Jason Fyk v. Facebook, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: FACEBOOK, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JASON FYK
Case Number: 19-16232
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 Streamlined request [10] by Appellant Jason Fyk to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamlined requests of time allow for 30 days. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Jason Fyk opening brief due 09/18/2019. Appellee Facebook, Inc. answering brief due 10/18/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11399040] (BG) [Entered: 08/15/2019 04:21 PM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Jason Fyk. New requested due date is 09/03/2019. [11398604] [19-16232] (Smikun, Michael) [Entered: 08/15/2019 01:38 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11368176] (CL) [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:03 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 07/16/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11351884] (CL) [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:27 AM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/27/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11347800][19-16232] (AD) [Entered: 06/27/2019 06:44 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/27/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11347798][19-16232] (AD) [Entered: 06/27/2019 06:44 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellant Jason Fyk Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/27/2019. [11347067] [19-16232] (Smikun, Michael) [Entered: 06/27/2019 01:44 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Jason Fyk Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/27/2019. [11347018] [19-16232] (Smikun, Michael) [Entered: 06/27/2019 01:24 PM]
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Added attorney Michael Jonathan Smikun for Jason Fyk, in case 19-16232. [11345693] (RR) [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:58 PM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael Jonathan Smikun for Appellant Jason Fyk. Date of service: 06/25/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11343876] [19-16232] (Smikun, Michael) [Entered: 06/25/2019 01:33 PM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/27/2019. Appellant Jason Fyk opening brief due 08/19/2019. Appellee Facebook, Inc. answering brief due 09/17/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11338802] (JMR) [Entered: 06/20/2019 10:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason Fyk v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FACEBOOK, INC.
Represented By: William S. Hicks
Represented By: Matan Shacham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON FYK
Represented By: Constance J. Yu
Represented By: Michael Jonathan Smikun Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?