Ira Connor, et al v. LG Display Co., Ltd., et al
Defendant / Appellee: EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CORPORATION, NEC DISPLAY SOLUTIONS OF AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC., KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., TOSHIBA CORPORATION, EPSON ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS COMPANY, LTD., TATUNG COMPANY, SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD., HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC., CMO JAPAN CO., LTD., CHIMEI INNOLUX CORP., SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONICS COMPONENTS, INC., NEXGEN MEDIATECH USA INC., MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LIMITED, TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC., HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD., SANYO CONSUMER ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., LG DISPLAY AMERICA, INC., NEC CORPORATION OF AMERICA, NEC LCD TECHNOLOGIES, LTD., CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES LTD., PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, SHARP CORPORATION, NEC ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD., RENESAS ELECTRONICS AMERICA, CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA, INC., NEC ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC., MITSUI & CO. (U.S.A.), INC., HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATION, LG DISPLAY CO., LTD., CHI MEI CORPORATION, NEC CORPORATION, HITACHI LTD., AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. and TOSHIBA MOBILE DISPLAY CO., LTD.
Not Classified By Court: In re: TFT-LCD, (Flat Panel) Antitrust Litigation
Amicus Curiae: STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, SPECTRUM SETTLEMENT RECOVERY, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF MICHIGAN and STATE OF MISSOURI
Appellant: STEFAN REST, IRA CONNOR ERWIN and LUIS MARIO SANTANA
Plaintiff / Appellee: INDIRECT PLAINTIFF CLASS
Case Number: 13-16793
Filed: September 6, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2014 Filing 73 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: MAC) Appellants motion to voluntarily dismiss these appeals is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [9127933] [12-16780, 12-16782, 12-16788, 13-16793] (SAM) [Entered: 06/11/2014 10:28 AM]
June 10, 2014 Filing 72 Filed (ECF) Appellant Julius Dunmore in 13-15915, Appellant Keena Dale in 13-16216 Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 06/10/2014. [9126693] [13-15915, 13-16216]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread to all cons cases [13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, and 13-16793], resent notice. 06/10/2014 by ASW] (Bacharach, N. Albert) [Entered: 06/10/2014 01:51 PM]
June 10, 2014 Filing 71 Filed (ECF) Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 06/10/2014. [9126198]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread entry to all cons cases, resent notice. 06/10/2014 by ASW] (Bandas, Christopher) [Entered: 06/10/2014 10:44 AM]
May 27, 2014 Filing 70 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [ # 68 ] filed by Ira Conner Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793. [9108784] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (SD) [Entered: 05/27/2014 10:42 AM]
May 20, 2014 Filing 69 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 68 ] submitted by Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9102233] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (GV) [Entered: 05/20/2014 10:24 AM]
May 19, 2014 Filing 68 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793. Date of service: 05/19/2014. [9100939] [13-16793, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF (TOC correction), resent notice. 05/19/2014 by ASW]--[Edited: Attached corrected brief (cover). Resent NDA. 05/21/2014 by RY] (Bandas, Christopher) [Entered: 05/19/2014 01:42 PM]
May 9, 2014 Filing 67 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [ # 65 ] filed by Barbara Cochran, et al in 13-15930. [9089985] [13-15930, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (SD) [Entered: 05/09/2014 01:51 PM]
May 5, 2014 Filing 66 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 65 ] submitted by Barbara Cochran, Kevin Luke, Gerri Marshall, Maria Marshall, Wayne Marshall and Geri Maxwell in 13-15930 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9082241] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (WWP) [Entered: 05/05/2014 07:42 AM]
May 3, 2014 Filing 65 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Barbara Cochran, Kevin Luke, Gerri Marshall, Maria Marshall, Wayne Marshall and Geri Maxwell in 13-15930. Date of service: 05/03/2014. [9082194] [13-15930, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Pentz, John) [Entered: 05/03/2014 02:20 PM]
April 29, 2014 Filing 64 Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [ # 59 ] filed by Alex Martinez, Margot Bradley, and CBC, Inc.. [9079155] [13-15930, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (SD) [Entered: 05/01/2014 09:46 AM]
April 24, 2014 Filing 63 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: cag): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Julius Dunmore, Appellant Keena Dale in 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-16216 The reply brief is due 05/19/2014,. [9071633] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (CG) [Entered: 04/24/2014 03:32 PM]
