Guillermo Robles v. Dominos Pizza LLC
Amicus Curiae: NATIONAL FEDERATION OF THE BLIND, AMERICAN COUNCIL OF THE BLIND; AMERICAN FOUNDATION FOR THE BLIND; ASSOCIATION OF LATE DEAFENED ADULTS; CALIFORNIA COUNCIL OF THE BLIND; CALIFORNIA FOUNDATION FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING CENTERS; DISABILITY RIGHTS ADVOCATE, ATLANTIC LEGAL FOUNDATION and THE RESTAURANT LAW CENTER, AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION; AMERICAN HOTEL & LODGING ASSOCIATION; AMERICAN RESORT DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION; ASIAN AMERICAN HOTEL OWNERS ASSOCIATION; CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; INTERNATIONAL COUNCI
Plaintiff / Appellant: GUILLERMO ROBLES, an individual
Defendant / Appellee: DOMINO'S PIZZA, LLC, a limited liability corporation
Case Number: 17-55504
Filed: April 13, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 70 Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 18-1539 Filed on: 06/13/2019 Cert Petition Action 1: Denied, 10/07/2019 [11459803] (RL) [Entered: 10/09/2019 03:10 PM]
June 14, 2019 Filing 69 Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 18-1539 Filed on: 06/13/2019 Cert Petition Action 1: Pending [11332204] (JFF) [Entered: 06/14/2019 02:27 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 68 Received letter from the Supreme Court dated 03/06/2019.The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kagan, who on March 6, 2019, extended the time to and including June 14, 2019. [11227324] (JFF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:02 AM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 67 MANDATE ISSUED.(PJW, JBO and JGZ) [11180436] (CW) [Entered: 02/06/2019 07:07 AM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 66 FILED OPINION (PAUL J. WATFORD, JOHN B. OWENS and JENNIFER G. ZIPPS) REVERSED AND REMANDED. Judge: JBO Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [11153060] (RMM) [Entered: 01/15/2019 07:43 AM]
October 15, 2018 Filing 65 Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [11046559] (Witt, Dusty) [Entered: 10/15/2018 10:28 AM]
October 12, 2018 Filing 64 ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO PAUL J. WATFORD, JOHN B. OWENS and JENNIFER G. ZIPPS. [11045187] (Witt, Dusty) [Entered: 10/12/2018 12:58 PM]
October 1, 2018 Filing 63 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 25 ] submitted by The Restaurant Law Center, et al. is filed. No additional paper copies are required at this time. [11031361] (LA) [Entered: 10/01/2018 05:40 PM]
October 1, 2018 Filing 62 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 24 ] submitted by Atlantic Legal Foundation is filed. No additional paper copies are required at this time. [11031359] (LA) [Entered: 10/01/2018 05:38 PM]
October 1, 2018 Filing 61 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 12 ] submitted by National Federation of the Blind, et al. is filed. No additional paper copies are required at this time. [11031356] (LA) [Entered: 10/01/2018 05:37 PM]
October 1, 2018 Filing 60 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: WL): Appellants requests for judicial notice (Dkt. Nos. [ # 10 ], [ # 35 ]) are granted. Appellees request for judicial notice (Dkt. No. [ # 21 ]) is granted. [11030388] (WL) [Entered: 10/01/2018 12:02 PM]
October 1, 2018 Filing 59 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: WL): The motion of the National Federation of the Blind, et al., to participate in this appeal and file a brief as amici curiae (Dkt. No. [ # 12 ]) is granted. The motion of the Atlantic Legal Foundation to participate in this appeal and file a brief as amicus curiae (Dkt. No. [ # 24 ]) is granted. The motion of the Restaurant Law Center, et al., to participate in this appeal and file a brief as amici curiae (Dkt. No. [ # 25 ]) is granted. [11030361] (WL) [Entered: 10/01/2018 11:53 AM]
September 27, 2018 Filing 58 Filed (ECF) Appellant Guillermo Robles citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/27/2018. [11027832] [17-55504] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 09/27/2018 02:33 PM]
September 27, 2018 Filing 57 Filed (ECF) Appellant Guillermo Robles citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/27/2018. [11027829] [17-55504] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 09/27/2018 02:32 PM]
September 27, 2018 Filing 56 Filed (ECF) Appellant Guillermo Robles citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/27/2018. [11027788] [17-55504] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 09/27/2018 02:19 PM]
September 26, 2018 Filing 55 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): At the hearing, the parties should be prepared to discuss the Department of Justices withdrawal on December 26, 2017, of its Advanced Notice of Proposed Rulemaking regarding the accessibility of websites of public accommodations. 82 Fed. Reg. 60932 (Dec. 26, 2017). [11026459] (AF) [Entered: 09/26/2018 02:02 PM]
September 25, 2018 Filing 54 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Joseph R. Manning for Appellant Guillermo Robles. [11024403] [17-55504] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 09/25/2018 11:46 AM]
September 11, 2018 Filing 53 Filed (ECF) Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/11/2018. [11007382] [17-55504] (Hurley, Gregory) [Entered: 09/11/2018 11:25 AM]
September 6, 2018 Filing 52 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Eve Hill, Esquire for Amicus Curiae - Pending National Federation of the Blind. [11003172] [17-55504] (Hill, Eve) [Entered: 09/06/2018 02:04 PM]
