Al McZeal, et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., et al
Plaintiff: MARVIN D. BEAULIEU, PABLO TREJO RESENDEZ, ELIZABETH VAN CAMP, JOSE LUIS PEREZ, ARACELI GARCIA, CHRISTOPHER JAMES, TOMMY ENCINAS, CHANERIA MCCLAIN, MEDINA JAMES, DIANE MARQUEZ PENICHE, individually, and on behalf of all other similarly situated individuals and LIANA MUNDEN
Defendant / Appellee: MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC, DURIO, MCGOFFIN, STAGG & ACKERMANN, APC., EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION, FKA EMC Mortgage LLC, REX KESSLER, MIDSOUTH NATIONAL BANK, NA, Erroneously Sued As MidSouth Bank, NA, BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP, Erroneously Sued As BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., ARONOWITZ & MECKLENBURG, PAUL N. DEBALLION, INDYMAC ONEWEST BANK, Erroneously Sued As OneWest Bank, FSB, SEVERSON AND WERSON, WELLS FARGO BANK, NA AS TRUSTEE OF THE ABFC 2006-OPT1 TRUST, ASSET BACKED FUNDING CORPORATION ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-OPT1, MACKIE, WOLF, ZIENZ, MANN, PC., POWER DEFAULT SERVICE, Erroneously Sued As Power Default Services, Inc., DEBALLION AND MILEY, LLP, JEFFREY ACKERMANN, JONATHAN G. WILBOURN, RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A., SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC., FIFTH THIRD BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, NA, SUSAN HENDRICK, WANDA ANDERSON DAVIS, L. JAY ANGELLE, Erroneously Sued As Jay L Angelle, ALBERT J. MCKNIGHT, FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE, SOUTHERN DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION, HSBC BANK USA, N.A., as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS (MERS), through their registered Agent - CT Corporation, BANK OF AMERICA, NA, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, FKA Bankers Trust Company of California, N.A., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., SOUTHERN CONSUMERS COOPERATIVE, REGIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION, JOHN B. FREEMAN, TD SERVICES COMPANY, 4 CLOTHES 4 TC, LLC, U.S. BANK, as Trustee, LEEFE GIBBS SULLIVAN DUPRE AND ALDOUS, LLC and CITIMORTGAGE INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMILEH MILLER, VIEN THI HO, IMELDA MANANSALA, FERNANDO ARBELAEZ, MICHAEL GILLILAND, AL MCZEAL, LUPI PAULO EDWARDS, ARLENE HUDSON, ALFRED MCZEAL, Sr. and MARK S. MILLER
Case Number: 12-55496
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Filing 123 Mail returned on 08/18/2018 addressed to Imelda Manansala, re: Memorandum filed 5/30/2018, docket [ # 108 ]. Resending to: Case files. No forwarding address located. [10987938] (MM) [Entered: 08/23/2018 04:17 PM]
August 7, 2018 Filing 122 Mail returned on 07/09/2018 addressed to Imelda Manansala, re: Mandate [ # 112 ] Return to sender. Resending to: casefiles-no forwarding address. [10969579] (JFF) [Entered: 08/07/2018 05:01 PM]
July 30, 2018 Filing 121 Mail returned on addressed to Rex Kessler, re: Courgt order filed on 07/17/2018 [ # 119 ] Return to sender. Resending to: casefiles-no forwarding address. [10966295] (JFF) [Entered: 08/03/2018 04:49 PM]
July 27, 2018 Filing 120 Mail returned from non-party Jose Luis Perez, memorandum filed 5/30/2018, docket [ # 108 ]. Sent to case files. [10959614] (MM) [Entered: 07/30/2018 02:27 PM]
July 17, 2018 Filing 119 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SVG): The district court dismissed 20 of the 21 originally named individual plaintiffs in this action on December 21, 2011, finding that those plaintiffs had been misjoined and were not properly named in the pro se complaint that was signed only by plaintiff Al McZeal. The pro se notice of appeal filed March 13, 2012 in this case was signed by Al McZeal and nine of the other originally named plaintiffs. Because the remaining eleven individually named plaintiffs have never appeared in either the district court or this Court, and were never properly part of this action in either court, the Clerk shall remove those plaintiffs from this docket. [10945031] (OC) [Entered: 07/17/2018 10:49 AM]
July 13, 2018 Filing 118 Mail returned on 07/12/2018 addressed to Jose Luis Perez, re: Memorandum filed 5/30/2018, docket [ # 108 ]. Resending to: Per district court docket, 12653 Coldbrook Avenue, Downey, CA 90242. [10941517]--[Edited: address updated. 07/13/2018 by RY] (MM) [Entered: 07/13/2018 11:04 AM]
July 5, 2018 Filing 117 Mail returned on 07/05/2018 addressed to Rex Kessler, re: 06/21/2018 mandate [ # 112 ]. Returned envelope notes: not here, return to sender, attempted - not known, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; no forwarding address found. [10932863] (LA) [Entered: 07/05/2018 05:56 PM]
July 5, 2018 Filing 116 Mail returned on 07/03/2018 addressed to Mark S. Miller, re: 06/21/2018 mandate [ # 112 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, attempted - not known, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; no forwarding address found. [10932778] (LA) [Entered: 07/05/2018 04:47 PM]
July 5, 2018 Filing 115 Mail returned on 07/03/2018 addressed to Lupi Paulo Edwards, re: 06/21/2018 mandate [ # 112 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, attempted - not known, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; no forwarding address found. [10932770] (LA) [Entered: 07/05/2018 04:45 PM]