April 23, 2014 Filing 62 Filed (ECF) Appellant Julius Dunmore in 13-15915, Appellant Keena Dale in 13-16216 Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 05/19/2014 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 04/23/2014. [9070390] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Bacharach, N. Albert) [Entered: 04/23/2014 06:08 PM]
April 23, 2014 Filing 61 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [ # 50 ] filed by Spectrum Settlement Recovery. [9069388] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (SD) [Entered: 04/23/2014 11:17 AM]
April 22, 2014 Filing 60 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 59 ] submitted by Alex Martinez and Margot Bradley is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9066976] [13-15930, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (WWP) [Entered: 04/22/2014 09:14 AM]
April 18, 2014 Filing 59 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Alex Martinez in 13-15916, Appellant Margot Bradley in 13-15917, Appellant CBC, Inc. in 13-15920. Date of service: 04/18/2014. [9064345] [13-15930, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920]--[Edited: Spread docket text to 13-16216, 13-16793, 13-15934, 13-15915. Resent NDA. 04/22/2014 by RY] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 04/18/2014 03:56 PM]
April 17, 2014 Filing 58 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus brief [ # 49 ] filed by State of Arkansas, et al. [9062482] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (SD) [Entered: 04/17/2014 02:43 PM]
April 14, 2014 Filing 57 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 49 ] submitted by State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of New York, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9057241] [13-15930, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (WWP) [Entered: 04/14/2014 03:01 PM]
April 14, 2014 Filing 56 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae State of Missouri, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Michigan, State of New York, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin [9057219] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (WWP) [Entered: 04/14/2014 02:56 PM]
April 14, 2014 Filing 55 Streamlined request [54] by Appellants Shannon Cashion, Kelly Kress, W. Christopher McDonough and Mark Schulte in 13-15934 to extend time to file the REPLY brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule due 5/19/14 [9056529] [13-15934, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-16216, 13-16793] (LN) [Entered: 04/14/2014 11:17 AM]
April 14, 2014 Filing 54 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Reply Brief by Appellants Shannon Cashion, Kelly Kress, W. Christopher McDonough and Mark Schulte in 13-15934. New requested due date is 05/19/2014 at 11:59 pm. [9056384] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Miller, Steve) [Entered: 04/14/2014 10:34 AM]
April 14, 2014 Filing 52 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending Spectrum Settlement Recovery. [9056009] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (WWP) [Entered: 04/14/2014 07:55 AM]
April 14, 2014 Filing 51 Filed Appellee Indirect Plaintiff Class paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 44 ] in 2 volume(s). [9055987] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (WWP) [Entered: 04/14/2014 07:13 AM]
April 11, 2014 Filing 53 Received 7 paper copies of Answering brief [ # 44 ] filed by Indirect Plaintiff Class. [9056230] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (SD) [Entered: 04/14/2014 09:47 AM]
April 11, 2014 Filing 50 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Spectrum Settlement Recovery. Date of service: 04/11/2014. [9055917] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Lewis, Eric) [Entered: 04/11/2014 05:29 PM]
April 11, 2014 Filing 49 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Amicus States of Missouri, Arkansas, Florida, Michigan, New York, West Virginia and Wisconsin. Date of service: 04/11/2014. [9055235] [13-15930, 13-15916, 13-15920, 13-15934]--[COURT UPDATE: spread to consolidated cases 13-15915, 13-15917, 13-16216 and 13-16793. 04/11/2014 by SS]--[Edited: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing (brief only). 04/14/2014 by RY] (Layton, James) [Entered: 04/11/2014 02:08 PM]
April 11, 2014 Filing 48 Terminated Kimberly Linnell Taylor for Epson Imaging Devices Corporation in 13-15915, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation in 13-15916, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation in 13-15917, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation in 13-15920, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation in 13-15930, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation in 13-15934, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation in 13-16216 and Epson Imaging Devices Corporation in 13-16793 (Csl no longer w/firm) [9054614] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (ASW) [Entered: 04/11/2014 10:48 AM]
April 11, 2014 Filing 47 ENTRY UPDATED Streamlined request [41] by Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793 to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: the reply brief is due 5/19/2014. [9054553] [13-16793, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216] [9054553] [13-16793, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216]--[Edited 04/11/2014 by LBS] (LBS) [Entered: 04/11/2014 10:33 AM]
April 10, 2014 Filing 46 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Reply Brief by Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana. New requested due date is 05/19/2014. [9053933] (Bandas, Christopher) [Entered: 04/10/2014 04:07 PM]
