Christopher Baker v. Louis Kealoha, et al

Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTOPHER BAKER
Defendant / Appellee: LOUIS KEALOHA, as an individual and in his official capacity as Honolulu Chief of Police, STATE OF HAWAII, CITY AND COUNTY OF HONOLULU, HONOLULU POLICE DEPARTMENT and NEIL ABERCROMBIE, in his official capacity as Hawaii Governor
Amicus Curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, COUNTY OF MAUI, COUNTY OF HAWAII, COUNTY OF KAUAI and NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 12-16258
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2017 116 MANDATE ISSUED.(DFO, SRT and CMC) [10380352] (JFF) [Entered: 04/03/2017 09:28 AM]
March 10, 2017 115 Featured Case Order filed (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN) The petition for rehearing is granted, our March 20, 2014 memorandum disposition is vacated, the district courts denial of plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction is vacated, and this matter is remanded to the District Court without prejudice to the District Court granting or denying a preliminary injunction or otherwise considering the case in light of Peruta v. City of San Diego, 824 F.3d 919, 924 (9th Cir. 2016) (en banc), and other intervening Ninth Circuit opinions. Each side shall bear its own costs. [10351383] (MM) [Entered: 03/10/2017 09:13 AM]
March 5, 2017 114 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/05/2017. [10343310] [12-16258] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 03/05/2017 07:42 AM]
October 26, 2016 113 Terminated Girard Douglas Lau for State of Hawaii in 12-16258 (No longer with agency) [10174607] (TYL) [Entered: 10/26/2016 01:06 PM]
October 5, 2016 112 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/05/2016. [10150164] [12-16258] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 10/05/2016 02:08 PM]
September 30, 2016 111 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 100 ] filed by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (sent to panel) [10144660] (SML) [Entered: 09/30/2016 03:47 PM]
September 27, 2016 110 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 92 ] filed by State of Hawaii. (sent to panel) [10139473] (SML) [Entered: 09/27/2016 03:17 PM]
September 27, 2016 109 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 102 ] filed by NRA. (sent to panel) [10139448] (SML) [Entered: 09/27/2016 03:05 PM]
September 22, 2016 108 Filed clerk order: The supplemental amicus brief [ # 102 ] submitted by NRA is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10133246] (SML) [Entered: 09/22/2016 01:40 PM]
September 22, 2016 107 Filed clerk order: The supplemental amicus brief [ # 92 ] submitted by State of Hawaii is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10133239] (SML) [Entered: 09/22/2016 01:38 PM]
September 22, 2016 106 Filed clerk order: The supplemental amicus brief [ # 100 ] submitted by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10133235] (SML) [Entered: 09/22/2016 01:37 PM]
September 22, 2016 105 Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN) The motions by the State of Hawaii, the Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence and the National Rifle Association of America, Inc. to file supplemental amici briefs are GRANTED. [10133196] (WL) [Entered: 09/22/2016 01:20 PM]
September 14, 2016 104 Received 7 paper copies of Supplemental Brief [ # 95 ] filed by City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha (sent to panel). [10124268] (SML) [Entered: 09/15/2016 08:51 AM]
September 13, 2016 103 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending NRA. [10122455] (SML) [Entered: 09/13/2016 04:15 PM]
September 13, 2016 102 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. Date of service: 09/13/2016. [10122368] [12-16258] (Clement, Paul) [Entered: 09/13/2016 03:43 PM]
September 9, 2016 101 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae County of Maui joinder to brief [ # 92 ]. Date of service: 09/09/2016. [10118962] [12-16258] (Rowe, Caleb) [Entered: 09/09/2016 06:23 PM]
September 8, 2016 99 Received 7 paper copies of Supplemental Brief [ # 90 ] filed by Christopher Baker (sent to panel). [10117020] (SML) [Entered: 09/08/2016 03:39 PM]
September 7, 2016 98 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae County of Kauai joinder to brief [ # 92 ]. Date of service: 09/07/2016. [10115727] [12-16258] (Courson, Nicholas) [Entered: 09/07/2016 05:35 PM]
September 7, 2016 97 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 98 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by County of Kauai. Date of service: 09/07/2016. [10115464] [12-16258] (Courson, Nicholas) [Entered: 09/07/2016 03:12 PM]
September 7, 2016 96 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [ # 95 ] submitted by City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10114864] (SML) [Entered: 09/07/2016 12:06 PM]
September 6, 2016 100 Submitted (ECF) Amicus Brief for review. Submitted by Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 09/06/2016. [10118851] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [ # 89 ] .] (TYL) [Entered: 09/09/2016 04:53 PM]
