22, 2009 39 Received 10 paper copies of Reply brief [35] filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [7105439] [09-35154, 09-35153] (SD) [Entered: 10/23/2009 08:57 AM]
October 19, 2009 38 Received 10 paper copies of Reply brief [34] filed by American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Powell's Books, Inc., Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd., Dark Horse Comics, Inc., Colette's: Good Food Hungry Minds, LLC, Bluejay, Inc., St. John's Booksellers, LLC and Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc. in 09-35153,09-35154. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [7100411] [09-35153, 09-35154] (SD) [Entered: 10/20/2009 10:06 AM]
October 13, 2009 37 Filed clerk order: Reply Brief [35] filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon in 09-35153,09-35154. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Grey cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7093579] [09-35153, 09-35154] (FT) [Entered: 10/13/2009 04:27 PM]
October 9, 2009 36 Filed clerk order: Reply Brief [34] filed by American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Powell's Books, Inc., Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd., Dark Horse Comics, Inc., Colette's: Good Food Hungry Minds, LLC, Bluejay, Inc., St. John's Booksellers, LLC and Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc. in 09-35153,09-35154. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Grey cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7091536] [09-35153, 09-35154] (FT) [Entered: 10/09/2009 05:10 PM]
October 9, 2009 35 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon in 09-35154, - American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon in 09-35153. Date of service: 10/09/2009. [7090212] [09-35154, 09-35153]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected docket text, changed filing category. 10/09/2009 by MA] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 10/09/2009 10:30 AM]
October 8, 2009 34 Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellants American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Bluejay, Inc., Colette's: Good Food Hungry Minds, LLC, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Dark Horse Comics, Inc., Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd., Powell's Books, Inc. and St. John's Booksellers, LLC in 09-35153. Date of service: 10/08/2009. [7089297] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Bamberger, Michael) [Entered: 10/08/2009 02:35 PM]
September 28, 2009 33 Filed clerk order: Answering Brief [32] filed by John Sewell, Michael D. Schrunk, John Fisher, Elizabeth Ballard, Mark Huddleston, Robert Hermann, Jack Banta, Michael Dugan, John Foote, Matt Shirtcliff, John Haroldson, Joshua Marquis, Steve Atchison, Paul Frasier, Gary Williams, Everett Dial, Marion Weatherford, Ryan Joslin, Tim Colahan, Peter L. Deuel, Stephen D. Campbell, Edwin I. Caleb, David A. Schutt, Douglass Harcleroad, Bernice Barnett, Jason Carlile, Dan Norris, Walter M. Beglau, Wade M. McLeod, William Bryan Porter, Dean Gushwa, Tim Thompson, Daniel Ousley, Eric J. Nisley, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Brad Berry and John Kroeger, John Sewell, Michael D. Schrunk, John Fisher, Elizabeth Ballard, Mark Huddleston, Robert Hermann, Jack Banta, Michael Dugan, John Foote, Matt Shirtcliff, John Haroldson, Joshua Marquis, Steve Atchison, Paul Frasier, Gary Williams, Everett Dial, Marion Weatherford, Ryan Joslin, Tim Colahan, Peter L. Deuel, Stephen D. Campbell, Edwin I. Caleb, David A. Schutt, Douglass Harcleroad, Bernice Barnett, Jason Carlile, Dan Norris, Walter M. Beglau, Wade M. McLeod, William Bryan Porter, Dean Gushwa, Tim Thompson, Daniel Ousley, Eric J. Nisley, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Brad Berry and John Kroger in 09-35153,09-35154. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Red cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [7076594] [09-35153, 09-35154] (FT) [Entered: 09/28/2009 12:29 PM]
September 25, 2009 32 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroeger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35153, Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35154. Date of service: 09/25/2009. [7075462] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Casper, Michael) [Entered: 09/25/2009 03:32 PM]
August 27, 2009 31 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:LBS): Appellees' unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. Appellees have notified this court that they will be filing a single brief responding to appellants' briefs in the above consolidated cases. The consolidated answering brief not exceeding 15,400 words is due September 25, 2009. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. The optional reply brief in 09-35153 and the optional reply brief in 09- 35154 are due within 14 days after service of the consolidated answering brief. [7042326] [09-35153, 09-35154] (WL) [Entered: 08/27/2009 09:30 AM]
August 13, 2009 30 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:LBS): The unopposed motion of defendants John Kroger, et. al. for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief is due September 25, 2009. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. See Fed. R. App. P. 31(a)(1). The unopposed motion of defendants John Kroger for leave to file an oversized brief is denied without prejudice to a renewed motion accompanied by a single copy of the proposed answering brief. [7025837] (WL) [Entered: 08/13/2009 08:59 AM]
August 10, 2009 29 Filed (ECF) Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 09/25/2009 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 08/10/2009. [7022228] (Casper, Michael) [Entered: 08/10/2009 03:13 PM]
