Abdul Mohamed, et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Appellant: STEVEN SIDLER, DANIEL TURNER, HAROLD BROWER, FELIX DROZ, ALI ESMAEILSHIRAZI, SALIM SURTI, ERIC SERRATOS, SHADI HAMAD, ANTHONY MANGUM, TIFFANY CLARK, ROGER LEWIS, MARC BORGENS, JOSHUA GRIMES, MARLENE MENDOZA, GERARDO MENDOZA, LUIS RAMOS, DESIREE TAYLOR, MOAHAMMAD SALEH, CHRISTOPHER JONES, ABDOURAHMAN SALEH, WALTER PEREZ, SANDRA HERNANDEZ, DENISE MCWHERTER, ANGEL LOPEZ, ROGER GONZALEZ, ARTIK ASHISH, SEYEDMAZIYAR MOHSENPOORGHZIMAHALE, ARTURO PIMENTEL, LAURA GARDNER, ROBERT GARITANO, MARIO PARADA, ANGEL GONZALEZ, RAUL VILLA, JOSE GAMEZ, ANTHONY WALKER, CARLOS CORTEZ, ORLANDO MENDOZA, MARGARET LARGURA, SYLVIA DANESH, BRIAN DEQUINIA, DARGE GUDURA, MELAD MIKHAIL, LAWRENCE HOLLIDAY, ROBERT FIGUEROA, MARTIN RUIZ, VAHE HAMDILYAN, ROLF CRUDUPT, ARSEN MATEVOSYAN, JAMES BARNES, EMIL SHEFTOLOVICH, YONCELLA HARRIS, REZA ZAKIKHANI, ALBERTO GUTIERREZ, WASKAR HERNANDEZ, FERNANDO BLANCO, LAUREN SEBESTA, LAWRENCE SUMPTER, DEBBIE HUNTER, MOHAMMAD HEIDARARABI, DIEGO RESTREPO, ALEXANDRE SILVA, SAMER NASSER, NATISHA LUPTON, ROBERT GARRETT, SYLVESTER WILLIAMS, JOSE BONILLA, SHARIF HASAN, BASH ALAWDI, CYNTHIA CONTRERAS, WILLIAM WALLACE, VICTOR MARIN, RICK RIDINGER, WILL MARTIN, GWENDOLYN SMITH, RICHARD RIVERA, KARIBYAN VARDKES, FAISAL ZULFI, SAMVEL BASMAJIAN, DASHAWAN DEVOE, BRANDON JACKSON, BASHIRUDDIN AHMAD, DREANEY PEAKS, WILLIAM CLARK, JORGE RODRIGUEZ, K. C. UDDHAB, FRANCISCO MORA, TIFFANY SMITH, ALEJANDRO ZEGARRA, LAWRENCE MARTIN, ART KAY, DAVID CONRADO, BRENT NORTH, JAMES BALL, AZIMA SHARRIEFF, KALILA LUJA, DAVID CUNDIFF, ROBERT BURCHFIELD, JAMES BOSWELL, FATEH PERLESCHI, HOSSAIN CHOWDHURY, DWAYNE BAUDY, PAMELA MARTIN, CHRIS ROMERO, MOHAMMADREZA ROSTAMA, JOSEPH LEON, STEVEN KELLY, AMADOU DIOUF, ANGEL PORTILLO, ARTUR DERTSAKYAN, TRACEY JONES, JOSE GARCIA, DAMIAN REMUS, DON COPELAND, HUGO ROMERO, CARLOS LOPEZ, JOEL GARCIA, SHAWN CLARK, ELI MAMEA, TAQI NAQVI, DEVIN MARTIN, TINA BROWN, ABDUL LATIF, DANIEL MOLINA, MIGUEL FLORES, RICHARD WAJDA, CYNTHIA ROBINSON, MOHAMED HUSSAIN, SURESHKUMAR SIVALOGANATHAN, JESUS . HERNANDEZ, CORY ALLEN, HUMBERTO ARMENDARIZ, MAGALLANES ERESE, SADEQ RAHEEM, MICHAEL MALLOY, MARK BELLA, MICHELLE SMITH, VAZGEN GHAZARIAN, ERIC SWENSON, CHAFIK DJENADI, VITO GRANDOLFO, THAMILCHELVAN THEIVENDRAMOORTHY, SULTAN YUSUFI, DANIEL DELLEPIANE and ERNEST ROBINSON
Plaintiff / Appellee: SHANNON WISE, RONALD GILLETTE, BRANDON FARMER, ABDUL KADIR MOHAMED, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and MEGHAN CHRISTENSON
Defendant / Appellee: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Case Number: 18-16097
Filed: June 13, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 36 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SL) Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties (Docket Entry No. [ # 35 ]), this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [11050681] (WL) [Entered: 10/17/2018 02:58 PM]
October 16, 2018 Filing 35 Filed (ECF) Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra and Faisal Zulfi Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 10/16/2018. [11049505] [18-16097] (Burton, Mark) [Entered: 10/16/2018 06:12 PM]
October 16, 2018 Filing 34 Filed (ECF) Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra and Faisal Zulfi Stipulated Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for Stipulated Withdrawal of All Pending Motions]. Date of service: 10/16/2018. [11049499] [18-16097] (Burton, Mark) [Entered: 10/16/2018 06:00 PM]
October 12, 2018 Filing 33 Filed (ECF) Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra and Faisal Zulfi Motion to strike portion of. Date of service: 10/12/2018. [11046036] [18-16097] (Burton, Mark) [Entered: 10/12/2018 07:36 PM]
October 11, 2018 Filing 32 Filed (ECF) Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra and Faisal Zulfi response opposing motion ([ # 30 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 30 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for sanctions, [ # 30 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for summary disposition). Date of service: 10/11/2018. [11044300] [18-16097] (Burton, Mark) [Entered: 10/11/2018 11:11 PM]
October 9, 2018 Filing 31 Filed (ECF) Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra, Faisal Zulfi and Appellees Meghan Christenson, Brandon Farmer, Ronald Gillette, Abdul Kadir Mohamed, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Shannon Wise reply to response (). Date of service: 10/09/2018. [11040101] [18-16097] (Burton, Mark) [Entered: 10/09/2018 11:08 PM]