June 26, 2018 Filing 114 Mail returned on 06/26/2018 addressed to Fernando Arbelaez, re: 06/21/2018 mandate [ # 112 ]. Returned envelope notes: forward time exp, return to sender, PO Box 700399, Saint Cloud, FL 34770-0399. Resending to: PO Box 700399, Saint Cloud, FL 34770-0399. [10923427] --[Edited: Updated Address. 06/27/2018 by TYL] (LA) [Entered: 06/26/2018 06:40 PM]
June 26, 2018 Filing 113 Mail returned on 06/26/2018 addressed to Jamileh Miller, re: Memorandum filed 5/30/2018, docket [ # 108 ]. Resending to: Unable to locate new address. Sent to case files. [10923358] (MM) [Entered: 06/26/2018 04:50 PM]
June 21, 2018 Filing 112 MANDATE ISSUED.(SST, BGS and RCT) [10916808] (RL) [Entered: 06/21/2018 08:45 AM]
June 14, 2018 Filing 111 Filed Plaintiff Marvin D. Beaulieu letter dated 06/11/2018 re: Requesting name be removed from case. Paper filing deficiency: Plaintiff not a party to the appeal. [10909452] (HH) [Entered: 06/14/2018 02:37 PM]
June 13, 2018 Filing 110 Mail returned on 06/12/2018 addressed to Tommy Encinas, Pablo Trejo Resendez, 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC and Rex Kessler, re: Memorandum filed5/30/18. Unable to locate new addresses. [10906952] (RMM) [Entered: 06/13/2018 11:17 AM]
June 11, 2018 Filing 109 Terminated Nicholas Gregory Hood for Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Power Default Service, IndyMac OneWest Bank and HSBC Bank USA, N.A. in 12-55496 (Due to incorrect ECF account information). [10903888] (SLM) [Entered: 06/11/2018 12:32 PM]
May 30, 2018 Filing 108 FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (STEPHEN S. TROTT, BARRY G. SILVERMAN and RICHARD C. TALLMAN) The motion for judicial notice, Docket Entry No. [ # 66 ], is denied as unnecessary. Costs are awarded to Appellees. See Fed. R. App. P. 39(a). AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [10889016] (MM) [Entered: 05/30/2018 09:21 AM]
March 9, 2018 Filing 107 Received notice of change of address dated 03/05/2018 from Al McZeal. New address: 2620 Fashion Ave., Long Beach, CA 90810. [10795915] --[Edited: Updated Address. 03/13/2018 by TYL] (RL) [Entered: 03/13/2018 10:16 AM]
January 25, 2018 Filing 106 Filed (ECF) Appellee Severson And Werson status report (as required by Court order dated 12/05/2017). Date of service: 01/25/2018 [10738011] [12-55496] (Chilton, Jan) [Entered: 01/25/2018 09:49 AM]
September 20, 2017 Filing 105 Attorney Gretchen Sigridur Carner substituted by Attorney Andrew J. Waxler. [10587851] (RL) [Entered: 09/20/2017 01:13 PM]
September 20, 2017 Filing 104 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew J. Waxler for Appellees Leefe Gibbs Sullivan Dupre and Aldous, LLC and Wanda Anderson Davis. Date of service: 09/20/2017. [10587737] [12-55496] (Waxler, Andrew) [Entered: 09/20/2017 12:18 PM]
September 18, 2017 Filing 103 Terminated Tracy Evans-Moyer for ReconTrust Company, NA, Countrywide Home Loans Inc, Bank of America, N.A. and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP in 12-55496 (Due to incorrect ECF account information). [10584317] (SLM) [Entered: 09/18/2017 10:13 AM]
August 23, 2017 Filing 102 Filed (ECF) Appellees Jonathan G. Wilbourn and McGlinchey Stafford status report (as required by Court order dated 02/02/2015). Date of service: 08/23/2017 [10555824] [12-55496] (Agle, Daniel) [Entered: 08/23/2017 04:52 PM]
January 15, 2016 Filing 101 Terminated Steven Edward Rich for CitiMortgage Inc. in 12-55496 (no longer with firm) [9829031] (JT) [Entered: 01/15/2016 11:27 AM]
October 28, 2015 Filing 100 Terminated Bryan Leifer for SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. and Regional Services Corporation in 12-55496 (no longer with firm) [9736696] (JT) [Entered: 10/28/2015 03:48 PM]
October 13, 2015 Filing 99 Terminated Charles H. Abbott for ReconTrust Company, NA, Countrywide Home Loans Inc, Bank of America, N.A. and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP in 12-55496 (due to incorrect account info) [9715651] (JT) [Entered: 10/13/2015 11:08 AM]
October 9, 2015 Filing 98 Terminated Steven M Shewry for Deballion and Miley, LLP and Paul N. Deballion in 12-55496 (due to incorrect account info) [9713878] (JT) [Entered: 10/09/2015 01:42 PM]
February 23, 2015 Filing 97 Mail returned on 02/23/2015 addressed to 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC, re: 2/2/15 court order. Returned envelope reads: return to sender. Resending to: casefile-no forwarding address. [9430618] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 02/23/2015 02:10 PM]
February 2, 2015 Filing 96 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: ME): Proceedings in this case shall be held in abeyance pending resolution of Ho v. ReconTrust Co., N.A., et al., No. 10-56884, Park, et al. v. Lehman Brothers Bank, FSB, et al., No. 11-55473, or Park, et al. v. Quality Loan Service Corp., No. 12-56450, or further order of the court. [9404660] (ME) [Entered: 02/02/2015 11:10 AM]
May 5, 2014 Filing 95 Filed Appellees McGlinchey Stafford and Jonathan G. Wilbourn letter dated 05/01/2014 re: stating parties have not recieved notice of oral argument or submission on the briefs since briefing was completed on 11/28/12. Paper filing deficiency: None. [9084227] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 05/06/2014 09:21 AM]
