George Young, Jr. v. State of Hawaii, et al

Plaintiff / Appellant: GEORGE K. YOUNG, Jr.
Defendant / Appellee: STATE OF HAWAII, NEIL ABERCROMBIE, in his capacity as Governor of the State of Hawaii, DAVID M. LOUIE, in his capacity as State Attorney General, COUNTY OF HAWAII, as a sub-agency of the State of Hawaii, WILLIAM P. KENOI, in his capacity as Mayor of the County of Hawaii, HILO COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT, as a sub-agency of the County of Hawaii, HARRY S. KUBOJIRI, in his capacity as Chief of Police, JOHN DOES, 1-25, JANE DOES, 1-25, DOE CORPORATIONS, 1-5, DOE ENTITIES, 1-5, DAVID MARK LOUIE, I, Esquire, in his capacity as State Attorney General and DAVID MARK LOUIE I, Esquire, in his capacity as State Attorney General
Amicus Curiae: EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY, COUNTY OF KAUAI, GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, CITY AND COUNTY OF HONOLULU, COUNTY OF MAUI, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, CALIFORNIA, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, ILLINOIS, IOWA, MASSACHUSETTS, MARYLAND, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, VIRGINIA, AND THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, SAN DIEGO COUNTY GUN OWNERS POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE, THE FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., HAWAII RIFLE ASSOCIATION, VIRGINIA CITIZENS DEFENSE LEAGUE, THE MADISON SOCIETY, INC., CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, THE HELLER FOUNDATION, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC., GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION, HAWAII FIREARMS COALITION, FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION, RESTORING LIBERTY ACTION COMMITTEE and GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 12-17808
Filed: December 24, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2018 196 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and SANDRA S. IKUTA): Having previously granted Appellants request to file a surreply, we DENY as moot Appellants motion for leave to file such surreply. The surreply shall be filed. [11099105] (AF) [Entered: 11/26/2018 02:19 PM]
November 21, 2018 195 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Motion for miscellaneous relief [motion to file sur-reply]. Date of service: 11/21/2018. [11096739] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [ # 193 ] .] (TYL) [Entered: 11/21/2018 03:31 PM]
November 21, 2018 194 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and SANDRA S. IKUTA) Defendants-Appellees motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition for rehearing en banc, filed with this Court on November 15, 2018, is GRANTED. The reply shall be filed. Having requested leave to file a surreply, Appellants request is GRANTED. The surreply shall not exceed 3,000 words and shall be filed within 14 days of the date of this order. [11096620] (OC) [Entered: 11/21/2018 02:40 PM]
November 21, 2018 193 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. sur-reply to response to petition for rehearing en banc. Date of service: 11/21/2018. [11096529]. [12-17808] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing and removed motion (refiled in entry [ # 195 ]). 11/21/2018 by TYL] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 11/21/2018 02:17 PM]
November 20, 2018 192 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 190 ] submitted by Firearms Policy Foundation, The Calguns Foundation, The Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. and The Madison Society, Inc. is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11093929] (SML) [Entered: 11/20/2018 08:34 AM]
November 20, 2018 191 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae The Madison Society, Inc., The Calguns Foundation, The Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. and Firearms Policy Foundation. [11093917] (SML) [Entered: 11/20/2018 08:30 AM]
November 19, 2018 190 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by THE MADISON SOCIETY, INC., CALGUNS FOUNDATION, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., AND FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION. Date of service: 11/19/2018. [11093783] [12-17808] (Kilmer, Donald) [Entered: 11/19/2018 10:34 PM]
November 19, 2018 189 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 187 ] submitted by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11093471] (SML) [Entered: 11/19/2018 03:56 PM]
November 19, 2018 188 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. [11093464] (SML) [Entered: 11/19/2018 03:54 PM]
November 19, 2018 187 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Date of service: 11/19/2018. [11093435] [12-17808] (Sigale, David) [Entered: 11/19/2018 03:47 PM]
November 19, 2018 186 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 183 ] submitted by Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Restoring Liberty Action Committee, The Heller Foundation and Virginia Citizens Defense League is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11093088] (SML) [Entered: 11/19/2018 02:38 PM]
November 19, 2018 185 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, The Heller Foundation, Virginia Citizens Defense League, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund and Restoring Liberty Action Committee. [11093077] (SML) [Entered: 11/19/2018 02:35 PM]
November 19, 2018 184 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 181 ] submitted by Hawaii Firearms Coalition is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11093023] (SML) [Entered: 11/19/2018 02:20 PM]
November 19, 2018 183 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, The Heller Foundation, Virginia Citizens Defense League, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee. Date of service: 11/19/2018. [11093008] [12-17808] (Titus, Herbert) [Entered: 11/19/2018 02:18 PM]
November 19, 2018 182 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Hawaii Firearms Coalition. [11092983] (SML) [Entered: 11/19/2018 02:14 PM]
November 19, 2018 181 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Hawaii Firearms Coalition. Date of service: 11/19/2018. [11092778] [12-17808] (Wilkerson, Donald) [Entered: 11/19/2018 01:16 PM]
November 19, 2018 180 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 178 ] submitted by Hawaii Rifle Association is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11092483] (SML) [Entered: 11/19/2018 11:20 AM]