September 6, 2016 95 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha. Date of service: 09/06/2016. [10114134] [12-16258] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached certificate of service. 09/07/2016 by TYL] (Sherwood, Curtis) [Entered: 09/06/2016 10:48 PM]
September 6, 2016 94 COURT DELETED DUPLICATE/INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 95 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha. Date of service: 09/06/2016. [10114106] [12-16258] (Sherwood, Curtis) [Entered: 09/06/2016 07:25 PM]
September 6, 2016 93 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae County of Hawaii joinder to brief [ # 92 ]. Date of service: 09/06/2016. [10113983] [12-16258] (Heroldt, Lerisa) [Entered: 09/06/2016 04:53 PM]
September 6, 2016 92 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by State of Hawai'i. Date of service: 09/06/2016. [10113911] [12-16258]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF files of motion and supplemental amicus brief. 09/07/2016 by RY] (Nakatsuji, Robert) [Entered: 09/06/2016 04:27 PM]
September 6, 2016 91 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [ # 90 ] submitted by Christopher Baker is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10113729] (SML) [Entered: 09/06/2016 03:35 PM]
September 6, 2016 90 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Christopher Baker. Date of service: 09/06/2016. [10113608] [12-16258] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 09/06/2016 03:03 PM]
September 6, 2016 89 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence Motion to file supplemental brief for petition for rehearing. Date of service: 09/06/2016. [10113416] [12-16258] --[COURT UPDATE: Removed brief (refiled in entry [ # 100 ]). 09/09/2016 by TYL] (Ali, Kathryn) [Entered: 09/06/2016 02:11 PM]
September 6, 2016 88 Added attorney Kathryn Marshall Ali for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, in case 12-16258. [10113335] (JFF) [Entered: 09/06/2016 01:48 PM]
September 6, 2016 87 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kathryn Marshall Ali for Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 09/06/2016. [10113260] [12-16258] (Ali, Kathryn) [Entered: 09/06/2016 01:21 PM]
September 2, 2016 86 Attorney Michael Joseph Udovic in 12-16258 substituted by Attorney Lerisa L. Heroldt in 12-16258 [10110958] (CW) [Entered: 09/02/2016 07:44 AM]
September 1, 2016 85 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lerisa L. Heroldt for Amicus Curiae County of Hawaii. Date of service: 09/01/2016. [10110869] [12-16258] (Heroldt, Lerisa) [Entered: 09/01/2016 06:00 PM]
August 18, 2016 84 Received 20 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 61 ] filed by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [10091851] (SML) [Entered: 08/18/2016 11:33 AM]
August 16, 2016 83 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 61 ] submitted by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 20 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10089633] (SML) [Entered: 08/16/2016 05:33 PM]
August 16, 2016 82 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN) The parties are ordered to provide supplemental briefs in light of the en banc decision in Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971 and Richards v. Prieto, No. 11-16255. Briefs shall be no longer than twenty (20) pages and shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days of this order. The Brady Center To Prevent Gun Violences motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of rehearing, ECF No. [ # 61 ] , is GRANTED. The motions by the County of Hawaii, County of Maui, and County of Kauai to join the amicus curiae brief of the State of Hawaii, ECF Nos. [ # 63 ], [ # 64 ], and [ # 65 ], are GRANTED. Appellants motion to strike the State of Hawaiis amicus brief, ECF No. [ # 66 ], is DENIED. [10088550] (WL) [Entered: 08/16/2016 11:56 AM]
August 7, 2014 81 Deleted Incorrect Entry [9197263] (RY) [Entered: 08/07/2014 01:38 PM]
May 6, 2014 80 Received 20 paper copies of Amicus brief [ # 62 ] filed by State of Hawaii. [9085457] (JFF)
May 2, 2014 79 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker response to Combo PFR Panel and En Banc (ECF Filing) ,Combo PFR Panel and En Banc (ECF Filing) for panel and en banc rehearing, for panel and en banc rehearing (statistical entry). Date of service: 05/02/2014. [9081276]. (AAB)
May 1, 2014 78 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN) Disposition of the pending petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc is deferred pending this Courts resolution of pending post-opinion matters in Peruta v. County of San Diego, No. 10-56971. [9078981] (WL)
April 30, 2014 77 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii response opposing motion (,motion to strike portion or whole of document). Date of service: 04/30/2014. [9078811] (GDL)
April 29, 2014 76 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending County of Hawaii. [9076990] (JFF)
April 29, 2014 75 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending County of Maui. [9076976] (JFF)
April 29, 2014 74 Added attorney Robert Tadao Nakatsuji for State of Hawaii, in case 12-16258. [9076797] (JFF)
April 29, 2014 73 Added attorney Kimberly Tsumoto Guidry for State of Hawaii, in case 12-16258. [9076793] (JFF)