October 1, 2018 Filing 30 Filed (ECF) Appellees Meghan Christenson, Brandon Farmer, Ronald Gillette, Abdul Kadir Mohamed and Shannon Wise Motion for sanctions, Motion for summary disposition. Date of service: 10/01/2018. [11031436] [18-16097] (Maya, Theodore) [Entered: 10/01/2018 11:33 PM]
October 1, 2018 Filing 29 Filed (ECF) Appellees Meghan Christenson, Brandon Farmer, Ronald Gillette, Abdul Kadir Mohamed and Shannon Wise response to motion ([ # 26 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 26 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 10/01/2018. [11031431] [18-16097] (Maya, Theodore) [Entered: 10/01/2018 10:53 PM]
October 1, 2018 Filing 28 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11029793] (VS) [Entered: 10/01/2018 09:00 AM]
September 21, 2018 Filing 27 Filed (ECF) Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra and Faisal Zulfi Motion to take judicial notice. Date of service: 09/21/2018. [11022588]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [ # 26 ].] (RY) [Entered: 09/24/2018 11:39 AM]
September 21, 2018 Filing 26 Filed (ECF) Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra and Faisal Zulfi Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 09/21/2018. [11021631] [18-16097]--[COURT UPDATE: Removed PDF of motion to take judicial notice (refiled separately using correct relief in entry [ # 27 ]). 09/24/2018 by RY] (Burton, Mark) [Entered: 09/21/2018 05:18 PM]
September 12, 2018 Filing 25 Streamlined request [24] by Appellants to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamlined requests allow for a 30 day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra and Faisal Zulfi opening brief due 10/17/2018. Appellees Meghan Christenson, Brandon Farmer, Ronald Gillette, Abdul Kadir Mohamed, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Shannon Wise answering brief due 11/16/2018. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11009734] (JN) [Entered: 09/12/2018 04:53 PM]
September 12, 2018 Filing 24 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra and Faisal Zulfi. New requested due date is 10/12/2018. [11009715] [18-16097] (Burton, Mark) [Entered: 09/12/2018 04:38 PM]
August 23, 2018 Filing 23 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN FurtherConference, 08/27/2018, 1:30 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [10987435] (VS) [Entered: 08/23/2018 01:32 PM]
August 15, 2018 Filing 22 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN FurtherConference, 08/20/2018, 1:00 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [10977163] (VS) [Entered: 08/15/2018 08:22 AM]
July 30, 2018 Filing 21 Added attorney William J. Simmons for Uber Technologies, Inc., in case 18-16097. [10958969] (NAC) [Entered: 07/30/2018 10:56 AM]
July 30, 2018 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of William Simmons for Appellee Uber Technologies, Inc.. Date of service: 07/30/2018. [10958687] [18-16097] (Simmons, William) [Entered: 07/30/2018 09:04 AM]
July 16, 2018 Filing 19 Terminated William C. Jhaveri-Weeks for Shannon Wise, Abdul Kadir Mohamed, Ronald Gillette, Brandon Farmer and Meghan Christenson in 18-16097 [10943619] (NAC) [Entered: 07/16/2018 01:14 PM]
July 13, 2018 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) Appellees Meghan Christenson, Brandon Farmer, Ronald Gillette, Abdul Kadir Mohamed and Shannon Wise Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel William Jhaveri-Weeks. Date of service: 07/13/2018 [10942545] [18-16097] (Jhaveri-Weeks, William) [Entered: 07/13/2018 04:33 PM]
July 13, 2018 Filing 17 Terminated Maiko Nakarai-Kanivas for Uber Technologies, Inc. in 18-16097 [10942469] (QDL) [Entered: 07/13/2018 04:05 PM]
July 13, 2018 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Appellee Uber Technologies, Inc. Correspondence: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Maiko Nakarai-Kanivas as Attorney of Record. Date of service: 07/13/2018 [10942368] [18-16097] (Behnia, Sophia) [Entered: 07/13/2018 03:40 PM]
June 28, 2018 Filing 15 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/10/2018, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [10925346] (VS) [Entered: 06/28/2018 09:36 AM]
June 25, 2018 Filing 14 Added attorney John C. Fish Jr. for Uber Technologies, Inc., in case 18-16097. [10921451] (RR) [Entered: 06/25/2018 04:04 PM]
June 25, 2018 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John C. Fish, Jr. for Appellee Uber Technologies, Inc.. Date of service: 06/25/2018. [10921154] [18-16097] (Fish, John) [Entered: 06/25/2018 02:50 PM]
June 22, 2018 Filing 12 Added attorney Maiko Nakarai-Kanivas for Uber Technologies, Inc., in case 18-16097. [10919246] (NAC) [Entered: 06/22/2018 02:34 PM]