April 7, 2014 Filing 45 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 44 ] submitted by Indirect Plaintiff Class is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [ # 44 ] submitted by Indirect Plaintiff Class in 13-15915. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9046070] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (WWP) [Entered: 04/07/2014 07:20 AM]
April 4, 2014 Filing 44 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellee Indirect Plaintiff Class in 13-15915. Date of service: 04/04/2014. [9045915] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Corbitt, Craig) [Entered: 04/04/2014 05:02 PM]
February 27, 2014 Filing 43 Streamlined request [41] by Appellee Indirect Plaintiff Class in 13-15917, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793 to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellee Indirect Plaintiff Class answering brief due 04/04/2014. The optional reply brief is due 14 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [8996245] [13-15917, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (LN) [Entered: 02/27/2014 03:15 PM]
February 27, 2014 Filing 42 Deleted Incorrect Entry. See Correct Entry [43]. (LN) [Entered: 02/27/2014 09:58 AM]
February 26, 2014 Filing 41 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee Indirect Plaintiff Class in 13-15917. New requested due date is 04/04/2014 at 05:00 pm. [8994740] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Clayton, Patrick) [Entered: 02/26/2014 06:56 PM]
February 18, 2014 Filing 40 Filed (ECF) Appellant Julius Dunmore in 13-15915, Appellant Keena Dale in 13-16216 reply to response (motion to supplement record on appeal, ). Date of service: 02/18/2014. [8982514] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Bacharach, N. Albert) [Entered: 02/18/2014 04:59 PM]
February 7, 2014 Filing 38 Terminated Courtney Lynn Landis for Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc. and Hitachi Displays, Ltd. [8970032] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (SYS) [Entered: 02/07/2014 09:51 AM]
February 6, 2014 Filing 39 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [ # 33 ] filed by Julius Dunmore in 13-15915 and Keena Dale in 13-16216. [8970373] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (SD) [Entered: 02/07/2014 11:33 AM]
February 6, 2014 Filing 37 Filed Appellant Julius Dunmore in 13-15915, Appellant Keena Dale in 13-16216 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 33 ] in 1 volume. [8969727] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (WWP) [Entered: 02/07/2014 07:34 AM]
February 6, 2014 Filing 36 Terminated Appellees Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV and Philips Electronics North America Corporation. [8968339] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (AF) [Entered: 02/06/2014 10:08 AM]
February 6, 2014 Filing 35 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CAG): The court is in receipt Koninklijke Phillips Electronices N.V. and North America Corporations motion to amend the caption. The motion is granted. The Clerk shall remove the above named from the caption and service list. [8968333] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (AF) [Entered: 02/06/2014 10:06 AM]
February 4, 2014 Filing 34 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 33 ] submitted by Julius Dunmore in 13-15915, Keena Dale in 13-16216 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 33 ] submitted by Julius Dunmore in 13-15915, Keena Dale in 13-16216. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8964292] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (WWP) [Entered: 02/04/2014 07:31 AM]
February 3, 2014 Filing 33 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellant Julius Dunmore in 13-15915, Appellant Keena Dale in 13-16216. Date of service: 02/03/2014. [8964226] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Bacharach, N. Albert) [Entered: 02/03/2014 09:25 PM]
January 30, 2014 Filing 32 Filed (ECF) Appellees Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV and Philips Electronics North America Corporation in 13-15915 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Amend the Caption]. Date of service: 01/30/2014. [8959449] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Cullen, Brendan) [Entered: 01/30/2014 12:49 PM]
January 30, 2014 Filing 31 Attorneys Matthew Scott Fitzwater substituted by Attorney Brendan Peter Cullen. [8958991] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (EL) [Entered: 01/30/2014 10:16 AM]
January 30, 2014 Filing 30 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brendan P. Cullen for Appellees Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV and Philips Electronics North America Corporation in 13-15915. Date of service: 01/30/2014. [8958946] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Cullen, Brendan) [Entered: 01/30/2014 10:03 AM]
