Ronald Draper v. KCG Americas LLC, et al

Defendant / Appellee: EDWARD W. WEDBUSH, President of Wedbush, GREG HOSTETLER, KCG Compliance Officer, COMPUTER VOICE SYSTEMS, INC., ROBERT SYLVERNE, CEO of ION, USA, CARL GILMORE, Director of KCG Futures, PAUL STURM, CEO of QST, PATRICK J. FLYNN, President of MST Wedbush Securities Inc., SCOTT WILLIAM BENZ, VP, KCG AMERICAS LLC, ANDREA PIGNATARO, CEO of ION, Global, ION TRADING, INC., WEDBUSH SECURITIES INC., MAIN STREET TRADING, INC. and DANIEL B. COLEMAN, CEO for KCG
Plaintiff / Appellant: RONALD STEPHEN DRAPER
Case Number: 19-15014
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely-filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4), and that motion is still pending in the district court. The December 26, 2018 notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending September 24, 2018 motions. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 14 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant shall file a written notice in this court: (1) informing this court of the district courts ruling; and (2) stating whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11172916] (CKP) [Entered: 01/30/2019 12:32 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 Added attorney Jeffry Henderson for Greg Hostetler Wedbush Securities Inc. Edward W. Wedbush Daniel B. Coleman Patrick J. Flynn Carl Gilmore KCG Americas LLC Main Street Trading, Inc., in case 19-15014. [11168373] (CW) [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:32 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 Added attorney Robert Christie for Greg Hostetler Wedbush Securities Inc. Edward W. Wedbush Daniel B. Coleman Patrick J. Flynn Carl Gilmore KCG Americas LLC Main Street Trading, Inc., in case 19-15014. [11168357] (CW) [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:30 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert B. Christie for Appellees Daniel B. Coleman, KCG Americas LLC, Carl Gilmore, Greg Hostetler, Main Street Trading, Inc., Wedbush Securities Inc., Edward W. Wedbush and Patrick J. Flynn. Date of service: 01/28/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11168334] [19-15014] (Christie, Robert) [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:26 AM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeffry M. Henderson for Appellees Edward W. Wedbush, Wedbush Securities Inc., Main Street Trading, Inc., Patrick J. Flynn, Carl Gilmore, Greg Hostetler, Daniel B. Coleman and KCG Americas LLC. Date of service: 01/28/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11168292] [19-15014] (Henderson, Jeffry) [Entered: 01/28/2019 09:20 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellees Scott William Benz, Computer Voice Systems, Inc. and Paul Sturm Correspondence: Letter submitted on behalf of all Defendants-Appellees questioning whether the notice of appeal was effective when filed on December 26, 2018. Date of service: 01/24/2019 [11165472] [19-15014] (Corcoran, Edward) [Entered: 01/24/2019 02:19 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 5 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellees Scott William Benz, Computer Voice Systems, Inc. and Paul Sturm Correspondence: Letter submitted on behalf of all Defendants-Appellees questioning whether the notice of appeal was effective when filed on December 26, 2018.. Date of service: 01/24/2019 [11165363] [19-15014] (Corcoran, Edward) [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:38 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 AttorneySophia Lau substituted by Attorney and Edward A. Corcoran in 19-15014 [11165319] (CW) [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:25 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Edward A. Corcoran for Appellees Scott William Benz, Computer Voice Systems, Inc. and Paul Sturm. Substitution for Attorney Ms. Sophia Lau for Appellees Scott William Benz, Computer Voice Systems, Inc. and Paul Sturm. Date of service: 01/24/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11165175] [19-15014] (Corcoran, Edward) [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:04 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ronald Stephen Draper opening brief due 03/01/2019. Appellees Scott William Benz, Daniel B. Coleman, Computer Voice Systems, Inc., Patrick J. Flynn, Carl Gilmore, Greg Hostetler, ION Trading, Inc., KCG Americas LLC, Main Street Trading, Inc., Andrea Pignataro, Paul Sturm, Robert Sylverne, Edward W. Wedbush and Wedbush Securities Inc. answering brief due 04/01/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11140231] (RT) [Entered: 01/03/2019 12:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronald Draper v. KCG Americas LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDWARD W. WEDBUSH, President of Wedbush
Represented By: Robert Christie
Represented By: Jeffry Henderson Esquire
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG HOSTETLER, KCG Compliance Officer
Represented By: Robert Christie
Represented By: Jeffry Henderson Esquire
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMPUTER VOICE SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Edward A. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT SYLVERNE, CEO of ION, USA
Represented By: Gregg Anthony Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL GILMORE, Director of KCG Futures
Represented By: Robert Christie
Represented By: Jeffry Henderson Esquire
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL STURM, CEO of QST
Represented By: Edward A. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK J. FLYNN, President of MST Wedbush Securities Inc.
Represented By: Robert Christie
Represented By: Jeffry Henderson Esquire
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT WILLIAM BENZ, VP
Represented By: Edward A. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KCG AMERICAS LLC
Represented By: Robert Christie
Represented By: Jeffry Henderson Esquire
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREA PIGNATARO, CEO of ION, Global
Represented By: Gregg Anthony Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ION TRADING, INC.
Represented By: Gregg Anthony Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WEDBUSH SECURITIES INC.
Represented By: Robert Christie
Represented By: Jeffry Henderson Esquire
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAIN STREET TRADING, INC.
Represented By: Robert Christie
Represented By: Jeffry Henderson Esquire
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL B. COLEMAN, CEO for KCG
Represented By: Robert Christie
Represented By: Jeffry Henderson Esquire
Represented By: Howard Holderness III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD STEPHEN DRAPER
Represented By: Ronald Stephen Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?