State of California, et al v. Alex Azar, II, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee,: STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF DELAWARE, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF MARYLAND and STATE OF NEW YORK
Defendant - Appellant,: ALEX M. AZAR II, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, in his official capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of Labor, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, in his official capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of the Treasury and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Case Number: 18-15255
Filed: February 16, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2018 74 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [65] submitted by National Family Planning and Reproductive Health Association, National Health Law Program, Inc. and Planned Parenthood Federation of America is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10890083] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/30/2018 03:33 PM]
May 30, 2018 73 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [64] submitted by ACLU of Northern California, ACLU of San Diego and Imperial Counties, ACLU of Southern California, ACLU, Anti-Defamation League, Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights and National Urban League, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10890076] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/30/2018 03:31 PM]
May 30, 2018 72 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [63] submitted by Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice, HEART Women and Girls, Hadassah, The Womens Zionist Organization of America, Inc., Jewish Women International, Methodist Federation for Social Action, Muslim Advocates, National Council of Jewish Women, Inc., People for the American Way Foundation, Reconstructing Judaism, Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association, The Interfaith Alliance Foundation and The Sikh Coalition is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10890065] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/30/2018 03:24 PM]
May 30, 2018 71 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [60] submitted by 17 Cities, Counties, and Local Agencies is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10890051] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/30/2018 03:22 PM]
May 30, 2018 70 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [56] submitted by 7 Civil Rights Organizations, Center for Reproductive Rights and Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10890042] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/30/2018 03:20 PM]
May 30, 2018 69 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Planned Parenthood Federation of America, National Health Law Program, Inc. and National Family Planning and Reproductive Health Association. [10890033] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/30/2018 03:17 PM]
May 30, 2018 68 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice, Hadassah, The Womens Zionist Organization of America, Inc., HEART Women and Girls, The Interfaith Alliance Foundation, Jewish Women International, Methodist Federation for Social Action, Muslim Advocates, National Council of Jewish Women, Inc., People for the American Way Foundation, Reconstructing Judaism, Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association and The Sikh Coalition. [10890022] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/30/2018 03:09 PM]
May 30, 2018 67 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Center for Reproductive Rights, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, 7 Civil Rights Organizations, 17 Cities, Counties, and Local Agencies, ACLU, ACLU of Northern California, ACLU of Southern California, ACLU of San Diego and Imperial Counties, Anti-Defamation League, Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights and National Urban League, Inc. [10890009] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/30/2018 03:03 PM]
May 29, 2018 66 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by U.S. Womens Chamber of Commerce, National Association for Female Executives, and Businesses in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellees. Date of service: 05/29/2018. [10888776] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 05/31/2018 by SLM] (Gilbert, Alan) [Entered: 05/29/2018 08:13 PM]
May 29, 2018 65 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, National Health Law Program, and National Family Planning and Reproductive Health Association. Date of service: 05/29/2018. [10888766] [18-15255, 18-15144, 18-15166] (Arffa, Allan) [Entered: 05/29/2018 06:47 PM]
May 29, 2018 64 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by THE ACLU, ACLU OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, ACLU OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ACLU OF SAN DIEGO AND IMPERIAL COUNTIES, THE ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, THE LEADERSHIP CONFERENCE ON CIVIL AND HUMAN RIGHTS, AND THE NATIONAL URBAN LEAGUE. Date of service: 05/29/2018. [10888714] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (Gill, Elizabeth) [Entered: 05/29/2018 05:27 PM]
May 29, 2018 63 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Ams. United Sep. Church & State; Bend the Arc; Hadassah; HEART; Interfaith All.; Jewish Women Int'l; Methodist Fed. Soc. Action; Muslim Advocates; Nat'l Coun. Jewish Women; People For Am. Way; Reconstr. Judaism; Reconstr. Rabbinical Ass'n; Sikh Coal.. Date of service: 05/29/2018. [10888701] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (Katskee, Richard) [Entered: 05/29/2018 05:17 PM]
May 29, 2018 62 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [51] submitted by National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum, National Latina Institute for Reproductive Health, SisterLove, Inc. and The National Women's Law Center is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10888631] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/29/2018 04:47 PM]
May 29, 2018 61 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae The National Women's Law Center, National Latina Institute for Reproductive Health, SisterLove, Inc. and National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum.. [10888628] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/29/2018 04:46 PM]
