In re: Jonathan Robinson, et al v. American Home Mortgage Serv., et al
Defendant / Appellee: PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC., NDEX WEST LLC, OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CO., GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC, RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A., GE MONEY BANK, BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP, MTC FINANCIAL, INC., DBA Trustee Corps, GRP FINANCIAL SERVICES CORP., GRP LOAN, LLC, BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORP., CR TITLE SERVICES, INC., AZTEC FORECLOSURE CORP., AMERICA'S WHOLESALE LENDER, HSBC MORTGAGE CORPORATION, USA, EXECUTIVE TRUSTEE SERVICES, LLC, DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC., HSBC BANK, U.S.A., N.A., FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY, FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICES, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES, INC., LITTON LOAN SERVICING, LP, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AMERICA'S SERVICING COMPANY, FIRST HORIZON HOME LOAN CORP., WELLS FARGO BANK, NA, U.S. BANK, CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY, DEUTSCHE BANK, AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE SERVICING, INC., MORTGAGE IT, INC., LIME FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED, IB PROPERTY HOLDINGS, QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION, CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION, BANK OF AMERICA, NA, AURORA LOAN SERVICES, LLC, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., COOPER CASTLE LAW FIRM LLP, UTLS DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC, NATIONAL CITY MORTGAGE, MERSCORP, INC., FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, WESTERN PROGRESSIVE TRUSTEE, LLC, CITYMORTGAGE, INC., HOUSEKEY FINANCIAL CORP., CENTRAL MORTGAGE CO., SAXON MORTGAGE, INC., FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CO., NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION, T.D. SERVICE COMPANY and SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRYAN GRAY, [for complete list of plaintiff/appellants, see Notice of Appeal], MARIA C. CASAS, TYRONE EVENSON, JOSE TRINIDAD CASAS, JONATHAN E. ROBINSON, PABLO LEON, SALLY J. ROBINSON-BURKE, MICHELLINA EVENSON, JOSEPHA S. LOPEZ, LYNDON B. GRAVES and ROSA A. SILVAS
Not Classified By Court: In re: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Case Number: 11-17615
Filed: October 31, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2014 Filing 260 MANDATE ISSUED. Each side shall bear its own costs on appeal. (AWT, WAF and JHN) [9300783] [9300783] (RR) [Entered: 11/04/2014 10:46 AM]
August 14, 2014 Filing 259 Terminated Appellee Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp. in 11-17615 [9205916] (AF) [Entered: 08/14/2014 04:36 PM]
August 14, 2014 Filing 258 Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN): The joint motion to dismiss a party from the case, filed August 12, 2014, is GRANTED. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b), the parties have stipulated to the dismissal of claims against Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation. Appellants appeal of the dismissal of their claims against Cal- Western is dismissed. Attorneys fees and costs shall be allocated according to the provisions of the stipulation. The copy of this order constitutes the mandate of this Court. [9205912] (AF) [Entered: 08/14/2014 04:35 PM]
August 12, 2014 Filing 257 Filed (ECF) Appellant Jonathan E. Robinson Stipulated Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 08/12/2014. [9201870] (Edwards, Valerie) [Entered: 08/12/2014 10:27 AM]
June 20, 2014 Filing 256 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jonathan E. Robinson and Sally J. Robinson-Burke Correspondence: Delete Lisa Irene Streu as counsel for Plaintiffs-Appellants. Date of service: 06/20/2014 [9139821] (Edwards, Valerie) [Entered: 06/20/2014 09:46 AM]
June 13, 2014 Filing 255 Terminated Lisa Irene Streu for Rosa A. Silvas, Sally J. Robinson-Burke, Jonathan E. Robinson, Josepha S. Lopez, Bryan Gray, Lyndon B. Graves, Tyrone Evenson, Michellina Evenson, Maria C. Casas and Jose Trinidad Casas in 11-17615 (no longer with firm) [9132431] (RY) [Entered: 06/13/2014 04:39 PM]
June 12, 2014 Filing 254 Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN) Defendant-appellee Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation ("Cal-Western"), though its counsel, has notified this court of the filing of bankruptcy proceedings in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, No. 13-11619-BLS. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a), we hereby stay that portion of the appeal in Robinson v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, No. 11-17615, as to which Cal-Western is a defendant-appellee. Cal-Western or its trustee shall file a notice in this proceeding within 30 days after the stay is lifted or otherwise is no longer in effect. [9129486] (BY) [Entered: 06/12/2014 09:04 AM]
June 12, 2014 Filing 253 Terminated Matthew A. Silverman for Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., Aztec Foreclosure Corp. and Aurora Loan Services, LLC in 11-17615 (Csl no longer with firm) [9129413] (ASW) [Entered: 06/12/2014 08:39 AM]
June 12, 2014 Filing 252 FILED OPINION (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN) Each side shall bear its own costs on appeal. DISMISSED in part, AFFIRMED in part, REVERSED in part, and REMANDED. Judge: WAF Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [9129397] (RMM) [Entered: 06/12/2014 08:32 AM]
April 1, 2014 Filing 251 Terminated Emily S. Cates for Bank of America, NA and ReconTrust Company in 11-17615 (no longer with firm) [9040492] (RY) [Entered: 04/01/2014 06:23 PM]
February 20, 2014 Filing 250 Filed (ECF) Appellees MERSCORP, Inc. and MERS citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/20/2014. [8985642] (Brochin, Robert) [Entered: 02/20/2014 01:39 PM]
January 31, 2014 Filing 249 Terminated Christopher M. Hunter for Quality Loan Service Corporation and Aurora Loan Services, LLC in 11-17615 (no longer with firm) [8961649] (RY) [Entered: 01/31/2014 03:09 PM]
January 31, 2014 Filing 248 Filed (ECF) Appellant Jonathan E. Robinson citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/31/2014. [8961545] (Edwards, Valerie) [Entered: 01/31/2014 02:42 PM]
January 15, 2014 Filing 247 Filed (ECF) Appellees MERSCORP, Inc. and MERS citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/15/2014. [8939756] (Brochin, Robert) [Entered: 01/15/2014 01:37 PM]
December 16, 2013 Filing 246 Filed (ECF) Appellant Sally J. Robinson-Burke citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/16/2013. [8902106] (Edwards, Valerie) [Entered: 12/16/2013 10:05 AM]
November 7, 2013 Filing 245 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO Judges A. WALLACE TASHIMA, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN. [8855475] [11-17615] (AT) [Entered: 11/07/2013 03:36 PM]
November 7, 2013 Filing 244 Terminated Robert J. Gibson for Wells Fargo Bank, NA in 11-17615 [8854579] (EL) [Entered: 11/07/2013 11:38 AM]
November 7, 2013 Filing 243 Filed (ECF) Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, NA Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Robert J. Gibson. Date of service: 11/07/2013 [8854465] (Marshall, Gregory) [Entered: 11/07/2013 11:03 AM]
November 4, 2013 Filing 242 Received Attorney Brian M. Forbes, Esquire letter dated 11/01/2013 re: the docket be corrected to reflect the notices of appearance. Served on 11/01/2013. [8849483] (EL) [Entered: 11/04/2013 03:53 PM]
November 4, 2013 Filing 241 Terminated Gregory N. Blase for Bank of New York Mellon in 11-17615, Brian M. Forbes for Bank of New York Mellon in 11-17615 [8849474] (EL) [Entered: 11/04/2013 03:51 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 240 Filed (ECF) Appellees MERSCORP, Inc. and MERS citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/01/2013. [8847209] (Brochin, Robert) [Entered: 11/01/2013 02:28 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 239 Filed (ECF) Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, NA, First Horizon Home Loan Corp., ReconTrust Company and Wells Fargo Bank, NA citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/01/2013. [8846956] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 11/01/2013 01:13 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 238 Filed (ECF) Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, NA, First Horizon Home Loan Corp., ReconTrust Company and Wells Fargo Bank, NA citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/01/2013. [8846940] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 11/01/2013 01:07 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 237 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew R. Louis for Appellees G.E. Money Bank and American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. [8846897] (Louis, Andrew) [Entered: 11/01/2013 12:40 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 236 Terminated Benjamin Weinberg for MERS and MERSCORP, Inc. in 11-17615 [8846360] (EL) [Entered: 11/01/2013 08:56 AM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 235 Filed (ECF) Appellees MERSCORP, Inc. and MERS Correspondence: Disassociation of attorney B. Weinberg. Date of service: 11/01/2013 [8846289] (Brochin, Robert) [Entered: 11/01/2013 06:50 AM]
October 28, 2013 Filing 234 Added attorney Sheryl Serreze for Pablo Leon Lyndon B. Graves Tyrone Evenson Josepha S. Lopez Michellina Evenson Jose Trinidad Casas Sally J. Robinson-Burke Bryan Gray Rosa A. Silvas Jonathan E. Robinson Maria C. Casas, in case 11-17615. [8839115] (EL) [Entered: 10/28/2013 11:19 AM]
October 28, 2013 Filing 233 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sheryl Serreze for Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas. Date of service: 10/28/2013. [8839070] (Serreze, Sheryl) [Entered: 10/28/2013 11:11 AM]
October 22, 2013 Filing 232 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Brian M. Forbes, Esquire for Appellees Bank of New York Mellon and HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A.. [8830248] (Forbes, Brian) [Entered: 10/22/2013 05:11 AM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 231 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Adam Kyle Bult, Esquire for Appellee NDex West LLC. [8826445] (Bult, Adam) [Entered: 10/18/2013 08:48 AM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 230 Filed (ECF) - MERS citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/17/2013. [8825588] (Edwards, Valerie) [Entered: 10/17/2013 02:22 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 229 Filed (ECF) - MERS citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/16/2013. [8823572] (Edwards, Valerie) [Entered: 10/16/2013 02:35 PM]
October 7, 2013 Filing 228 Filed (ECF) Appellee Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp. Correspondence: Notice of Bankruptcy and Suggestion of Automatic Stay. Date of service: 10/07/2013 [8811744] (Handley, Laurel) [Entered: 10/07/2013 02:14 PM]
October 4, 2013 Filing 227 Filed (ECF) Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, NA, First Horizon Home Loan Corp., ReconTrust Company and Wells Fargo Bank, NA Unopposed Motion for miscellaneous relief [to Adjust November 7, 2013 Argument Schedule]. Date of service: 10/04/2013. [8810384] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 10/04/2013 03:49 PM]