July 28, 2009 25 Attorneys Denise Gale Fjordbeck substituted by Attorneys Michael A. Casper [7005613] (JFF) [Entered: 07/28/2009 09:20 AM]
July 28, 2009 24 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael Casper for Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams. Date of service: 07/28/2009. [7005526] (Casper, Michael) [Entered: 07/28/2009 08:27 AM]
July 24, 2009 23 Received 10 paper copies of Opening brief [20] filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Candace Morgan, Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. and Cascade AIDS Project in 09-35154. One copy to Case Files, the remainder to Records. [7003270] (SD) [Entered: 07/24/2009 02:27 PM]
July 22, 2009 21 Filed clerk order: Opening Brief [20] filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Candace Morgan, Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. and Cascade AIDS Project in 09-35154. Within 5 working days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 10 copies of the brief in paper format, with a Blue cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. [6999851] (FT) [Entered: 07/22/2009 11:01 AM]
July 20, 2009 22 Filed - American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. in 09-35153, - Dark Horse Comics, Inc., Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd. and Powell's Books, Inc etc. in 09-35154 excerpts of record in 2 volumes. Served on. [7001676] [09-35153, 09-35154] (FT) [Entered: 07/23/2009 12:33 PM]
July 17, 2009 20 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc.. Date of service: 07/17/2009. [6996434] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 07/17/2009 05:02 PM]
July 2, 2009 19 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) Appellants have stated that they are represented by separate counsel. Accordingly, the opposed motion of appellants Powell's Books, Inc. and ACLU of Oregon for reconsideration of the June 3, 2009 order is granted in part. Appeal nos. 09-35153 and 09-35154 remain consolidated to the extent that they shall be assigned to the same merits panel. The appeals may be briefed separately. The briefing schedule for 09-35153 is as follows: the opening brief is due July 23, 2009; the consolidated answering brief is due August 24, 2009; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The briefing schedule for 09-35154 is as follows: the opening brief is due July 23, 2009; the consolidated answering brief is due August 24, 2009; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. Appellants' motion for leave to file a single excerpts of record is granted. [6979683] [09-35153, 09-35154] (WL) [Entered: 07/02/2009 03:32 PM]
June 10, 2009 18 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. reply to response (Motion for Reconsideration (ECF Filing) , Response to Motion (ECF Filing) ). Date of service: 06/10/2009. [6952527] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 06/10/2009 04:00 PM]
June 9, 2009 17 Filed (ECF) Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroeger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35153, Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, John Kroger, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams in 09-35154 response to motion (Motion (ECF Filing) ,Motion (ECF Filing) motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies), Motion for Reconsideration (ECF Filing) ). Date of service: 06/09/2009. [6950223] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Casper, Michael) [Entered: 06/09/2009 11:44 AM]
June 8, 2009 16 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Bluejay, Inc., Colette's: Good Food Hungry Minds, LLC, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Dark Horse Comics, Inc., Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd., Powell's Books, Inc. and St. John's Booksellers, LLC in 09-35153 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Notice of Filing on June 4, 2009 of Plaintiff-Appellants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Order on their Motion to File a Single Excerpt of Record and for Combined Oral Argument, and Plaintiffs-Appellants' Motion for an Extension of Time]. Date of service: 06/08/2009. [6949437] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Zuckerman, Richard) [Entered: 06/08/2009 04:45 PM]
June 4, 2009 15 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. motion for reconsideration of non-dispositive Clerk Order of 06/03/2009. Date of service: 06/04/2009. [6946240] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 06/04/2009 03:13 PM]
June 3, 2009 14 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:LBS ): Appellants' motion for leave to file a single excerpts of record and for combined oral argument is construed as a motion for consolidation of nos. 09-35153 and 09-35154. So construed, the motion is granted. See Fed. R. App. P. 3(b). The consolidated opening brief is due June 5, 2009; the consolidated answering brief is due July 6, 2009; and the optional consolidated reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the consolidated answering brief. Appellant's motion for combined oral argument is granted. [09-35153, 09-35154] (WL) [Entered: 06/03/2009 09:12 AM]
May 19, 2009 13 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Booksellers Foundation for Free Expression, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Bluejay, Inc., Colette's: Good Food Hungry Minds, LLC, Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Dark Horse Comics, Inc., Freedom to Read Foundation, Inc., Old Multnomah Book Store, Ltd., Powell's Books, Inc. and St. John's Booksellers, LLC in 09-35153 Correspondence: Letter to the Clerk of the Court requesting a docket correction. Date of service: 05/19/2009 [6925784] [09-35153, 09-35154] (Bamberger, Michael) [Entered: 05/19/2009 12:47 PM]