January 16, 2014 Filing 29 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellant Bradleys opposed motion for leave to file sur-reply regarding appellees motion for summary disposition, filed in appeal No. 13-15917, is denied. Appellees motion for summary affirmance, filed in appeal Nos. 13-15916, 13-15917, and 13-15920, is denied. Appellees counsel Joseph M. Aliotos motion to retain separate counsel to file a brief in response to the motion for leave to supplekent the record on appeal with the supplemental declaration of William M. Balin is denied. Mr. Alioto is not a party to these consolidated appeals. Appellees may file an opposition to appellants Dunmore and Dales motion for leave to supplement the record within 21 days after the date of this order. Appellants Dunmore and Dales motion for leave to supplement the record on appeal with the supplemental declaration of William M. Balin, and any opposition and reply thereto, is referred to the panel assigned to decide the merits of this appeal for whatever consideration the panel deems appropriate. The parties are reminded that these are consolidated appeals, and that submissions to the court shall be filed in the consolidated dockets. All filings must also bear all consolidated appeal numbers. Appellants Dunmore and Dales motion for an extension of time to file their opening briefs is granted. Appellants Dunmore and Dales opening brief in appeal Nos. 13-15915 and 13-16216, are now due February 3, 2014. The answering brief(s) in these consolidated appeals are due March 5, 2014; and the optional reply brief(s) are due within 14 days after service of the consolidated answering brief(s). All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the greatest extent practicable. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. (MOATT) [8940915] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (AF) [Entered: 01/16/2014 09:52 AM]
January 13, 2014 Filing 28 Filed order MEDIATION (MAC): The briefing schedule previously set for these consolidated appeals is vacated pending the courts disposition of appellees motion for summary affirmance, filed October 23, 2013, and the appellants motion for an extension of time for filing the opening briefs in appeal nos. 13-15915 and 13-16216, filed December 10, 2013. Both pending motions will be addressed by separate order. [8934439] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (AF) [Entered: 01/13/2014 09:01 AM]
December 26, 2013 Filing 27 Filed Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 22 ] in 5 volume(s). [8917834] [13-16793, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216] (GV) [Entered: 12/27/2013 11:47 AM]
December 26, 2013 Filing 26 Received 7 paper copies of Opening brief [ # 22 ] filed by Ira Conner Erwin, Stefan Rest, and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793. [8917082] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (SD) [Entered: 12/26/2013 03:06 PM]
December 20, 2013 Filing 25 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 22 ] submitted by Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 22 ] submitted by Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8911495] [13-16793, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216] (GV) [Entered: 12/20/2013 02:35 PM]
December 15, 2013 Filing 23 Filed (ECF) Appellant Keena Dale in 13-16216 Motion to supplement record on appeal. Date of service: 12/15/2013. [8901793] [13-16216, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16793] (Bacharach, N. Albert) [Entered: 12/15/2013 03:07 PM]
December 13, 2013 Filing 22 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and further excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana. Date of service: 12/13/2013. [8900462]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread entry to cons cases, resent notice. 12/17/2013 by ASW] (Bandas, Christopher) [Entered: 12/13/2013 10:22 AM]
December 10, 2013 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Appellant Keena Dale in 13-16216, Appellant Julius Dunmore in 13-15915 Joint Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 01/24/2014 at 11:55 pm. Date of service: 12/10/2013. [8896680] [13-16216, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16793] (Bacharach, N. Albert) [Entered: 12/10/2013 05:42 PM]
November 27, 2013 Filing 20 ENTRY UPDATED. ORIGINAL TEXT: Streamlined request [19] by Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793 to extend time to file the brief is VACATED. [8882162] [13-16793, 13-15915, 13-1591pursuant to the 10/11/13 order] S. [8882162] [13-16793, 13-15915, 13-15916]--[Edited 12/02/2013 by LKK] (LKK) [Entered: 11/27/2013 04:45 PM]
November 26, 2013 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana. New requested due date is 01/13/2014 at 11:59 pm. [8879507] (Bandas, Christopher) [Entered: 11/26/2013 01:34 PM]
November 18, 2013 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) Appellant Margot Bradley in 13-15917, Appellant Alex Martinez in 13-15916, Appellant CBC, Inc. in 13-15920 reply to response (). Date of service: 11/18/2013. [8866082] [13-15917, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:33 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Appellant Margot Bradley in 13-15917, Appellant Alex Martinez in 13-15916, Appellant CBC, Inc. in 13-15920 reply to response (, ,motion for summary affirmance). Date of service: 11/14/2013. [8862551] [13-15917, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 11/14/2013 01:30 PM]
November 4, 2013 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex Martinez in 13-15916, Appellant Margot Bradley in 13-15917, Appellant CBC, Inc. in 13-15920 response to motion (,motion for summary affirmance). Date of service: 11/04/2013. [8849856] [13-15916, 13-15915, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 11/04/2013 07:50 PM]