October 4, 2013 Filing 226 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Lucia Nale for Appellee CR Title Services, Inc.. [8809782] (Nale, Lucia) [Entered: 10/04/2013 12:19 PM]
September 30, 2013 Filing 225 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Jonathan D. Fink for Appellees National Default Servicing Corp. and Aztec Foreclosure Corp.. [8802789] (Fink, Jonathan) [Entered: 09/30/2013 03:14 PM]
September 25, 2013 Filing 224 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas Hefferon for Appellees Bank of America, NA, ReconTrust Company, Bank of New York Mellon, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, America's Wholesale Lender, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, America's Servicing Company and First Horizon Home Loan Corp.. [8795864] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 09/25/2013 09:35 AM]
September 18, 2013 Filing 223 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Phillip Russell Perdew for Appellees Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Saxon Mortgage, Inc. and Old Republic National Title Insurance Co.. [8786975] (Perdew, Phillip) [Entered: 09/18/2013 08:48 AM]
September 17, 2013 Filing 222 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Aaron Michael Waite for Appellees Cooper Castle Law Firm LLP and Lime Financial Services Limited. [8784969] (Waite, Aaron) [Entered: 09/17/2013 08:27 AM]
September 13, 2013 Filing 221 Filed (ECF) Appellee American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc. corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 09/13/2013. [8781097] (Previn, Matthew) [Entered: 09/13/2013 09:43 AM]
September 11, 2013 Filing 220 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. William Morris Fischbach, III for Appellee Central Mortgage Co.. [8778233] (Cowles, David) [Entered: 09/11/2013 02:10 PM]
September 11, 2013 Filing 219 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mrs. Jill L. Nicholson, Esquire for Appellees Federal National Mortgage Association and FHLMC. [8777961] (Nicholson, Jill) [Entered: 09/11/2013 12:50 PM]
September 6, 2013 Filing 218 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Randall W. Edwards, Esquire for Appellee Western Progressive Trustee, LLC. [8773170] (Edwards, Randall) [Entered: 09/06/2013 05:44 PM]
September 6, 2013 Filing 217 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Elizabeth Allen Frohlich for Appellee Deutsche Bank. [8772035] (Frohlich, Elizabeth) [Entered: 09/06/2013 12:07 PM]
September 5, 2013 Filing 216 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Gregory L. Wilde, Esquire for Appellees National Default Servicing Corp., IB Property Holdings and T.D. Service Company. [8770938] (Wilde, Gregory) [Entered: 09/05/2013 04:23 PM]
September 4, 2013 Filing 215 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Danielle Jean Szukala, Esquire for Appellees JPMorgan Chase Bank, Bank of New York Mellon and California Reconveyance Co.. [8768843] (Gould, Danielle) [Entered: 09/04/2013 04:32 PM]
September 4, 2013 Filing 214 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew P. Previn for Appellees G.E. Money Bank and American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. [8767401] (Previn, Matthew) [Entered: 09/04/2013 09:54 AM]
September 3, 2013 Filing 213 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Richard Joseph Reynolds, Esquire for Appellee MTC Financial, Inc.. [8766744] (Reynolds, Richard) [Entered: 09/03/2013 03:58 PM]
September 3, 2013 Filing 212 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Christina Wang for Appellee Fidelity National Title Insurance Co.. [8766593] (Wang, Christina) [Entered: 09/03/2013 03:21 PM]
September 3, 2013 Filing 211 Filed (ECF) Appellant Jonathan E. Robinson citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/03/2013. [8766571] (Edwards, Valerie) [Entered: 09/03/2013 03:16 PM]
September 3, 2013 Filing 210 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Treva Hearne, Esquire for Appellants Rosa A. Silvas, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke, Josepha S. Lopez, Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Lyndon B. Graves, Tyrone Evenson, Michellina Evenson and Bryan Gray. [8766442] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 09/03/2013 02:46 PM]
August 30, 2013 Filing 209 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Valerie R. Edwards for Appellants Rosa A. Silvas, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke, Josepha S. Lopez, Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Lyndon B. Graves, Tyrone Evenson, Michellina Evenson, Bryan Gray and Pablo Leon. [8764399] (Edwards, Valerie) [Entered: 08/30/2013 02:50 PM]
August 30, 2013 Filing 208 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Robert M. Brochin for Appellees Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and MERSCORP, Inc.. [8763838] (Brochin, Robert) [Entered: 08/30/2013 11:32 AM]
August 29, 2013 Filing 207 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mark S. Landman, Esquire for Appellee FHLMC. [8761121] (Landman, Mark) [Entered: 08/29/2013 07:36 AM]
August 28, 2013 Filing 206 Notice of Oral Argument on Thursday, November 7, 2013 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 2, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8760619] (RB) [Entered: 08/28/2013 03:24 PM]
August 12, 2013 Filing 205 Terminated John Michael DeStefano III for Wells Fargo Bank, NA in 11-17615 [8740104] (EL) [Entered: 08/12/2013 03:42 PM]
August 12, 2013 Filing 204 Filed (ECF) Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, NA Correspondence: Notice to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 08/12/2013. [8739743]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct ECF event. Resent NDA. 08/12/2013 by RY] (Marshall, Gregory) [Entered: 08/12/2013 02:11 PM]
August 12, 2013 Filing 203 Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by - Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS) Litigation. Date of service: 07/25/2012. [8739440] (Brochin, Robert) [Entered: 08/12/2013 12:47 PM]
August 1, 2013 Filing 202 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas. Date of service: 06/12/2012. [8727434] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 08/01/2013 04:13 PM]
July 29, 2013 Filing 201 Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Aztec Foreclosure Corp., BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, NA, Bank of New York Mellon, CR Title Services, Inc., Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., Central Mortgage Co., CityMortgage, Inc., Cooper Castle Law Firm LLP, Deutsche Bank, FHFA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Fidelity National Title Insurance Co., First Horizon Home Loan Corp., G.E. Money Bank, HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., HSBC Mortgage Corporation, USA, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Housekey Financial Corp., IB Property Holdings, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Lime Financial Services Limited, Mortgage IT, Inc., NDex West LLC, National City Mortgage, National Default Servicing Corp., Old Republic National Title Insurance Co., Quality Loan Service Corporation, ReconTrust Company, T.D. Service Company, UTLS Default Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, NA and Western Progressive Trustee, LLC. Date of service: 07/29/2013. [8720738] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 07/29/2013 09:39 AM]
June 25, 2013 Filing 200 Terminated Donna M. Osborn for First American Loan Star Trustee Services, LLC and Aztec Foreclosure Corp. in 11-17615 [8680636] (PH) [Entered: 06/25/2013 10:53 AM]
March 19, 2013 Filing 199 Terminated Stephen Eddie Hart for FHFA in 11-17615 [8556770] (SYS) [Entered: 03/19/2013 02:02 PM]
February 27, 2013 Filing 198 Added attorney Michael Q. Eagan Jr. for Deutsche Bank, in case 11-17615. [8529202] (EL) [Entered: 02/27/2013 01:14 PM]
February 27, 2013 Filing 197 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael Q. Eagan, Jr. for Appellee Deutsche Bank. Date of service: 02/27/2013. [8529160] (Eagan, Michael) [Entered: 02/27/2013 12:55 PM]
February 20, 2013 Filing 196 Terminated Appellees DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc., GRP Financial Services Corp., GRP Loan, LLC and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. in 11-17615 [8519630] (AF) [Entered: 02/20/2013 10:03 AM]
February 20, 2013 Filing 195 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of this appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) as to GRP Financial Services Corporation, GRP Loan, LLC, DLJ Mortage Capital Inc., and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. only. This appeal is dismissed with prejudice. A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court as to the above named parties only. [8519619] (AF) [Entered: 02/20/2013 09:59 AM]
February 19, 2013 Filing 194 Terminated Shawn M. Kennedy for Deutsche Bank in 11-17615 [8518745] (PH) [Entered: 02/19/2013 03:01 PM]
February 19, 2013 Filing 193 Terminated Jessica R. Kenney for Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp. in 11-17615 [8518538] (PH) [Entered: 02/19/2013 02:20 PM]
February 19, 2013 Filing 192 Filed (ECF) Appellees DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc., GRP Financial Services Corp., GRP Loan, LLC and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 02/19/2013. [8518001] (Handley, Laurel) [Entered: 02/19/2013 11:42 AM]
December 28, 2012 Filing 191 Terminated Appellees Litton Loan Servicing, LP and U.S. Bank, N.A. in 11-17615 [8455124] (WL) [Entered: 12/28/2012 11:36 AM]
December 28, 2012 Filing 190 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of this appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) as to Litton Loan Servicing and U.S. National Bank, National Association , as Trustee for the C-Bass Mortgage Loan Asset Backed Certificate Series 2006- CBI. This appeal is dismissed with prejudice as to the above named parties only. Costs, expenses, and attorneys fees shall be allocated according to the provisions of the stipulation. A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for the above named parties only. [8455062] (WL) [Entered: 12/28/2012 11:19 AM]
December 20, 2012 Filing 189 Filed (ECF) Appellees Litton Loan Servicing, LP and U.S. Bank, N.A. Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 12/20/2012. [8448037] (Schnitzer, Gary) [Entered: 12/20/2012 12:01 PM]
December 13, 2012 Filing 188 Terminated U. Gwyn Williams for Bank of America, NA, America's Wholesale Lender and America's Servicing Company in 11-17615 [8437863] (EL) [Entered: 12/13/2012 01:47 PM]
December 13, 2012 Filing 187 Mail returned on 12/13/2012 addressed to U. Gwyn Williams for Bank of America, NA, America's Wholesale Lender and America's Servicing Company, re: order filed 11/21/12. Resending to: casefile, attempted - not known, unable to forward. [8437860] (EL) [Entered: 12/13/2012 01:46 PM]
December 3, 2012 Filing 186 Terminated Gregory Michael Monaco for Litton Loan Servicing, LP in 11-17615 [8422762] (ASW) [Entered: 12/03/2012 11:29 AM]
November 21, 2012 Filing 185 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): Appellant Alfonso Vargas motion for withdrawal of claims,and any responsive filings shall be referred for disposition to the panel that considers the merits of the case. [8411206] (SAM) [Entered: 11/21/2012 11:02 AM]
November 13, 2012 Filing 184 Filed (ECF) Appellant Jonathan E. Robinson Motion for miscellaneous relief [Withdrawal of Claims as to Alfonso Vargas' property, only]. Date of service: 11/13/2012. [8398802] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 11/13/2012 12:44 PM]