November 19, 2018 179 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Hawaii Rifle Association. [11092470] (SML) [Entered: 11/19/2018 11:17 AM]
November 19, 2018 178 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Hawaii Rifle Association. Date of service: 11/19/2018. [11092346] [12-17808] (Holcomb, Richard) [Entered: 11/19/2018 10:39 AM]
November 16, 2018 177 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 175 ] submitted by San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11091588] (SML) [Entered: 11/16/2018 04:54 PM]
November 16, 2018 176 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae San Diego County Gun Owners Political Action Committee. [11091584] (SML) [Entered: 11/16/2018 04:51 PM]
November 16, 2018 175 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF OF SAN DIEGO COUNTY GUN OWNERS POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE IN OPPOSITION TO THE PETITION FOR REHEARING. Date of service: 11/16/2018. [11091460] [12-17808] (Dillon, John) [Entered: 11/16/2018 03:54 PM]
November 16, 2018 174 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. response opposing motion ([ # 172 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 172 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 11/16/2018. [11090315] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 11/16/2018 10:28 AM]
November 15, 2018 173 Filed (ECF) Appellees Neil Abercrombie, County of Hawaii, Hilo County Police Department, William P. Kenoi, Harry S. Kubojiri, Mr. David Mark Louie, I, Esquire and State of Hawaii reply to response to petition for rehearing en banc. Date of service: 11/15/2018. [11090109].--[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [ # 172 ].] (SLM) [Entered: 11/16/2018 09:25 AM]
November 15, 2018 172 Filed (ECF) Appellees Neil Abercrombie, County of Hawaii, Hilo County Police Department, William P. Kenoi, Harry S. Kubojiri, Mr. David Mark Louie, I, Esquire and State of Hawaii Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to File Reply In Support of Petition for Rehearing En Banc]. Date of service: 11/15/2018. [11089762] [12-17808]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed reply (filed correctly in entry [ # 173 ]). 11/16/2018 by SLM] (Katyal, Neal) [Entered: 11/15/2018 05:25 PM]
November 8, 2018 171 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. response to petition for rehearing en banc. Date of service: 11/08/2018. [11081117]. [12-17808]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect content of filing. 11/08/2018 by RY] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 11/08/2018 05:18 AM]
October 2, 2018 170 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and SANDRA S. IKUTA): Appellants motion for a 30-day extension of time to file a response to Appellees petition for rehearing en banc, filed with this court on September 30, 2018, is GRANTED. Appellants response will now be due on November 8, 2018. [11032037] (AF) [Entered: 10/02/2018 11:25 AM]
September 30, 2018 169 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Unopposed Motion to extend time to file a response until 11/08/2018. Date of service: 09/30/2018. [11029683] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 09/30/2018 06:27 PM]
September 25, 2018 168 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 166 ] submitted by the State of New Jersey; et al., is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11023838] (SML) [Entered: 09/25/2018 08:58 AM]
September 25, 2018 167 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae States of New Jersey; et al. [11023832] (SML) [Entered: 09/25/2018 08:54 AM]
September 24, 2018 166 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by New Jersey, California, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Iowa, Massachusetts, Maryland, Oregon, Rhode Island, Virginia, and the District of Columbia.. Date of service: 09/24/2018. [11023582] [12-17808] (Feigenbaum, Jeremy) [Entered: 09/24/2018 05:11 PM]
September 24, 2018 165 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 163 ] submitted by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11023552] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2018 04:56 PM]
September 24, 2018 164 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [11023536] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2018 04:52 PM]
September 24, 2018 163 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 09/24/2018. [11023513] [12-17808] (Frankel, Simon) [Entered: 09/24/2018 04:44 PM]
September 24, 2018 162 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 160 ] submitted by Everytown for Gun Safety is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11023457] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2018 04:27 PM]
September 24, 2018 161 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Everytown for Gun Safety. [11023442] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2018 04:24 PM]
September 24, 2018 160 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund. Date of service: 09/24/2018. [11023414] [12-17808] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 09/24/2018 04:16 PM]
September 24, 2018 159 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 157 ] submitted by City and County of Honolulu, County of Kauai and County of Maui is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11023399] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2018 04:12 PM]
September 24, 2018 158 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae City and County of Honolulu, County of Kauai and County of Maui. [11023390] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2018 04:09 PM]
September 24, 2018 157 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE CITY AND COUNTY OF HONOLULU, COUNTY OF KAUAI, AND COUNTY OF MAUI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC. Date of service: 09/24/2018. [11023362] [12-17808] (Jackson, Daniel) [Entered: 09/24/2018 04:01 PM]
September 18, 2018 156 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and SANDRA S. IKUTA): Appellant is directed to file a response to the petition for rehearing en banc filed with this Court on September 14, 2018. The response shall not exceed 15 pages or 4,200 words and shall be filed within 21 days of the date of this order. [11014991] (AF) [Entered: 09/18/2018 09:14 AM]
September 14, 2018 155 Filed (ECF) Appellees Neil Abercrombie, County of Hawaii, Hilo County Police Department, William P. Kenoi, Harry S. Kubojiri, Mr. David Mark Louie, I, Esquire and State of Hawaii petition for rehearing en banc (from 07/24/2018 opinion). Date of service: 09/14/2018. [11012483] [12-17808] (Katyal, Neal) [Entered: 09/14/2018 02:54 PM]