May 2, 2013 Filing 94 Received Appellant Al McZeal notice regarding change of address: 2222 Irish Spring Dr. Houston, TX 77067. [8614125] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 05/02/2013 03:40 PM]
January 14, 2013 Filing 93 Received Appellant Vien Thi Ho notice regarding change of address: 2501 Cherry Ave #100 Signal Hill, CA 90755. [8472162] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 01/14/2013 09:13 AM]
January 11, 2013 Filing 92 Received Appellant Al McZeal in 12-55496, 12-56750 notice regarding change of address: 10919 Lakewood Blvd Suite 202 Downey, CA 90240. [8471498] [12-55496, 12-56750] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 01/11/2013 03:40 PM]
November 28, 2012 Filing 91 Filed original and 7 copies of Appellants Fernando Arbelaez, Lupi Paulo Edwards, Michael Gilliland, Vien Thi Ho, Arlene Hudson, Imelda Manansala, Al McZeal, Alfred McZeal, Sr., Jamileh Miller and Mark S. Miller (Informal: No) reply brief of 16 pages. Served on 11/21/2012. [8420232] (RH) [Entered: 11/29/2012 03:44 PM]
November 15, 2012 Filing 90 Mail returned on 11/13/2012 addressed to 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC, re: 10-4-12 order. Resending to: casefile-no forwarding address. [8402571] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 11/15/2012 09:12 AM]
October 25, 2012 Filing 89 Mail returned on 10/24/2012 addressed to 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC, re: 10/5/12 order. Resending to: casefile-no forwarding address. [8376657] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 10/25/2012 01:32 PM]
October 23, 2012 Filing 88 Mail returned on 10/22/2012 addressed to 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC, re: 10/10/12 Order. Resending to: casefiles-no forwarding address. [8373490] (JFF) [Entered: 10/23/2012 02:26 PM]
October 18, 2012 Filing 86 Filed (ECF) Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee of the ABFC 2006-Opt1 Trust Correspondence: Notice of Undeliverable Mailing Addresses. Date of service: 10/18/2012 [8366010] (Fink, Jonathan) [Entered: 10/18/2012 09:09 AM]
October 17, 2012 Filing 87 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 57 ] filed by TD Services Company. [8366094] (SD) [Entered: 10/18/2012 09:26 AM]
October 17, 2012 Filing 85 Filed Appellee TD Services Company supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [8365563] (RH) [Entered: 10/17/2012 04:07 PM]
October 17, 2012 Filing 84 Mail returned on 10/17/2012 addressed to 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC, re: 10/4/12 order. Resending to: casefile-no forwarding address. [8364808] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 10/17/2012 01:26 PM]
October 17, 2012 Filing 83 Mail returned on 10/17/2012 addressed to 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC, re: 10-3-12 order. Resending to: casefile-no forwarding address. [8364800] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 10/17/2012 01:25 PM]
October 17, 2012 Filing 82 Mail returned on 10/17/2012 addressed to 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC, re: 10-5-12 order. Resending to: casefile-no forwarding address. [8364794] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 10/17/2012 01:24 PM]
October 16, 2012 Filing 81 Mail returned on 10/16/2012 addressed to 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC, re: 9-20-12 order. Resending to: casefile-no forwarding address. [8363180] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 10/16/2012 03:13 PM]
October 15, 2012 Filing 80 Filed Appellees Paul N. Deballion and Deballion and Miley, LLP supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [8362187] (RH) [Entered: 10/16/2012 10:33 AM]
October 15, 2012 Filing 79 Received corrected deficiency of white color covers and certificate of service from Appellees Paul N. Deballion and Deballion and Miley, LLP served on 10/11/2012. [8362180] (RH) [Entered: 10/16/2012 10:33 AM]
October 11, 2012 Filing 78 Received Appellees Paul N. Deballion and Deballion and Miley, LLP supplemental excerpt of record on appeal in 1 volume. Deficiencies: incorrect color covers, excerpts lack certificate of service. Notified counsel (see attached notice). [8357262] (RH) [Entered: 10/11/2012 04:30 PM]
October 11, 2012 Filing 77 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 58 ] filed by Paul N. Deballion and Deballion and Miley, LLP. [8356918] (SD) [Entered: 10/11/2012 03:15 PM]
October 11, 2012 Filing 76 Received Appellee TD Services Company supplemental excerpt of record on appeal in 1 volume. Served on 10/03/2012. Deficiencies: excerpts lack consecutive page numbers, excerpts are bound improperly. Notified counsel (see attached notice). [8356859] (RH) [Entered: 10/11/2012 03:02 PM]
October 10, 2012 Filing 75 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 53 ] filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee of the ABFC 2006-Opt1 Trust. [8354813] (SD) [Entered: 10/10/2012 03:06 PM]
October 10, 2012 Filing 73 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 57 ] submitted by TD Services Company is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8353964] (RH) [Entered: 10/10/2012 11:24 AM]