November 1, 2012 Filing 183 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [ # 181 ] filed by Jose Trinidad Casas, et al. [8384512] (SD) [Entered: 11/01/2012 01:06 PM]
October 26, 2012 Filing 182 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 181 ] submitted by Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8377904] (WWP) [Entered: 10/26/2012 11:25 AM]
October 25, 2012 Filing 181 Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas. Date of service: 10/25/2012. [8376735] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 10/25/2012 02:02 PM]
September 21, 2012 Filing 180 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: cag):Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants Rosa A. Silvas, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke, Josepha S. Lopez, Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Lyndon B. Graves, Tyrone Evenson, Michellina Evenson, Bryan Gray and Pablo Leon. The optional reply brief is due 10/25/12.[8333607] (CG) [Entered: 09/21/2012 04:41 PM]
September 21, 2012 Filing 179 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 178 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas Correspondence: Certificate of Counsel in support of Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Date of service: 09/21/2012 [8333375] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 09/21/2012 02:57 PM]
September 21, 2012 Filing 178 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas EMERGENCY Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 10/25/2012 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 09/21/2012. [8333363]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached declaration and service list. Resent NDA. 09/21/2012 by RY] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 09/21/2012 02:54 PM]
August 28, 2012 Filing 177 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: cag): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants Rosa A. Silvas, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke, Josepha S. Lopez, Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Lyndon B. Graves, Tyrone Evenson, Michellina Evenson, Bryan Gray and Pablo Leon. The optional reply brief is due 9/26/12. [8302016] (CG) [Entered: 08/28/2012 10:05 AM]
August 24, 2012 Filing 176 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 09/26/2012 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 08/24/2012. [8299222] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 08/24/2012 03:39 PM]
August 9, 2012 Filing 175 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 165 ] filed by America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc., Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Aztec Foreclosure Corp., BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, NA, Bank of New York Mellon, CR Title Services, Inc., Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., California Reconveyance Co., Central Mortgage Co., CityMortgage, Inc., Cooper Castle Law Firm LLP, Deutsche Bank, FHFA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Fidelity National Title Insurance Co., First Horizon Home Loan Corp., G.E. Money Bank, HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., HSBC Mortgage Corporation, USA, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Housekey Financial Corp., IB Property Holdings, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Lime Financial Services Limited, Litton Loan Servicing, LP, Mortgage IT, Inc., NDex West LLC, National City Mortgage, National Default Servicing Corp., Old Republic National Title Insurance Co., Quality Loan Service Corporation, ReconTrust Company, T.D. Service Company, U.S. Bank, N.A., UTLS Default Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, NA and Western Progressive Trustee, LLC. [8282183] (DB) [Entered: 08/09/2012 04:14 PM]
August 3, 2012 Filing 174 Received 7 paper copies of Joinder Answering brief [ # 168 ] filed by Aztec Foreclosure Corp. and National Default Servicing Corp.. [8274919] (SD) [Entered: 08/03/2012 02:57 PM]
August 3, 2012 Filing 172 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas Correspondence: Letter regarding 2 week extension on Reply Brief. Date of service: 08/03/2012 [8273805] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 08/03/2012 07:28 AM]
August 2, 2012 Filing 171 Oral extension of time granted to appellants. The reply brief is now due 9/4/2012. [8273558] (LBS) [Entered: 08/02/2012 04:27 PM]
August 2, 2012 Filing 170 Filed clerk order: The joinder [ # 168 ] submitted by Aztec Foreclosure Corp. and National Default Servicing Corp. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8273097] (WWP) [Entered: 08/02/2012 02:00 PM]
August 2, 2012 Filing 169 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 165 ] submitted by America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc., Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Aztec Foreclosure Corp., BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, NA, Bank of New York Mellon, CR Title Services, Inc., Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., Central Mortgage Co., CityMortgage, Inc., Cooper Castle Law Firm LLP, Deutsche Bank, FHLMC, FHFA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Fidelity National Title Insurance Co., First Horizon Home Loan Corp., G.E. Money Bank, HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., HSBC Mortgage Corporation, USA, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Housekey Financial Corp., IB Property Holdings, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Lime Financial Services Limited, Litton Loan Servicing, LP, MTC Financial, Inc., Mortgage IT, Inc., NDex West LLC, National City Mortgage, National Default Servicing Corp., Old Republic National Title Insurance Co., Quality Loan Service Corporation, ReconTrust Company, T.D. Service Company, U.S. Bank, N.A., UTLS Default Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, NA and Western Progressive Trustee, LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8273062] --[Edited 08/02/2012 by WP to include all parties] (WWP) [Entered: 08/02/2012 01:47 PM]
August 2, 2012 Filing 168 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Aztec Foreclosure Corp. and National Default Servicing Corp.. Date of service: 08/02/2012. [8272825] (Fink, Jonathan) [Entered: 08/02/2012 11:47 AM]
August 2, 2012 Filing 167 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas Correspondence: letter to counsel regarding extension to file Reply Brief. Date of service: 08/02/2012 [8272616] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 08/02/2012 10:53 AM]
August 1, 2012 Filing 173 Filed Appellee American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc. et al., supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 3 volumes. [8273968] (WWP) [Entered: 08/03/2012 09:10 AM]
August 1, 2012 Filing 165 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc., Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Aztec Foreclosure Corp., BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, NA, Bank of New York Mellon, CR Title Services, Inc., Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., Central Mortgage Co., CityMortgage, Inc., Cooper Castle Law Firm LLP, Deutsche Bank, FHFA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Fidelity National Title Insurance Co., First Horizon Home Loan Corp., G.E. Money Bank, HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., HSBC Mortgage Corporation, USA, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Housekey Financial Corp., IB Property Holdings, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Lime Financial Services Limited, Litton Loan Servicing, LP, Mortgage IT, Inc., NDex West LLC, National City Mortgage, National Default Servicing Corp., Old Republic National Title Insurance Co., Quality Loan Service Corporation, ReconTrust Company, T.D. Service Company, U.S. Bank, N.A., UTLS Default Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, NA and Western Progressive Trustee, LLC. Date of service: 08/01/2012. [8272092] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 08/01/2012 05:08 PM]
August 1, 2012 Filing 164 Filed (ECF) Appellee Litton Loan Servicing, LP corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 08/01/2012. [8271736] (Forbes, Brian) [Entered: 08/01/2012 03:01 PM]
July 30, 2012 Filing 163 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 158 ] filed by MTC Financial, Inc.. [8267748] (SD) [Entered: 07/30/2012 11:10 AM]
July 27, 2012 Filing 166 Filed Appellees MERSCORP, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [8272174] (WWP) [Entered: 08/02/2012 07:56 AM]
July 27, 2012 Filing 162 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 160 ] filed by MERSCORP, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. [8266137] (SD) [Entered: 07/27/2012 11:29 AM]
July 25, 2012 Filing 161 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 160 ] submitted by MERSCORP, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8263559] (RH) [Entered: 07/25/2012 03:44 PM]
July 25, 2012 Filing 160 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees MERSCORP, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Date of service: 07/25/2012. [8263169]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct party filers. Resent NDA. 07/25/2012 by RY] (Weinberg, Benjamin) [Entered: 07/25/2012 02:05 PM]
July 25, 2012 Filing 159 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 158 ] submitted by MTC Financial, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8262537] (RH) [Entered: 07/25/2012 10:13 AM]
July 24, 2012 Filing 158 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee MTC Financial, Inc.. Date of service: 07/24/2012. [8262001] (Reynolds, Richard) [Entered: 07/24/2012 04:43 PM]
July 23, 2012 Filing 157 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 155 ] filed by Central Mortgage Co.. [8259447] (SD) [Entered: 07/23/2012 02:25 PM]
July 17, 2012 Filing 156 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 155 ] submitted by Central Mortgage Co. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8252299] (WWP) [Entered: 07/17/2012 07:37 AM]
July 11, 2012 Filing 155 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Central Mortgage Co.. Date of service: 07/11/2012. [8246154]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 07/16/2012 by RY] (Cowles, David) [Entered: 07/11/2012 02:26 PM]
July 2, 2012 Filing 154 14 day oral extension of time granted to appellees MERSCORP, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. The answering brief for appellees MERSCORP, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is due 7/25/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. [8236464] (LBS) [Entered: 07/03/2012 12:46 PM]
July 2, 2012 Filing 153 Filed (ECF) Appellee MTC Financial, Inc. Correspondence: Letter re 14-day telephonic extension from Clerk for Appellee MTC Financial Inc. dba Trustee Corps to file its answering brief.. Date of service: 07/02/2012 [8235535] (Reynolds, Richard) [Entered: 07/02/2012 05:14 PM]
July 2, 2012 Filing 152 Filed (ECF) - Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS) Litigation Correspondence: 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a) Extension of time to file answer brief. Date of service: 07/02/2012 [8234730] (Weinberg, Benjamin) [Entered: 07/02/2012 01:04 PM]
