Joseph Anderson v. Quentin Byrne, et al
Defendant: K. LEGRAND and NEVADA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Defendant / Appellee: TARA CARPENTER, JAMES GREG COX, JETHRO PARKS, ELDON K. MCDANIEL, RON STOGNER, RAY EAST, QUENTIN BYRNE, JONATHAN BALL, VALAREE OLIVAS, KARA KRAUSE-LEGRAND, ROBERT LEGRAND, Warden and SHERYL FOSTER
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSEPH M. ANDERSON
Case Number: 19-15602
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 Filed Appellant Joseph M. Anderson reply to appointment of counsel. served on 05/14/2019 [11302784] (JFF) [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:59 AM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellee Jethro Parks response opposing motion ([ # 8 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 05/06/2019. [11288316] [19-15602] (Toddre, Frank) [Entered: 05/06/2019 04:08 PM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 Received original and 7 copies of Appellant Joseph M. Anderson opening brief (Informal: Yes) 31 pages. Served on 04/23/2019. Major deficiencies: motions pending. [11278616] (SML) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:19 AM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Joseph M. Anderson motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/19/2019. [11275770] (CW) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:19 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Joseph M. Anderson motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/12/2019. [11275727] (CW) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:08 PM]
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellee Jethro Parks response non-opposing motion/form/notice at [ # 5 ] Party Motion. Date of service: 04/19/2019. I certify that I have separately notified all parties not registered for Appellate Electronic Filing in this case with notice of this non-opposition. [11270111] [19-15602] (Toddre, Frank) [Entered: 04/19/2019 11:20 AM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Joseph M. Anderson motion to extend time to comply with the order dated 04/02/2019. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/14/2019. [11268849] (CW) [Entered: 04/18/2019 01:48 PM]
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 Attorney Ian E. Carr in 19-15602 substituted by Attorney Frank Anthony Toddre II in 19-15602 [11251646] (CW) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:52 PM]
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Frank A. Toddre, II for Appellees Jonathan Ball, Quentin Byrne, Tara Carpenter, James Greg Cox, Ray East, Sheryl Foster, Kara Krause-LeGrand, Robert LeGrand, Eldon K. McDaniel, Valaree Olivas, Jethro Parks and Ron Stogner. Substitution for Attorney Ian E. Carr, Esquire for Appellee Jethro Parks. Date of service: 04/03/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11251524] [19-15602] (Toddre, Frank) [Entered: 04/03/2019 11:39 AM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11250355] (CKP) [Entered: 04/02/2019 02:04 PM]
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Joseph M. Anderson opening brief due 05/28/2019. Appellees Jonathan Ball, Quentin Byrne, Tara Carpenter, James Greg Cox, Ray East, Sheryl Foster, Kara Krause-LeGrand, Robert LeGrand, Warden, Eldon K. McDaniel, Valaree Olivas, Jethro Parks and Ron Stogner answering brief due 06/27/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11247933] (JPD) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Anderson v. Quentin Byrne, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TARA CARPENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES GREG COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JETHRO PARKS
Represented By: Ian E. Carr Esquire
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELDON K. MCDANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RON STOGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAY EAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QUENTIN BYRNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JONATHAN BALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VALAREE OLIVAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KARA KRAUSE-LEGRAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT LEGRAND, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHERYL FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. LEGRAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEVADA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH M. ANDERSON
Represented By: Joseph M. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?