September 14, 2018 154 Added attorney Neal Kumar Katyal for William P. Kenoi County of Hawaii Harry S. Kubojiri Neil Abercrombie Hilo County Police Department David Mark Louie I State of Hawaii, in case 12-17808. [11012461] (CW) [Entered: 09/14/2018 02:48 PM]
September 14, 2018 153 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Neal Kumar Katyal for Appellees Neil Abercrombie, County of Hawaii, Hilo County Police Department, William P. Kenoi, Harry S. Kubojiri, Mr. David Mark Louie, I, Esquire and State of Hawaii. Date of service: 09/14/2018. [11012403] [12-17808] (Katyal, Neal) [Entered: 09/14/2018 02:27 PM]
August 29, 2018 152 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and SANDRA S. IKUTA): The State of Hawaiis motion to intervene pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2403(b), filed on August 16, 2018, is DENIED as unnecessary. The State of Hawaii is, and remains, a party to this appeal during the pendency of any en banc proceedings, since Young filed a notice of appeal with respect to the district courts dismissal of his claims against both the State and the County. While we dismissed the appeal against the State, such dismissal is not effective until the mandate issues in this case. See Fed. R. App. P. 41. We sua sponte extend the time for the State of Hawaii to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc until September 14, 2018the current deadline for the County of Hawaii to file any such petition. Judge Clifton dissents from the denial of the unopposed motion to intervene. He would grant it. [10993822] (AF) [Entered: 08/29/2018 08:51 AM]
August 23, 2018 151 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and SANDRA S. IKUTA): The Application for an exemption to Ninth Circuit Rule 46-5 for Attorney Kalikoonalani D. Fernandes, filed on August 21, 2018, is GRANTED. [10987762] (AF) [Entered: 08/23/2018 03:11 PM]
August 21, 2018 150 Filed (ECF) Intervenor - Pending State of Hawaii Motion for 46-5 exemption. Date of service: 08/21/2018. [10984716] [12-17808] (Fernandes, Kaliko'Onalani) [Entered: 08/21/2018 04:26 PM]
August 17, 2018 149 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. response to motion ([ # 138 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 138 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to intervene). Date of service: 08/17/2018. [10980854] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 08/17/2018 01:51 PM]
August 17, 2018 148 Added attorneys Colleen Sinzdak, Mitchell Reich for State of Hawaii, in case 12-17808. [10980227] (QDL) [Entered: 08/17/2018 10:00 AM]
August 17, 2018 147 Added attorney Colleen Sinzdak, Mitchell Reich for State of Hawaii, in case 12-17808. [10980220] (QDL) [Entered: 08/17/2018 09:58 AM]
August 16, 2018 146 Added attorney Clyde James Wadsworth for State of Hawaii, in case 12-17808. [10979892] (QDL) [Entered: 08/16/2018 04:43 PM]
August 16, 2018 145 Added attorney Kaliko'Onalani Diara Fernandes for State of Hawaii, in case 12-17808. [10979889] (QDL) [Entered: 08/16/2018 04:41 PM]
August 16, 2018 144 Added attorneys Clyde James Wadsworth, Kaliko'Onalani Diara Fernandes for State of Hawaii, in case 12-17808. [10979881] (QDL) [Entered: 08/16/2018 04:38 PM]
August 16, 2018 143 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending State of Hawaii. [10979498] (QDL) [Entered: 08/16/2018 02:23 PM]
August 16, 2018 142 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kaliko'onalani D. Fernandes for Appellee State of Hawaii and Intervenor - Pending State of Hawaii. Date of service: 08/16/2018. [10979335] [12-17808] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct party filers. 8/16/2018 by TYL] (Fernandes, Kaliko'Onalani) [Entered: 08/16/2018 01:39 PM]
August 16, 2018 141 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Clyde J. Wadsworth for Appellee State of Hawaii and Intervenor - Pending State of Hawaii. Date of service: 08/16/2018. [10979292] [12-17808] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct party filers. 8/16/2018 by TYL] (Wadsworth, Clyde) [Entered: 08/16/2018 01:26 PM]
August 16, 2018 140 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Colleen E. Roh Sinzdak for Appellee State of Hawaii and Intervenor - Pending State of Hawaii. Date of service: 08/16/2018. [10979232] [12-17808] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct party filers. 8/16/2018 by TYL] (Sinzdak, Colleen) [Entered: 08/16/2018 12:47 PM]
August 16, 2018 139 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mitchell Pearsall Reich for Appellee State of Hawaii and Intervenor - Pending State of Hawaii. Date of service: 08/16/2018. [10979203] [12-17808] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct party filers. 8/16/2018 by TYL] (Reich, Mitchell) [Entered: 08/16/2018 12:14 PM]
August 16, 2018 138 Filed (ECF) State of Hawaii Motion to intervene. Date of service: 08/16/2018. [10979196] [12-17808] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 8/16/2018 by TYL] (Katyal, Neal) [Entered: 08/16/2018 12:08 PM]
August 16, 2018 137 Added attorney Neal Kumar Katyal for State of Hawaii, in case 12-17808. [10979145] (QDL) [Entered: 08/16/2018 11:44 AM]
August 16, 2018 136 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Neal Kumar Katyal for Appellee State of Hawaii. Date of service: 08/16/2018. [10979088] [12-17808] (Katyal, Neal) [Entered: 08/16/2018 11:26 AM]
August 6, 2018 135 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 35 ] submitted by State of Hawaii is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [10967505] (KWG) [Entered: 08/06/2018 02:09 PM]
August 2, 2018 134 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and SANDRA S. IKUTA) Appellees motion for a 45-day extension of time to file a petition for rehearing and a petition for rehearing en banc, filed with this court on July 31, 2018, is GRANTED. Appellees petition for rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc will now be due on September 14, 2018. [10963920] (WL) [Entered: 08/02/2018 12:03 PM]
August 1, 2018 133 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. response non-opposing motion ([ # 132 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 132 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 08/01/2018. [10962827] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 08/01/2018 02:22 PM]
July 31, 2018 132 Filed (ECF) Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri Motion to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 09/14/2018. Date of service: 07/31/2018. [10961892] [12-17808] (Horowitz, D. Kaena) [Entered: 07/31/2018 06:44 PM]
