Bright Harry v. KCG Americas LLC, et al

Defendant / Appellee: EDWARD W. WEDBUSH, President of Wedbush, GREG HOSTETLER, KCG Compliance Officer, COMPUTER VOICE SYSTEMS, INC., ROBERT SYLVERNE, CEO of ION, USA, CARL GILMORE, Director of KCG Futures, PAUL STURM, CEO of QST, PATRICK J. FLYNN, President of MST Wedbush Securities Inc., SCOTT WILLIAM BENZ, VP, KCG AMERICAS LLC, ANDREA PIGNATARO, CEO of ION, Global, ION TRADING, INC., WEDBUSH SECURITIES INC., MAIN STREET TRADING, INC. and DANIEL B. COLEMAN, CEO for KCG
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRIGHT HARRY
Case Number: 19-15013
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 Received copy of 2nd amended notice of appeal from district court. [11288706] (CW) [Entered: 05/07/2019 08:58 AM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): On January 8, 2019, this court issued an order staying appellate proceedings pending disposition of the motion to vacate in the district court. On April 19, 2019, the district court denied the motion. The stay order filed January 8, 2019, is lifted and this appeal shall proceed. Briefing shall proceed as follows: appellants opening brief is due June 7, 2019; appellees answering brief is due July 8, 2019; and appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of appellees brief. [11287794] (AF) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:01 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court, filed 5/2/19 [11285849] (CW) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:53 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Attorney Sophia Lau substituted by Attorney Edward A. Corcoran in 19-15013 [11166246] (CW) [Entered: 01/25/2019 07:01 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Edward A. Corcoran for Appellees Scott William Benz, Computer Voice Systems, Inc. and Paul Sturm. Substitution for Attorney Ms. Sophia Lau for Appellees Scott William Benz, Computer Voice Systems, Inc. and Paul Sturm. Date of service: 01/25/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11166234] [19-15013] (Corcoran, Edward) [Entered: 01/25/2019 06:18 AM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely-filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4), and that motion is still pending in the district court. The December 26, 2018 notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending September 24, 2018 motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 14 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant shall file a written notice in this court: (1) informing this court of the district courts ruling; and (2) stating whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11145103] (CKP) [Entered: 01/08/2019 11:30 AM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Bright Harry opening brief due 03/01/2019. Appellees Scott William Benz, Daniel B. Coleman, Computer Voice Systems, Inc., Patrick J. Flynn, Carl Gilmore, Greg Hostetler, ION Trading, Inc., KCG Americas LLC, Main Street Trading, Inc., Andrea Pignataro, Paul Sturm, Robert Sylverne, Edward W. Wedbush and Wedbush Securities Inc. answering brief due 04/01/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11140224] (RT) [Entered: 01/03/2019 12:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bright Harry v. KCG Americas LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDWARD W. WEDBUSH, President of Wedbush
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG HOSTETLER, KCG Compliance Officer
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMPUTER VOICE SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Edward A. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT SYLVERNE, CEO of ION, USA
Represented By: Danielle Kono Lewis Esquire
Represented By: Gregg Anthony Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL GILMORE, Director of KCG Futures
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL STURM, CEO of QST
Represented By: Edward A. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK J. FLYNN, President of MST Wedbush Securities Inc.
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT WILLIAM BENZ, VP
Represented By: Edward A. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KCG AMERICAS LLC
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREA PIGNATARO, CEO of ION, Global
Represented By: Danielle Kono Lewis Esquire
Represented By: Gregg Anthony Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ION TRADING, INC.
Represented By: Danielle Kono Lewis Esquire
Represented By: Gregg Anthony Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WEDBUSH SECURITIES INC.
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAIN STREET TRADING, INC.
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL B. COLEMAN, CEO for KCG
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRIGHT HARRY
Represented By: Bright Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?