June 22, 2018 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Maiko Nakarai-Kanivas for Appellee Uber Technologies, Inc.. Date of service: 06/22/2018. [10918851] [18-16097] (Nakarai-Kanivas, Maiko) [Entered: 06/22/2018 11:59 AM]
June 21, 2018 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellees Meghan Christenson, Brandon Farmer, Ronald Gillette, Abdul Kadir Mohamed and Shannon Wise Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/21/2018. [10918044] [18-16097] (Maya, Theodore) [Entered: 06/21/2018 04:44 PM]
June 21, 2018 Filing 9 Added attorney Rod Michael Fliegel for Uber Technologies, Inc.. [10917964] (RL) [Entered: 06/21/2018 04:07 PM]
June 21, 2018 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rod M. Fliegel for Appellee Uber Technologies, Inc.. Date of service: 06/21/2018. [10917929] [18-16097] (Fliegel, Rod) [Entered: 06/21/2018 03:57 PM]
June 21, 2018 Filing 7 Added attorney Andrew Michael Spurchise, Sophia Behnia for Uber Technologies, Inc., in case 18-16097. [10917015] (NAC) [Entered: 06/21/2018 09:54 AM]
June 20, 2018 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew M. Spurchise for Appellee Uber Technologies, Inc.. Date of service: 06/20/2018. [10916619] [18-16097] (Spurchise, Andrew) [Entered: 06/20/2018 05:30 PM]
June 20, 2018 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sophia Behnia for Appellee Uber Technologies, Inc.. Date of service: 06/20/2018. [10916607] [18-16097] (Behnia, Sophia) [Entered: 06/20/2018 05:22 PM]
June 20, 2018 Filing 4 Added attorney Mark Etheredge Burton Jr. for Cory Allen Chafik Djenadi Kalila Luja Richard Rivera Anthony Mangum Arsen Matevosyan Art Kay Gerardo Mendoza Jesus. Hernandez Martin Ruiz Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan Tracey Jones Debbie Hunter Michelle Smith Dwayne Baudy Eric Swenson Chris Romero James Barnes Alexandre Silva Tiffany Smith Carlos Cortez Vahe Hamdilyan Jose Gamez Daniel Dellepiane Alberto Gutierrez Shawn Clark William Clark Natisha Lupton Amadou Diouf Darge Gudura Bashiruddin Ahmad Robert Garitano Robert Figueroa Rolf Crudupt Angel Portillo Joshua Grimes Hugo Romero Don Copeland Faisal Zulfi Cynthia Robinson Carlos Lopez Taqi Naqvi Mark Bella Arturo Pimentel Lauren Sebesta Brandon Jackson Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy Lawrence Martin Steven Sidler Karibyan Vardkes Mohammadreza Rostama Tina Brown Damian Remus Richard Wajda Bash Alawdi James Ball Sylvia Danesh Samer Nasser Sharif Hasan Mario Parada Devin Martin Melad Mikhail Lawrence Holliday Felix Droz Fernando Blanco Humberto Armendariz Jorge Rodriguez Lawrence Sumpter Artur Dertsakyan Ali Esmaeilshirazi Sultan Yusufi Anthony Walker Mohamed Hussain Hossain Chowdhury Emil Sheftolovich Eli Mamea Steven Kelly Christopher Jones K. C. Uddhab Abdourahman Saleh Francisco Mora Margaret Largura Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale Sadeq Raheem Walter Perez Laura Gardner Fateh Perleschi Joseph Leon Waskar Hernandez Mohammad Heidararabi Alejandro Zegarra Roger Gonzalez Reza Zakikhani Marc Borgens Marlene Mendoza Raul Villa Tiffany Clark Joel Garcia Abdul Latif Vito Grandolfo Angel Lopez Luis Ramos Brian Dequinia Magallanes Erese Michael Malloy Gwendolyn Smith Shadi Hamad James Boswell Jose Garcia Daniel Molina William Wallace Azima Sharrieff Diego Restrepo Daniel Turner Vazgen Ghazarian Robert Burchfield Harold Brower Pamela Martin Brent North Miguel Flores Eric Serratos Artik Ashish Robert Garrett Orlando Mendoza Ernest Robinson David Conrado Desiree Taylor Roger Lewis Will Martin Angel Gonzalez Denise McWherter Dashawan Devoe Sandra Hernandez Sylvester Williams Yoncella Harris Dreaney Peaks Rick Ridinger David Cundiff Victor Marin Moahammad Saleh Salim Surti Jose Bonilla Samvel Basmajian Cynthia Contreras. [10915299] (RL) [Entered: 06/20/2018 09:56 AM]
June 19, 2018 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mark E. Burton for Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra and Faisal Zulfi. Date of service: 06/19/2018. [10914923] [18-16097] (Burton, Mark) [Entered: 06/19/2018 07:35 PM]
June 19, 2018 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra, Faisal Zulfi and Appellees Meghan Christenson, Brandon Farmer, Ronald Gillette, Abdul Kadir Mohamed, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Shannon Wise Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/19/2018. [10914921] [18-16097] (Burton, Mark) [Entered: 06/19/2018 07:10 PM]