July 24, 2018 131 Filed clerk order: The supplemental amicus brief [ # 93 ] submitted by State of Hawaii is filed. No additional paper copies are required. [10953621] (SML) [Entered: 07/24/2018 03:34 PM]
July 24, 2018 130 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [ # 87 ] submitted by George K. Young, Jr. is filed. No additional paper copies are required. [10953613] (SML) [Entered: 07/24/2018 03:32 PM]
July 24, 2018 129 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [ # 23 ] submitted by George K. Young, Jr. is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [10953598] (SML) [Entered: 07/24/2018 03:29 PM]
July 24, 2018 128 FILED OPINION (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and SANDRA S. IKUTA) We deal with the pending motions as follows: (1) The Countys motion to strike Youngs 28(j) letters, ECF No. 20, is DENIED; (2) Youngs motion to file a supplemental brief, ECF No. 24, is GRANTED; (3) Youngs motion to strike the States amicus brief, ECF No. 36, is DENIED; (4) Youngs motion to take judicial notice, ECF No. 80, is GRANTED IN PART, and we take judicial notice of the Hawaii Attorney Generals 2014 Firearms Registration Report; (5) Youngs second motion to file a supplemental brief, ECF No. 84, is GRANTED; (6) The States motion to file a supplemental amicus brief, ECF No. 92, is GRANTED. REVERSED as to the County, DISMISSED as to the State, and REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion Judge: DFO Authoring, Judge: RRC Dissenting, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [10952459]--[Edited: Replaced PDF of Opinion (typo corrected). 07/31/2018 by RY] (RMM) [Entered: 07/24/2018 07:00 AM]
April 17, 2018 127 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/17/2018. [10840638] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 04/17/2018 05:37 PM]
February 12, 2018 126 Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [10762920] (TG) [Entered: 02/13/2018 04:04 PM]
February 12, 2018 125 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and SANDRA S. IKUTA. [10760164] (TG) [Entered: 02/12/2018 12:54 PM]
February 6, 2018 124 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Correspondence: Correspondence from the Chief of Police, Harry S. Kubojiri, which are the denials of Mr. Young's permit as alleged on page thirteen (13) of Mr. Young's Complaint in the District Court.. Date of service: 02/06/2018 [10753742] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 02/06/2018 01:55 PM]
February 1, 2018 123 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/01/2018. [10748350] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 02/01/2018 02:43 PM]
January 2, 2018 122 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Other (Honolulu, Hawaii). Filed by Attorney Mr. Alan Alexander Beck, Esquire for Appellant George K. Young, Jr.. [10709349] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 01/02/2018 12:28 PM]
December 21, 2017 121 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Other (Honolulu, Hawaii). Filed by Attorney D. Kaena Horowitz for Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri. [10700044] [12-17808] (Horowitz, D. Kaena) [Entered: 12/21/2017 03:40 PM]
December 21, 2017 120 Attorney Michael S. Kagami substituted by Attorney D. Kaena Horowitz, in 12-17808. [10700011] (HH) [Entered: 12/21/2017 03:32 PM]
December 21, 2017 119 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of D. Kaena Horowitz for Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri. Date of service: 12/21/2017. [10699949] [12-17808] (Horowitz, D. Kaena) [Entered: 12/21/2017 03:16 PM]
December 15, 2017 118 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii Correspondence: Notice of Non-Participation in Oral Argument. Date of service: 12/15/2017 [10692353] [12-17808] (Nakatsuji, Robert) [Entered: 12/15/2017 12:10 PM]
December 8, 2017 117 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/08/2017. [10683436] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 12/08/2017 07:42 AM]
December 5, 2017 116 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Other (Honolulu, HI). Filed by Attorney Stephen D. Stamboulieh for Appellant George K. Young, Jr.. [10679686] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 12/05/2017 05:27 PM]
December 4, 2017 115 Notice of Oral Argument on Monday, February 12, 2018 - 09:00 A.M. - Hawaii Bkcy Courtroom 250L - Honolulu HI. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). When you have reviewed the calendar, download the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form , complete the form, and file it via Appellate ECF or return the completed form to: SAN FRANCISCO Office. [10677070] (AKM) [Entered: 12/04/2017 02:32 PM]
October 20, 2017 114 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/20/2017. [10625658] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 10/20/2017 12:05 PM]
October 10, 2017 113 This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in Honolulu Please review the Honolulu sitting dates for February 2018 and the two subsequent sitting months in that location at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions . If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please inform the court within 3 days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : regarding availability for oral argument). When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date. If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : request for mediation).[10610778] (AW) [Entered: 10/10/2017 11:01 AM]
September 12, 2017 112 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/12/2017. [10577538] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 09/12/2017 10:54 AM]
July 25, 2017 111 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/25/2017. [10520974] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 07/25/2017 02:39 PM]
July 3, 2017 110 Attorneys Melody A. Parker, Melody A. Parker and Melody A. Parker in 12-17808 substituted by Attorneys Michael S. Kagami, Michael S. Kagami and Michael S. Kagami in 12-17808 [10495203] (CW) [Entered: 07/03/2017 07:17 AM]
June 30, 2017 109 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael S. Kagami for Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri. Date of service: 06/30/2017. [10495112] [12-17808] (Kagami, Michael) [Entered: 06/30/2017 06:27 PM]
June 30, 2017 108 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/30/2017. [10495059] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 06/30/2017 05:20 PM]