September 5, 2018 Filing 51 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): Amici Curiaes motion for leave to participate in oral argument on October 12, 2018, is granted. As requested, five minutes of Appellants argument time will be allocated to amici. [11001727] (AF) [Entered: 09/05/2018 02:32 PM]
August 27, 2018 Filing 50 Filed (ECF) Appellant Guillermo Robles citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/27/2018. [10991417] [17-55504]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of letter. 08/27/2018 by RY] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 08/27/2018 03:50 PM]
August 27, 2018 Filing 49 Filed (ECF) Appellant Guillermo Robles citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/27/2018. [10991412] [17-55504]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of letter. 08/27/2018 by RY] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 08/27/2018 03:49 PM]
August 27, 2018 Filing 48 Filed (ECF) Appellant Guillermo Robles citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/27/2018. [10991407] [17-55504]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of letter. 08/27/2018 by RY] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 08/27/2018 03:48 PM]
August 27, 2018 Filing 47 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae - Pending National Federation of the Blind Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Leave to Participate in Oral Argument]. Date of service: 08/27/2018. [10990956] [17-55504] (Hill, Eve) [Entered: 08/27/2018 02:16 PM]
August 6, 2018 Filing 46 Filed (ECF) Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/06/2018. [10967590] [17-55504] (Hurley, Gregory) [Entered: 08/06/2018 02:30 PM]
August 2, 2018 Filing 45 Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Gregory Francis Hurley, Esquire for Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC. [10964379] [17-55504] (Hurley, Gregory) [Entered: 08/02/2018 03:35 PM]
July 30, 2018 Filing 44 Notice of Oral Argument on Friday, October 12, 2018 - 9:30 am - Courtroom 3 - Pasadena CA. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). When you have reviewed the calendar, download the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form and within 21 days of Friday, October 12, 2018, file the completed form via Appellate CM/ECF. [10959386] (AW) [Entered: 07/30/2018 01:43 PM]
June 27, 2018 Filing 43 Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae - Pending Atlantic Legal Foundation Correspondence: Regarding availability for oral argument.. Date of service: 06/27/2018 [10924067] [17-55504] (Lumpkin, Carol) [Entered: 06/27/2018 11:42 AM]
June 13, 2018 Filing 42 This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in Pasadena Please review the Pasadena sitting dates for October 2018 and the two subsequent sitting months in that location at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions . If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please inform the court within 3 days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : regarding availability for oral argument). When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date. If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : request for mediation).[10907073] (AW) [Entered: 06/13/2018 11:41 AM]
April 23, 2018 Filing 41 Filed (ECF) Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC Correspondence: Defendant, Appellee's Availability for oral argument. Date of service: 04/23/2018 [10847664] [17-55504] (Hurley, Gregory) [Entered: 04/23/2018 05:26 PM]
April 20, 2018 Filing 40 This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in Pasadena Please review the Pasadena sitting dates for August 2018 and the two subsequent sitting months in that location at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions . If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please inform the court within 3 days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : regarding availability for oral argument). When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date. If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : request for mediation).[10844871] (AW) [Entered: 04/20/2018 12:57 PM]
February 20, 2018 Filing 39 Received 7 paper copies of Reply Brief [ # 34 ] filed by Guillermo Robles. [10771013] (SD) [Entered: 02/21/2018 09:57 AM]
February 20, 2018 Filing 38 Filed (ECF) Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC Correspondence: Availability for Oral Argument. Date of service: 02/20/2018 [10769468] [17-55504] (Hurley, Gregory) [Entered: 02/20/2018 12:08 PM]
February 16, 2018 Filing 37 This case is being considered for an upcoming oral argument calendar in Pasadena Please review the Pasadena sitting dates for June 2018 and the two subsequent sitting months in that location at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/court_sessions . If you have an unavoidable conflict on any of the dates, please inform the court within 3 days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : regarding availability for oral argument). When setting your argument date, the court will try to work around unavoidable conflicts; the court is not able to accommodate mere scheduling preferences. You will receive notice that your case has been assigned to a calendar approximately 10 weeks before the scheduled oral argument date. If the parties wish to discuss settlement before an argument date is set, they should jointly request referral to the mediation unit by filing a letter within 3 days of this notice , using CM/ECF ( Type of Document : File Correspondence to Court; Subject : request for mediation).[10767205] (AW) [Entered: 02/16/2018 11:42 AM]