July 2, 2012 Filing 151 Filed notice of joint brief by Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc., Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Aztec Foreclosure Corp., BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, NA, Bank of New York Mellon, CR Title Services, Inc., Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., California Reconveyance Co., Cooper Castle Law Firm LLP, Deutsche Bank, Executive Trustee Services, LLC, FHLMC, FHFA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Fidelity National Title Insurance Co. and First American Loan Star Trustee Services, LLC. Briefing schedule is now as follows: Joint answering brief for America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc., Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Aztec Foreclosure Corp., BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, NA, Bank of New York Mellon, CR Title Services, Inc., Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., California Reconveyance Co., Central Mortgage Co., CityMortgage, Inc., Cooper Castle Law Firm LLP, Deutsche Bank, Executive Trustee Services, LLC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association, Fidelity National Title Insurance Co., First Horizon Home Loan Corp., G.E. Money Bank, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., HSBC Mortgage Corporation, USA, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Housekey Financial Corp., IB Property Holdings, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Lime Financial Services Limited, Litton Loan Servicing, LP, MTC Financial, Inc., Mortgage IT, Inc., NDex West LLC, National City Mortgage, National Default Servicing Corp., Old Republic National Title Insurance Co., Quality Loan Service Corporation, ReconTrust Company, Saxon Mortgage, Inc., T.D. Service Company, U.S. Bank, N.A., UTLS Default Services, LLC and Wells Fargo Bank, NA due 08/01/2012. Five additional pages or 1,400 words are authorized. The optional reply brief will be due 14 days from service of the joint answering brief. [8234258] (EL) [Entered: 07/02/2012 09:53 AM]
June 29, 2012 Filing 150 Filed (ECF) Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, NA, First Horizon Home Loan Corp., ReconTrust Company and Wells Fargo Bank, NA notice of joint brief (Answering). Date of service: 06/29/2012. [8233838] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 06/29/2012 04:44 PM]
June 29, 2012 Filing 149 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file the answering brief for Appellee MTC Financial, Inc. is granted. The answering brief for Appellee MTC Financial, Inc. is due 07/25/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the last-served answering brief. [8233531] [11-17615] (AT) [Entered: 06/29/2012 02:53 PM]
June 19, 2012 Filing 148 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [ # 142 ] filed by Jose Trinidad Casas, et al. [8220298] (SD) [Entered: 06/19/2012 02:55 PM]
June 19, 2012 Filing 147 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) Appellee Central Mortgage Companys motion to dismiss appellants Thomas W. Bilyea and Laurie S. Bilyea is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the answering brief. The stipulated motion for voluntary dismissal of the claims by appellants Stuart and Theresa Ellifritz against appellees OneWestBank FSB and HSBCBank USA (the Ellifritz Claims) is granted. The Ellifritz Claims are dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The opening brief has been filed. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect for the answering and optional reply briefs. (MOATT) [8219023] (KKW) [Entered: 06/19/2012 09:20 AM]
June 15, 2012 Filing 146 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 142 ] submitted by Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8216695] (WWP) [Entered: 06/15/2012 03:42 PM]
June 13, 2012 Filing 145 Terminated Anthony J. DiRaimondo for NDex West LLC in 11-17615, NDEX West, LLC in 11-17663 and NDEX West, LLC and LSI Title Agency Inc. in 12-15992, counsel no longer with firm, co-counsel remains. [8213735] [11-17615, 11-17663, 12-15992] (ASW) [Entered: 06/13/2012 03:35 PM]
June 12, 2012 Filing 144 Filed Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon and Josepha S. Lopez excerpts of record in 6 volumes. Served on 06/11/2012. [8212233] (WWP) [Entered: 06/13/2012 08:31 AM]
June 12, 2012 Filing 143 Filed (ECF) Appellee HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A. Stipulated Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 06/12/2012. [8210804] (Donn, Rachel) [Entered: 06/12/2012 10:38 AM]
June 11, 2012 Filing 142 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas. Date of service: 06/11/2012. [8210179]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 06/14/2012 by RY] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 06/11/2012 04:53 PM]
June 11, 2012 Filing 141 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 06/11/2012. [8209868] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 06/11/2012 03:45 PM]
June 4, 2012 Filing 140 Filed (ECF) - Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS) Litigation response joining motion (,motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 06/04/2012. [8200627] (Brochin, Robert) [Entered: 06/04/2012 11:17 AM]
June 1, 2012 Filing 139 Filed (ECF) Appellee Central Mortgage Co. Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 06/01/2012. [8199696] (Cowles, David) [Entered: 06/01/2012 04:19 PM]
June 1, 2012 Filing 138 Added attorney David Winthrop Cowles for Central Mortgage Co., in case 11-17615. [8199308] (EL) [Entered: 06/01/2012 02:47 PM]
June 1, 2012 Filing 137 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David W. Cowles for Appellee Central Mortgage Co.. Date of service: 06/01/2012. [8199181] (Cowles, David) [Entered: 06/01/2012 02:22 PM]
May 11, 2012 Filing 136 Filed (ECF) Appellees Cooper Castle Law Firm LLP and Lime Financial Services Limited response joining motion (). Date of service: 05/11/2012. [8175228] (Waite, Aaron) [Entered: 05/11/2012 02:22 PM]
May 7, 2012 Filing 135 Filed order MOATT: (KS) The following briefing schedule shall govern this appeal in light of the courts March 23, 2012 order: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due June 11, 2012; the answering brief is due July 11, 2012; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8168250] (DEV) [Entered: 05/07/2012 05:07 PM]
May 7, 2012 Filing 134 Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN): Appellants emergency motion for stay pending appeal is denied. See Hilton v. Braunskill, 481 U.S. 770, 776 (1987). Briefing remains stayed in appeal No. 11-17615 pursuant to the courts November 10, 2011 order. Briefing in appeal Nos. 11-17645, 11-17661, 11-17663, 11-17667, and 12- 15258 shall proceed according to the briefing schedules established on April 18, 2012. [8167869] [11-17615, 11-17645, 11-17661, 11-17663, 11-17667, 12-15258] (AF) [Entered: 05/07/2012 03:44 PM]
May 2, 2012 Filing 133 Filed (ECF) Appellee National City Mortgage response joining motion (). Date of service: 05/02/2012. [8161725] (Pittinsky, David) [Entered: 05/02/2012 12:58 PM]
May 1, 2012 Filing 132 Filed (ECF) Appellee NDex West LLC response joining motion (). Date of service: 05/01/2012. [8160860] (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Entered: 05/01/2012 04:53 PM]
May 1, 2012 Filing 131 Filed (ECF) Appellee NDex West LLC corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 05/01/2012. [8160852] (DiRaimondo, Anthony) [Entered: 05/01/2012 04:45 PM]
May 1, 2012 Filing 130 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas reply to response (, , , , , , , , , , , , ). Date of service: 05/01/2012. [8160800] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 05/01/2012 04:22 PM]
May 1, 2012 Filing 129 Filed (ECF) Appellees IB Property Holdings and T.D. Service Company response joining motion (). Date of service: 05/01/2012. [8160514] (Wilde, Gregory) [Entered: 05/01/2012 02:53 PM]
May 1, 2012 Filing 128 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 129 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellees IB Property Holdings and T.D. Service Company response joining motion (,motion to stay proceedings). Date of service: 05/01/2012. [8160479] (Wilde, Gregory) [Entered: 05/01/2012 02:40 PM]
April 30, 2012 Filing 127 Filed (ECF) Appellees CR Title Services, Inc. and CityMortgage, Inc. response joining motion (). Date of service: 04/30/2012. [8157960] (Panoff, Thomas) [Entered: 04/30/2012 10:58 AM]
April 30, 2012 Filing 126 Attorney Rebecca Ann Falk in 11-17615 substituted by Attorney Shawn M. Kennedy in 11-17615 [8157601] (EL) [Entered: 04/30/2012 08:50 AM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 125 Filed (ECF) Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association response opposing motion (,motion to stay proceedings). Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157482] (Garlough, Jonathan) [Entered: 04/27/2012 07:59 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 124 Filed (ECF) Appellees Executive Trustee Services, LLC and GMAC Mortgage, LLC response to motion (,motion to stay proceedings, ). Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157476] (Reichner, Henry) [Entered: 04/27/2012 06:32 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 123 Filed (ECF) Appellees HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., HSBC Mortgage Corporation, USA, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Housekey Financial Corp. and U.S. Bank, N.A. corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157472] (Marshall, Gregory) [Entered: 04/27/2012 05:59 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 122 Filed (ECF) Appellees HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., HSBC Mortgage Corporation, USA, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Housekey Financial Corp. and U.S. Bank, N.A. response joining motion (). Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157471] (Marshall, Gregory) [Entered: 04/27/2012 05:57 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 121 Filed (ECF) Appellee Deutsche Bank response joining motion (). Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157468] (Frohlich, Elizabeth) [Entered: 04/27/2012 05:52 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 120 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Shawn M. Kennedy for Appellee Deutsche Bank. Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157463] (Kennedy, Shawn) [Entered: 04/27/2012 05:41 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 119 Filed (ECF) Appellees Bank of America, NA, First Horizon Home Loan Corp., ReconTrust Company, U.S. Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, NA response opposing motion (,motion to stay proceedings). Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157399] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 04/27/2012 04:42 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 118 Filed (ECF) Appellees MERSCORP, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. response joining motion (). Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157200] (Brochin, Robert) [Entered: 04/27/2012 03:57 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 117 Filed (ECF) Appellees Bank of America, NA, Bank of New York Mellon and J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. response opposing motion (,motion to stay proceedings). Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157174] (Gould, Danielle) [Entered: 04/27/2012 03:52 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 116 Filed (ECF) Appellee American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc. response joining motion (). Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157173] (Alexander, Cynthia) [Entered: 04/27/2012 03:52 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 115 Added attorney Cynthia Lynn Alexander for American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc., in case 11-17615. [8157140] (EL) [Entered: 04/27/2012 03:45 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 114 Filed (ECF) Appellees HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., Litton Loan Servicing, LP and U.S. Bank, N.A. response opposing motion (,motion to stay proceedings). Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157138] (Forbes, Brian) [Entered: 04/27/2012 03:44 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 113 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Cynthia L. Alexander for Appellee American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc.. Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8157077] (Alexander, Cynthia) [Entered: 04/27/2012 03:32 PM]