May 14, 2009 12 Filed certificate of record on appeal. RT filed in DC None (JFF) [Entered: 05/14/2009 02:56 PM]
May 14, 2009 11 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. brief. Appellant American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Appellant Cascade AIDS Project, Appellant Candace Morgan and Appellant Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. opening brief due 06/05/2009. Appellee Steve Atchison, Appellee Elizabeth Ballard, Appellee Jack Banta, Appellee Bernice Barnett, Appellee Walter M. Beglau, Appellee Brad Berry, Appellee Edwin I. Caleb, Appellee Stephen D. Campbell, Appellee Jason Carlile, Appellee Tim Colahan, Appellee Thomas W. Cutsforth, Appellee Peter L. Deuel, Appellee Everett Dial, Appellee Michael Dugan, Appellee John Fisher, Appellee John Foote, Appellee Paul Frasier, Appellee Dean Gushwa, Appellee Douglass Harcleroad, Appellee John Haroldson, Appellee Robert Hermann, Appellee Mark Huddleston, Appellee Ryan Joslin, Appellee Joshua Marquis, Appellee Wade M. McLeod, Appellee Eric J. Nisley, Appellee Dan Norris, Appellee Daniel Ousley, Appellee William Bryan Porter, Appellee Michael D. Schrunk, Appellee David A. Schutt, Appellee John Sewell, Appellee Matt Shirtcliff, Appellee Tim Thompson, Appellee Marion Weatherford and Appellee Gary Williams answering brief due 07/06/2009. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. (LW) [Entered: 05/14/2009 01:04 PM]
May 8, 2009 10 Filed (ECF) Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. Unopposed Motion for miscellaneous relief [Leave to File Single Excerpt of Record and for Combined Oral Argument]. Date of service: 05/08/2009. [6915036] (Runkles-Pearson, Patricia) [Entered: 05/08/2009 03:08 PM]
May 7, 2009 9 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk:LBS ): Appellees' motion to amend the case caption is construed as a motion to substitute John Kroger as Attorney General of the State of Oregon. So construed, the motion is granted. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 43(c)(2), court records shall be amended to reflect that Hardy Myers is no longer a party to this case. The briefing schedule is unchanged. (WL) [Entered: 05/07/2009 10:48 AM]
May 7, 2009 8 Terminate Appellee Hardy Myers in 09-35154 (WL) [Entered: 05/07/2009 10:48 AM]
May 7, 2009 7 Entered appearance of Appellee John Kroger. (WL) [Entered: 05/07/2009 10:47 AM]
April 1, 2009 5 Filed (ECF) Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Hardy Myers, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams Motion to substitute party. Date of service: 04/01/2009. [6867146] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 04/01/2009 01:48 PM]
March 30, 2009 6 Case rejected from Circuit Mediation Program. [08-17661, 08-36001, 08-36010, 08-36052, 08-36069, 08-56375, 08-56956, 08-57015, 08-57046, 08-74956, 09-15121, 09-15166, 09-15200, 09-15216, 09-15281, 09-15301, 09-15415, 09-15417, 09-15426, 09-15431, 09-15434, 09-35119, 09-35196, 09-35136, 09-35153, 09-35154, 09-35190, 09-55045, 09-55093, 09-55099, 09-55196, 09-55267, 09-55303, 09-55326, 09-55353, 09-55365, 09-70576] (SB) [Entered: 04/09/2009 08:35 AM]
March 23, 2009 4 Attorneys Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper, Katherine G. Georges, Michael A. Casper and Katherine G. Georges in 09-35154 substituted by Attorneys Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck, Denise Gale Fjordbeck and Denise Gale Fjordbeck in 09-35154 (JFF) [Entered: 03/23/2009 11:35 AM]
March 23, 2009 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Denise G. Fjordbeck for Appellees Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Hardy Myers, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams. Date of service: 03/23/2009. [6855103] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 03/23/2009 11:20 AM]
March 2, 2009 2 Filed Appellants American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. Civil Appeals Docketing Statement. Served on 02/04/2009. (RT) [Entered: 03/02/2009 01:59 PM]
March 2, 2009 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND CADS: No. The schedule is set as follows: Designation of RT for Appellant American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Cascade AIDS Project, Candace Morgan and Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. due 02/17/2009. Designation of RT for Appellee Steve Atchison, Elizabeth Ballard, Jack Banta, Bernice Barnett, Walter M. Beglau, Brad Berry, Edwin I. Caleb, Stephen D. Campbell, Jason Carlile, Tim Colahan, Thomas W. Cutsforth, Peter L. Deuel, Everett Dial, Michael Dugan, John Fisher, John Foote, Paul Frasier, Dean Gushwa, Douglass Harcleroad, John Haroldson, Robert Hermann, Mark Huddleston, Ryan Joslin, Joshua Marquis, Wade M. McLeod, Hardy Myers, Eric J. Nisley, Dan Norris, Daniel Ousley, William Bryan Porter, Michael D. Schrunk, David A. Schutt, John Sewell, Matt Shirtcliff, Tim Thompson, Marion Weatherford and Gary Williams due 02/24/2009. Transcript order for Appellant American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Appellant Cascade AIDS Project, Appellant Candace Morgan and Appellant Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. due 03/06/2009. Transcript due for Court Reporter Bonita Shumway, Court Reporter on 04/06/2009. Certificate of record due 03/13/2009. Appellant American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Appellant Cascade AIDS Project, Appellant Candace Morgan and Appellant Planned Parenthood of the Columbia/Willamette, Inc. opening brief due 05/22/2009. Appellee Steve Atchison, Appellee Elizabeth Ballard, Appellee