Laura Larson v. Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff-counter-claim-defendant - Appellant,: LAURA SIEGEL LARSON, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Joanne Siegel
Defendant-counter-claimant - Appellee,: WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT, INC., a corporation and DC COMICS
Case Number: 11-55863
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 10, 2013 LAURA LARSON V. WARNER BROS ENTERTAINMENT, INC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2013 Filing 71 MANDATE ISSUED.(SR, SRT and JWS) [8498958] [11-55863, 11-56034] (CW)
January 10, 2013 Filing 70 FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and JOHN W. SEDWICK) REVERSED IN PART; REMANDED; We reach our conclusions without the need to consider the documents that are the subject of DC’s motions for judicial notice and to supplement the record. DC’s motions, and Larson’s motion to strike the related portions of DC’s brief, are therefore denied as moot. Larson’s motion for sanctions is also denied. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. [8468916] [11-55863, 11-56034] (RP)
November 5, 2012 Filing 69 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO STEPHEN R. REINHARDT, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and JOHN W. SEDWICK. [8388045] [11-55863, 11-56034] (FB)
October 26, 2012 Filing 68 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Defendants move to lodge an original Detective Comics #15 comic book in the record. Neither party contests the authenticity of this comic book, the salient portion of which was reproduced in the district judge’s decision. Seigel v. Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., 542 F. Supp. 2d. 1098, 1109 (C.D. Cal. 2008). In any case, the comic book is the proper subject of judicial notice. Fed. R. Evid. 201(b); see Von Saher v. Norton Simon Museum of Art at Pasadena, 592 F.3d 954, 960 (9th Cir. 2010). The motion is therefore granted. Defendants may send the comic book to: Eve Fisher, Senior Deputy Clerk United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit The Richard H. Chambers Courthouse 125 South Grand Ave. Pasadena, CA 91105-1643 Defendants are encouraged to insure the comic book before mailing. [8378508] [11-55863, 11-56034] (SM)
September 12, 2012 Filing 67 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Marc Toberoff for Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863, Attorney Marc Toberoff for Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034. [8321270] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
September 12, 2012 Filing 66 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Daniel Petrocelli for Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034. [8321208] [11-55863, 11-56034] (DP)
September 10, 2012 Filing 65 Notice of Oral Argument on NOVEMBER Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8316676] [11-55863, 11-56034] (LN)
July 23, 2012 Filing 64 Terminated Patrick Perkins for Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. and DC Comics. [8259343] [11-55863, 11-56034] (EL)
July 23, 2012 Filing 63 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 Unopposed Motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 07/23/2012. [8259304] [11-55863, 11-56034] (PP)
July 11, 2012 Filing 62 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 reply to response (motion to supplement record on appeal). Date of service: 07/11/2012. [8246958] [11-55863, 11-56034] (AP)
July 9, 2012 Filing 61 Received 7 paper copies of Third Brief on Cross-Appeal brief [43] filed by Laura Siegel Larson. [8242567] [11-55863, 11-56034] (SD)
July 5, 2012 Filing 60 Filed clerk order: The third brief on cross-appeal [43] submitted by Laura Siegel Larson is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: yellow. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8239204] [11-55863, 11-56034] (LA)
July 5, 2012 Filing 59 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner)The appellant’s opposed motion to strike portions of the supplemental excerpts of record and the second cross-appeal brief is referred to the merits panel for resolution. The appellant’s motion to file an oversized third cross-appeal brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the third cross-appeal brief submitted on May 24, 2012. The appellees’ motion to supplement the record, and any response, is referred to the merits panel for resolution. The fourth cross-appeal brief submitted on June 19, 2012 has been filed. (Pro Mo) [8238125] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MS)
July 2, 2012 Filing 58 Filed (ECF) Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863 response to motion (,motion to supplement record on appeal). Date of service: 07/02/2012. [8235584] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
July 2, 2012 Filing 57 Filed (ECF) Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/02/2012 [8234666] [11-55863, 11-56034]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect content of filing. Resent NDA. 07/02/2012 by RY] (DP)
July 2, 2012 Filing 56 Filed (ECF) Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 reply to response (). Date of service: 07/02/2012. [8234651] [11-55863, 11-56034] (DP)
June 25, 2012 Filing 54 Received 7 paper copies of Cross-Appeal Reply Brief brief [49] filed by DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. [8226245] [11-55863, 11-56034] (SD)