October 9, 2012 Filing 74 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 52 ] filed by BAC Home Loans, Inc., Bank of America, NA, Countrywide Home Loans Inc. and Recontrust Company, NA. [8354693] (SD) [Entered: 10/10/2012 02:45 PM]
October 9, 2012 Filing 72 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 55 ] filed by EMC Mortgage Corporation and JPMorgan Chase Bank. [8353711] (SD) [Entered: 10/10/2012 09:52 AM]
October 9, 2012 Filing 71 Received Appellee Mackie, Wolf, Zienz, Mann, PC. letter dated 10/05/2012 re: Mackie, Wolf Zientz & Mann will not file a brief in this appeal unless otherwise directed by the court.. [8353493] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 10/10/2012 08:56 AM]
October 5, 2012 Filing 70 Received 7 paper copies of Joinder Answering brief [ # 51 ] filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and IndyMac One West Bank. [8351374] (SD) [Entered: 10/09/2012 08:57 AM]
October 5, 2012 Filing 69 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 53 ] submitted by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee of the ABFC 2006-Opt1 Trust is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8350801] (RH) [Entered: 10/05/2012 03:42 PM]
October 5, 2012 Filing 68 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Appellants motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief is due November 21, 2012. [8350777] (KKW) [Entered: 10/05/2012 03:35 PM]
October 5, 2012 Filing 67 Filed Appellees EMC Mortgage Corporation and JPMorgan Chase Bank supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [8350565] (RH) [Entered: 10/05/2012 02:20 PM]
October 5, 2012 Filing 66 Filed (ECF) Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee of the ABFC 2006-Opt1 Trust Motion to take judicial notice of The Complaint filed September 19, 2011, United States District Court, Central District of California, Case No. 2:11-cv-07739-PA-PJW, entitled Al McZeal, et al., v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, et al.. Date of service: 10/05/2012. [8350381] (Fink, Jonathan) [Entered: 10/05/2012 01:15 PM]
October 5, 2012 Filing 65 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 55 ] submitted by EMC Mortgage Corporation and JPMorgan Chase Bank is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8350155] (RH) [Entered: 10/05/2012 11:32 AM]
October 5, 2012 Filing 64 Received 7 paper copies of Joinder Answering brief [ # 49 ] filed by Wanda Anderson Davis and Leefe Gibbs Sullivan Dupre and Aldous, LLC. [8350125] (SD) [Entered: 10/05/2012 11:25 AM]
October 4, 2012 Filing 63 Entered appearance of Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee of the ABFC 2006-Opt1 Trust. [8349242] (HH) [Entered: 10/04/2012 03:55 PM]
October 4, 2012 Filing 62 Filed Appellants motion to extend time to file reply brief. Served on 10/01/2012. [8348919] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 10/04/2012 02:43 PM]
October 4, 2012 Filing 61 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 51 ] submitted by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and IndyMac One West Bank is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8348680] (RH) [Entered: 10/04/2012 01:49 PM]
October 4, 2012 Filing 60 Filed Appellees BAC Home Loans, Inc., Bank of America, NA, Countrywide Home Loans Inc. and Recontrust Company, NA supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [8348617] (RH) [Entered: 10/04/2012 01:38 PM]
October 4, 2012 Filing 59 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 58 ] submitted by Paul N. Deballion and Deballion and Miley, LLP is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8347871] (RH) [Entered: 10/04/2012 09:52 AM]
October 3, 2012 Filing 58 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Paul N. Deballion and Deballion and Miley, LLP. Date of service: 10/03/2012. [8347524] (Shewry, Steven) [Entered: 10/03/2012 08:16 PM]
October 3, 2012 Filing 57 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee TD Services Company. Date of service: 10/03/2012. [8347504]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 10/10/2012 by RY] (Dreyfuss, Lawrence) [Entered: 10/03/2012 05:46 PM]
October 3, 2012 Filing 56 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 49 ] submitted by Wanda Anderson Davis and Leefe Gibbs Sullivan Dupre and Aldous, LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8347324] (RH) [Entered: 10/03/2012 04:06 PM]
October 3, 2012 Filing 55 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees EMC Mortgage Corporation and JPMorgan Chase Bank. Date of service: 10/03/2012. [8347242] (Perovich, Stefan) [Entered: 10/03/2012 03:41 PM]
October 3, 2012 Filing 54 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 52 ] submitted by BAC Home Loans, Inc., Bank of America, NA, Countrywide Home Loans Inc. and Recontrust Company, NA is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8347236]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected filed date (10/3/2012). Removed incorrect order. Resent NDA. 10/03/2012 by RY] (RH) [Entered: 10/03/2012 03:40 PM]
October 3, 2012 Filing 53 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee of the ABFC 2006-Opt1 Trust. Date of service: 10/03/2012. [8346736]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct party filer. Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 10/05/2012 by RY] (Fink, Jonathan) [Entered: 10/03/2012 01:12 PM]