Jack Banta, Appellee Bernice Barnett, Appellee Walter M. Beglau, Appellee Brad Berry, Appellee Edwin I. Caleb, Appellee Stephen D. Campbell, Appellee Jason Carlile, Appellee Tim Colahan, Appellee Thomas W. Cutsforth, Appellee Peter L. Deuel, Appellee Everett Dial, Appellee Michael Dugan, Appellee John Fisher, Appellee John Foote, Appellee Paul Frasier, Appellee Dean Gushwa, Appellee Douglass Harcleroad, Appellee John Haroldson, Appellee Robert Hermann, Appellee Mark Huddleston, Appellee Ryan Joslin, Appellee Joshua Marquis, Appellee Wade M. McLeod, Appellee Hardy Myers, Appellee Eric J. Nisley, Appellee Dan Norris, Appellee Daniel Ousley, Appellee William Bryan Porter, Appellee Michael D. Schrunk, Appellee David A. Schutt, Appellee John Sewell, Appellee Matt Shirtcliff, Appellee Tim Thompson, Appellee Marion Weatherford and Appellee Gary Williams answering brief due 06/22/2009. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (RT) [Entered: 03/02/2009 01:54 PM]

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union, et al v. John Kroger, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF OREGON
Represented By: Patricia Kay Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: CANDACE MORGAN
Represented By: Patricia Kay Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF THE COLUMBIA/WILLAMETTE, INC.
Represented By: Patricia Kay Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant,: CASCADE AIDS PROJECT
Represented By: Patricia Kay Runkles-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: POWELL'S BOOKS, INC.
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: OLD MULTNOMAH BOOK STORE, LTD., DBA Annie Bloom's Books
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: DARK HORSE COMICS, INC.
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: COLETTE'S: GOOD FOOD HUNGRY MINDS, LLC
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: BLUEJAY, INC., DBA Paulina Springs Books
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: ST. JOHN'S BOOKSELLERS, LLC
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS FOUNDATION FOR FREE EXPRESSION
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC.
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: FREEDOM TO READ FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff,: COMIC BOOK LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: HARDY MYERS, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: MATT SHIRTCLIFF, Baker County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: JOHN HAROLDSON, Benton County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: JOHN FOOTE, Clackamas County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: JOSHUA MARQUIS, Clatsop County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: STEVE ATCHISON, Columbia County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: PAUL FRASIER, Coos County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: GARY WILLIAMS, Crook County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: EVERETT DIAL, Curry County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: MICHAEL DUGAN, Deschutes County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: JACK BANTA, Douglas County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: MARION WEATHERFORD, Gilliam County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: RYAN JOSLIN, Grant County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: TIM COLAHAN, Harney County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: JOHN SEWELL, Hood River County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: MARK HUDDLESTON, Jackson County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: PETER L. DEUEL, Jefferson County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: STEPHEN D. CAMPBELL, Josephine County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: EDWIN I. CALEB, Klamath County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: DAVID A. SCHUTT, Lake County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: DOUGLASS HARCLEROAD, Lane County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: BERNICE BARNETT, Lincoln County District Attorney, in her official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: JASON CARLILE, Linn County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: DAN NORRIS, Malheur County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: WALTER M. BEGLAU, Marion County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: ELIZABETH BALLARD, Morrow County District Attorney, in her official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: MICHAEL D. SCHRUNK, Multnomah County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: JOHN FISHER, Polk County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: WADE M. MCLEOD, Sherman County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: WILLIAM BRYAN PORTER, Tillamook County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: DEAN GUSHWA, Umatilla County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: TIM THOMPSON, Union County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: DANIEL OUSLEY, Wallowa County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: ERIC J. NISLEY, Wasco County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: ROBERT HERMANN, Washington County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: THOMAS W. CUTSFORTH, Wheeler County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: BRAD BERRY, Yamhill County District Attorney, in his official capacity
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee,: JOHN R. KROGER, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Oregon
Represented By: Michael A. Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?