June 25, 2012 Filing 53 Filed (ECF) Appellant Laura Siegel Larson citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/25/2012. [8226243]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to 11-56034, resent notice. 06/25/2012 by ASW] (MT)
June 22, 2012 Filing 55 Filed Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [8228454] [11-55863, 11-56034] (GV)
June 21, 2012 Filing 52 Filed (ECF) Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. and Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034 response to motion (). Date of service: 06/20/2012. [8222702] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
June 20, 2012 Filing 51 Filed clerk order: The cross-appeal reply brief [49] submitted by DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8220895] [11-55863, 11-56034] (GV)
June 19, 2012 Filing 50 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 Motion to supplement record on appeal. Date of service: 06/19/2012. [8219745] [11-55863, 11-56034] (DP)
June 19, 2012 Filing 49 Submitted (ECF) Cross-Appeal Reply Brief brief for review. Submitted by Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034. Date of service: 06/19/2012. [8219717] [11-55863, 11-56034]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct brief type. Resent NDA. 06/19/2012 by RY] (MTK)
June 6, 2012 Filing 48 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 response opposing motion (,motion to strike portion or whole of document). Date of service: 06/06/2012. [8203445] [11-55863, 11-56034] (DP)
May 29, 2012 Filing 47 Filed Appellant/Cross-Appellee Laura Siegel Larson's supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [8193866] [11-55863, 11-56034] (LA)
May 25, 2012 Filing 46 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 Correspondence: Letter regarding oral request for extension of deadline to file reply brief. Date of service: 05/25/2012 [8192871] [11-55863, 11-56034] (CS)
May 25, 2012 Filing 45 14 day oral extenstion by phone to file cross-appeal brief. Optional cross appeal reply brief due 06/25/2012 for DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. The optional reply cross-appeal brief is due 14 days after service of the third cross-appeal brief [8192628] [11-55863, 11-56034] (LN)
May 25, 2012 Filing 44 Filed (ECF) Errata to Third Brief on Cross-Appeal Brief ([43] Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing) ,[43] Motion (ECF Filing) ,[43] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to file oversized brief). Filed by Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034, Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863. Date of service: 05/25/2012. [8192326] [11-56034, 11-55863] (MT)
May 24, 2012 Filing 43 Submitted (ECF) Third Brief on Cross-Appeal brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863, Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034. Date of service: 05/24/2012. [8191347] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
May 24, 2012 Filing 42 Filed (ECF) Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863, Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034 Motion to strike portion of Appellees' Supplemental Excerpts of Record and portions of Principal and Response Brief. Date of service: 05/24/2012. [8191338] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
May 3, 2012 Filing 41 Received 7 paper copies of Second Brief on Cross-Appeal brief [31] filed by DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. [8164268] [11-55863, 11-56034 (SD)
May 2, 2012 Filing 40 Filed (ECF) Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863, Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034 Correspondence: Letter confirming notice given to opposing counsel re: extension of time for third brief on cross-appeal from May 10, 2012 to May 24, 2012 pursuant to Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a). Date of service: 05/02/2012 [8162651] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
May 2, 2012 Filing 39 14 day oral extenstion by phone to file Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863 cross-appeal brief. Third brief on cross appeal due 05/24/2012 for Laura Siegel Larson. The optional reply cross-appeal brief is due 14 days after service of the third cross-appeal brief [8161033] [11-55863, 11-56034] (LN)
April 30, 2012 Filing 38 Filed clerk order: The second brief on cross-appeal [31] submitted by DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8159022] [11-55863, 11-56034] (LA)
April 30, 2012 Filing 37 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: RJ): The panel has considered appellees’ opposed motion to assign these crossappeals to the panel assigned to petition No. 11-71844 and declines to grant the motion. Accordingly, the motion is denied. Appellees’ opposed motion for leave to lodge an original Detective Comics No. 15 in the appellate record is referred to the panel that will hear the merits of this appeal for whatever consideration the panel deems appropriate. Appellees’ unopposed motion to file a combined brief on cross-appeal not exceeding 20,000 words is granted. The Clerk shall file the second brief on crossappeal received March 23, 2012. The briefing schedule established March 1, 2012, shall remain in effect. [8157703] [11-55863, 11-56034] (SM)
April 12, 2012 Filing 36 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 reply to response (). Date of service: 04/12/2012. [8137952] [11-55863, 11-56034] (DP)
April 12, 2012 Filing 35 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 reply to response (). Date of service: 04/12/2012. [8137922] [11-55863, 11-56034] (DP)
