CFTC v. James Crombie, et al
Defendant: PARON CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Trustee: TIMOTHY W. HOFFMAN
Plaintiff / Appellee: U.S. COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION
Defendant / Appellant: JAMES DEVLIN CROMBIE
Case Number: 19-16190
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Jonathan Persons Robell in 19-16190 substituted by Attorney Martin B. White in 19-16190 [11356410] (NAC) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:53 AM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Martin Baskin White (Office of the General Counsel, Commodity Futures Trading Commission, 1155 21st Street NW, Washington, DC 20581) for Appellee CFTC. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Jonathan Persons Robell for Appellee CFTC. Date of service: 07/08/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11356283] [19-16190] (White, Martin) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:13 AM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Mail returned on 07/01/2019 addressed to James Devlin Crombie, re: 06/11/2019 case opening information [ # 1 ], postmarked 06/13/2019. Returned envelope notes: please forward/return, not at this address since 2016, return to sender, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; no forwarding address found. [11354450] (LA) [Entered: 07/03/2019 06:24 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Mail returned on 06/27/2019 addressed to James Devlin Crombie, re: case opening package [ # 1 ] Not at this addresss since 2016. Resending to: casefiles- no forwarding address. [11347102] (JFF) [Entered: 06/27/2019 01:56 PM]
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 07/05/2019. Transcript due 08/05/2019. Appellant James Devlin Crombie opening brief due 09/13/2019. Appellee U.S. COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11327299] (RT) [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: CFTC v. James Crombie, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: TIMOTHY W. HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARON CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: U.S. COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION
Represented By: Jonathan Persons Robell
Represented By: Martin B. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAMES DEVLIN CROMBIE
Represented By: James Devlin Crombie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?