June 27, 2017 107 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: HL): Appellants motion to lift the stay entered in this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 103 ]) is granted. This appeal shall be placed on the next available calendar. [10489137] (AF) [Entered: 06/27/2017 10:23 AM]
June 14, 2017 106 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/14/2017. [10473890] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 06/14/2017 03:27 PM]
May 8, 2017 105 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/08/2017. [10425546] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 05/08/2017 12:21 PM]
April 25, 2017 104 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/25/2017. [10410598] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 04/25/2017 02:43 PM]
March 10, 2017 103 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Motion to lift stay. Date of service: 03/10/2017. [10352166] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 03/10/2017 01:40 PM]
March 3, 2017 102 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/03/2017. [10342171] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 03/03/2017 12:06 PM]
February 6, 2017 101 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: HL): The court stays proceedings in this appeal pending this courts, mandate in Baker v. Kealoha , 12-16258, or further order of the court. [10303840] (AF) [Entered: 02/06/2017 01:33 PM]
October 26, 2016 100 Terminated Girard Douglas Lau for State of Hawaii in 12-17808 (No longer with agency) [10174610] (TYL) [Entered: 10/26/2016 01:06 PM]
October 5, 2016 99 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/05/2016. [10149913] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 10/05/2016 01:07 PM]
July 19, 2016 98 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii reply to response (motion to file supplemental brief). Date of service: 07/19/2016. [10055610] [12-17808] (Lau, Girard) [Entered: 07/19/2016 05:10 PM]
July 18, 2016 97 Received 7 paper copies of Supplemental Brief [ # 93 ] lodged by County of Hawaii, et al. [10053324] (SD) [Entered: 07/18/2016 02:06 PM]
July 15, 2016 96 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): The motion of Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii to file an oversized supplemental brief (Docket No. [ # 92 ]) is referred to the panel that considers the merits of the appeal. [10051221] (AF) [Entered: 07/15/2016 09:46 AM]
July 14, 2016 95 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. response opposing motion ([ # 92 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 92 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to file supplemental brief, [ # 91 ] Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 07/14/2016. [10051016] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 07/14/2016 08:22 PM]
July 14, 2016 94 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [ # 93 ] submitted by County of Hawaii, et al. is lodged. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, appellees are ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10050714] (LA) [Entered: 07/14/2016 03:36 PM]
July 12, 2016 93 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi, Hilo County Police Department and Harry S. Kubojiri. Date of service: 07/14/2016. [10050473] [12-17808]--[COURT UPDATE: Backdated entry to reflect original submission date, attached consolidated PDF of brief. 07/14/2016 by LA] (Parker, Melody) [Entered: 07/14/2016 02:00 PM]
July 12, 2016 92 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii Motion to file supplemental brief. Date of service: 07/12/2016. [10050198]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [ # 91 ].] (LA) [Entered: 07/14/2016 11:44 AM]
July 12, 2016 91 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii. Date of service: 07/12/2016. [10048162] [12-17808]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed motion (filed correctly in entry [ # 92 ]), updated docket text to reflect correct type of brief, attached consolidated PDF of brief with certificate of service. 07/14/2016 by LA] (Lau, Girard) [Entered: 07/12/2016 06:35 PM]
July 12, 2016 90 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Brief resubmitted using correct filing type. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 93 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi, Harry S. Kubojiri and Hilo County Police Department response opposing motion ([ # 87 ] Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 07/12/2016. [10047277] [12-17808] (Parker, Melody) [Entered: 07/12/2016 11:54 AM]
July 1, 2016 89 Received 7 paper copies of Supplemental Brief [ # 87 ] lodged by George K. Young, Jr.. [10036997] (SD) [Entered: 07/01/2016 02:33 PM]
June 23, 2016 88 Filed clerk order: The supplemental brief [ # 87 ] submitted by George K. Young, Jr. is lodged. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, appellant is ordered to submit 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: tan. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10027684] (LA) [Entered: 06/23/2016 04:21 PM]
June 23, 2016 87 Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant George K. Young, Jr.. Date of service: 06/23/2016. [10027376] [12-17808] (Beck, Alan) [Entered: 06/23/2016 02:56 PM]
June 16, 2016 86 Filed (ECF) Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi, Hilo County Police Department and Harry S. Kubojiri response opposing motion ([ # 84 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 84 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to file supplemental brief). Date of service: 06/16/2016. [10018254] [12-17808] (Parker, Melody) [Entered: 06/16/2016 03:57 PM]
June 15, 2016 85 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Appellants motion for leave to file a supplemental brief (Docket No. [ # 84 ]) is referred to the merits panel. Within 14 days after the date of this order, the appellant may submit a supplemental brief not to exceed 2,400 words. Within 28 days after the date of this order, the appellees may file a supplemental response brief not to exceed 2,400 words. The proposed briefs shall be lodged pending the Courtss resolution of appellants motion. [10016724] (AF) [Entered: 06/15/2016 05:17 PM]
June 9, 2016 84 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Motion to file supplemental brief. Date of service: 06/09/2016. [10009328] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 06/09/2016 05:17 PM]