February 12, 2018 Filing 36 Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 34 ] submitted by Guillermo Robles is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10761110] (LA) [Entered: 02/12/2018 05:32 PM]
February 9, 2018 Filing 35 Filed (ECF) Appellant Guillermo Robles Motion to take judicial notice of. Date of service: 02/09/2018. [10757838] [17-55504] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 02/09/2018 11:36 AM]
February 9, 2018 Filing 34 Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Guillermo Robles. Date of service: 02/09/2018. [10757810] [17-55504] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 02/09/2018 11:27 AM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 33 Received 7 paper copies of amicus brief [ # 24 ] filed by Atlantic Legal Foundation. [10744255] (SD) [Entered: 01/30/2018 01:10 PM]
January 29, 2018 Filing 32 Added attorney Stephanie N. Moot for Atlantic Legal Foundation, in case 17-55504. [10742119] (RL) [Entered: 01/29/2018 01:38 PM]
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Ordered paper copies of Amicus Atlantic Legal Foundations Brief. Per Order [ # 29 ] [10741505] (SOS) [Entered: 01/29/2018 10:29 AM]
January 8, 2018 Filing 30 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 25 ] filed by The Restaurant Law Center, et al. [10716373] (SD) [Entered: 01/08/2018 11:57 AM]
January 2, 2018 Filing 29 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Motions [ # 24 ] and [ # 25 ] (ECF Filing) are referred to panel. Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus is referred to panel., Motion (ECF Filing) motion to become amicus is referred to panel. (see attached PDF for complete order addressing Dkt No. 24) [10709767] (GS) [Entered: 01/02/2018 02:53 PM]
December 29, 2017 Filing 28 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending Atlantic Legal Foundation and The Restaurant Law Center, et al. [10707750] (LA) [Entered: 12/29/2017 12:09 PM]
December 28, 2017 Filing 27 Streamlined request [26] by Appellant Guillermo Robles to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: the optional reply brief is due 2/9/18. [10706754] (LW) [Entered: 12/28/2017 03:12 PM]
December 28, 2017 Filing 26 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Reply Brief by Appellant Guillermo Robles. New requested due date is 02/09/2018. [10706364] [17-55504] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 12/28/2017 12:46 PM]
December 27, 2017 Filing 25 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by The Restaurant Law Center; American Bankers Association; American Hotel & Lodging Association; American Resort Development Association; Asian American Hotel Owners Association; Chamber of Commerce of The United States of America; et al.. Date of service: 12/27/2017. [10705180] [17-55504]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected motion and brief. 12/29/2017 by LA] (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) [Entered: 12/27/2017 03:04 PM]
December 27, 2017 Filing 24 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Atlantic Legal Foundation. Date of service: 12/27/2017. [10705154] [17-55504]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected motion and brief. 12/29/2017 by LA] (Lumpkin, Carol) [Entered: 12/27/2017 03:00 PM]
December 26, 2017 Filing 23 Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 20 ] filed by Dominos Pizza LLC. [10703415] (SD) [Entered: 12/26/2017 02:33 PM]
December 21, 2017 Filing 22 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 20 ] submitted by Dominos Pizza LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10700009] (KWG) [Entered: 12/21/2017 03:31 PM]
December 20, 2017 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC Motion to take judicial notice of Brief For The United States As Amicus Curiae dated July 2017 filed by the United States Department of Justice in the matter of Magee v. Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc., Supreme Court of the United States Case No. 16-668. Date of service: 12/20/2017. [10699917]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [ # 20 ].] (RY) [Entered: 12/21/2017 03:11 PM]
December 20, 2017 Filing 20 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC. Date of service: 12/20/2017. [10697864] [17-55504]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed PDFs of motion, decarlation, and exhibit (refiled using correct filing type in entry [ # 21 ]). 12/21/2017 by RY] (Hurley, Gregory) [Entered: 12/20/2017 02:25 PM]
November 14, 2017 Filing 19 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 12 ] filed by National Federation of the Blind, et al. [10653554] (SD) [Entered: 11/14/2017 02:12 PM]
November 9, 2017 Filing 18 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): The motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 12 ]) of National Federation of the Blind, et al. to file an amicus brief and any responses thereto shall be referred to the panel that will consider the merits of the case for resolution. Within 7 days after the date of this order, amici curiae is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, with a green cover, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. A sample certificate is available on the Court's website, www.ca9.uscourts.gov at the Electronic Filing - CM/ECF link. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. For regular U.S. mail, the address is P.O. Box 193939, San Francisco, CA 94119-3939. For overnight mail, the address is 95 Seventh Street, San Francisco, CA 94103- 1526. [10649744] (AF) [Entered: 11/09/2017 02:01 PM]