October 3, 2012 Filing 52 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees BAC Home Loans, Inc., Bank of America, NA, Countrywide Home Loans Inc. and Recontrust Company, NA. Date of service: 10/03/2012. [8346643] (Werlin, Leslie) [Entered: 10/03/2012 12:17 PM]
October 3, 2012 Filing 51 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and IndyMac One West Bank. Date of service: 10/03/2012. [8346267]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable brief. Resent NDA. 10/04/2012 by RY] (Newman, Brian) [Entered: 10/03/2012 10:07 AM]
October 2, 2012 Filing 50 Filed (ECF) Appellees McGlinchey Stafford and Jonathan G. Wilbourn Correspondence: Notice of Joinder to Already-Filed Briefs (Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Severson & Werson). Date of service: 10/02/2012 [8345500] (Agle, Daniel) [Entered: 10/02/2012 03:39 PM]
October 2, 2012 Filing 49 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Wanda Anderson Davis and Leefe Gibbs Sullivan Dupre and Aldous, LLC. Date of service: 10/02/2012. [8344368]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief and ceritifcate of service. Resent NDA. 10/03/2012 by RY] (Carner, Gretchen) [Entered: 10/02/2012 09:57 AM]
September 27, 2012 Filing 48 Filed (ECF) Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, NA Correspondence: Notice of undeliverable mailing addresses. Date of service: 09/27/2012 [8339826] (Vogel, Karin) [Entered: 09/27/2012 02:17 PM]
September 21, 2012 Filing 47 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 30 ] filed by Severson And Werson. [8333225] (SD) [Entered: 09/21/2012 02:12 PM]
September 21, 2012 Filing 46 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 34 ] filed by Fifth Third Bank and Fifth Third Mortgage. [8333211] (SD) [Entered: 09/21/2012 02:09 PM]
September 21, 2012 Filing 45 Received 7 paper copies of Joinder Answering brief [ # 38 ] filed by L. Jay Angelle and MidSouth National Bank, NA. [8333188] (SD) [Entered: 09/21/2012 02:01 PM]
September 20, 2012 Filing 43 Filed clerk order: The answering brief (joinder) [ # 38 ] submitted by L. Jay Angelle and MidSouth National Bank, NA is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8331634] (RH) [Entered: 09/20/2012 01:44 PM]
September 20, 2012 Filing 42 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 31 ] filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA. [8331593] (SD) [Entered: 09/20/2012 01:34 PM]
September 20, 2012 Filing 41 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul N. Deballion and Deballion and Miley, LLP correspondence: deadline extension. Date of service: 09/20/2012 [8331458]--[COURT UPDATE: Corrected entry to reflect content of filing, resent notice. 09/20/2012 by ASW] (Shewry, Steven) [Entered: 09/20/2012 12:43 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 44 Filed Appellants Jamileh Miller and Mark S. Miller 7 copies of supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 1 volume. [8331898] (RH) [Entered: 09/20/2012 02:50 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 40 Filed original and 7 copies of Appellee Susan Hendrick answering brief of 18 pages. Served on 09/18/2012. [8331252] (RH) [Entered: 09/20/2012 11:22 AM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 39 Filed (ECF) Appellee TD Services Company Correspondence: Extension was granted through October 3, 2012 to file T.D. Service Company's Answering Brief.. Date of service: 09/19/2012 [8330667] (Dreyfuss, Lawrence) [Entered: 09/19/2012 05:33 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 38 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees L. Jay Angelle and MidSouth National Bank, NA. Date of service: 09/19/2012. [8330305]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 09/20/2012 by RY] (Miller, Elissa) [Entered: 09/19/2012 03:15 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 37 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file brief. Appellees Paul N. Deballion and Deballion and Miley, LLP answering brief due 10/03/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [8329925] (LN) [Entered: 09/19/2012 01:52 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 36 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 34 ] submitted by Fifth Third Bank and Fifth Third Mortgage is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8329264] (RH) [Entered: 09/19/2012 10:13 AM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 35 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 30 ] submitted by Severson And Werson is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8329144] (RH) [Entered: 09/19/2012 09:11 AM]
September 18, 2012 Filing 34 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Fifth Third Bank and Fifth Third Mortgage. Date of service: 09/18/2012. [8328855] (Michel, Hayes) [Entered: 09/18/2012 04:39 PM]
September 18, 2012 Filing 33 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 31 ] submitted by Wells Fargo Bank, NA is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8328622] (RH) [Entered: 09/18/2012 03:45 PM]