April 27, 2012 Filing 112 Filed (ECF) Appellees Aurora Loan Services, LLC and Old Republic National Title Insurance Co. response opposing motion (,motion to stay proceedings). Date of service: 04/27/2012. [8156805] (Perdew, Phillip) [Entered: 04/27/2012 02:27 PM]
April 25, 2012 Filing 111 Terminated Zachary T. Ball for Fidelity National Title Insurance Co. in 11-17615 [8152819] (EL) [Entered: 04/25/2012 11:11 AM]
April 25, 2012 Filing 110 Mail returned on 04/25/2012 addressed to Zachary T. Ball for Fidelity National Title Insurance Co., re: order filed 4/16/12. Resending to: no such street, unable to forward. [8152817] (EL) [Entered: 04/25/2012 11:10 AM]
April 19, 2012 Filing 109 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [8147283] (EL) [Entered: 04/20/2012 09:45 AM]
April 19, 2012 Filing 108 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas EMERGENCY Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 04/19/2012. [8146940]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct relief. Resent NDA. 04/20/2012 by RY] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 04/19/2012 05:03 PM]
April 18, 2012 Filing 107 Filed (ECF) Appellee MTC Financial, Inc. corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 04/18/2012. [8145427] (Reynolds, Richard) [Entered: 04/18/2012 04:48 PM]
April 16, 2012 Filing 106 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of this appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) as to Eric A. Gothan and Terreia L. Gothan. This appeal is dismissed as to the named parties only. This appeal shall proceed as to the remaining appellants. Costs and expenses shall be allocated according to the provisions of the stipulation. A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court as to the above named parties only. [8141457] (SAM) [Entered: 04/16/2012 01:59 PM]
April 12, 2012 Filing 105 Filed (ECF) Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, NA Stipulated Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 04/12/2012. [8138057] (Jacobs, Andrew) [Entered: 04/12/2012 02:05 PM]
April 11, 2012 Filing 104 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas Correspondence: Notice of Change of Address of HAGER & HEARNE. Date of service: 04/11/2012 [8136432] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 04/11/2012 02:54 PM]
April 3, 2012 Filing 103 Attorneys Cynthia Lynn Alexander substituted by Attorney Andrew Martin Jacobs. [8126422] (EL) [Entered: 04/03/2012 04:06 PM]
April 3, 2012 Filing 102 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew M. Jacobs for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Date of service: 04/03/2012. [8126398] (Jacobs, Andrew) [Entered: 04/03/2012 04:00 PM]
March 23, 2012 Filing 101 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MT): The record reflects that the district court has denied the post-judgment motion and appellants have informed the court that they intend to prosecute this appeal. Accordingly, briefing resumes. Within 10 days after entry of the order disposing of the post-judgment motion, appellants shall designate any reporters transcripts or serve on appellees a statement indicating that appellants do not intend to order any transcripts. See 9th Cir. R. 10-3.1(a). If appellants fail to comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellants designate transcripts, the transcripts will be due April 30, 2012. The opening brief and excerpts of record are due June 11, 2012; the answering brief is due July 11, 2012; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The stipulated motion for voluntary dismissal of the claims by appellants Pablo E. Leon and Irene E. Rodriguez against appellees Litton Loan Servicing LP (Litton), Merscorp, Inc., and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (the Leon Claims) is granted. The Leon claims are dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The stipulated motions for voluntary dismissal of the claims by appellants Ronald E. Freeto, Marie Huynh, and Grant Matthew Youngren against appellee Litton (the Litton Claims) is granted. The Litton Claims are dismissed. See id. [8114802] (AF) [Entered: 03/23/2012 08:55 AM]
March 22, 2012 Filing 100 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Pablo Leon, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas response to Court order dated 03/20/2012. Date of service: 03/22/2012. [8113504] (Edwards, Valerie) [Entered: 03/22/2012 10:36 AM]
March 20, 2012 Filing 99 Filed (ECF) Appellee Litton Loan Servicing, LP Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 03/20/2012. [8109906] (Schnitzer, Gary) [Entered: 03/20/2012 10:34 AM]
March 20, 2012 Filing 98 Filed (ECF) Appellee Litton Loan Servicing, LP Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 03/20/2012. [8109866] (Schnitzer, Gary) [Entered: 03/20/2012 10:24 AM]
March 20, 2012 Filing 97 Filed (ECF) Appellee Litton Loan Servicing, LP Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 03/20/2012. [8109849] (Schnitzer, Gary) [Entered: 03/20/2012 10:20 AM]
March 19, 2012 Filing 96 Added attorney Christina Wang for Fidelity National Title Insurance Co., in case 11-17615. [8109122] (EL) [Entered: 03/19/2012 03:53 PM]
March 19, 2012 Filing 95 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Thomas A. Ryan for Appellee Fidelity National Title Insurance Co.. Date of service: 03/19/2012. [8109107] (Ryan, Thomas) [Entered: 03/19/2012 03:49 PM]
March 15, 2012 Filing 94 Filed (ECF) AHMS Inc. corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 03/15/2012. [8104889] (Alexander, Cynthia) [Entered: 03/15/2012 10:19 AM]
March 9, 2012 Filing 93 Received copy of a motion filed in district court re: stipulated notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice. [8099094] (EL) [Entered: 03/12/2012 10:12 AM]
March 9, 2012 Filing 92 Filed (ECF) - Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS) Litigation, Appellant Pablo Leon and Appellee Litton Loan Servicing, LP Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 03/09/2012. [8097571] (Blase, Gregory) [Entered: 03/09/2012 12:54 PM]
March 9, 2012 Filing 91 Entered appearance of Appellant Pablo Leon. [8097564] (HH) [Entered: 03/09/2012 12:52 PM]
March 2, 2012 Filing 90 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SVG): The opposed motions to consolidate these seven appeals, filed February 1, 2012, February 2, 2012, and February 14, 2012 in the various appeals, are denied. These related appeals shall be calendared before the same merits panel to the extent practicable. The emergency motions to continue the briefing schedules in appeal nos. 11-17645, 11-17661, 11-17663, and 11-17667, filed February 9, 2012, are granted. The previously existing briefing schedules in those four appeals are vacated. The joint motion filed February 17, 2012 in appeal no. 11-17661 to dismiss appellee Litton Loan Servicing LP as a party to that appeal is granted. The Clerk shall correct the caption in docket no. 11-17661 to reflect that Litton Loan Servicing LP is not a party to that appeal. The stipulated motion filed February 2, 2012 in appeal no. 11-17663 to dismiss appellee Onewest Bank FSB as a party to that appeal is granted. The Clerk shall correct the caption in docket no. 11-17663 to reflect that Onewest Bank FSB is not a party to that appeal. The February 22, 2012 motion to withdraw as counsel in appeal no. 12- 15258 is granted. The Clerk shall correct the caption in docket no. 12-15258 to reflect that Colt B. Dodrill is not counsel of record for appellee Aurora Loan Services, and that counsel Hugh Balsam remains counsel of record for that appellee. Briefing remains stayed in appeal no. 11-17615 pursuant to the November 10, 2011 order. Briefing also remains stayed in appeal no. 11-17919 pending resolution of the February 6, 2012 order to show cause. Briefing in appeal no. 12-15258 shall continue in effect pursuant to the schedule established February 8, 2012. Briefing shall proceed separately as follows in appeal nos. 11-17645, 11-17661, 11-17663, and 11-17667: the opening briefs are due May 17, 2012; the answering briefs are due June 18, 2012; and the optional reply briefs are due 14 days from service of the answering briefs. [8088709] [11-17615, 11-17645, 11-17661, 11-17663, 11-17667, 11-17919, 12-15258] (AF) [Entered: 03/02/2012 02:45 PM]
February 22, 2012 Filing 89 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas reply to response (). Date of service: 02/22/2012. [8077577] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 02/22/2012 02:15 PM]
February 21, 2012 Filing 88 Added attorney Rebecca A. Falk for Deutsche Bank, in case 11-17615. [8075615] (EL) [Entered: 02/21/2012 02:33 PM]
February 21, 2012 Filing 87 Added attorney Elizabeth Allen Frohlich for Deutsche Bank, in case 11-17615. [8075602] (EL) [Entered: 02/21/2012 02:30 PM]
February 21, 2012 Filing 86 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rebecca A. Falk for Appellee Deutsche Bank. Date of service: 02/21/2012. [8075597] (Frohlich, Elizabeth) [Entered: 02/21/2012 02:28 PM]
February 21, 2012 Filing 85 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Elizabeth A. Frohlich for Appellee Deutsche Bank. Date of service: 02/21/2012. [8075591] (Frohlich, Elizabeth) [Entered: 02/21/2012 02:27 PM]
February 16, 2012 Filing 84 Filed (ECF) Appellees Aurora Loan Services, LLC and Old Republic National Title Insurance Co. response joining motion (). Date of service: 02/16/2012. [8071537] (Perdew, Phillip) [Entered: 02/16/2012 12:35 PM]
February 16, 2012 Filing 83 Filed (ECF) Appellees Aurora Loan Services, LLC and Old Republic National Title Insurance Co. corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 02/16/2012. [8071530] (Perdew, Phillip) [Entered: 02/16/2012 12:31 PM]
February 15, 2012 Filing 82 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas reply to response (). Date of service: 02/15/2012. [8070062] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 02/15/2012 02:08 PM]
February 15, 2012 Filing 81 COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 82 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas reply to response (). Date of service: 02/15/2012. [8069822] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 02/15/2012 12:09 PM]
February 14, 2012 Filing 80 Filed (ECF) Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. response joining motion (). Date of service: 02/14/2012. [8068975] (Dove, Kelly) [Entered: 02/14/2012 04:23 PM]
