Roger Hillygus, et al v. Frances Doherty, et al
Defendant: WASHOE COUNTY GOVERNMENTAL AUTHORITY
Defendant / Appellee: JEA SENIOR LIVING JERRY ERWIN ASS. INC., JOEL BENNETT BARBER, RYAN J. MCELHINNEY, CITY OF RENO, GORDON MUIR, DEBORAH S. BOWERS, MARSHA BERKBIGLER, LUND ENTERPRISES, LLC, DBA Fiduciary Services of Nevada, DON LESLIE ROSS, MARK H. GUNDERSON, DAVID SPITZER, JEANNE HERMAN, RYAN J. EARL, KAYCEE ZUSMAN, individually; as guardian of the Person and Estate of Susan Hillygus; as Successor Trustee of the Hillygus Family Trust; as Managing Member of Fiduciary Services of Nevada, LLC, DANIEL D. LUND, Managing member of Lund Enterprises, LLC, RENO JUSTICE COURT, DAVID CLIFTON, Judge; in official and individual capacity, MICHAEL W. KEANE, THE BARBER LAW GROUP INC., SCOTT FREEMAN, Chief administrator of the 2nd Judicial District Court in Washoe County, KITTY JUNG, JOHN R. FUNK, ROBIN R. RENWICK, individually; as guardian of H.E. Hillygus; as co-guardian, S.L. Hillygus and co-trustee The Hillygus Family Trust, JOHN MACKEN, FIDUCIARY SERVICES OF NEVADA, LLC, DBA Lund Enterprises, LLC, JACQUELINE BRYANT, 2ND JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, County of Washoe, Nevada, JERRY BALDRIDGE, WASHOE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, WASHOE LEGAL SERVICES DOMESTIC NON-PROFIT CORPORATION, BOB LUCY, HAWKINS FOLSOM & MUIR P.C., MICHAEL B. SPRINGER, STEPHEN C. MOSS, FRANCES DOHERTY, Judge; in official and individual capacity, WASHOE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, ADAM LAXALT, CHUCK ALLAN, SILVER STATE LAW, LLC, TODD L. TORVINEN ESQ, CHARTERED P.C., RENO CITY COUNCIL, ROBERT ZUSMAN, individually; as managing partner of Fiduciary Services of Nevada, LLC, DEBRA A.W. FREDERICKS, GREG HERRERA, THE GUNDERSON LAW FIRM P.L.C., AUSTIN K. SWEET, PATRICK FLANAGAN, VAUGHN HARTUNG, WOODBURN & WEDGE, KELLY K. LUND, individually, and incorrectly identified as Guardian and Trustee; as Managing Member of Lund Enterprises, LLC, WASHOE LEGAL SERVICES BOARD OF DIRECTORS, TODD L. TORVINEN and TODD LEE TORVINEN
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROGER HILLYGUS, DEBBIE HILLYGUS, HERBERT EUGENE HILLYGUS, SUSAN HILLYGUS and THE HILLYGUS FAMILY TRUST
Case Number: 19-15137
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellants' motion for appointment of counsel; motion to be appointed guardian of Susan L. Hillygus; motion for deceased (Herbert E. Hillygus) estate be submitted to probate. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/06/2019. [11233884] (RR) [Entered: 03/19/2019 12:14 PM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Roger Hillygus motion and affidavit for permission to proceed IFP. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/06/2019. [11233876] (RR) [Entered: 03/19/2019 12:11 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Terminated Mark G. Simons for Washoe Legal Services Domestic Non-Profit Corporation, Washoe Legal Services Board of Directors, Austin K. Sweet and David Spitzer in 19-15137 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [11213310] (RY) [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:28 PM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11189360] (CKP) [Entered: 02/13/2019 03:04 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS AND APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Debbie Hillygus, Herbert Eugene Hillygus, Roger Hillygus, Susan Hillygus and The Hillygus Family Trust opening brief due 03/19/2019. Appellees 2nd Judicial District Court, Chuck Allan, Jerry Baldridge, Joel Bennett Barber, Marsha Berkbigler, Deborah S. Bowers, Jacqueline Bryant, City of Reno, David Clifton, Frances Doherty, Ryan J. Earl, Fiduciary Services of Nevada, LLC, Patrick Flanagan, Debra A.W. Fredericks, Scott Freeman, John R. Funk, Mark H. Gunderson, Vaughn Hartung, Hawkins Folsom & Muir P.C., Jeanne Herman, Greg Herrera, JEA Senior Living Jerry Erwin Ass. Inc., Kitty Jung, Michael W. Keane, Adam Laxalt, Bob Lucy, Daniel D. Lund, Kelly K. Lund, Lund Enterprises, LLC, John Macken, Ryan J. McElhinney, Stephen Craig Moss, Gordon Muir, Reno City Council, Reno Justice Court, Robin R. Renwick, Don Leslie Ross, Silver State Law, LLC, David Spitzer, Michael B. Springer, Austin K. Sweet, The Barber Law Group Inc., The Gunderson Law Firm P.L.C., Todd L. Torvinen Esq, Chartered P.C., Todd L. Torvinen, Washoe County Board of Commissioners, Washoe County Sheriff's Department, Washoe Legal Services Board of Directors, Washoe Legal Services Domestic Non-Profit Corporation, Woodburn & Wedge, Kaycee Zusman and Robert Zusman answering brief due 04/18/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11166895] (JMR) [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roger Hillygus, et al v. Frances Doherty, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEA SENIOR LIVING JERRY ERWIN ASS. INC.