May 29, 2018 60 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by 17 Cities, Counties, and Local Agencies. Date of service: 05/29/2018. [10888573] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (Benedict, Adriana) [Entered: 05/29/2018 04:32 PM]
May 29, 2018 59 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Brief of Administrative Law Professors as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs. Date of service: 05/29/2018. [10888323] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 05/31/2018 by SLM] (Schulder, Elliott) [Entered: 05/29/2018 03:27 PM]
May 29, 2018 58 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Commonwealth of Massachusetts et al.. Date of service: 05/29/2018. [10888283] [18-15255, 18-15144, 18-15166] (Nadeau, Genevieve) [Entered: 05/29/2018 03:14 PM]
May 29, 2018 57 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Health Professional Organizations The American Nurses Association, Am Coll of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, The Am Academy of Nursing, The Am Academy of Pediatrics, Physicians for Reproductive Health and The California Medical Association. Date of service: 05/29/2018. [10888073] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 05/31/2018 by SLM] (Schneider, Bruce) [Entered: 05/29/2018 02:05 PM]
May 29, 2018 56 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Center for Reproductive Rights, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, and seven Civil Rights Organizations. Date of service: 05/29/2018. [10887693] [18-15255, 18-15144, 18-15166] (Kasdan, Diana) [Entered: 05/29/2018 11:46 AM]
May 29, 2018 55 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [53] submitted by 12 Additional Professional, Labor, and Student Associations, American Association of University Women and Service Employees International Union is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10887466] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/29/2018 10:52 AM]
May 29, 2018 54 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae American Association of University Women, Service Employees International Union and 12 Additional Professional, Labor, and Student Associations. [10887460] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/29/2018 10:51 AM]
May 25, 2018 53 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by American Association of University Women; Service Employees International Union; The American Federation of State, County, and Municipal Employees; American Federation of Teachers; National Association of Women Lawyers; Girls Inc.; et al. Date of service: 05/25/2018. [10886794] [18-15255, 18-15166, 18-15144] (Levitt, Jamie) [Entered: 05/25/2018 04:52 PM]
May 25, 2018 52 STRICKEN PER ORDER [55] (brief will not be filed). Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by American Association of University Women; Service Employees International Union; The American Federation of State, County, and Municipal Employees; American Federation of Teachers; National Association of Women Lawyers; Girls Inc.; et al.. Date of service: 05/25/2018. [10886430] [18-15255] (Levitt, Jamie) [Entered: 05/25/2018 02:34 PM]
May 25, 2018 51 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by The National Women's Law Center, the National Latina Institute for Reproductive Health, SisterLove, Inc., and the National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum. Date of service: 05/25/2018. [10886238] [18-15144, 18-15255, 18-15166]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 05/29/2018 by SLM] (Blumenfeld, Jeffrey) [Entered: 05/25/2018 01:37 PM]
May 23, 2018 50 Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [48] filed by appellees. [10883298] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (DB) [Entered: 05/23/2018 01:51 PM]
May 22, 2018 49 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [48] submitted by appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10880864] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 05/22/2018 09:22 AM]
May 21, 2018 48 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Commonwealth of Virginia, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Maryland and State of New York in 18-15255, 18-15144, 18-15166. Date of service: 05/21/2018. [10880459] [18-15255, 18-15144, 18-15166] (Carter-Oberstone, Max) [Entered: 05/21/2018 04:09 PM]
April 24, 2018 47 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [35] filed by First Liberty Institute. [10848685] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SD) [Entered: 04/24/2018 01:19 PM]
April 19, 2018 46 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [32] filed by Residents and Families of Residents at Homes of the Little Sisters of the Poor. [10843040] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (DB) [Entered: 04/19/2018 01:05 PM]
April 19, 2018 45 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [37] filed by Constitutional Law Scholars. [10842994] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (DB) [Entered: 04/19/2018 12:42 PM]
April 18, 2018 44 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [38] filed by Religious Sisters of Mercy. [10841116] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SD) [Entered: 04/18/2018 10:22 AM]
April 17, 2018 43 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [35] submitted by First Liberty Institute is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10840447] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 04/17/2018 04:01 PM]
April 17, 2018 42 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae First Liberty Institute. [10840442] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 04/17/2018 04:00 PM]
April 17, 2018 41 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [38] submitted by Religious Sisters of Mercy is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10839507] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 04/17/2018 10:33 AM]
April 17, 2018 40 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [37] submitted by Constitutional Law Scholars is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10839467] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 04/17/2018 10:15 AM]