September 18, 2012 Filing 32 Filed Appellee Severson And Werson supplemental excerpts of record on appeal in 2 volumes. [8328250] (RH) [Entered: 09/18/2012 02:27 PM]
September 18, 2012 Filing 31 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Date of service: 09/18/2012. [8328180] (Vogel, Karin) [Entered: 09/18/2012 02:12 PM]
September 17, 2012 Filing 30 Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Severson And Werson. Date of service: 09/17/2012. [8326691]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 09/18/2012 by RY] (Chilton, Jan) [Entered: 09/17/2012 04:04 PM]
September 17, 2012 Filing 29 Added attorney Jan T. Chilton for Severson And Werson, in case 12-55496. [8326641] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 09/17/2012 03:51 PM]
September 17, 2012 Filing 28 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jan T. Chilton for Appellee Severson And Werson. Date of service: 09/17/2012. [8326293] (Chilton, Jan) [Entered: 09/17/2012 02:29 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 27 Filed (ECF) Appellees EMC Mortgage Corporation and JPMorgan Chase Bank Correspondence: Confirmation of Extension to File Appellee's Answering Brief. Date of service: 09/14/2012 [8324988] (Perovich, Stefan) [Entered: 09/14/2012 04:41 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 26 Filed (ECF) Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, NA Correspondence: Wells's Fargo Bank's Extension of time to file Appellee's Brief to October 3, 2012. Date of service: 09/14/2012 [8324830] (Hood, Nicholas) [Entered: 09/14/2012 04:10 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 25 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file brief. Appellee TD Services Company answering brief due 10/03/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [8324638] (LN) [Entered: 09/14/2012 03:18 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 24 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file brief. Appellees EMC Mortgage Corporation and JPMorgan Chase Bank answering brief due 10/03/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [8324476] (LN) [Entered: 09/14/2012 02:43 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 23 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file brief. Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, NA answering brief due 10/03/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [8324456] (LN) [Entered: 09/14/2012 02:39 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 22 Filed (ECF) Appellees Wanda Anderson Davis and Leefe Gibbs Sullivan Dupre and Aldous, LLC Correspondence: Correspondence re extension to file brief on behalf of Wanda Anderson Davis and Leefe, Gibbs, Sullivan, Dupre & Aldous, LLC. Date of service: 09/14/2012 [8324051] (Carner, Gretchen) [Entered: 09/14/2012 11:57 AM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Appellees McGlinchey Stafford and Jonathan G. Wilbourn Correspondence: Letter to All Appellants and Appellees requesting an extension pursuant to 31-2.2. Date of service: 09/14/2012 [8323883] (Agle, Daniel) [Entered: 09/14/2012 11:02 AM]
September 13, 2012 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Appellees BAC Home Loans, Inc., Bank of America, NA, Countrywide Home Loans Inc. and Recontrust Company, NA Correspondence: Letter to opposing counsel served on all counsel of record concerning extension pursuant to L.R. 31-2.2. Date of service: 09/13/2012 [8323173] (Abbott, Charles) [Entered: 09/13/2012 03:57 PM]
September 13, 2012 Filing 19 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file brief. Appellees McGlinchey Stafford and Jonathan G. Wilbourn answering brief due 10/03/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [8322877] (LN) [Entered: 09/13/2012 02:42 PM]
September 13, 2012 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Correspondence: Correspondence re extension to file brief on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Co. and OneWest Bank, FSB. Date of service: 09/13/2012 [8322339] (Newman, Brian) [Entered: 09/13/2012 11:26 AM]
September 13, 2012 Filing 17 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file brief. Appellees Wanda Anderson Davis and Leefe Gibbs Sullivan Dupre and Aldous, LLC answering brief due 10/03/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [8322213] (LN) [Entered: 09/13/2012 10:55 AM]
September 12, 2012 Filing 16 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file brief. Appellees BAC Home Loans, Inc., Bank of America, NA, Countrywide Home Loans Inc. and Recontrust Company, NA answering brief due 10/03/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [8321533] (LN) [Entered: 09/12/2012 04:19 PM]
September 12, 2012 Filing 15 14 day oral extension by phone of time to file brief. Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and IndyMac One West Bank answering brief due 10/03/2012. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the appellee brief. [8321424] (LN) [Entered: 09/12/2012 03:42 PM]
August 30, 2012 Filing 14 Added attorney Karin Dougan Vogel for Wells Fargo Bank, NA, in case 12-55496. [8306351] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 08/30/2012 04:22 PM]
August 30, 2012 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Karin Dougan Vogel for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Date of service: 08/30/2012. [8306132] (Vogel, Karin) [Entered: 08/30/2012 03:16 PM]