April 5, 2012 Filing 34 Filed (ECF) Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863, Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034 response opposing motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 04/05/2012. [8129968] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
April 5, 2012 Filing 33 Filed (ECF) Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863, Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034 response opposing motion (,motion to assign case to prior panel). Date of service: 04/05/2012. [8129967] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
March 26, 2012 Filing 32 Filed Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc's supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 4 volumes. [8116751] [11-55863, 11-56034] (GV)
March 23, 2012 Filing 31 Submitted (ECF) Second Brief on Cross-Appeal brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034. Date of service: 03/23/2012. [8115931] [11-55863, 11-56034] (DP)
March 23, 2012 Filing 30 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion By Cross-Appellants and Appellees Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. And DC Comics For Leave To Lodge An Original Detective Comics #15 In The Appellate Record]. Date of service: 03/23/2012. [8115893] [11-55863, 11-56034] (DP)
March 23, 2012 Filing 29 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 Motion to assign case to prior panel. Date of service: 03/23/2012. [8115846] [11-55863, 11-56034] (DP)
March 22, 2012 Filing 28 Added attorney Jonathan Hacker for DC Comics Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. [8114572] [11-55863, 11-56034] (RL)
March 22, 2012 Filing 27 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jonathan D. Hacker for Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034. Date of service: 03/22/2012. [8114561] [11-55863, 11-56034] (JH)
March 19, 2012 Filing 26 Added attorney Pablo David Arredondo for Laura Siegel Larson, in case 11-55863 Pablo David Arredondo for Laura Siegel Larson, in case 11-56034. [8107560] [11-55863, 11-56034] (CW)
March 16, 2012 Filing 25 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Pablo David Arredondo for Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863, Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034. Date of service: 03/16/2012. [8107497] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
March 8, 2012 Filing 24 Added attorney Ashley Pearson for DC Comics Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. [8096021] [11-55863, 11-56034] (RL)
March 8, 2012 Filing 23 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ashley K. Pearson for Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034. Date of service: 03/08/2012. [8096010] [11-55863, 11-56034] (AP)
March 5, 2012 Filing 22 Filed order MEDIATION (AJ): The court has determined that these appeals will not be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [8090118] [11-55863, 11-56034] (SM)
March 1, 2012 Filing 21 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) Appellees Warner Bros., et al.’s opposed motion for an extension of time to file the second cross-appeal brief is granted. The second cross-appeal brief for appellees Warner Bros., et al. is due March 23, 2012. Appellant Larson’s motion for an extension of time to file the third crossappeal brief is granted. The third cross-appeal brief for appellant Larson is due May 10, 2012. The fourth cross-appeal brief is due within 14 days after service of the second cross-appeal brief. (Pro Mo) [8087340] [11-55863, 11-56034] (SM)
February 24, 2012 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863, Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034 response opposing motion (,motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 02/24/2012. [8081180] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
February 17, 2012 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 03/23/2012. Date of service: 02/17/2012. [8074246] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MTK)
January 25, 2012 Filing 18 Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): These cases are under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel for all parties to this appeal are requested to inform Circuit Mediator Ann Julius of their clients’ views on whether: (1) the case is appropriate for settlement discussions or mediation; (2) the court can accommodate ongoing settlement discussions or otherwise facilitate settlement of the dispute; and/or (3) the court should schedule a telephonic conference to discuss settlement. This communication may be sent in letter form by e-mail (ann_julius@ca9.uscourts.gov) or fax (415/355-8566). It will be kept confidential from the other parties, if requested. This communication shall not be served on the opposing party and shall not be filed with the court. For more detailed information Mediation Program and its procedures generally, please see Mediation Program web site: www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect pending the determination whether the case will be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [8044565] [11-55863, 11-56034] (SM)
January 10, 2012 Filing 17 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GSS): Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros.’s motion for an extension of time to file the second cross-appeal brief is granted. The second cross-appeal brief for appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. is due March 6, 2012. The third crossappeal brief for appellant Laura Siegel Larson is due April 6, 2012. The fourth cross-appeal brief for appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. is due within 14 days after service of the third cross-appeal brief. [8025162] [11-55863, 11-56034] (SM)