April 17, 2018 39 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Constitutional Law Scholars and Religious Sisters. [10839464] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 04/17/2018 10:14 AM]
April 16, 2018 38 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Religious Sisters of Mercy. Date of service: 04/16/2018. [10838998] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (Dunn, Robert) [Entered: 04/16/2018 07:28 PM]
April 16, 2018 37 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Constitutional Law Scholars. Date of service: 04/16/2018. [10838319] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (Haun, William) [Entered: 04/16/2018 02:30 PM]
April 16, 2018 36 Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [20] filed by March for Life Education and Defense Fund. [10838084] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (DB) [Entered: 04/16/2018 01:14 PM]
April 16, 2018 35 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by First Liberty Institute. Date of service: 04/16/2018. [10838069] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 04/17/2018 by SLM] (Taub, Stephanie) [Entered: 04/16/2018 01:08 PM]
April 13, 2018 34 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [32] submitted by Residents and Families of Residents at Homes of the Little Sisters of the Poor in 18-15144 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10835979] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 04/13/2018 10:55 AM]
April 13, 2018 33 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Residents and Families of Residents at Homes of the Little Sisters of the Poor. [10835973] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 04/13/2018 10:53 AM]
April 13, 2018 32 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Residents and Families of Residents at Homes of the Little Sisters of the Poor. Date of service: 04/13/2018. [10835708] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (Duncan, Dwight) [Entered: 04/13/2018 09:58 AM]
April 12, 2018 31 Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [19] filed by The Little Sisters of the Poor Jeanne Jugan Residence. [10834674] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (DB) [Entered: 04/12/2018 02:15 PM]
April 12, 2018 30 Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [17] filed by R. Alexander Acosta, et al. [10834660] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (DB) [Entered: 04/12/2018 02:10 PM]
April 12, 2018 29 Filed 4 paper copies of the joint excerpts of record [18] in 3 volume(s) filed by Appellants. [10834285] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 04/12/2018 12:08 PM]
April 12, 2018 28 Added attorney Diana Verm for The Little Sisters of the Poor Jeanne Jugan Residence, in case 18-15144. [10834159] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (NAC) [Entered: 04/12/2018 11:05 AM]
April 12, 2018 27 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Diana M. Verm for Appellant The Little Sisters of the Poor Jeanne Jugan Residence in 18-15144. Date of service: 04/12/2018. [10834146] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (Verm, Diana) [Entered: 04/12/2018 10:59 AM]
April 12, 2018 26 Filed (ECF) Appellant The Little Sisters of the Poor Jeanne Jugan Residence in 18-15144 Correspondence: Parties' consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs. Date of service: 04/12/2018 [10834054] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (Rienzi, Mark) [Entered: 04/12/2018 10:37 AM]
April 10, 2018 25 Added attorney Kenneth John Connelly for March for Life Education and Defense Fund, in case 18-15166. [10830764] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (NAC) [Entered: 04/10/2018 11:06 AM]
April 10, 2018 24 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kenneth J. Connelly for Appellant March for Life Education and Defense Fund in 18-15166. Date of service: 04/10/2018. [10830707] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] --[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in case 18-15166 only.] (TYL) [Entered: 04/10/2018 10:40 AM]
April 10, 2018 23 ENTRY UPDATED: Filed clerk order: The opening brief [20] submitted by March for Life Education and Defense Fund is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10830627] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255]--[Edited 04/12/2018 by SML to attach the order and send the NDA] (SML) [Entered: 04/10/2018 10:11 AM]
April 10, 2018 22 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [19] submitted by The Little Sisters of the Poor Jeanne Jugan Residence is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. [10830614] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 04/10/2018 10:09 AM]
April 10, 2018 21 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [17] submitted by R. Alexander Acosta; et al., is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the joint excerpts of record [18] submitted by appellants. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10830602] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (SML) [Entered: 04/10/2018 10:05 AM]
April 9, 2018 20 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant March for Life Education and Defense Fund in 18-15166. Date of service: 04/09/2018. [10830157] [18-15166, 18-15144, 18-15255] (Baylor, Gregory) [Entered: 04/09/2018 08:49 PM]
April 9, 2018 19 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant The Little Sisters of the Poor Jeanne Jugan Residence in 18-15144. Date of service: 04/09/2018. [10830130] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (Rienzi, Mark) [Entered: 04/09/2018 06:51 PM]
April 9, 2018 18 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants R. Alexander Acosta, Alex M. Azar, II, Steven Terner Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, USDOL and USHHS in 18-15255. Date of service: 04/09/2018. [10829852] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (Sturgill, Lowell) [Entered: 04/09/2018 04:02 PM]
April 9, 2018 17 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants R. Alexander Acosta, Alex M. Azar, II, Steven Terner Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, USDOL and USHHS in 18-15255. Date of service: 04/09/2018. [10829828] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (Sturgill, Lowell) [Entered: 04/09/2018 03:56 PM]
April 6, 2018 16 Added attorney Jaynie R. Lilley for USHHS Alex M. Azar II USDOL Steven Terner Mnuchin U.S. Department of the Treasury R. Alexander Acosta, in case 18-15255. [10828046] (JFF) [Entered: 04/06/2018 04:11 PM]