June 13, 2018 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/20/2018. Transcript ordered by 07/09/2018. Transcript due 08/06/2018. Appellants Bashiruddin Ahmad, Bash Alawdi, Cory Allen, Humberto Armendariz, Artik Ashish, James Ball, James Barnes, Samvel Basmajian, Dwayne Baudy, Mark Bella, Fernando Blanco, Jose Bonilla, Marc Borgens, James Boswell, Harold Brower, Tina Brown, Robert Burchfield, Hossain Chowdhury, Shawn Clark, Tiffany Clark, William Clark, David Conrado, Cynthia Contreras, Don Copeland, Carlos Cortez, Rolf Crudupt, David Cundiff, Sylvia Danesh, Daniel Dellepiane, Brian Dequinia, Artur Dertsakyan, Dashawan Devoe, Amadou Diouf, Chafik Djenadi, Felix Droz, Magallanes Erese, Ali Esmaeilshirazi, Robert Figueroa, Miguel Flores, Jose Gamez, Joel Garcia, Jose Garcia, Laura Gardner, Robert Garitano, Robert Garrett, Vazgen Ghazarian, Angel Gonzalez, Roger Gonzalez, Vito Grandolfo, Joshua Grimes, Darge Gudura, Alberto Gutierrez, Shadi Hamad, Vahe Hamdilyan, Yoncella Harris, Sharif Hasan, Mohammad Heidararabi, Jesus. Hernandez, Sandra Hernandez, Waskar Hernandez, Lawrence Holliday, Debbie Hunter, Mohamed Hussain, Brandon Jackson, Christopher Jones, Tracey Jones, Art Kay, Steven Kelly, Margaret Largura, Abdul Latif, Joseph Leon, Roger Lewis, Angel Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Kalila Luja, Natisha Lupton, Michael Malloy, Eli Mamea, Anthony Mangum, Victor Marin, Devin Martin, Lawrence Martin, Pamela Martin, Will Martin, Arsen Matevosyan, Denise McWherter, Gerardo Mendoza, Marlene Mendoza, Orlando Mendoza, Melad Mikhail, Seyedmaziyar Mohsenpoorghzimahale, Daniel Molina, Francisco Mora, Taqi Naqvi, Samer Nasser, Brent North, Mario Parada, Dreaney Peaks, Walter Perez, Fateh Perleschi, Arturo Pimentel, Angel Portillo, Sadeq Raheem, Luis Ramos, Damian Remus, Diego Restrepo, Rick Ridinger, Richard Rivera, Cynthia Robinson, Ernest Robinson, Jorge Rodriguez, Chris Romero, Hugo Romero, Mohammadreza Rostama, Martin Ruiz, Abdourahman Saleh, Moahammad Saleh, Lauren Sebesta, Eric Serratos, Azima Sharrieff, Emil Sheftolovich, Steven Sidler, Alexandre Silva, Sureshkumar Sivaloganathan, Gwendolyn Smith, Michelle Smith, Tiffany Smith, Lawrence Sumpter, Salim Surti, Eric Swenson, Desiree Taylor, Thamilchelvan Theivendramoorthy, Daniel Turner, K. C. Uddhab, Karibyan Vardkes, Raul Villa, Richard Wajda, Anthony Walker, William Wallace, Sylvester Williams, Sultan Yusufi, Reza Zakikhani, Alejandro Zegarra and Faisal Zulfi opening brief due 09/17/2018. Appellees Meghan Christenson, Brandon Farmer, Ronald Gillette, Abdul Kadir Mohamed, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Shannon Wise answering brief due 10/17/2018. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10908052] (RT) [Entered: 06/13/2018 05:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Abdul Mohamed, et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STEVEN SIDLER
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DANIEL TURNER
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HAROLD BROWER
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FELIX DROZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ALI ESMAEILSHIRAZI
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SALIM SURTI
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ERIC SERRATOS
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SHADI HAMAD
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ANTHONY MANGUM
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TIFFANY CLARK
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ROGER LEWIS
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MARC BORGENS
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JOSHUA GRIMES
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MARLENE MENDOZA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GERARDO MENDOZA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LUIS RAMOS
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DESIREE TAYLOR
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MOAHAMMAD SALEH
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CHRISTOPHER JONES
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ABDOURAHMAN SALEH
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WALTER PEREZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SANDRA HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DENISE MCWHERTER
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ANGEL LOPEZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ROGER GONZALEZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ARTIK ASHISH
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SEYEDMAZIYAR MOHSENPOORGHZIMAHALE
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ARTURO PIMENTEL
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LAURA GARDNER
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ROBERT GARITANO
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MARIO PARADA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ANGEL GONZALEZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RAUL VILLA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JOSE GAMEZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ANTHONY WALKER