May 22, 2016 83 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/22/2016. [9986101] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 05/22/2016 03:21 PM]
April 10, 2016 82 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. reply to response (motion to take judicial notice, ). Date of service: 04/10/2016. [9933890] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 04/10/2016 05:31 PM]
April 8, 2016 81 Filed (ECF) Appellees County of Hawaii, Hilo County Police Department, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri response opposing motion ([ # 80 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 80 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to take judicial notice). Date of service: 04/08/2016. [9933029] [12-17808] (Parker, Melody) [Entered: 04/08/2016 12:08 PM]
March 30, 2016 80 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Motion to take judicial notice of County of Hawaii concedes the fact contained in the Hawaii Attorney General most recent firearms study which indicates there are no permits is accurate and to its knowledge the County of Hawaii has never issued a carry permit to private citizen. Date of service: 03/30/2016. [9922160] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 03/30/2016 06:21 PM]
March 22, 2016 79 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/22/2016. [9909887] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 03/22/2016 07:10 AM]
February 6, 2016 78 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/06/2016. [9857278] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 02/06/2016 05:33 PM]
January 15, 2016 77 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/15/2016. [9829918] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 01/15/2016 06:03 PM]
December 6, 2015 76 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/06/2015. [9781167] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 12/06/2015 04:48 PM]
November 27, 2015 75 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/27/2015. [9772164] [12-17808] (Stamboulieh, Stephen) [Entered: 11/27/2015 01:41 PM]
October 19, 2015 74 Added attorney Stephen D. Stamboulieh for George K. Young Jr., in case 12-17808. [9722378] (KB) [Entered: 10/19/2015 09:11 AM]
October 16, 2015 73 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Dean Stamboulieh for Appellant George K. Young, Jr.. Date of service: 10/16/2015. [9722114] [12-17808] (SDS) [Entered: 10/16/2015 05:24 PM]
December 31, 2014 72 Added attorney Melody A. Parker for Hilo County Police Department, William P. Kenoi, County of Hawaii, Harry S. Kubojiri, in case 12-17808. [9367385] (KB) [Entered: 12/31/2014 01:25 PM]
December 31, 2014 71 Terminated Joseph Kamelamela for Hilo County Police Department in 12-17808 [9367378] (KB) [Entered: 12/31/2014 01:21 PM]
December 31, 2014 70 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Melody A. Parker for Appellees County of Hawaii, Hilo County Police Department, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri. Date of service: 12/31/2014. [9367235] [12-17808] (MAP) [Entered: 12/31/2014 12:05 PM]
December 16, 2014 69 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/16/2014. [9352260] [12-17808] (AAB) [Entered: 12/16/2014 10:31 PM]
August 27, 2014 68 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/25/2014. [9221520] (AAB)
August 7, 2014 67 Terminated Michael Joseph Udovic for Harry S. Kubojiri and William P. Kenoi in 12-17808 - RETIRED [9197262] (RY)
July 3, 2014 66 Attorney Michael Joseph Udovic in 12-17808 substituted by Attorney Joseph Kamelamela in 12-17808 [9155058] (CW)
July 2, 2014 65 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joseph Kalani Kamelamela for Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri. Date of service: 07/02/2014. [9154890] (JK)
April 29, 2014 64 Added attorney Robert Tadao Nakatsuji for State of Hawaii, in case 12-17808. [9077179] (EL)
April 29, 2014 63 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert Tadao Nakatsuji for Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii. Date of service: 04/29/2014. [9076863] (RTN)
April 29, 2014 62 Added attorney Kimberly Tsumoto Guidry for State of Hawaii, in case 12-17808. [9076781] (EL)
April 29, 2014 61 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kimberly Tsumoto Guidry for Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii. Date of service: 04/29/2014. [9076763] (KTG)
March 29, 2014 60 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/29/2014. [9036661] (AAB)
March 27, 2014 59 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/27/2014. [9033140] (AAB)
March 6, 2014 58 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Correspondence: Notice of Related Case. Date of service: 03/06/2014 [9006012] (AAB)
January 28, 2014 57 Added attorney Laureen L. Martin for William P. Kenoi County of Hawaii Harry S. Kubojiri, in case 12-17808. [8954760] (EL)
January 28, 2014 56 Terminated Kimberly Angay for Harry S. Kubojiri, William P. Kenoi and Hilo County Police Department in 12-17808 [8954752] (EL)
January 27, 2014 55 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Laureen Lee Martin for Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri. Date of service: 01/27/2014. [8954476] (LLM)
January 27, 2014 54 Filed (ECF) Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri Correspondence: Notice of Disassociation. Date of service: 01/27/2014 [8954467] (MJU)
January 13, 2014 53 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/13/2014. [8935435] (AAB)
November 25, 2013 52 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/25/2013. [8877814] (GDL)
November 8, 2013 51 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/08/2013. [8855897] (AAB)
November 7, 2013 50 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/07/2013. [8854624] (GDL)
June 27, 2013 49 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [ # 35 ] filed by State of Hawaii. [8683914] (DB)
June 21, 2013 48 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GSS): The appellants opposed motion to strike the amicus brief submitted by State of Hawaii is referred to the panel that will consider the merits of the case. [8676823] (AF)
June 5, 2013 47 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [ # 37 ] filed by George K. Young, Jr.. [8656415] (SD)
June 4, 2013 46 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. reply to response (). Date of service: 06/04/2013. [8655154] (AAB)
June 4, 2013 45 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii response opposing motion (,motion to strike portion or whole of document). Date of service: 06/04/2013. [8655089] (GDL)