April 29, 2014 72 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert Tadao Nakatsuji for Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii. Date of service: 04/29/2014. [9076782] (RTN)
April 29, 2014 71 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kimberly Tsumoto Guidry for Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii. Date of service: 04/29/2014. [9076751] (KTG)
April 29, 2014 70 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending County of Kauai. [9076606] (JFF)
April 29, 2014 69 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 62 ] submitted by State of Hawaii is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 20 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9076588] (JFF)
April 29, 2014 68 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii. [9076563] (JFF)
April 29, 2014 67 Terminated Appellee State of Hawaii in 12-16258 [9076555] (BY)
April 28, 2014 66 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker Motion to strike whole of amicus brief of Defendant State of Hawaii. Date of service: 04/28/2014. [9075484] (AAB)
April 28, 2014 65 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by County of Kauai. Date of service: 04/28/2014. [9075477]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached Certificate of Service. Resent NDA. 04/29/2014 by RY] (NC)
April 28, 2014 64 Filed (ECF) County of Maui Motion to become amicus curiae (includes motion to join in amicus brief filed by submitted by State of Hawaii). Date of service: 04/28/2014. [9075460]--[Edited: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing (no brief attached). 04/29/2014 by RY] (CPR)
April 28, 2014 63 Filed (ECF) County of Hawaii Motion to become amicus curiae (includes motion to join in amicus brief filed by submitted by State of Hawaii). Date of service: 04/28/2014. [9075450]--[Edited: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing (no brief attached). 04/29/2014 by RY] (MJU)
April 28, 2014 62 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by State of Hawaii, by its Attorney General. Date of service: 04/28/2014. [9075432] (GDL)
April 28, 2014 61 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Brady Center To Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 04/28/2014. [9074180] (NRO)
April 22, 2014 60 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN) Plaintiff-Appellant is directed to file a response to the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc filed with this court on April 17, 2014. The response shall not exceed 15 pages or 4200 words and shall be filed within 21 days of the date of this order. [9067986] (WL)
April 17, 2014 59 Filed (ECF) Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 03/20/2014 memorandum). Date of service: 04/17/2014. [9063061] (CES)
April 2, 2014 58 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN) Defendants-Appellees motion for an extension of time to file their petition for panel rehearing and/or petition for rehearing en banc is granted. Defendants- Appellees shall file any petition for rehearing no later than April 17, 2014. [9040697] (WL)
March 27, 2014 57 Filed (ECF) Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha Motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 04/17/2014. Date of service: 03/27/2014. [9033955] (CES)
March 20, 2014 56 FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN) VACATED; REMANDED. Each party shall bear its own costs on appeal. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [9023773] (PH)
November 25, 2013 55 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/25/2013. [8876913] (AAB)
November 21, 2013 54 Filed (ECF) Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/21/2013. [8873100] (CV)
August 29, 2013 53 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/29/2013. [8762240] (AAB)
August 13, 2013 52 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/13/2013. [8742061] (AAB)
August 12, 2013 51 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/12/2013. [8740055] (AAB)
August 9, 2013 50 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/09/2013. [8738507]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct ECF event. Resent NDA. 08/12/2013 by RY] (AAB)
August 2, 2013 49 Filed (ECF) Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/02/2013. [8729218] (CV)
March 29, 2013 48 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/29/2013. [8570527]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct ECF event and content of filing. Resent NDA. 03/29/2013 by RY] (AAB)
March 28, 2013 47 Filed (ECF) Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/28/2013. [8568898] (CV)
March 14, 2013 46 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/14/2013. [8551218] (AAB)
February 27, 2013 45 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/27/2013. [8528289] (AAB)
December 18, 2012 44 Filed (ECF) Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/18/2012. [8444136] (CV)
December 11, 2012 43 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/11/2012. [8434265] (AAB)
December 6, 2012 42 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, SIDNEY R. THOMAS and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN. [8428135] (RB)
December 5, 2012 41 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/05/2012. [8425684] (AAB)
