Carl Krawitt, et al v. Infosys Technologies Limited, et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ex rel.
Plaintiff / Appellant: CARL KRAWITT, an individual
Defendant / Appellee: INFOSYS TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED, INCORPORATED and APPLE, INC.
Case Number: 19-15718
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11270984] (CL) [Entered: 04/19/2019 05:03 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David I. Monteiro for Appellee Infosys Technologies Limited, Incorporated. Date of service: 04/18/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11268743] [19-15718] (Monteiro, David) [Entered: 04/18/2019 12:58 PM]
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/17/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11268017] (AD) [Entered: 04/17/2019 06:44 PM]
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 Added attorney Megan R. Whisler for Infosys Technologies Limited, Incorporated, in case 19-15718. [11267471] (RR) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:43 PM]
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellant Carl Krawitt Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/17/2019. [11267363] [19-15718] (Pierce, John) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:18 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Megan Renee Whisler for Appellee Infosys Technologies Limited, Incorporated. Date of service: 04/16/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11265892] [19-15718] (Whisler, Megan) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:14 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Added attorney John Mark Pierce for Carl Krawitt, in case 19-15718. [11264156] (RR) [Entered: 04/15/2019 02:44 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John M. Pierce for Appellant Carl Krawitt. Date of service: 04/15/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11262993] [19-15718] (Pierce, John) [Entered: 04/15/2019 07:49 AM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/17/2019. Transcript ordered by 05/10/2019. Transcript due 06/10/2019. Appellant Carl Krawitt opening brief due 07/19/2019. Appellees Apple, Inc. and Infosys Technologies Limited, Incorporated answering brief due 08/19/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11259885] (JBS) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carl Krawitt, et al v. Infosys Technologies Limited, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARL KRAWITT, an individual
Represented By: Steven Kaufhold
Represented By: John Mark Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INFOSYS TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Represented By: David I. Monteiro
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Justin Roel Chapa
Represented By: Megan R. Whisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APPLE, INC.
Represented By: Christopher Babbitt
Represented By: Kimberly A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ex rel.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?