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CARLOS CORTEZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ORLANDO MENDOZA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MARGARET LARGURA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SYLVIA DANESH
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BRIAN DEQUINIA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DARGE GUDURA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MELAD MIKHAIL
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LAWRENCE HOLLIDAY
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ROBERT FIGUEROA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MARTIN RUIZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: VAHE HAMDILYAN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ROLF CRUDUPT
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ARSEN MATEVOSYAN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JAMES BARNES
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: EMIL SHEFTOLOVICH
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: YONCELLA HARRIS
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: REZA ZAKIKHANI
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ALBERTO GUTIERREZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WASKAR HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FERNANDO BLANCO
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LAUREN SEBESTA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LAWRENCE SUMPTER
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DEBBIE HUNTER
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MOHAMMAD HEIDARARABI
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DIEGO RESTREPO
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ALEXANDRE SILVA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SAMER NASSER
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: NATISHA LUPTON
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ROBERT GARRETT
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SYLVESTER WILLIAMS
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JOSE BONILLA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SHARIF HASAN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BASH ALAWDI
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CYNTHIA CONTRERAS
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WILLIAM WALLACE
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: VICTOR MARIN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RICK RIDINGER
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WILL MARTIN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GWENDOLYN SMITH
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RICHARD RIVERA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KARIBYAN VARDKES
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FAISAL ZULFI
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SAMVEL BASMAJIAN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DASHAWAN DEVOE
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BRANDON JACKSON
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BASHIRUDDIN AHMAD
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DREANEY PEAKS
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WILLIAM CLARK
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JORGE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: K. C. UDDHAB
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FRANCISCO MORA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TIFFANY SMITH
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ALEJANDRO ZEGARRA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LAWRENCE MARTIN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ART KAY
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DAVID CONRADO
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BRENT NORTH
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JAMES BALL
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: AZIMA SHARRIEFF
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: KALILA LUJA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DAVID CUNDIFF
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ROBERT BURCHFIELD
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JAMES BOSWELL
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: FATEH PERLESCHI
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HOSSAIN CHOWDHURY
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DWAYNE BAUDY
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PAMELA MARTIN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CHRIS ROMERO