February 14, 2012 Filing 79 Added attorney Kelly Harrison Dove for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., in case 11-17615. [8068967] (EL) [Entered: 02/14/2012 04:18 PM]
February 14, 2012 Filing 78 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kelly H. Dove for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 02/14/2012. [8068944] (Dove, Kelly) [Entered: 02/14/2012 04:12 PM]
February 8, 2012 Filing 77 Filed (ECF) Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, N.A., Recon Trust Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 02/08/2012. [8062094] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 02/08/2012 04:52 PM]
February 8, 2012 Filing 76 Filed (ECF) Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, N.A., Recon Trust Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. response opposing motion (,motion to consolidate cases). Date of service: 02/08/2012. [8062075] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 02/08/2012 04:42 PM]
February 1, 2012 Filing 75 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke and Rosa A. Silvas Motion to consolidate cases 11-17615, 11-17645, 11-17661, 11-17663, 11-17667 and 11-17919. Date of service: 02/01/2012. [8053540] (Hearne, Treva) [Entered: 02/01/2012 04:19 PM]
December 9, 2011 Filing 74 Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): Based on a review of the Mediation Questionnaire, this case is not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel for any party interested in obtaining assistance from the court in pursuing settlement of the case on appeal or learning more about the Mediation Program is encouraged to contact Stephen Liacouras, Circuit Mediator, by e-mail at stephen_liacouras@ca9.uscourts.gov or fax at (415) 355-8566. The communication will be kept confidential, if requested, from the other parties in the case. Counsel are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. [7995850] (AF) [Entered: 12/09/2011 03:36 PM]
November 29, 2011 Filing 73 Entered appearance of Appellee Lime Financial Services Limited. [7982219] (HH) [Entered: 11/29/2011 02:19 PM]
November 21, 2011 Filing 72 Added attorney Laurel I. Handley for Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., in case 11-17615. [7974141] (EL) [Entered: 11/21/2011 02:32 PM]
November 21, 2011 Filing 71 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Laurel I. Handley for Appellee Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp.. Date of service: 11/21/2011. [7974107] (Handley, Laurel) [Entered: 11/21/2011 02:26 PM]
November 18, 2011 Filing 70 Terminated Colt B. Dodrill for Executive Trustee Services, LLC, Aztec Foreclosure Corp. and Aurora Loan Services, LLC in 11-17615 [7972080] (EL) [Entered: 11/18/2011 01:48 PM]
November 18, 2011 Filing 69 Filed (ECF) Appellees Aurora Loan Services, LLC and Saxon Mortgage, Inc. Motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 11/18/2011. [7972051] (Dodrill, Colt) [Entered: 11/18/2011 01:41 PM]
November 16, 2011 Filing 68 Entered appearance of Appellee CityMortgage, Inc. [7968740] (HH) [Entered: 11/16/2011 03:01 PM]
November 14, 2011 Filing 67 Filed CitiMortage, Inc request to be added to case. no proof of service [7968615] (JFF) [Entered: 11/16/2011 02:33 PM]
November 14, 2011 Filing 66 Added attorney Aaron Michael Waite for Cooper Castle Law Firm LLP. [7963418] (JFF) [Entered: 11/14/2011 09:43 AM]
November 11, 2011 Filing 65 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Aaron Michael Waite for Appellee Cooper Castle Law Firm LLP. Date of service: 10/31/2011. [7963017] (Waite, Aaron) [Entered: 11/11/2011 12:56 PM]
November 10, 2011 Filing 64 Filed order MOATT: (MT) The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court shall be held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending motion. See Leader Nat'l Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 5 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellants shall notify this court in writing of the ruling and shall advise whether appellants intend to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellants must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [7962823] (DEV) [Entered: 11/10/2011 04:35 PM]
November 10, 2011 Filing 63 Added attorney Gregory L. Wilde for T.D. Service Company. [7962125] (JFF) [Entered: 11/10/2011 01:38 PM]
November 10, 2011 Filing 62 Added attorney Jill L. Nicholson for Federal National Mortgage Association [7962122] (JFF) [Entered: 11/10/2011 01:36 PM]
November 10, 2011 Filing 61 Added attorney Gregory L. Wilde for National Default Servicing Corp [7962117] (JFF) [Entered: 11/10/2011 01:34 PM]
November 10, 2011 Filing 60 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gregory L. Wilde for Appellee T.D. Service Company. Date of service: 11/10/2011. [7961904]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected appellee name to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 11/10/2011 by ASW] (Wilde, Gregory) [Entered: 11/10/2011 12:04 PM]
November 8, 2011 Filing 59 Added attorney Howard N. Cayne for FHFA [7959442] (JFF) [Entered: 11/08/2011 04:51 PM]
November 8, 2011 Filing 58 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Howard N. Cayne for Appellee FHFA. Date of service: 11/08/2011. [7959073] (Fauvre, David) [Entered: 11/08/2011 03:18 PM]
November 8, 2011 Filing 57 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 455.00. Date paid: 11/08/2011. [7958366] (RT) [Entered: 11/08/2011 11:09 AM]
November 8, 2011 Filing 56 Filed (ECF) Appellee CR Title Services, Inc. Correspondence: Letter to add CitiMortgage, Inc. as appellee. Date of service: 11/08/2011 [7957813] (Panoff, Thomas) [Entered: 11/08/2011 08:08 AM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 55 Added attorney Jonathan William Garlough for Federal National Mortgage Association, in case 11-17615. [7957651] (JFF) [Entered: 11/07/2011 05:16 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 54 Added attorney Jill L. Nicholson for Federal National Mortgage Association. [7957647] (JFF) [Entered: 11/07/2011 05:13 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 53 Added attorney Jonathan William Garlough for Federal National Mortgage Association, in case 11-17615. [7957641] (JFF) [Entered: 11/07/2011 05:09 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 52 Filed (ECF) Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7957550] (Nicholson, Jill) [Entered: 11/07/2011 04:38 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 51 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jonathan W. Garlough for Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7957531] (Garlough, Jonathan) [Entered: 11/07/2011 04:33 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 50 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Attached wrong document (Notice of Appearance). Correct Entry: [ # 52 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7957494] (Nicholson, Jill) [Entered: 11/07/2011 04:26 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 49 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jill L. Nicholson for Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7957483] (Nicholson, Jill) [Entered: 11/07/2011 04:24 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 48 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jonathan E. Robinson and Sally J. Robinson-Burke Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7957422] (Edwards, Valerie) [Entered: 11/07/2011 04:03 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 47 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Correct Entry: [ # 48 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellants Jonathan E. Robinson and Sally J. Robinson-Burke Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7957395] (Edwards, Valerie) [Entered: 11/07/2011 03:53 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 46 Mail returned on 11/07/2011 addressed to Gary E. Schnitzer for U.S. Bank, N.A., Litton Loan Servicing, LP and America's Servicing Company, re: 10/31/11 Time Schedule Order. Resending to: Kravitz Schnitzer Sloane Johnson & Eberhardy, Chtd. Suite 200 8985 So. Eastern Avenue Las Vegas, NV 89123. [7957046] (RL) [Entered: 11/07/2011 02:47 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 45 Added attorney Danielle Jean Szukala for J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. [7956978] (JFF) [Entered: 11/07/2011 02:31 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 44 Added attorney Joseph Yenouskas, Thomas Hefferon for U.S. Bank, N.A. BAC Home Loans Servicing LP Recon Trust Company First Horizon Home Loan Corp. Bank of America, N.A. America's Wholesale Lender America's Servicing Company Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., in case 11-17615. [7956955] (JFF) [Entered: 11/07/2011 02:27 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 43 Filed (ECF) Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7956897] (Gould, Danielle) [Entered: 11/07/2011 02:15 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 42 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Danielle J. Szukala for Appellee J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7956890] (Gould, Danielle) [Entered: 11/07/2011 02:13 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 41 Filed (ECF) Appellees American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc. and G.E. Money Bank Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7956694] (Louis, Andrew) [Entered: 11/07/2011 01:17 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 40 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joseph F. Yenouskas for Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, N.A., First Horizon Home Loan Corp., Recon Trust Company, U.S. Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7956616] (Yenouskas, Joseph) [Entered: 11/07/2011 12:32 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 39 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Thomas M. Hefferon for Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, N.A., First Horizon Home Loan Corp., Recon Trust Company, U.S. Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7956608] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 11/07/2011 12:29 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 38 Filed (ECF) Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, N.A., First Horizon Home Loan Corp., Recon Trust Company, U.S. Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7956558] (Hefferon, Thomas) [Entered: 11/07/2011 12:14 PM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 37 Added attorney Mark S. Landman for FHLMC. [7956291] (JFF) [Entered: 11/07/2011 10:44 AM]
