Shawne Alston, et al v. NCAA, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: KENDALL TIMMONS, ALEX LAURICELLA, INDIA CHANEY, SHARRIF FLOYD, JOHN BOHANNON, WILLIAM TYNDALL, KENYATA JOHNSON, KENDALL GREGORY-MCGHEE, JOHNATHAN MOORE, CHRIS DAVENPORT, JUSTINE HARTMAN, KEVIN PERRY, MARTIN JENKINS, NIGEL HAYES, SHAWNE ALSTON, MICHEL'LE THOMAS, BARRY BRUNETTI, NICHOLAS KINDLER, ASHLEY HOLLIDAY, DUANE BENNETT, DALENTA JAMERAL STEPHENS, "D.J.", CHRIS STONE, ALEC JAMES, DON BANKS, "DJ", ANFORNEE STEWART, AFURE JEMERIGBE, DAX DELLENBACH and KYLE THERET
Defendant / Appellant: THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC., NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, The NCAA, MOUNTAIN WEST CONFERENCE, THE BIG TWELVE CONFERENCE, INC., WESTERN ATHLETIC CONFERENCE, PACIFIC 12 CONFERENCE, AMERICAN ATHLETIC CONFERENCE, SOUTHEASTERN CONFERENCE, ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE, MID-AMERICAN CONFERENCE, CONFERENCE USA and SUN BELT CONFERENCE
Not Classified By Court: In re: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION ATHLETIC GRANT-IN-AID CAP ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 19-15566
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 Terminated Kyle A. Casazza for Pacific 12 Conference in 19-15566 and Pacific 12 Conference in 19-15662 (Due to incorrect ECF account information). [11308556] [19-15566, 19-15662] (SLM) [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:52 AM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11282874] [19-15566, 19-15662] (VS) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:20 AM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 04/30/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in these matters are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11265250] [19-15566, 19-15662] (VS) [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:22 AM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/15/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11263818] (AD) [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:44 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Appellees Justine Hartman, John Bohannon, Shawne Alston, Don Banks, Duane Bennett, Barry Brunetti, India Chaney, Chris Davenport, Dax Dellenbach, Sharrif Floyd, Kendall Gregory-McGhee, Nigel Hayes, Ashley Holliday, Alec James, Afure Jemerigbe, Martin Jenkins, Kenyata Johnson, Nicholas Kindler, Alex Lauricella, Johnathan Moore, Kevin Perry, Dalenta Jameral Stephens, Anfornee Stewart, Chris Stone, Kyle Theret, Michel'le Thomas, Kendall Timmons and William Tyndall in 19-15566, Appellants Justine Hartman and John Bohannon in 19-15662 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/15/2019. [11263645] [19-15566, 19-15662] (Kessler, Jeffrey) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:41 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/15/2019. First cross appeal brief due 07/03/2019 for American Athletic Conference, Atlantic Coast Conference, Conference USA, Mid-American Conference, Mountain West Conference, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Pacific 12 Conference, Southeastern Conference, Sun Belt Conference, The Big Ten Conference, Inc., The Big Twelve Conference, Inc. and Western Athletic Conference. Second brief on cross appeal due 08/05/2019 for Shawne Alston, Don Banks, Duane Bennett, John Bohannon, Barry Brunetti, India Chaney, Chris Davenport, Dax Dellenbach, Sharrif Floyd, Kendall Gregory-McGhee, Justine Hartman, Nigel Hayes, Ashley Holliday, Alec James, Afure Jemerigbe, Martin Jenkins, Kenyata Johnson, Nicholas Kindler, Alex Lauricella, Johnathan Moore, Kevin Perry, Dalenta Jameral Stephens, Anfornee Stewart, Chris Stone, Kyle Theret, Michel'le Thomas, Kendall Timmons and William Tyndall. Third brief on cross appeal due 09/04/2019 for American Athletic Conference, Atlantic Coast Conference, Conference USA, Mid-American Conference, Mountain West Conference, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Pacific 12 Conference, Southeastern Conference, Sun Belt Conference, The Big Ten Conference, Inc., The Big Twelve Conference, Inc. and Western Athletic Conference. Optional cross appeal reply brief is due within 21 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [11255888] [19-15662, 19-15566] (JBS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:22 AM]
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/03/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11252405] (AD) [Entered: 04/03/2019 06:44 PM]
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellant NCAA Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/03/2019. [11251973] [19-15566] (Waxman, Seth) [Entered: 04/03/2019 02:36 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 Added attorney Kevin Matthew Lamb for NCAA. [11245853] (RL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:23 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 Added attorney David Lehn for NCAA. [11245843] (RL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:20 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kevin Lamb for Appellant NCAA. Date of service: 03/28/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11245842] [19-15566] (Lamb, Kevin) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:20 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David Lehn for Appellant NCAA. Date of service: 03/28/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11245831] [19-15566] (Lehn, David) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:14 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Added attorney Daniel Volchok for NCAA. [11245817] (RL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:05 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Volchok for Appellant NCAA. Date of service: 03/28/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11245800] [19-15566] (Volchok, Daniel) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:00 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 Added attorney Leon B. Greenfield for NCAA. [11245595] (RL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 02:16 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Leon B. Greenfield for Appellant NCAA. Date of service: 03/28/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11245585] [19-15566] (Greenfield, Leon) [Entered: 03/28/2019 02:14 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 Added attorney Seth P. Waxman for NCAA. [11245557] (RL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 02:01 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Seth P. Waxman for Appellant NCAA. Date of service: 03/28/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11245552] [19-15566] (Waxman, Seth) [Entered: 03/28/2019 01:58 PM]
