Hoai Dang v. Samsung Electronics Company, L, et al

Defendant / Appellee: SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC, SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. and SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS COMPANY, LTD.
Plaintiff / Appellant: HOAI DANG, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Case Number: 19-15007
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11190115] (BS) [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:01 AM]
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 Added attorney George Granade for Hoai Dang, in case 19-15007. [11186602] (CW) [Entered: 02/12/2019 06:49 AM]
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of George Volney Granade for Appellant Hoai Dang. Date of service: 02/12/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11186587] [19-15007] (Granade, George) [Entered: 02/12/2019 06:21 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/13/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11169766] (BS) [Entered: 01/28/2019 03:06 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/10/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11148517] (AD) [Entered: 01/10/2019 12:44 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Hoai Dang Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/10/2019. [11148322] [19-15007] (Reese, Michael) [Entered: 01/10/2019 11:04 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Added attorney Michael Reese for Hoai Dang, in case 19-15007. [11148262] (CW) [Entered: 01/10/2019 10:47 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael Robert Reese for Appellant Hoai Dang. Date of service: 01/10/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11148260] [19-15007] (Reese, Michael) [Entered: 01/10/2019 10:45 AM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/10/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/01/2019. Transcript due 03/04/2019. Appellant Hoai Dang opening brief due 04/12/2019. Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC answering brief due 05/13/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11139787] (RT) [Entered: 01/03/2019 09:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoai Dang v. Samsung Electronics Company, L, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: Mark Coleman Dosker
Represented By: Bruce Alan Khula Esquire
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Jantsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Mark Coleman Dosker
Represented By: Bruce Alan Khula Esquire
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Jantsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS COMPANY, LTD.
Represented By: Mark Coleman Dosker
Represented By: Bruce Alan Khula Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HOAI DANG, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel Leon Warshaw Esquire
Represented By: George Granade
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Michael Reese
Represented By: Joseph C. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?