Institute for Free Speech v. Xavier Becerra

Defendant / Appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Plaintiff / Appellant: INSTITUTE FOR FREE SPEECH, FKA Center for Competitive Politics
Amicus Curiae: THE PHILANTHROPY ROUNDTABLE, FREE SPEECH COALITION and FREE SPEECH DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Case Number: 17-17403
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2018 28 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: PK): No judge has requested a vote to hear this case initially en banc within the time allowed by GO 5.2(a). The petition for initial hearing en banc (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) is therefore denied. [10976846] (AF) [Entered: 08/14/2018 03:26 PM]
June 21, 2018 27 Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra reply to response (). Date of service: 06/21/2018. [10917231] [17-17403] (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) [Entered: 06/21/2018 11:02 AM]
June 18, 2018 26 Filed (ECF) Appellant Institute for Free Speech response opposing motion ([ # 25 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 25 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for summary affirmance). Date of service: 06/18/2018. [10912880] [17-17403] (Dickerson, Allen) [Entered: 06/18/2018 03:36 PM]
June 8, 2018 25 Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra Motion for summary affirmance. Date of service: 06/08/2018. [10902408] [17-17403] (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) [Entered: 06/08/2018 02:20 PM]
May 4, 2018 24 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Granting unopposed motion [ # 23 ] to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee Xavier Becerra Appellee Xavier Becerra answering brief due 06/08/2018. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10862349] (SAM) [Entered: 05/04/2018 02:33 PM]
May 3, 2018 23 Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 06/08/2018. Date of service: 05/03/2018. [10861077] [17-17403] (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose) [Entered: 05/03/2018 03:27 PM]
March 26, 2018 22 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 14 ] filed by Free Speech Defense and Education Fund and Free Speech Coalition. [10812653] (SD) [Entered: 03/26/2018 02:05 PM]
March 21, 2018 21 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 13 ] filed by The Philanthropy Roundtable. [10807341] (SD) [Entered: 03/21/2018 01:22 PM]
March 20, 2018 20 Added attorney Zac Morgan for Institute for Free Speech, in case 17-17403. [10804779] (CW) [Entered: 03/20/2018 09:07 AM]
March 19, 2018 19 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 14 ] submitted by Free Speech Defense and Education Fund and Free Speech Coalition is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10804532] (LA) [Entered: 03/19/2018 05:19 PM]
March 19, 2018 18 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 13 ] submitted by The Philanthropy Roundtable is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10804531] (LA) [Entered: 03/19/2018 05:18 PM]
March 19, 2018 17 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae The Philanthropy Roundtable, Free Speech Defense and Education Fund, and Free Speech Coalition. [10804530] (LA) [Entered: 03/19/2018 05:17 PM]
March 19, 2018 16 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Zachary Robert Morgan for Appellant Institute for Free Speech. Date of service: 03/19/2018. [10803380] [17-17403] (Morgan, Zac) [Entered: 03/19/2018 11:50 AM]
March 16, 2018 14 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Free Speech Defense and Education Fund and Free Speech Coalition. Date of service: 03/16/2018. [10802432] [17-17403] (Titus, Herbert) [Entered: 03/16/2018 05:21 PM]
March 16, 2018 13 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by The Philanthropy Roundtable. Date of service: 03/16/2018. [10801754] [17-17403] (Ho, Allyson) [Entered: 03/16/2018 01:51 PM]
March 16, 2018 12 Streamlined request [10] by Appellee Xavier Becerra to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellee Xavier Becerra answering brief due 05/09/2018. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [10800694] (LW) [Entered: 03/16/2018 07:53 AM]
March 15, 2018 15 Filed 4 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 5 ] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellant Institute for Free Speech. [10802526] (LA) [Entered: 03/16/2018 06:33 PM]
March 15, 2018 11 Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 4 ] filed by Institute for Free Speech. [10800529] (DB) [Entered: 03/15/2018 05:00 PM]
March 15, 2018 10 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee Xavier Becerra. New requested due date is 05/09/2018. [10800528] [17-17403] (Pachter, Tamar) [Entered: 03/15/2018 04:59 PM]
March 15, 2018 9 Attorney Kevin A. Calia in 17-17403 substituted by Attorney Tamar Pachter in 17-17403 [10800422] (NAC) [Entered: 03/15/2018 04:18 PM]
March 15, 2018 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tamar Pachter for Appellee Xavier Becerra. Date of service: 03/15/2018. [10800410] [17-17403] (Pachter, Tamar) [Entered: 03/15/2018 04:15 PM]
March 12, 2018 7 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 4 ] submitted by Institute for Free Speech is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 5 ] submitted by Institute for Free Speech. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10794962] (LA) [Entered: 03/12/2018 02:38 PM]
March 9, 2018 6 Filed (ECF) Appellant Institute for Free Speech Motion for miscellaneous relief [Petition for Initial Hearing En Banc]. Date of service: 03/09/2018. [10793796] [17-17403] (Dickerson, Allen) [Entered: 03/09/2018 11:38 PM]
March 9, 2018 5 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Institute for Free Speech. Date of service: 03/09/2018. [10793794] [17-17403] (Dickerson, Allen) [Entered: 03/09/2018 11:11 PM]
March 9, 2018 4 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Institute for Free Speech. Date of service: 03/09/2018. [10793793] [17-17403] (Dickerson, Allen) [Entered: 03/09/2018 11:06 PM]
December 18, 2017 3 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [10693875] (VS) [Entered: 12/18/2017 10:40 AM]
December 7, 2017 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Institute for Free Speech Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/07/2017. [10681923] [17-17403] (Dickerson, Allen) [Entered: 12/07/2017 09:44 AM]
November 30, 2017 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/07/2017. Transcript ordered by 12/29/2017. Transcript due 01/29/2018. Appellant Institute for Free Speech opening brief due 03/09/2018. Appellee Xavier Becerra answering brief due 04/09/2018. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10672764] (RT) [Entered: 11/30/2017 09:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Institute for Free Speech v. Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Jose Zelidon-Zepeda
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Represented By: Kevin A. Calia
Represented By: Tamar Pachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: INSTITUTE FOR FREE SPEECH, FKA Center for Competitive Politics
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: Allen J. Dickerson
Represented By: Zac Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE PHILANTHROPY ROUNDTABLE
Represented By: Allyson Newton Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FREE SPEECH COALITION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FREE SPEECH DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?