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/03/2019. Transcript ordered by 04/24/2019. Transcript due 05/23/2019. Appellants American Athletic Conference, Atlantic Coast Conference, Conference USA, Mid-American Conference, Mountain West Conference, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Pacific 12 Conference, Southeastern Conference, Sun Belt Conference, The Big Ten Conference, Inc., The Big Twelve Conference, Inc. and Western Athletic Conference opening brief due 07/03/2019. Appellees Shawne Alston, Don Banks, Duane Bennett, John Bohannon, Barry Brunetti, India Chaney, Chris Davenport, Dax Dellenbach, Sharrif Floyd, Kendall Gregory-McGhee, Justine Hartman, Nigel Hayes, Ashley Holliday, Alec James, Afure Jemerigbe, Martin Jenkins, Kenyata Johnson, Nicholas Kindler, Alex Lauricella, Johnathan Moore, Kevin Perry, Dalenta Jameral Stephens, Anfornee Stewart, Chris Stone, Kyle Theret, Michel'le Thomas, Kendall Timmons and William Tyndall answering brief due 08/05/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11244285] (RT) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shawne Alston, et al v. NCAA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENDALL TIMMONS
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALEX LAURICELLA
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INDIA CHANEY
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHARRIF FLOYD
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN BOHANNON
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIAM TYNDALL
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENYATA JOHNSON
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENDALL GREGORY-MCGHEE
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHNATHAN MOORE
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRIS DAVENPORT
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUSTINE HARTMAN
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEVIN PERRY
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARTIN JENKINS
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NIGEL HAYES
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHAWNE ALSTON
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHEL'LE THOMAS
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BARRY BRUNETTI
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NICHOLAS KINDLER
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ASHLEY HOLLIDAY
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DUANE BENNETT
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DALENTA JAMERAL STEPHENS, "D.J."
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRIS STONE
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALEC JAMES
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DON BANKS, "DJ"
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANFORNEE STEWART
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AFURE JEMERIGBE
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAX DELLENBACH
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KYLE THERET
Represented By: David Greenspan
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon Esquire
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Robert B. Carey Esquire
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC.
Represented By: Andrew Rosenman
Represented By: Britt M. Miller
Represented By: Richard Joseph Favretto Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, The NCAA
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Lamb
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Represented By: David Lehn
Represented By: Daniel Volchok
Represented By: Seth P. Waxman
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Represented By: Sean Eskovitz Esquire
Represented By: Brant Bishop
Represented By: Leon B. Greenfield
Represented By: Beth A. Wilkinson
Represented By: Brant W. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MOUNTAIN WEST CONFERENCE
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Represented By: Brent E. Rychener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: THE BIG TWELVE CONFERENCE, INC.
Represented By: Leane K. Capps
Represented By: Caitlin J. Morgan
Represented By: Wesley Douglas Hurst Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WESTERN ATHLETIC CONFERENCE
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Mishkin
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PACIFIC 12 CONFERENCE
Represented By: Shawn Scott Ledingham Jr.
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Bart H. Williams Esquire
Represented By: Kyle A. Casazza Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMERICAN ATHLETIC CONFERENCE
Represented By: Rebecca A. Jacobs
Represented By: Benjamin Conrad Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SOUTHEASTERN CONFERENCE
Represented By: Robert W. Fuller III
Represented By: Mark Jeremy Seifert
Represented By: Pearlynn Gilleece Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ATLANTIC COAST CONFERENCE
Represented By: David Erik Albright Esquire
Represented By: Jonathan P. Heyl
Represented By: Gregory G. Holland
Represented By: Charles L. Coleman Esquire III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MID-AMERICAN CONFERENCE
Represented By: Andrew Bennett Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CONFERENCE USA
Represented By: Leane K. Capps
Represented By: Caitlin J. Morgan
Represented By: Wesley Douglas Hurst Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SUN BELT CONFERENCE
Represented By: Mark A. Cunningham Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION ATHLETIC GRANT-IN-AID CAP ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?