Represented By: Anthony Dean Lauria Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOEL BENNETT BARBER
Represented By: Roger Strassburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN J. MCELHINNEY
Represented By: Roger Strassburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF RENO
Represented By: Brian M. Sooudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GORDON MUIR
Represented By: Gordon R. Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBORAH S. BOWERS
Represented By: Danielle Lynn Christenson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARSHA BERKBIGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUND ENTERPRISES, LLC, DBA Fiduciary Services of Nevada
Represented By: Danielle Lynn Christenson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DON LESLIE ROSS
Represented By: Janice Hodge Jensen Esquire
Represented By: Wayne Alan Shaffer Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK H. GUNDERSON
Represented By: Roger Strassburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID SPITZER
Represented By: John A. Snow Esquire
Represented By: Mark G. Simons Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEANNE HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN J. EARL
Represented By: Ryan J. Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAYCEE ZUSMAN, individually; as guardian of the Person and Estate of Susan Hillygus; as Successor Trustee of the Hillygus Family Trust; as Managing Member of Fiduciary Services of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Lynn Christenson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL D. LUND, Managing member of Lund Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Lynn Christenson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RENO JUSTICE COURT
Represented By: Herbert Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID CLIFTON, Judge; in official and individual capacity
Represented By: Herbert Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL W. KEANE
Represented By: Janice Hodge Jensen Esquire
Represented By: Wayne Alan Shaffer Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE BARBER LAW GROUP INC.
Represented By: Roger Strassburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT FREEMAN, Chief administrator of the 2nd Judicial District Court in Washoe County
Represented By: Charles Wayne Howle Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KITTY JUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN R. FUNK
Represented By: Roger Strassburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBIN R. RENWICK, individually; as guardian of H.E. Hillygus; as co-guardian, S.L. Hillygus and co-trustee The Hillygus Family Trust
Represented By: Todd Lee Torvinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN MACKEN
Represented By: Herbert Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIDUCIARY SERVICES OF NEVADA, LLC, DBA Lund Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Lynn Christenson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE BRYANT
Represented By: Herbert Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 2ND JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT, County of Washoe, Nevada
Represented By: Charles Wayne Howle Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERRY BALDRIDGE
Represented By: Herbert Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WASHOE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Herbert Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WASHOE LEGAL SERVICES DOMESTIC NON-PROFIT CORPORATION
Represented By: John A. Snow Esquire
Represented By: Mark G. Simons Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOB LUCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAWKINS FOLSOM & MUIR P.C.
Represented By: Gordon R. Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL B. SPRINGER
Represented By: Matthew J. Curti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN C. MOSS
Represented By: Stephen C. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANCES DOHERTY, Judge; in official and individual capacity
Represented By: Charles Wayne Howle Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WASHOE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS
Represented By: Herbert Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADAM LAXALT
Represented By: Charles Wayne Howle Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHUCK ALLAN
Represented By: Herbert Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SILVER STATE LAW, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Curti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TODD L. TORVINEN ESQ, CHARTERED P.C.
Represented By: Todd Lee Torvinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RENO CITY COUNCIL
Represented By: Brian M. Sooudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT ZUSMAN, individually; as managing partner of Fiduciary Services of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Lynn Christenson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBRA A.W. FREDERICKS
Represented By: Debra A.W. Fredericks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG HERRERA
Represented By: Herbert Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE GUNDERSON LAW FIRM P.L.C.
Represented By: Roger Strassburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUSTIN K. SWEET
Represented By: John A. Snow Esquire
Represented By: Mark G. Simons Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK FLANAGAN
Represented By: Charles Wayne Howle Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VAUGHN HARTUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WOODBURN & WEDGE
Represented By: Janice Hodge Jensen Esquire
Represented By: Wayne Alan Shaffer Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KELLY K. LUND, individually, and incorrectly identified as Guardian and Trustee; as Managing Member of Lund Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Lynn Christenson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WASHOE LEGAL SERVICES BOARD OF DIRECTORS
Represented By: John A. Snow Esquire
Represented By: Mark G. Simons Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TODD L. TORVINEN
Represented By: Todd Lee Torvinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TODD LEE TORVINEN
Represented By: Todd Lee Torvinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROGER HILLYGUS
Represented By: Roger Hillygus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEBBIE HILLYGUS
Represented By: Debbie Hillygus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HERBERT EUGENE HILLYGUS
Represented By: Herbert Eugene Hillygus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN HILLYGUS
Represented By: Susan Hillygus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THE HILLYGUS FAMILY TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHOE COUNTY GOVERNMENTAL AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?