June 4, 2013 44 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae State of Hawaii. [8655006] (LA)
June 3, 2013 43 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: WP): The court's June 4, 2013 notice attached to docket entry number 42 is vacated as being issued in error. [8654592] (WP)
June 3, 2013 42 Filed Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri excerpts of record [ # 33 ] in 1 volume. [Edited 06/19/2013 by wp to reflect the correct party] [8654264] (WP)
June 3, 2013 41 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 32 ] filed by County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri. [8652606] (SD)
June 3, 2013 40 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 37 ] submitted by George K. Young, Jr. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8652349] (WP)
June 3, 2013 39 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: WP): The Clerk order filing the State of Hawaii's brief is vacated. The filing of the brief will be determined by a later order. [8652330] (WP)
June 3, 2013 38 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 35 ] submitted by State of Hawaii is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8652294] (WP)
June 1, 2013 37 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant George K. Young, Jr.. Date of service: 06/01/2013. [8651308] (AAB)
May 31, 2013 36 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Motion to strike whole of State of Hawaii is a named Defendant in this appeal and belated filed a "amicus" brief in violation of the FRAP. They were afforded a Answering Brief and declined to file one.. Date of service: 05/31/2013. [8651277] (AAB)
May 31, 2013 35 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by State of Hawaii. Date of service: 05/31/2013. [8651273] (GDL)
May 29, 2013 34 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 32 ] submitted by County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [ # 33 ] submitted by County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8645933] (WP)
May 24, 2013 33 Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri. Date of service: 05/24/2013. [8643305] (MJU)
May 24, 2013 32 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri. Date of service: 05/24/2013. [8643295]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 05/28/2013 by RY] (MJU)
April 30, 2013 31 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KN): The motion to align or expedite? appeal Nos. 12-17803 and 12-17808 is denied. The answering brief in appeal No. 12-17808 remains due May 24, 2013 and the optional reply remains due 14 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [8609677] (TSP)
April 28, 2013 30 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. reply to response (,motion to hear case with other case). Date of service: 04/28/2013. [8607420] (AAB)
April 22, 2013 29 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Motion to hear this case before the panel which will hear case This motion asks that this case be heard by the same panel as San Francisco v. Jackson.. Date of service: 04/22/2013. [8598087] (AAB)
April 14, 2013 28 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Correspondence: Notice of Related Case in the Event that Defendants' motion to strike is denied and Mr. Young's Supplemental Brief is approved.. Date of service: 04/14/2013 [8589092] (AAB)
April 14, 2013 27 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/14/2013. [8589082] (AAB)
April 12, 2013 26 Filed (ECF) Appellees County of Hawaii, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri reply to response (,motion to file supplemental brief). Date of service: 04/12/2013. [8589034] (MJU)
April 12, 2013 25 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): The appellees motion to strike, the appellants response thereto, the appellants motion to file a supplemental brief, the proposed supplemental brief, and shall be referred for disposition to the panel that considers the merits of the appeal. [8587769] (AF)
April 10, 2013 24 COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [22]. Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Motion to file supplemental brief and Response to motion (motion to strike portion or whole of document). Date of service: 04/10/2013. [8586020] (RY)
April 10, 2013 23 COURT ENTERED FILING. Submitted (ECF) Supplemental Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant George K. Young, Jr.. Date of service: 04/10/2013. [8585987] (RY)
April 10, 2013 22 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 24 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Motion to file supplemental brief and Response to motion (motion to strike portion or whole of document). Date of service: 04/10/2013. [8585168] (AAB)
April 3, 2013 21 Filed (ECF) Appellees County of Hawaii, Hilo County Police Department, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri Correspondence: filing of expedited request for extension of time to file its Answering Brief. Date of service: 04/03/2013 [8576517] (MJU)
April 2, 2013 20 Filed (ECF) Appellees County of Hawaii, Hilo County Police Department, William P. Kenoi and Harry S. Kubojiri Motion to strike whole of Plaintiff-Appellant's Notices of Supplemental Authority Filed February 28, 2013, March 3, 2013, March 11, 2013, March 16, 2013, March 21, 2013, March 27, 2013 and March 31, 2013. Date of service: 04/02/2013. [8574404] (MJU)
April 2, 2013 19 Streamlined request [18] by Appellees Neil Abercrombie, County of Hawaii, Doe Corporations, Doe Entities, Hilo County Police Department, Jane Does, John Does, William P. Kenoi, Harry S. Kubojiri, David M. Louie and State of Hawaii to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellees Neil Abercrombie, County of Hawaii, Doe Corporations, Doe Entities, Hilo County Police Department, Jane Does, John Does, William P. Kenoi, Harry S. Kubojiri, David M. Louie and State of Hawaii answering brief due 05/24/2013. The optional reply brief is due 14 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [8574220] (LN)
April 2, 2013 18 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellant George K. Young, Jr. and Appellees Neil Abercrombie, County of Hawaii, Doe Corporations, Doe Entities, Hilo County Police Department, Jane Does, John Does, William P. Kenoi, Harry S. Kubojiri, David M. Louie and State of Hawaii. New requested due date is 05/24/2013 at 05:00 pm. [8573942] (MJU)
March 31, 2013 17 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/31/2013. [8571097] (AAB)