November 7, 2011 Filing 36 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mark S. Landman for Appellee FHLMC. Date of service: 11/07/2011. [7956189] (Landman, Mark) [Entered: 11/07/2011 10:12 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 35 Added attorney Robert M. Brochin for MERSCORP, Inc. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., in case 11-17615. [7955355] (EL) [Entered: 11/04/2011 02:53 PM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 34 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert M. Brochin for Appellees MERSCORP, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Date of service: 11/04/2011. [7955304] (Brochin, Robert) [Entered: 11/04/2011 02:41 PM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 33 Attorney Felicia Yu in 11-17615 substituted by Attorney Henry Faulkner Reichner in 11-17615 [7954870] (EL) [Entered: 11/04/2011 11:50 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 32 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Henry F. Reichner for Appellee GMAC Mortgage, LLC. Date of service: 11/04/2011. [7954842] (Yu, Felicia) [Entered: 11/04/2011 11:40 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 31 Added attorney Marilyn Fine, Rachel E. Donn, Peter E. Dunkley for HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., in case 11-17615. [7954779] (EL) [Entered: 11/04/2011 11:20 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 30 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rachel E. Donn for Appellee HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A.. Date of service: 11/04/2011. [7954748] (Meier, Glenn) [Entered: 11/04/2011 11:12 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 29 Added attorney Andrew R. Louis, Matthew P. Previn for American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc. G.E. Money Bank, in case 11-17615. [7954518] (EL) [Entered: 11/04/2011 10:05 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 28 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew R. Louis for Appellees American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc. and G.E. Money Bank. Date of service: 11/04/2011. [7954497] (Louis, Andrew) [Entered: 11/04/2011 10:00 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 27 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew P. Previn for Appellees American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc. and G.E. Money Bank. Date of service: 11/04/2011. [7954485] (Previn, Matthew) [Entered: 11/04/2011 09:58 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 26 Added attorney Phillip Russell Perdew for Saxon Mortgage, Inc. Old Republic National Title Insurance Co. Aurora Loan Services, LLC, in case 11-17615. [7954426] (EL) [Entered: 11/04/2011 09:35 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 25 Added attorney Hugh Balsam, Thomas Justin Cunningham, J. Matthew Goodin for Saxon Mortgage, Inc. Old Republic National Title Insurance Co. Aurora Loan Services, LLC, in case 11-17615. [7954424] (EL) [Entered: 11/04/2011 09:33 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 24 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of P. Russell Perdew for Appellees Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Old Republic National Title Insurance Co. and Saxon Mortgage, Inc.. Date of service: 11/04/2011. [7954422] (Balsam, Hugh) [Entered: 11/04/2011 09:32 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 23 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of J. Matthew Goodin for Appellees Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Old Republic National Title Insurance Co. and Saxon Mortgage, Inc.. Date of service: 11/04/2011. [7954417] (Balsam, Hugh) [Entered: 11/04/2011 09:29 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 22 Added attorney Kristin Schuler-Hintz for Quality Loan Service Corporation, in case 11-17615. [7954416] (EL) [Entered: 11/04/2011 09:28 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Thomas J. Cunningham for Appellees Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Old Republic National Title Insurance Co. and Saxon Mortgage, Inc.. Date of service: 11/04/2011. [7954413] (Balsam, Hugh) [Entered: 11/04/2011 09:27 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Hugh S. Balsam for Appellees Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Old Republic National Title Insurance Co. and Saxon Mortgage, Inc.. Date of service: 11/04/2011. [7954408] (Balsam, Hugh) [Entered: 11/04/2011 09:25 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kristin Schuler-Hintz for Appellee Quality Loan Service Corporation. Date of service: 11/04/2011. [7954343] (Schuler-Hintz, Kristin) [Entered: 11/04/2011 08:58 AM]
November 4, 2011 Filing 18 Added attorney Jonathan D. Fink for National Default Servicing Corp. Aztec Foreclosure Corp., in case 11-17615. [7954222] (CW) [Entered: 11/04/2011 07:27 AM]
November 3, 2011 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jonathan D. Fink for Appellees Aztec Foreclosure Corp. and National Default Servicing Corp.. Date of service: 11/03/2011. [7954153] (Fink, Jonathan) [Entered: 11/03/2011 05:25 PM]
November 3, 2011 Filing 16 Added attorney Lucia Nale, Thomas V. Panoff for CR Title Services, Inc., in case 11-17615. [7952585] (EL) [Entered: 11/03/2011 09:22 AM]
November 3, 2011 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lucia Nale for Appellee CR Title Services, Inc.. Date of service: 11/03/2011. [7952565] (Panoff, Thomas) [Entered: 11/03/2011 09:14 AM]
November 3, 2011 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Thomas V. Panoff for Appellee CR Title Services, Inc.. Date of service: 11/03/2011. [7952552] (Panoff, Thomas) [Entered: 11/03/2011 09:10 AM]
November 3, 2011 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David H. Pittinsky for Appellee National City Mortgage. Date of service: 11/03/2011. [7952407] (Pittinsky, David) [Entered: 11/03/2011 07:03 AM]
November 2, 2011 Filing 12 Added attorney David H. Pittinsky for National City Mortgage PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., in case 11-17615. [7951487] (EL) [Entered: 11/02/2011 01:01 PM]
November 2, 2011 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David H. Pittinsky for Appellees National City Mortgage and PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.. Date of service: 11/02/2011. [7951475] (Pittinsky, David) [Entered: 11/02/2011 12:56 PM]
November 2, 2011 Filing 10 Added attorney Brian M. Forbes for U.S. Bank, N.A. HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A. Litton Loan Servicing, LP, in case 11-17615. [7951285] (EL) [Entered: 11/02/2011 11:23 AM]
November 2, 2011 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian M. Forbes for Appellees HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., Litton Loan Servicing, LP and U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 11/02/2011. [7951159] (Forbes, Brian) [Entered: 11/02/2011 10:48 AM]
November 2, 2011 Filing 8 Added attorney Robert Bruce Allensworth for U.S. Bank, N.A. HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A. Litton Loan Servicing, LP, in case 11-17615. [7951127] (EL) [Entered: 11/02/2011 10:32 AM]
November 2, 2011 Filing 7 Added attorney Gregory N. Blase for U.S. Bank, N.A. HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A. Litton Loan Servicing, LP, in case 11-17615. [7951122] (EL) [Entered: 11/02/2011 10:29 AM]
November 2, 2011 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gregory N. Blase for Appellees HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., Litton Loan Servicing, LP and U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 11/02/2011. [7951115] (Blase, Gregory) [Entered: 11/02/2011 10:26 AM]
November 2, 2011 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of R. Bruce Allensworth for Appellees HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., Litton Loan Servicing, LP and U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 11/02/2011. [7951077] (Allensworth, Robert) [Entered: 11/02/2011 10:17 AM]
November 1, 2011 Filing 4 Terminated Richard J. Sahatjian for GMAC Mortgage, LLC in 11-17615 [7950224] (PH) [Entered: 11/01/2011 02:42 PM]
October 31, 2011 Filing 3 Added attorney Dennis Peter Maio for Mortgage IT, Inc. Deutsche Bank, in case 11-17615. [7948528] (EL) [Entered: 10/31/2011 02:22 PM]
October 31, 2011 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Dennis Peter Maio for Appellees Deutsche Bank and Mortgage IT, Inc.. Date of service: 10/31/2011. [7948493] (Maio, Dennis) [Entered: 10/31/2011 02:13 PM]
October 31, 2011 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke, Rosa A. Silvas on 10/26/2011. Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/07/2011. Transcript ordered by 11/25/2011. Transcript due 12/27/2011. Appellants Jose Trinidad Casas, Maria C. Casas, Michellina Evenson, Tyrone Evenson, Lyndon B. Graves, Bryan Gray, Josepha S. Lopez, Jonathan E. Robinson, Sally J. Robinson-Burke, Rosa A. Silvas opening brief due 02/03/2012. Appellees America's Servicing Company, America's Wholesale Lender, American Home Mortage Servicing, Inc., Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Aztec Foreclosure Corp., BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon, CR Title Services, Inc., Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., California Reconveyance Co., Central Mortgage Co., Cooper Castle Law Firm LLP, Deutsche Bank, Executive Trustee Services, LLC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association, Fidelity National Title Insurance Co., First American Loan Star Trustee Services, LLC, First Horizon Home Loan Corp., G.E. Money Bank, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A., HSBC Mortgage Corporation, USA, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., Housekey Financial Corp., IB Property Holdings, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Litton Loan Servicing, LP, MERSCORP, Inc., MTC Financial, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage IT, Inc., NDex West LLC, National City Mortgage, National Default Servicing Corp., Old Republic National Title Insurance Co., PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., Quality Loan Service Corporation, Recon Trust Company, Saxon Mortgage, Inc., TS Service Co., U.S. Bank, N.A., UTLS Default Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Western Progressive Trustee, LLC answering brief due 03/05/2012. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7948222] (GR) [Entered: 10/31/2011 12:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Jonathan Robinson, et al v. American Home Mortgage Serv., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Brian J. Schulman Esquire
Represented By: David H. Pittinsky Esquire
Represented By: Abran Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NDEX WEST LLC
Represented By: Adam Kyle Bult Esquire
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OLD REPUBLIC NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Thomas Justin Cunningham
Represented By: Hugh Balsam
Represented By: J. Matthew Goodin
Represented By: Phillip Russell Perdew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GMAC MORTGAGE, LLC
Represented By: Henry Faulkner Reichner Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Martin Jacobs Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas Hefferon
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Joseph Yenouskas
Represented By: Christopher Jorgensen
Represented By: Stefan M. Palys Esquire
Represented By: Ann-Martha Andrews Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GE MONEY BANK
Represented By: Andrew R. Louis
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp Esquire
Represented By: Benjamin B. Klubes
Represented By: Roopali H. Desai
Represented By: Matthew P. Previn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP
Represented By: Thomas Hefferon
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Joseph Yenouskas
Represented By: Christopher Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MTC FINANCIAL, INC., DBA Trustee Corps
Represented By: William F. Hyder
Represented By: Richard J. Reynolds Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRP FINANCIAL SERVICES CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRP LOAN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORP.
