Kerry Boulton, et al v. US Tax Lien Association, LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: SAEN HIGGINS and US TAX LIEN ASSOCIATION, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: LUCA ANGELUCCI, JEREMY ANDREWS, KERRY BOULTON, WILLIAM GAMBA and ANE MARIE LACY
Case Number: 19-15526
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 15, 2020 KERRY BOULTON V. US TAX LIEN ASSN.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11283583] (VS) [Entered: 05/01/2019 01:57 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 Added attorney Teri T. Pham for Saen Higgins US Tax Lien Association, LLC, in case 19-15526. [11282020] (RR) [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:40 AM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Teri Thuy Ngoc Pham for Appellees Saen Higgins and US Tax Lien Association, LLC. Date of service: 04/30/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11281761] [19-15526] (Pham, Teri) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:42 AM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 Attorney Anna M. He in 19-15526 substituted by Attorney Jenna F. Karadbil for US Tax Lien Association, LLC and Saen Higgins in 19-15526 [11266383] (LA) [Entered: 04/16/2019 07:17 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 Mail returned on 04/15/2019 addressed to Anna M. He for US Tax Lien Association, LLC and Saen Higgins, re: 03/22/2019 case opening information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: Jenna F. Karadbil via CM/ECF per Representation Statement attached to Notice of Appeal. [11266382] (LA) [Entered: 04/16/2019 07:14 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 04/26/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11261101] (VS) [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:32 PM]
April 7, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/07/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11255294] (AD) [Entered: 04/07/2019 06:44 PM]
April 7, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jeremy Andrews, Luca Angelucci, Kerry Boulton, William Gamba and Ane Marie Lacy Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/07/2019. [11255293] [19-15526] (Carter, Brian) [Entered: 04/07/2019 06:41 PM]
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11248608] (LW) [Entered: 04/01/2019 01:51 PM]
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Terminated Teri T. Pham for US Tax Lien Association, LLC and Saen Higgins in 19-15526 (Due to incorrect ECF account information). [11240565] (SLM) [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:46 AM]
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/29/2019. Transcript ordered by 04/22/2019. Transcript due 05/20/2019. Appellants Jeremy Andrews, Luca Angelucci, Kerry Boulton, William Gamba and Ane Marie Lacy opening brief due 07/01/2019. Appellees Saen Higgins and US Tax Lien Association, LLC answering brief due 08/01/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11239039] (RT) [Entered: 03/22/2019 11:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kerry Boulton, et al v. US Tax Lien Association, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAEN HIGGINS
Represented By: Anna M. He
Represented By: Teri T. Pham
Represented By: Jenna F. Karadbil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US TAX LIEN ASSOCIATION, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Anna M. He
Represented By: Teri T. Pham
Represented By: Jenna F. Karadbil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LUCA ANGELUCCI
Represented By: Brian S. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEREMY ANDREWS
Represented By: Brian S. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KERRY BOULTON
Represented By: Brian S. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM GAMBA
Represented By: Brian S. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANE MARIE LACY
Represented By: Brian S. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?