January 5, 2012 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-55863, Appellants DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. in 11-56034 Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 03/06/2012. Date of service: 01/05/2012. [8021641] [11-55863, 11-56034] (DP)
December 27, 2011 Filing 15 Filed Plaintiff Laura Siegel Larson's excerpts of record in 5 volumes. Served on 12/02/2011. [8013172] [11-55863, 11-56034] (GV)
December 27, 2011 Filing 14 Received 7 paper copies of First Brief on Cross-Appeal brief [12] filed by Laura Siegel Larson [8012891] [11-55863, 11-56034] (DB)
December 23, 2011 Filing 13 Filed clerk order: The first brief on cross-appeal [12] submitted by Plaintiff Laura Siegel Larson is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. [8011249] [11-55863, 11-56034] (GV)
December 22, 2011 Filing 12 Submitted (ECF) First Brief on Cross-Appeal brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863, Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034. Date of service: 12/22/2011. [8011065] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
October 28, 2011 Filing 11 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Appellant Laura Siegel Larson’s motion for an extension of time to file the first cross-appeal brief is granted. The first cross-appeal brief is now due December 22, 2011. The second cross-appeal brief is due January 23, 2012. The third cross-appeal brief is due February 23, 2012. The fourth cross-appeal brief is due within 14 days after service of the third cross-appeal brief. [7946175] [11-55863, 11-56034] (SM)
October 26, 2011 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellant Laura Siegel Larson in 11-55863, Appellee Laura Siegel Larson in 11-56034 Unopposed Motion to extend time to file First Brief on Cross-Appeal brief until 12/22/2011. Date of service: 10/26/2011. [7944070] [11-55863, 11-56034] (MT)
September 22, 2011 Filing 9 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner) Appellees’ motion to dismiss appeal No. 11-55863 for lack of jurisdiction is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the second brief on crossappeal. See Nat’l Indus. v. Republic Nat’l Life Ins. Co., 677 F.2d 1258, 1262 (9th Cir. 1982) (stating that merits panel may consider appellate jurisdiction despite earlier denial of motion to dismiss). The briefing schedule established previously shall remain in effect. (MOATT) [7903804] [11-55863, 11-56034] (SM)
July 21, 2011 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. reply to response (, ,motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction). Date of service: 07/21/2011. [7828448] --[COURT UPDATE: Filing spread to case number 11-56034. Resent NDA. 07/21/2011 by DB] (DP)
July 11, 2011 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellant Laura Siegel Larson response opposing motion (,motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction). Date of service: 07/11/2011. [7815707]--[COURT UPDATE : Spread filing to 11-56034. Resent NDA. 07/12/2011 by TW] (MT)
June 28, 2011 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 06/28/2011. [7801134]--[COURT UPDATE : Spread docket text to 11-56034.. Resent NDA. 06/28/2011 by TW] (DP)
June 28, 2011 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellees DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 06/28/2011. [7801117]--[COURT UPDATE : Spread filing to 11-56034. Resent NDA. 06/28/2011 by TW] (DP)
June 20, 2011 Filing 4 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL ON CROSS APPEAL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/27/2011. First cross appeal brief due 11/07/2011 for Laura Siegel Larson. Second brief on cross appeal due 12/07/2011 for DC Comics and Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. Third brief on cross appeal due 01/06/2012 for Laura Siegel Larson. Optional reply brief on cross appeal due 14 days after service of third brief. [7790696] [11-56034, 11-55863] (FB)
June 3, 2011 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Laura Siegel Larson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/03/2011. [7774231] (MT)
May 27, 2011 Filing 2 Received Appellant's Representation Statement. Served on 05/27/2011. [7767538] (JN)
May 27, 2011 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/03/2011. Transcript ordered by 06/27/2011. Transcript due 09/26/2011. Appellant Laura Siegel Larson opening brief due 11/07/2011. Appellee DC Comics and Appellee Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. answering brief due 12/07/2011. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [7767531] (JN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Laura Larson v. Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff-counter-claim-defendant - appellant,: LAURA SIEGEL LARSON, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Joanne Siegel
Represented By: Marc Toberoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant-counter-claimant - appellee,: WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT, INC., a corporation
Represented By: Matthew T. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant-counter-claimant - appellee,: DC COMICS
Represented By: Matthew T. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?