August 30, 2012 Filing 12 Added attorney Charles H. Abbott, Leslie M. Werlin for Recontrust Company, NA Countrywide Home Loans Inc. BAC Home Loans, Inc. Bank of America, NA, in case 12-55496. [8305260] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 08/30/2012 10:13 AM]
August 30, 2012 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Leslie M. Werlin for Appellees BAC Home Loans, Inc., Bank of America, NA, Countrywide Home Loans Inc. and Recontrust Company, NA. Date of service: 08/30/2012. [8305182] (Abbott, Charles) [Entered: 08/30/2012 09:40 AM]
August 30, 2012 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Charles H. Abbott for Appellees BAC Home Loans, Inc., Bank of America, NA, Countrywide Home Loans Inc. and Recontrust Company, NA. Date of service: 08/30/2012. [8305177] (Abbott, Charles) [Entered: 08/30/2012 09:37 AM]
August 23, 2012 Filing 9 Filed original and 7 copies of Appellants Fernando Arbelaez, Lupi Paulo Edwards, Michael Gilliland, Vien Thi Ho, Arlene Hudson, Imelda Manansala, Al McZeal, Alfred McZeal, Sr., Jamileh Miller and Mark S. Miller (Informal: No) opening brief of 34 pages. Five copies Excerpts of record in 1 volume. Served on 08/20/2012. [8298448] (RH) [Entered: 08/24/2012 10:34 AM]
April 4, 2012 Filing 8 Mail returned on 04/04/2012 addressed to Tommy Encinas, 11532 Pioneer Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650. re: Opening Letter & Briefing Schedule. Reason for return: Not deliverable as addressed. [8128743] (FB) [Entered: 04/05/2012 10:59 AM]
March 27, 2012 Filing 7 Mail returned on 03/27/2012 addressed to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS), 1200 South Pine Island Road, Plantation, FL 33324 re: opening letter & briefing schedule. Reason for return: address unknown [8119741] (FB) [Entered: 03/28/2012 11:34 AM]
March 27, 2012 Filing 6 Mail returned on 03/23/2012 addressed to Pablo Trejo Resendez, re: notice that appeal was opened. Resending to: casefile-no forwarding address. [8117770] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 03/27/2012 09:02 AM]
March 27, 2012 Filing 5 Mail returned on 03/23/2012 addressed to 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC, re: notice that appeal was opened. Resending to: casefile-no forwarding address provided. [8117768] (Turcios, Margoth) [Entered: 03/27/2012 09:01 AM]
March 26, 2012 Filing 4 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 455.00. Date paid: 03/23/2012. [8117126] (HH) [Entered: 03/26/2012 02:46 PM]
March 23, 2012 Filing 3 Mail returned on 02/23/2012 addressed to 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC,@ 433 Camden Dr., Suite 600, Beverly Hills, 90210. Document: Opening Letter & Briefing Schedule. Reason: Attempted, not known. [8115224] (FB) [Entered: 03/23/2012 11:54 AM]
March 23, 2012 Filing 2 Mail returned on 03/23/2012 addressed to Pablo Trejo Resendez @ 616 N. Del Norte Ave., Ontario, CA 91764. Document returned: Opening Letter & Time Schedule Order. Reason: No such number. [8114882] (FB) [Entered: 03/23/2012 09:33 AM]
March 16, 2012 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF APPELLANTS IN PRO PER AND COUNSEL FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellants Al McZeal, et al on 03/13/2012. Transcript ordered by 04/12/2012. Transcript due 07/11/2012. Appellants Al McZeal,et al opening brief due 08/20/2012. Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., et al answering brief due 09/19/2012. Appellants' optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8106662] (FB) [Entered: 03/16/2012 11:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Al McZeal, et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARVIN D. BEAULIEU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PABLO TREJO RESENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH VAN CAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE LUIS PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARACELI GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMMY ENCINAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANERIA MCCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDINA JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE MARQUEZ PENICHE, individually, and on behalf of all other similarly situated individuals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIANA MUNDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD
Represented By: Daniel S. Agle Esquire
Represented By: Heather L. Rosing Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC
Represented By: Leslie M. Werlin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DURIO, MCGOFFIN, STAGG & ACKERMANN, APC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Ackermann Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION, FKA EMC Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Stefan Perovich
Represented By: David Doss Piper Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REX KESSLER
Represented By: Rex Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIDSOUTH NATIONAL BANK, NA, Erroneously Sued As MidSouth Bank, NA
Represented By: Elissa D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP, Erroneously Sued As BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P.