November 7, 2017 Filing 17 Streamlined request [16] by Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC answering brief due 12/20/2017. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [10645583] (LW) [Entered: 11/07/2017 08:46 AM]
November 6, 2017 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC. New requested due date is 12/20/2017. [10645319] [17-55504] (Hurley, Gregory) [Entered: 11/06/2017 04:51 PM]
November 1, 2017 Filing 15 Filed 4 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 9 ] in 3 volume(s) filed by Appellant Guillermo Robles. [10643245] (SML) [Entered: 11/03/2017 02:44 PM]
November 1, 2017 Filing 14 Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 8 ] filed by Guillermo Robles. [10640091] (SD) [Entered: 11/01/2017 02:39 PM]
October 27, 2017 Filing 13 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae - Pending National Federation of the Blind, et al. [10635148] (LA) [Entered: 10/27/2017 05:01 PM]
October 26, 2017 Filing 12 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by National Federation of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, American Foundation for the Blind, Association of Late Deafened Adults, Cal. Council of the Blind, Cal. Foundation for Independent Living Centers, Disability Rights Advocates, et al.. Date of service: 10/26/2017. [10632879] [17-55504] (Hill, Eve) [Entered: 10/26/2017 01:49 PM]
October 24, 2017 Filing 11 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 8 ] submitted by Guillermo Robles is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 9 ] submitted by Guillermo Robles. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10629396] (LA) [Entered: 10/24/2017 11:25 AM]
October 19, 2017 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellant Guillermo Robles Motion to take judicial notice of Plaintiffs-Appellant's Exhibits 1-14. Date of service: 10/19/2017. [10624803] [17-55504]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable version of motion. 10/20/2017 by SLM] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 10/19/2017 05:14 PM]
October 19, 2017 Filing 9 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Guillermo Robles. Date of service: 10/19/2017. [10624800] [17-55504]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts. 10/24/2017 by LA] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 10/19/2017 05:04 PM]
October 19, 2017 Filing 8 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Guillermo Robles. Date of service: 10/19/2017. [10624797] [17-55504]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF. 10/24/2017 by LA] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 10/19/2017 05:01 PM]
August 11, 2017 Filing 7 Streamlined request [6] by Appellant Guillermo Robles to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Guillermo Robles opening brief due 10/19/2017. Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC answering brief due 11/20/2017. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [10541573] (LW) [Entered: 08/11/2017 01:15 PM]
August 11, 2017 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Guillermo Robles. New requested due date is 10/19/2017. [10541153] [17-55504] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 08/11/2017 10:40 AM]
June 23, 2017 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [10486378] (MS) [Entered: 06/23/2017 02:23 PM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/22/2017, 2:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [10456931] (BLS) [Entered: 06/01/2017 05:42 PM]
April 20, 2017 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Guillermo Robles Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/20/2017. [10404852] [17-55504] (Manning, Joseph) [Entered: 04/20/2017 02:43 PM]
April 14, 2017 Filing 2 Terminated Alison Nicole Kleaver for Dominos Pizza LLC in 17-55504 (Due to incorrect ECF account information). [10396387] (SLM) [Entered: 04/14/2017 10:48 AM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/20/2017. Transcript ordered by 05/12/2017. Transcript due 08/10/2017. Appellant Guillermo Robles opening brief due 09/19/2017. Appellee Dominos Pizza LLC answering brief due 10/19/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10395690] (RT) [Entered: 04/13/2017 04:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillermo Robles v. Dominos Pizza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL FEDERATION OF THE BLIND, AMERICAN COUNCIL OF THE BLIND; AMERICAN FOUNDATION FOR THE BLIND; ASSOCIATION OF LATE DEAFENED ADULTS; CALIFORNIA COUNCIL OF THE BLIND; CALIFORNIA FOUNDATION FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING CENTERS; DISABILITY RIGHTS ADVOCATE
Represented By: Eve L. Hill
Represented By: Jessica Paulie Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ATLANTIC LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Carol C. Lumpkin
Represented By: Stephanie N. Moot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE RESTAURANT LAW CENTER, AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION; AMERICAN HOTEL & LODGING ASSOCIATION; AMERICAN RESORT DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION; ASIAN AMERICAN HOTEL OWNERS ASSOCIATION; CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; INTERNATIONAL COUNCI
Represented By: Joyce Ackerbaum Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GUILLERMO ROBLES, an individual
Represented By: Joseph R. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOMINO'S PIZZA, LLC, a limited liability corporation
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hurley Esquire
Represented By: Bradley J. Leimkuhler
Represented By: Michael Chilleen Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?