Represented By: Thomas Hefferon
Represented By: Joseph Yenouskas
Represented By: David Ray Hall
Represented By: Jennifer Reiter
Represented By: Danielle Jean Gould Esquire
Represented By: LeAnn Pedersen Pope Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CR TITLE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Lauren Elliott Stine
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Thomas V. Panoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AZTEC FORECLOSURE CORP.
Represented By: Thomas Justin Cunningham
Represented By: Paul M. Levine Esquire
Represented By: Robert W. Norman Jr.
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: J. Matthew Goodin
Represented By: Jonathan D. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICA'S WHOLESALE LENDER
Represented By: Thomas Hefferon
Represented By: Joseph Yenouskas
Represented By: Gregory B. Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC MORTGAGE CORPORATION, USA
Represented By: Gregory J. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EXECUTIVE TRUSTEE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Ira S. Lefton Esquire
Represented By: Laurel I. Handley
Represented By: Henry Faulkner Reichner Esquire
Represented By: Gregory B. Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC BANK, U.S.A., N.A.
Represented By: Brian M. Forbes Esquire
Represented By: Robert Bruce Allensworth
Represented By: Peter E. Dunkley
Represented By: Gregory J. Marshall
Represented By: Gregory Blase
Represented By: Marilyn Fine
Represented By: Rachel E. Donn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY
Represented By: Howard N. Cayne
Represented By: Steven Edward Guinn Esquire
Represented By: David B. Bergman
Represented By: David Fauvre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: Jill L. Nicholson Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Landman Esquire
Represented By: Gregory Wendell Falls
Represented By: William J. McKenna Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Howard Lindenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Gregory J. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LITTON LOAN SERVICING, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: James R. Condo Esquire
Represented By: Robert M. Brochin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICA'S SERVICING COMPANY
Represented By: Thomas Hefferon
Represented By: Joseph Yenouskas
Represented By: Gary Edward Schnitzer Esquire
Represented By: Gregory J. Marshall
Represented By: Andrew Martin Jacobs Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST HORIZON HOME LOAN CORP.
Represented By: Thomas Hefferon
Represented By: Joseph Yenouskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA
Represented By: Thomas Hefferon
Represented By: Joseph Yenouskas
Represented By: Gregory J. Marshall
Represented By: Andrew Martin Jacobs Esquire
Represented By: Barbara Dawson Esquire
Represented By: Kelly Harrison Dove Esquire
Represented By: Patrick G. Byrne Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Kent F. Larsen
Represented By: Joseph T. Prete Esquire
Represented By: David Ray Hall
Represented By: Jennifer Reiter
Represented By: Danielle Jean Gould Esquire
Represented By: LeAnn Pedersen Pope Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK
Represented By: Elizabeth Allen Frohlich
Represented By: Karen Ann Braje
Represented By: Lorenzo E. Gasparetti Esquire
Represented By: Dennis Peter Maio Esquire
Represented By: Michael Q. Eagan Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Kristine Huajen Chen Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE SERVICING, INC.
Represented By: Michael R. Pennington
Represented By: Henry Faulkner Reichner Esquire
Represented By: Andrew R. Louis
Represented By: Andrew Martin Jacobs Esquire
Represented By: Matthew P. Previn
Represented By: Cynthia Alexander
Represented By: Patrick G. Byrne Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORTGAGE IT, INC.
Represented By: Brian J. Schulman Esquire
Represented By: Laura Sixkiller Esquire
Represented By: Dennis Peter Maio Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIME FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED
Represented By: Aaron M. Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IB PROPERTY HOLDINGS
Represented By: Gregory L. Wilde Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION
Represented By: Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, NA
Represented By: Thomas Hefferon
Represented By: Joseph Yenouskas
Represented By: Gregory B. Iannelli
Represented By: Stefan M. Palys Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AURORA LOAN SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz
Represented By: Thomas Justin Cunningham
Represented By: Paul M. Levine Esquire
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Robert W. Norman Jr.
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Hugh Balsam
Represented By: J. Matthew Goodin
Represented By: Phillip Russell Perdew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Douglas Erickson
Represented By: Jennifer Reiter
Represented By: Danielle Jean Gould Esquire
Represented By: LeAnn Pedersen Pope Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COOPER CASTLE LAW FIRM LLP
Represented By: Kevin Hahn
Represented By: Aaron M. Waite
Represented By: Leonard J. McDonald Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UTLS DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Laurel I. Handley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL CITY MORTGAGE
Represented By: Brian J. Schulman Esquire
Represented By: David H. Pittinsky Esquire
Represented By: Abran Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MERSCORP, INC.
Represented By: James R. Condo Esquire
Represented By: Robert M. Brochin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: James R. Condo Esquire
Represented By: Jill L. Nicholson Esquire
Represented By: Jonathan William Garlough
Represented By: Joanne Lee
Represented By: William J. McKenna Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WESTERN PROGRESSIVE TRUSTEE, LLC
Represented By: Randall W. Edwards Esquire
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITYMORTGAGE, INC.
Represented By: Thomas V. Panoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOUSEKEY FINANCIAL CORP.
Represented By: Gregory J. Marshall
Represented By: Andrew Martin Jacobs Esquire
Represented By: Patrick G. Byrne Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTRAL MORTGAGE CO.
Represented By: Kevin Hahn
Represented By: William Morris Fischbach III
Represented By: David Winthrop Cowles
Represented By: Leonard J. McDonald Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAXON MORTGAGE, INC.
Represented By: Thomas Justin Cunningham
Represented By: Hugh Balsam
Represented By: J. Matthew Goodin
Represented By: Phillip Russell Perdew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Neil Ackerman
Represented By: Christina Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION
Represented By: Gregory J. Marshall
Represented By: Andrew Martin Jacobs Esquire
Represented By: Jonathan D. Fink
Represented By: Gregory L. Wilde Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T.D. SERVICE COMPANY
Represented By: Gregory L. Wilde Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRYAN GRAY, [for complete list of plaintiff/appellants, see Notice of Appeal]
Represented By: Valerie R. Edwards
Represented By: Treva J. Hearne
Represented By: William A. Nebeker Esquire
Represented By: Robert Hager
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIA C. CASAS
Represented By: Valerie R. Edwards
Represented By: Treva J. Hearne
Represented By: William A. Nebeker Esquire
Represented By: Robert Hager
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TYRONE EVENSON
Represented By: Valerie R. Edwards
Represented By: Treva J. Hearne
Represented By: William A. Nebeker Esquire
Represented By: Robert Hager
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE TRINIDAD CASAS
Represented By: Valerie R. Edwards
Represented By: Treva J. Hearne
Represented By: William A. Nebeker Esquire
Represented By: Robert Hager
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONATHAN E. ROBINSON
Represented By: Valerie R. Edwards
Represented By: Treva J. Hearne
Represented By: William A. Nebeker Esquire
Represented By: Robert Hager
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PABLO LEON
Represented By: Valerie R. Edwards
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SALLY J. ROBINSON-BURKE
Represented By: Valerie R. Edwards
Represented By: Treva J. Hearne
Represented By: William A. Nebeker Esquire
Represented By: Robert Hager
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHELLINA EVENSON
Represented By: Valerie R. Edwards
Represented By: Treva J. Hearne
Represented By: William A. Nebeker Esquire
Represented By: Robert Hager
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPHA S. LOPEZ
Represented By: Valerie R. Edwards
Represented By: Treva J. Hearne
Represented By: William A. Nebeker Esquire
Represented By: Robert Hager
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LYNDON B. GRAVES
Represented By: Valerie R. Edwards
Represented By: Treva J. Hearne
Represented By: William A. Nebeker Esquire
Represented By: Robert Hager
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROSA A. SILVAS
Represented By: Valerie R. Edwards
Represented By: Treva J. Hearne
Represented By: William A. Nebeker Esquire
Represented By: Robert Hager
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?