Represented By: Leslie M. Werlin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARONOWITZ & MECKLENBURG
Represented By: Aronowitz & Mecklenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL N. DEBALLION
Represented By: Christopher C. Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INDYMAC ONEWEST BANK, Erroneously Sued As OneWest Bank, FSB
Represented By: Brian H. Newman
Represented By: Jonathan D. Fink
Represented By: James Kevin Snyder Esquire
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEVERSON AND WERSON
Represented By: Sanford Shatz
Represented By: Michael Jan Steiner Esquire
Represented By: Jan T. Chilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA AS TRUSTEE OF THE ABFC 2006-OPT1 TRUST, ASSET BACKED FUNDING CORPORATION ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-OPT1
Represented By: Jonathan D. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MACKIE, WOLF, ZIENZ, MANN, PC.
Represented By: Mackie, Wolf, Zienz, Mann, PC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: POWER DEFAULT SERVICE, Erroneously Sued As Power Default Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Fink
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBALLION AND MILEY, LLP
Represented By: Christopher C. Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY ACKERMANN
Represented By: Jeffrey Ackermann Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN G. WILBOURN
Represented By: Daniel S. Agle Esquire
Represented By: Heather L. Rosing Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.
Represented By: Leslie M. Werlin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC.
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIFTH THIRD BANK
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esquire
Represented By: Jocelyn N. Prewitt-Stanley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA
Represented By: John C. Dineen Esquire
Represented By: Edward D. Vogel Esquire
Represented By: Karin Dougan Vogel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN HENDRICK
Represented By: Susan Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WANDA ANDERSON DAVIS
Represented By: Andrew J. Waxler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: L. JAY ANGELLE, Erroneously Sued As Jay L Angelle
Represented By: Elissa D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALBERT J. MCKNIGHT
Represented By: Albert J. McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE
Represented By: Hayes Michel
Represented By: Robert Neal Webner Esquire
Represented By: Jocelyn N. Prewitt-Stanley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOUTHERN DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION
Represented By: Southern Development Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC BANK USA, N.A., as Trustee for Ace Securities Corp.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Fink
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS (MERS), through their registered Agent - CT Corporation
Represented By: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, NA
Represented By: Leslie M. Werlin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, FKA Bankers Trust Company of California, N.A.
Represented By: Elizabeth Allen Frohlich
Represented By: Brian H. Newman
Represented By: James Kevin Snyder Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Stefan Perovich
Represented By: David Doss Piper Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOUTHERN CONSUMERS COOPERATIVE
Represented By: Southern Consumers Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REGIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: Jonathan D. Fink
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN B. FREEMAN
Represented By: John B. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TD SERVICES COMPANY
Represented By: Lawrence Dreyfuss Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 4 CLOTHES 4 TC, LLC
Represented By: 4 Clothes 4 TC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK, as Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEEFE GIBBS SULLIVAN DUPRE AND ALDOUS, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Waxler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITIMORTGAGE INC.
Represented By: John Nadolenco Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMILEH MILLER
Represented By: Jamileh Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VIEN THI HO
Represented By: Vien Thi Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IMELDA MANANSALA
Represented By: Imelda Manansala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FERNANDO ARBELAEZ
Represented By: Fernando Arbelaez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL GILLILAND
Represented By: Michael Gilliland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AL MCZEAL
Represented By: Al McZeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUPI PAULO EDWARDS
Represented By: Lupi Paulo Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARLENE HUDSON
Represented By: Arlene Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALFRED MCZEAL, Sr.
Represented By: Alfred McZeal Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK S. MILLER
Represented By: Mark S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?