November 29, 2012 40 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/29/2012. [8420515]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct ECF event. Resent NDA. 11/30/2012 by RY] (AAB)
November 29, 2012 39 Filed (ECF) Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha Correspondence: Attachment to Appellees' FRAP 28j Letter - Kachalsky Opinion (Case No. 11-3642). Date of service: 11/29/2012 [8419412]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected document (cover and certificate of service). Resent NDA. 11/29/2012 by RY] (CV)
November 29, 2012 38 Filed (ECF) Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/29/2012. [8419282] (CV)
November 29, 2012 37 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KKW):At oral argument, the parties should be prepared to discuss the following two questions: 1) Assuming that Plaintiff-Appellant correctly reads certain state statutes to forbid the use of handguns at firing ranges, does he have standing to challenge those statutes on that ground? 2) What effect, if any, does the lack of state defendants have on this case? See Evers v. Cnty. of Custer, 745 F.2d 1196 (9th Cir. 1984); Martin A. Schwartz & Kathryn R. Urbonya, Section 1983 Litigation 101 (2d ed. 2008) (A local governments mere enforcement of state law, as opposed to express incorporation or adoption of state law into local regulations or codes, has been found insufficient to establish Monell liability?); see also 28 U.S.C. 2403(b). [8419153] (KKW)
November 15, 2012 36 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Christine Van Aken for Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha. [8403448] (CV)
November 15, 2012 35 Added attorney Christine Van Aken for Louis Kealoha City and County of Honolulu, in case 12-16258. [8402915] (JFF)
November 15, 2012 34 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christine Van Aken for Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha. Date of service: 11/15/2012. [8402895] (CV)
October 16, 2012 32 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Curtis Edwin Sherwood, Esquire for Appellees City and County of Honolulu, Honolulu Police Department and Louis Kealoha. [8362605] (CES)
October 15, 2012 33 Received Appellees Neil Abercrombie and State of Hawaii letter dated 10/10/2012 re: There will be no appearance at oral argument (PANEL). [8365098] (JFF)
October 10, 2012 31 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Richard Loren Holcomb, Jr., Esquire for Appellant Christopher Baker. [8354530] (RLH)
October 9, 2012 30 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: HL): These appeals have been assigned to the same panel because they involve issues regarding the Second Amendment. The cases are not consolidated for oral argument. Counsel may wish to confer in order to enhance oral argument. The Clerk shall serve a copy of the courts service list for each case on all parties. [8353131] [10-56971, 11-16255, 12-16258] (SM)
October 9, 2012 29 Notice of Oral Argument on Thursday, December 6, 2012 - 9:00 AM - Courtroom 1, 3rd Floor - James R. Browning US Courthouse - San Francisco, CA. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8352270] (RB)
September 24, 2012 28 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Pursuant to the Motion for Clarification & Coordination of Appeals in Related Cases filed by Appellants in 10-56971, it is hereby ORDERED that arguments in 10-56971, 11-16255, and 12-16258 will be scheduled to be heard by the same panel on the same day. The date and time of the arguments will be determined in due course by subsequent order. [8335002] [10-56971, 11-16255, 12-16258] (SM)
September 13, 2012 27 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/13/2012. [8322303] (AAB)
September 7, 2012 26 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [ # 19 ] filed by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Sent to panel) [8314249] (SD)
September 4, 2012 25 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: HB): The court denies appellants motion to stay appellate proceedings in this preliminary injunction appeal pending issuance of the decision in Richards, et al. v. Prieto, et al., No. 11-16255. The Clerk shall calendar this appeal, No. 12-16258, before the panel that will be assigned to decide appeal No. 11-16255. Briefing is completed. The amicus brief submitted by the Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, the filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically.[8309708] (WL)
August 30, 2012 24 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 08/30/2012. [8306507] (RLH)
August 29, 2012 23 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [ # 21 ] filed by Christopher Baker. [8304339] (SD)
August 22, 2012 22 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 21 ] submitted by Christopher Baker is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8295052] (GV)
August 21, 2012 21 Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Christopher Baker. Date of service: 08/21/2012. [8294607] (RLH)
August 15, 2012 20 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [8288034] (GV)
August 14, 2012 19 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 08/14/2012. [8286896] (MMM)
