Malcolm Gray v. Dwight Neven, et al
Defendant: MENTAL HEALTH PROVIDERS, E. K. MCDANIEL and GREG COX
Defendant / Appellee: ROBERT OWENS, Sgt, BRUCE STROUD, DWIGHT NEVEN, Warden, NETHANJAH CHILDERS, JENNIFER NASH, SHERYL FOSTER and TIMOTHY FILSON
Plaintiff / Appellant: MALCOLM L. GRAY
Case Number: 19-15492
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11290569] (CKP) [Entered: 05/08/2019 11:19 AM]
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney Michael Simba Muzorewa Jr. in 19-15492 substituted by Attorney Frank Anthony Toddre II in 19-15492 [11243336] (NAC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 08:23 AM]
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Frank A. Toddre, II for Appellees Nethanjah Childers, Timothy Filson, Sheryl Foster, Jennifer Nash, Dwight Neven and Robert Owens. Substitution for Attorney Michael Simba Muzorewa, Jr. for Appellees Nethanjah Childers, Timothy Filson, Sheryl Foster, Jennifer Nash, Dwight Neven and Robert Owens. Date of service: 03/27/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11243334] [19-15492] (Toddre, Frank) [Entered: 03/27/2019 08:21 AM]
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 04/15/2019. Transcript due 05/13/2019. Appellant Malcolm L. Gray opening brief due 06/24/2019. Appellees Nethanjah Childers, Timothy Filson, Sheryl Foster, Jennifer Nash, Dwight Neven, Warden, Robert Owens and Bruce Stroud answering brief due 07/22/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11234276] (JPD) [Entered: 03/19/2019 02:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malcolm Gray v. Dwight Neven, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENTAL HEALTH PROVIDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. K. MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT OWENS, Sgt
Represented By: Michael Simba Muzorewa Jr.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRUCE STROUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DWIGHT NEVEN, Warden
Represented By: Michael Simba Muzorewa Jr.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NETHANJAH CHILDERS
Represented By: Michael Simba Muzorewa Jr.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER NASH
Represented By: Michael Simba Muzorewa Jr.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHERYL FOSTER
Represented By: Michael Simba Muzorewa Jr.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY FILSON
Represented By: Michael Simba Muzorewa Jr.
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MALCOLM L. GRAY
Represented By: Malcolm L. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?