October 31, 2013 Filing 15 Terminated Daniel Suleiman for Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15915, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15917, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15920, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15930, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15934 and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. in 13-16216 (For failure to register for ECF). [8845369] [13-15934, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-16216, 13-16793] (HC) [Entered: 10/31/2013 11:41 AM]
October 29, 2013 Filing 14 Terminated Daniel Suleiman for Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15916 (for failure to register for ECF) [8841108] [13-15930, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (IV) [Entered: 10/29/2013 10:41 AM]
October 28, 2013 Filing 13 Added attorney Jack Wing Lee for Indirect Plaintiff Class. [8839126] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (EL) [Entered: 10/28/2013 11:21 AM]
October 28, 2013 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jack W. Lee for Appellee Indirect Plaintiff Class in 13-15916. Date of service: 10/28/2013. [8839094] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Lee, Jack) [Entered: 10/28/2013 11:14 AM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 11 (Per Order Filed 10/22/2013) ****** COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [xxxxxxx-2]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Plaintiff Class in 13-15916 Motion for summary affirmance. Date of service: 10/17/2013. [8824760] [13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread entry to cons cases, replaced PDFs (footnotes), resent notice. 10/18/2013 by ASW] (Shulman, Daniel) [Entered: 10/17/2013 10:20 AM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 10 Added attorney Daniel Rees Shulman for Indirect Plaintiff Class. [8824182] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (EL) [Entered: 10/16/2013 04:51 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel R. Shulman for Appellee Indirect Plaintiff Class in 13-15915. Date of service: 10/16/2013. [8824139] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (Shulman, Daniel) [Entered: 10/16/2013 04:40 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 8 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GSS): The appellants motion to consolidate is granted. Appeal Nos. 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, and 13-16793 are consolidated. The opening briefs in Nos. 13-15916, 13-15917, and 13-15920 were filed on August 20, 2013. The opening briefs in No. 13-15930 and 13-15934 were filed on September 10, 2013. The opening briefs in Nos. 13-15915, 13-16216, and 13-16793 are due December 13, 2013. The class plaintiffs motion to file a consolidated answering brief of 28,000 words is denied without prejudice to a renewed motion accompanied by a copy of the proposed oversized brief. See 9th Cir R. 32-2. The consolidated answering brief is due January 13, 2014. The optional reply briefs are due within 30 days after service of the consolidated answering brief. Any motion for an extension of time to file a brief is disfavored and must be made under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). [8818821] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (AF) [Entered: 10/11/2013 11:38 AM]
September 19, 2013 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Plaintiff Class Motion to consolidate cases 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793. Date of service: 09/19/2013. [8788792] (Scarpulla, Francis) [Entered: 09/19/2013 10:19 AM]
September 18, 2013 Filing 6 Terminated Appellees NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation and NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. [8787292] [13-15365, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (HH) [Entered: 09/18/2013 10:01 AM]
September 18, 2013 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CB): The motions of Appellants Dunmore and Dale in Nos. 13-15915 and 13- 16216 for a limited remand is denied. The denial is without prejudice to a renewed motion that demonstrates the district court has indicated that it would grant or entertain the motion. Fed. R. App. P. 12.1. Briefing in Nos. 13-15915 and 13- 16216 is amended as follows: the opening briefs are due October 18, 2013; the answering briefs are due November 18, 2013 and the optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the answering briefs. The briefing schedules in the remainder of the above captioned cases remain in place. The motion in No. 13-15930 to be exempted from the requirement to include the district court docket sheet in the excerpts is granted. NEC Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Display Solutions of America Renesas Electronic American, NEC Corporation of America, and NEC Electronics Corporations (The NEC Entities), motion to amend the caption is granted. The NEC Entities shall be removed from the caption of this case and shall be removed from the service list. [8787218] [13-15365, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (SAM) [Entered: 09/18/2013 09:44 AM]
September 13, 2013 Filing 4 Terminated participation of Court Reporter James Jonathan Yeomans in this case. [8782293] (ASW) [Entered: 09/13/2013 04:03 PM]
September 10, 2013 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/10/2013. [8775913] (Bandas, Christopher) [Entered: 09/10/2013 10:55 AM]
September 6, 2013 Filing 2 Terminated Daniel Suleiman for Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. at his request. [8771810] (GR) [Entered: 09/06/2013 11:10 AM]