April 6, 2018 15 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jaynie Lilley for Appellants R. Alexander Acosta, Alex M. Azar, II, Steven Terner Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, USDOL and USHHS. Date of service: 04/06/2018. [10826908] [18-15255] (Lilley, Jaynie) [Entered: 04/06/2018 09:10 AM]
March 7, 2018 14 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KML): The unopposed motion to consolidate appeal Nos. 18-15144, 18-15166, and 18-15255 is granted (Docket Entry No. [13] in 18-15255). Appeal Nos. 18-15144, 18-15166, and 18-15255 are consolidated. The opening briefs and excerpts of record are due April 9, 2018; the answering briefs are due May 21, 2018; and the optional reply briefs are due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. All parties on a side are encouraged to join in a single brief to the greatest extent practicable. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. [10790253] [18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255] (OC) [Entered: 03/07/2018 03:53 PM]
March 5, 2018 13 Filed (ECF) Appellants R. Alexander Acosta, Alex M. Azar, II, Steven Terner Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, USDOL and USHHS Unopposed Motion to consolidate cases 18-15144, 18-15166, 18-15255. Date of service: 03/05/2018. [10785922] [18-15255] (Schoen, Karen) [Entered: 03/05/2018 12:46 PM]
March 2, 2018 12 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [10783789] (BS) [Entered: 03/02/2018 09:25 AM]
February 26, 2018 11 Added attorney Lowell Sturgill Jr. for USHHS Alex M. Azar II USDOL Steven Terner Mnuchin U.S. Department of the Treasury R. Alexander Acosta, in case 18-15255. [10778045] (JFF) [Entered: 02/26/2018 04:52 PM]
February 26, 2018 10 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. for Appellants R. Alexander Acosta, Alex M. Azar, II, Steven Terner Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, USDOL and USHHS. Date of service: 02/26/2018. [10777272] [18-15255] (Sturgill, Lowell) [Entered: 02/26/2018 01:33 PM]
February 23, 2018 9 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed February 16, 2018 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than March 16, 2018; the answering brief is due April 13, 2018 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). The parties are reminded that streamlined requests for extensions of time are not available in preliminary injunction appeals. See http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/content/view.php?pk_id=0000000638. Any request for an extension of time must be requested under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [10775639] (OC) [Entered: 02/23/2018 02:14 PM]
February 23, 2018 8 Filed (ECF) Appellants R. Alexander Acosta, Alex M. Azar, II, Steven Terner Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, USDOL and USHHS Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/23/2018. [10774509] [18-15255] (Schoen, Karen) [Entered: 02/23/2018 06:43 AM]
February 22, 2018 7 Added attorney Max Carter-Oberstone for State of California, in case 18-15255. [10773780] (NAC) [Entered: 02/22/2018 02:14 PM]
February 22, 2018 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Max, Carter-Oberstone for Appellee State of California. Date of service: 02/22/2018. [10773465] [18-15255] (Carter-Oberstone, Max) [Entered: 02/22/2018 12:48 PM]
February 21, 2018 5 Added attorney Matthew M. Collette for USHHS Alex M. Azar II USDOL Steven Terner Mnuchin U.S. Department of the Treasury R. Alexander Acosta, in case 18-15255. [10772345] (JFF) [Entered: 02/21/2018 04:15 PM]
February 21, 2018 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew M. Collette for Appellants R. Alexander Acosta, Alex M. Azar, II, Steven Terner Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, USDOL and USHHS. Date of service: 02/21/2018. [10772111] [18-15255] (Collette, Matthew) [Entered: 02/21/2018 02:52 PM]
February 20, 2018 3 Added attorney Karen Schoen for USHHS Alex M. Azar II USDOL Steven Terner Mnuchin U.S. Department of the Treasury R. Alexander Acosta, in case 18-15255. [10768913] (NAC) [Entered: 02/20/2018 09:39 AM]
February 20, 2018 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Karen Schoen for Appellants R. Alexander Acosta, Alex M. Azar, II, Steven Terner Mnuchin, U.S. Department of the Treasury, USDOL and USHHS. Date of service: 02/20/2018. [10768694] [18-15255] (Schoen, Karen) [Entered: 02/20/2018 07:52 AM]
February 16, 2018 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [10767933] (RT) [Entered: 02/16/2018 03:05 PM]

Search for this case: State of California, et al v. Alex Azar, II, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Christina Bull Arndt
Represented By: Karli A. Eisenberg
Represented By: Nimrod Elias
Represented By: R. Matthew Wise
Represented By: Michele Li Wong
Represented By: Max Carter-Oberstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Nimrod Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Nimrod Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Nimrod Elias
Represented By: Steven Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee,: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Nimrod Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: ALEX M. AZAR II, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Justin Sandberg
Represented By: Matthew M. Collette
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Justin Sandberg
Represented By: Matthew M. Collette
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, in his official capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of Labor
Represented By: Justin Sandberg
Represented By: Matthew M. Collette
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: Justin Sandberg
Represented By: Matthew M. Collette
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, in his official capacity as Secretary of the U.S. Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Justin Sandberg
Represented By: Matthew M. Collette
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant,: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: Justin Sandberg
Represented By: Matthew M. Collette
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Lowell Sturgill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?