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MOHAMMADREZA ROSTAMA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JOSEPH LEON
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STEVEN KELLY
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: AMADOU DIOUF
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ANGEL PORTILLO
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ARTUR DERTSAKYAN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TRACEY JONES
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JOSE GARCIA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DAMIAN REMUS
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DON COPELAND
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HUGO ROMERO
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CARLOS LOPEZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JOEL GARCIA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SHAWN CLARK
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ELI MAMEA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TAQI NAQVI
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DEVIN MARTIN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TINA BROWN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ABDUL LATIF
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DANIEL MOLINA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MIGUEL FLORES
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RICHARD WAJDA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CYNTHIA ROBINSON
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MOHAMED HUSSAIN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SURESHKUMAR SIVALOGANATHAN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JESUS . HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CORY ALLEN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HUMBERTO ARMENDARIZ
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MAGALLANES ERESE
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SADEQ RAHEEM
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MICHAEL MALLOY
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MARK BELLA
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MICHELLE SMITH
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: VAZGEN GHAZARIAN
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ERIC SWENSON
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CHAFIK DJENADI
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: VITO GRANDOLFO
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: THAMILCHELVAN THEIVENDRAMOORTHY
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SULTAN YUSUFI
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DANIEL DELLEPIANE
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ERNEST ROBINSON
Represented By: Mark Etheredge Burton Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHANNON WISE
Represented By: Andrew P. Lee
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Robert Rafael Ahdoot Esquire
Represented By: Tina Wolfson Esquire
Represented By: Bradley Keith King
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RONALD GILLETTE
Represented By: Andrew P. Lee
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Robert Rafael Ahdoot Esquire
Represented By: Tina Wolfson Esquire
Represented By: Bradley Keith King
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRANDON FARMER
Represented By: Andrew P. Lee
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Robert Rafael Ahdoot Esquire
Represented By: Tina Wolfson Esquire
Represented By: Bradley Keith King
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ABDUL KADIR MOHAMED, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Andrew P. Lee
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Robert Rafael Ahdoot Esquire
Represented By: Tina Wolfson Esquire
Represented By: Bradley Keith King
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MEGHAN CHRISTENSON
Represented By: Andrew P. Lee
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Robert Rafael Ahdoot Esquire
Represented By: Tina Wolfson Esquire
Represented By: Bradley Keith King
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Theane Evangelis
Represented By: William J. Simmons
Represented By: John C. Fish Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Brandon Stoker
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz Esquire
Represented By: Marcellus Antonio McRae Esquire
Represented By: Rod Michael Fliegel
Represented By: Sophia Behnia
Represented By: Debra Wong Yang Esquire
Represented By: Dhananjay S. Manthripragada
Represented By: Andrew Michael Spurchise Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?