September 6, 2013 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/13/2013. Transcript ordered by 10/04/2013. Transcript due 11/04/2013. Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana opening brief due 12/13/2013. Appellees AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chimei Innolux Corp., Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Indirect Plaintiff Class, Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV, LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited, Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Renesas Electronics America, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD. and Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. answering brief due 01/13/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8771391] (GR) [Entered: 09/06/2013 09:07 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ira Connor, et al v. LG Display Co., Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Represented By: Stephen E. Taylor Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEC DISPLAY SOLUTIONS OF AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: James McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: William Farmer Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EPSON ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Melvin R. Goldman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS COMPANY, LTD.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TATUNG COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: William Farmer Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Represented By: James McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CMO JAPAN CO., LTD.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Harrison Frahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIMEI INNOLUX CORP.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Harrison Frahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Anne Kaldor Sauro
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONICS COMPONENTS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEXGEN MEDIATECH USA INC.
Represented By: Harrison Frahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LIMITED
Represented By: Peter W. James Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANYO CONSUMER ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Sam Dawood Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LG DISPLAY AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Holly Adele House Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEC CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEC LCD TECHNOLOGIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES LTD.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: William Farmer Esquire
Represented By: Rachel Susan Brass
Represented By: Joel Steven Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHARP CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Anne Kaldor Sauro
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEC ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RENESAS ELECTRONICS AMERICA
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Harrison Frahn
Represented By: Jake J. Ewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEC ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MITSUI & CO. (U.S.A.), INC.
Represented By: Ernest Eugene Vargo Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATION
Represented By: Jerry Chen Esquire
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Donald H. Mullins Esquire
Represented By: Ismail Ramsey
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LG DISPLAY CO., LTD.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Hailyn Jennifer Chen
Represented By: Holly Adele House Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHI MEI CORPORATION
Represented By: Harrison Frahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI LTD.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Martha Ann Boersch Esquire
Represented By: Allison M. Dibley Esquire
Represented By: Kirk Christopher Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA MOBILE DISPLAY CO., LTD.
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: TFT-LCD, (Flat Panel) Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Lizabeth A. Brady Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: Gwendolyn Jean Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SPECTRUM SETTLEMENT RECOVERY
Represented By: Eric L. Lewis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Amy McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: Douglas L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Kevin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: M. Elizabeth Lippitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By: James Robert Layton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STEFAN REST
Represented By: Christopher Andres Bandas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: IRA CONNOR ERWIN
Represented By: Christopher Andres Bandas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LUIS MARIO SANTANA
Represented By: Christopher Andres Bandas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INDIRECT PLAINTIFF CLASS
Represented By: Qianwei Fu
Represented By: Judith Zahid
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire
Represented By: Patrick B. Clayton
Represented By: John Bogdanov
Represented By: Craig C. Corbitt Esquire
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto
Represented By: Josef Cooper
Represented By: Theresa D. Moore Esquire
Represented By: Heather Thompson Rankie
Represented By: Tracy Rena Kirkham
Represented By: Daniel Rees Shulman Esquire
Represented By: Jack Wing Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?