Alice Brown v. County of Del Norte, et al
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, REDWOOD NATIONAL AND STATE PARKS DEPARTMENT, DEL NORTE SHERIFF DEPARTMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEANA FREEMAN, National Park Ranger and MARSHALL NEECK, Chier Ranger, retired
Defendant / Appellee: ROBERT CLARKSON, ERIK APPERSON, GREGORY MORSE, ADAM DANIELS, NEAL OILAR, COUNTY OF DEL NORTE, DEAN WILSON, ROBERT TOLER, DAVID KELTNER, GRANT HENDERSON and JOEL LEACHMAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALICE BROWN
Case Number: 19-15017
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Alice Brown in 18-16689, 19-15017 motion for exemption from pacer fees. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/04/2019. [11181257] [18-16689, 19-15017] (NAC) [Entered: 02/06/2019 01:25 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellants motions to consolidate appeal Nos. 18-16689 and 19-15017 (Docket Entry No. [ # 11159601-2 ] in appeal No. 18-16689; Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ] in appeal No. 19-15017) are granted. Appeal Nos. 18-16689 and 19-15017 are consolidated. Upon review of the record, this court has determined that the appointment of pro bono counsel in these appeals would benefit the courts review. Appellants motion for appointment of counsel (Docket Entry No. [ # 11093587-2 ] in appeal No. 18-16689) is granted. The court by this order expresses no opinion as to the merits of these appeals. The Clerk shall enter an order appointing pro bono counsel on behalf of appellant for purposes of these appeals only, and establishing a revised briefing schedule. The appeals are stayed pending further order of this court.Upon review of the record, this court has determined that the appointment of pro bono counsel in these appeals would benefit the courts review. Appellants motion for appointment of counsel (Docket Entry No. 14 in appeal No. 18-16689) is granted. The court by this order expresses no opinion as to the merits of these appeals. The Clerk shall enter an order appointing pro bono counsel on behalf of appellant for purposes of these appeals only, and establishing a revised briefing schedule. The appeals are stayed pending further order of this court. (MOATT) [11168894] [18-16689, 19-15017] (RT) [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:38 AM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Alice Brown motion to consolidate case number 18-16689. Deficiencies: None. Served on 01/16/2019. [11159608] (NAC) [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:12 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Alice Brown opening brief due 03/04/2019. Appellees Erik Apperson, Robert Clarkson, County of Del Norte, Adam Daniels, Grant Henderson, David Keltner, Joel Leachman, Gregory Morse, Neal Oilar, Robert Toler and Dean Wilson answering brief due 04/04/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11141385] (RT) [Entered: 01/04/2019 10:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alice Brown v. County of Del Norte, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REDWOOD NATIONAL AND STATE PARKS DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEL NORTE SHERIFF DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEANA FREEMAN, National Park Ranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHALL NEECK, Chier Ranger, retired
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT CLARKSON
Represented By: Nicholas R. Kloeppel
Represented By: William Forrest Mitchell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIK APPERSON
Represented By: Nicholas R. Kloeppel
Represented By: William Forrest Mitchell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY MORSE
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADAM DANIELS
Represented By: Nicholas R. Kloeppel
Represented By: William Forrest Mitchell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEAL OILAR
Represented By: Nicholas R. Kloeppel
Represented By: William Forrest Mitchell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF DEL NORTE
Represented By: Nicholas R. Kloeppel
Represented By: William Forrest Mitchell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEAN WILSON
Represented By: Nicholas R. Kloeppel
Represented By: William Forrest Mitchell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT TOLER
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID KELTNER
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRANT HENDERSON
Represented By: Nicholas R. Kloeppel
Represented By: William Forrest Mitchell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOEL LEACHMAN
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALICE BROWN
Represented By: Alice Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?