Bill Rovid, et al v. Graco Children's Products, Inc, et al
Defendant: JERRY LUSK and KAREN SUSANNE LUSK, DBA Karen's Day Care
Defendant / Appellee: NEWELL RUBBERMAID, INC. and GRACO CHILDREN'S PRODUCTS, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: BILL ROVID, individually and as a successor in interest to Leanne Stephanie Rovid, deceased and LISA ROVID, individually and as a successor in interest to Leanne Stephanie Rovid, deceased
Case Number: 19-15033
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: TSP) Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to respond to order. (Order dated 01/15/2019), This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. [11219732] (TSP) [Entered: 03/07/2019 01:14 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11182773] (VS) [Entered: 02/07/2019 01:49 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 01/30/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11154241] (VS) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:54 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MBI): A review of the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over the appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after the district courts judgment entered on November 9, 2018. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellants shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellants elect to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellants do not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11153888] (WL) [Entered: 01/15/2019 01:43 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/14/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11152910] (AD) [Entered: 01/14/2019 06:44 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellees Graco Children's Products, Inc. and Newell Rubbermaid, Inc. Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 01/14/2019. [11152334] [19-15033] (Swaney, Steven) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:46 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Bill Rovid and Lisa Rovid Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/14/2019. [11152271] [19-15033] (Carcione, Joseph) [Entered: 01/14/2019 02:35 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/14/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/04/2019. Transcript due 03/05/2019. Appellants Bill Rovid and Lisa Rovid opening brief due 04/15/2019. Appellees Graco Children's Products, Inc. and Newell Rubbermaid, Inc. answering brief due 05/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11144208] (RT) [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bill Rovid, et al v. Graco Children's Products, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEWELL RUBBERMAID, INC.
Represented By: Steven Edward Swaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRACO CHILDREN'S PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Steven Edward Swaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY LUSK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN SUSANNE LUSK, DBA Karen's Day Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BILL ROVID, individually and as a successor in interest to Leanne Stephanie Rovid, deceased
Represented By: Joseph W. Carcione Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LISA ROVID, individually and as a successor in interest to Leanne Stephanie Rovid, deceased
Represented By: Joseph W. Carcione Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?