August 13, 2012 17 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 13 ] filed by Appellees. [8285218] (SD)
August 10, 2012 18 Filed Appellees' supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [8286358] (GV)
August 10, 2012 16 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: HB): The motion of appellees Louis Kealoha and the City and County of Honolulu for leave to file a late answering brief is denied as unnecessary, because the brief submitted by appellees on August 8, 2012 has already been ordered filed. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8283666] (WL)
August 8, 2012 15 Filed (ECF) Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha Motion to file a late brief. Date of service: 08/08/2012. [8280668] (CES)
August 8, 2012 14 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 13 ] submitted by Appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8280326] (GV)
August 8, 2012 13 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees City and County of Honolulu and Louis Kealoha. Date of service: 08/07/2012. [8279028] (CES)
July 23, 2012 12 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file Appellees Neil Abercrombie, City and County of Honolulu, Honolulu Police Department, Louis Kealoha and State of Hawaii brief. Appellees Neil Abercrombie, City and County of Honolulu, Honolulu Police Department, Louis Kealoha and State of Hawaii answering brief due 08/07/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [8259599] (DEV)
July 5, 2012 11 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [ # 5 ] filed by Christopher Baker. [8238307] (SD)
June 29, 2012 10 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: HB): This is a preliminary injunction appeal. Appellant has filed a Notification Pursuant to Circuit Rule 34-3? along with his opening brief. The proposed briefing schedule contained in appellants Notification is not adopted. This appeal is governed by Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3. The briefing schedule established in the courts order of May 31, 2012 remains in effect. If any party wishes to file a motion to stay briefing in this appeal pending the resolution of Richards, et al. v. Prieto, et al., No. 11-16255, they may do so. [8233152] (WL)
June 28, 2012 9 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 5 ] submitted by Christopher Baker is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8231401] (LA)
June 27, 2012 8 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 5 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Christopher Baker. Date of service: 06/27/2012. [8230943] (RLH)
June 27, 2012 7 Filed Appellant Christopher Baker excerpts of record in 1 volume. Served on 06/26/2012. [8230789] (LA)
June 26, 2012 6 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 5 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Christopher Baker. Date of service: 06/26/2012. [8229369] (RLH)
June 26, 2012 5 Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Christopher Baker. Date of service: 06/26/2012. [8229363]--[COURT UPDATE: replaced PDF with corrected version submitted separately by csl, resent notice. 06/28/2012 by ASW] (RLH)
June 26, 2012 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 06/26/2012. [8228355] (KO)
June 3, 2012 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christopher Baker Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/03/2012. [8200040] (KO)
May 31, 2012 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AW): The appeal filed May 29, 2012 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than June 26, 2012; the answering brief is due July 24, 2012 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [8197038] (WL)
May 30, 2012 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. Circuit Rule 3-3. Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/06/2012. [8195062] (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Baker v. Louis Kealoha, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER BAKER
Represented By: Alan Alexander Beck Esquire
Represented By: Richard Loren Holcomb Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Kevin O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOUIS KEALOHA, as an individual and in his official capacity as Honolulu Chief of Police
Represented By: Curtis Edwin Sherwood Esquire
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF HAWAII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY AND COUNTY OF HONOLULU
Represented By: Curtis Edwin Sherwood Esquire
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HONOLULU POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Curtis Edwin Sherwood Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEIL ABERCROMBIE, in his official capacity as Hawaii Governor
Represented By: Kendall Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Mark Murakami Esquire
Represented By: Kathryn Marshall Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNTY OF MAUI
Represented By: Caleb Patrick Rowe Esquire
Represented By: Caleb Patrick Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNTY OF HAWAII
Represented By: Michael Joseph Udovic Esquire
Represented By: Lerisa L. Heroldt Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNTY OF KAUAI
Represented By: Nicholas Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?