USA v. Walter Kubon, et al
Defendant: STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD
Defendant / Appellant: WALTER JAMES KUBON and VALLY KUBON
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-15036
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Streamlined request by Appellant Walter James Kubon to extend time to file the brief is not approved because the case is closed per Order dated 02/28/2019 [ # 7 ]. [11219295] (JN) [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:30 AM]
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY, SUSAN P. GRABER and M. MARGARET MCKEOWN) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with rule). DISMISSED. [11211216] (WL) [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:13 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 01/22/2019. [11165180] (RT) [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:07 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Check number 25276981904 in the amount of $505.00, forwarded to district court. (See Case Files) [11152473] (JR) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:13 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellee USA Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 01/10/2019. [11148912] [19-15036] (Ugolini, Francesca) [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:59 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney Cynthia Lewis Stier in 19-15036 substituted by Attorney Francesca Ugolini in 19-15036 [11148745] (NAC) [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:13 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Francesca Ugolini for Appellee USA. Substitution for Attorney Ms. Cynthia Lewis Stier, Esquire for Appellee USA. Date of service: 01/10/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11148083] [19-15036] (Ugolini, Francesca) [Entered: 01/10/2019 09:42 AM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Vally Kubon and Walter James Kubon opening brief due 03/04/2019. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 04/04/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11143689] (RT) [Entered: 01/07/2019 02:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Walter Kubon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WALTER JAMES KUBON
Represented By: Walter James Kubon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: VALLY KUBON
Represented By: Vally Kubon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Francesca Ugolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?