March 27, 2013 16 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/27/2013. [8565862] (AAB)
March 21, 2013 15 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/21/2013. [8558893] (AAB)
March 16, 2013 14 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/16/2013. [8553545] (AAB)
March 11, 2013 13 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/11/2003. [8544214] (AAB)
March 3, 2013 12 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 03/03/2013. [8534393] (AAB)
February 28, 2013 11 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/28/2013. [8531147] (AAB)
February 25, 2013 10 Filed (ECF) Errata to Opening brief ([ # 6 ] Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing) ). Filed by Appellant George K. Young, Jr.. Date of service: 02/25/2012. [8524232] (AAB)
February 22, 2013 9 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [ # 6 ] filed by George K. Young, Jr.. [8523542] (SD)
February 20, 2013 8 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 6 ] submitted by George K. Young, Jr. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8520660] (RH)
February 19, 2013 7 Filed Appellant George K. Young, Jr. paper copies of excerpts of record in 1 volume(s). [8518753] (RH)
February 16, 2013 6 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant George K. Young, Jr.. Date of service: 02/16/2013. [8516981]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF w/corrected version (footnotes), resent notice. 02/20/2013 by ASW] (AAB)
February 11, 2013 5 Case rejected from Circuit Mediation Program. [8508364] [12-17808, 12-17845, 12-35748, 12-35947, 12-35976, 12-36011] (LW)
January 2, 2013 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant George K. Young, Jr. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/02/2013. [8458849]--[COURT UPDATE: Attaached corrected PDF of questionnaire to correct viewing error (blank). Resent NDA. 01/04/2013 by RY] (AAB)
January 2, 2013 3 Added attorney Alan Alexander Beck for George K. Young Jr., in case 12-17808. [8458834] (HH)
January 2, 2013 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alan Alexander Beck for Appellant George K. Young, Jr.. Date of service: 01/02/2013. [8458826] (AAB)
December 24, 2012 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant George K. Young Jr. opening brief due 03/25/2013. Appellees Neil Abercrombie, County of Hawaii, Doe Corporations, Doe Entities, Hilo County Police Department, Jane Does, John Does, William P. Kenoi, Harry S. Kubojiri, David M. Louie and State of Hawaii answering brief due 04/25/2013. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8451772] (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Young, Jr. v. State of Hawaii, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE K. YOUNG, Jr.
Represented By: Alan Alexander Beck Esquire
Represented By: Stephen D. Stamboulieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: John M. Cregor Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Colleen Sinzdak
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Clyde James Wadsworth
Represented By: Kaliko'Onalani Diara Fernandes
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEIL ABERCROMBIE, in his capacity as Governor of the State of Hawaii
Represented By: John M. Cregor Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID M. LOUIE, in his capacity as State Attorney General
Represented By: John M. Cregor Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF HAWAII, as a sub-agency of the State of Hawaii
Represented By: Laureen L. Martin
Represented By: Melody A. Parker
Represented By: Michael S. Kagami Esquire
Represented By: D. Kaena Horowitz
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. KENOI, in his capacity as Mayor of the County of Hawaii
Represented By: Laureen L. Martin
Represented By: Melody A. Parker
Represented By: Michael S. Kagami Esquire
Represented By: D. Kaena Horowitz
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HILO COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT, as a sub-agency of the County of Hawaii
Represented By: Melody A. Parker
Represented By: Joseph Kamelamela
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARRY S. KUBOJIRI, in his capacity as Chief of Police
Represented By: Laureen L. Martin
Represented By: Melody A. Parker
Represented By: Michael S. Kagami Esquire
Represented By: D. Kaena Horowitz
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES, 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOES, 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOE CORPORATIONS, 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOE ENTITIES, 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID MARK LOUIE, I, Esquire, in his capacity as State Attorney General
Represented By: John M. Cregor Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID MARK LOUIE I, Esquire, in his capacity as State Attorney General
Represented By: John M. Cregor Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNTY OF KAUAI
Represented By: Daniel E. Jackson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY AND COUNTY OF HONOLULU
Represented By: Daniel E. Jackson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNTY OF MAUI
Represented By: Daniel E. Jackson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW JERSEY, CALIFORNIA, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, ILLINOIS, IOWA, MASSACHUSETTS, MARYLAND, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, VIRGINIA, AND THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Jeremy Feigenbaum Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SAN DIEGO COUNTY GUN OWNERS POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.
Represented By: Donald Kilmer Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HAWAII RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Richard Loren Holcomb Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VIRGINIA CITIZENS DEFENSE LEAGUE
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE MADISON SOCIETY, INC.
Represented By: Donald Kilmer Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE HELLER FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE CALGUNS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Donald Kilmer Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HAWAII FIREARMS COALITION
Represented By: Donald L. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FIREARMS POLICY FOUNDATION
Represented By: Donald Kilmer Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RESTORING LIBERTY ACTION COMMITTEE
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?