Victoria Yeager v. Ed Bowlin, et al
Plaintiff: AT&T MOBILITY, LLC
Defendant: LESSER LAW GROUP, AVIATION AUTOGRAPHS, BOWLIN & ASSOCIATES, INC., ED BOWLIN and CONNIE BOWLIN
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: VICTORIA YEAGER
Case Number: 17-17261
Filed: November 3, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Filing 3 MANDATE ISSUED. (AWT, WAF and RCT) [10685331] (JFF) [Entered: 12/11/2017 09:25 AM]
November 17, 2017 Filing 2 Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and RICHARD C. TALLMAN) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with rule); see also Hyan v. Hummer, 825 F 3d 1043, 1047 (9th Cir. 2016) (ordinary rules of finality applied to deny appeal from order that struck one defendant only, since grant of anti-SLAPP motion could be fully reviewed on appeal of final judgment). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [10658509] (OC) [Entered: 11/17/2017 11:17 AM]
November 3, 2017 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 11/29/2017. Transcript due 12/29/2017. Appellant Victoria Yeager opening brief due 02/08/2018. Appellees Aviation Autographs, Connie Bowlin, Ed Bowlin, Bowlin & Associates, Inc., Lesser Law Group and Parsons Behle & Latimer answering brief due 03/09/2018. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10643585] (RT) [Entered: 11/03/2017 04:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Victoria Yeager v. Ed Bowlin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER
Represented By: Brook Bernard Bond
Represented By: Kennedy K. Luvai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: VICTORIA YEAGER
Represented By: Victoria Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T MOBILITY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESSER LAW GROUP
Represented By: Don A. Lesser Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVIATION AUTOGRAPHS
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOWLIN & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ED BOWLIN
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE BOWLIN
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?