Jordan Venable v. City of Phoenix, et al

Defendant / Appellee: DOES, Unknown Parties named as John Does 1-10 and Black Entities 1-5, CITY OF PHOENIX, a municipality, CHARLES MORIN, Commander, Phoenix Police Department, EMILIO LUNA, Badge No. 10074, in his individual capacity as an officer with the Phoenix Police Department, JERI WILLIAMS, Police Chief, Phoenix Police Department, TOM MCKEE, Badge No. 9214, in his individual capacity as an officer with the Phoenix Police Department and BUSH, Badge No. 9316, in his individual capacity as an officer with the Phoenix Police Department
Plaintiff / Appellant: JORDAN DUKE VENABLE
Case Number: 19-16263
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellees City of Phoenix, Tom McKee, Charles Morin and Jeri Williams reply to response to order to show cause dated 07/01/2019. Date of service: 08/05/2019. [11387855] [19-16263] (Zoellner, Tara) [Entered: 08/05/2019 05:08 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Tara Zoellner for party(s) Appellee Tom McKee, Appellee City of Phoenix, Appellee Jeri Williams and Appellee Charles Morin, in case 19-16263. [11387826] (QDL) [Entered: 08/05/2019 04:53 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tara B. Zoellner (Wieneke Law Group, PLC, 1095 West Rio Salado Parkway, Suite 209, Tempe, AZ 85281) for Appellees City of Phoenix, Tom McKee, Jeri Williams and Charles Morin. Date of service: 08/05/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11387819] [19-16263] (Zoellner, Tara) [Entered: 08/05/2019 04:49 PM]
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Jordan Duke Venable motion to oppose a order. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/08/2019. [11363903] (RL) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:48 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Jordan Duke Venable FORM 4 supplement to motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Dated 07/02/2019. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11362293] (RL) [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:21 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Received original and 7 copies of Appellant Jordan Duke Venable opening brief (Informal: Yes) 6 pages. Served on 07/02/2019. Major deficiencies: motion pending. [11361617] (KWG) [Entered: 07/12/2019 10:16 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Jordan Duke Venable FORM 4 affidavit accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 06/12/2019. [11357979] (RL) [Entered: 07/09/2019 11:57 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): The district courts judgment was entered on the docket on May 16, 2019. Appellants notice of appeal was postmarked on June 18, 2019, and received by the district court on June 20, 2019. Accordingly, the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed or delivered to prison officials within 30 days after entry of the district courts judgment. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A), 4(c); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional); Houston v. Lack, 487 U.S. 266, 270 (1988) (notice of appeal deemed filed when it was delivered to prison authorities for forwarding to the court). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal, or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11350490] (CKP) [Entered: 07/01/2019 01:13 PM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jordan Duke Venable opening brief due 08/19/2019. Appellees Bush, City of Phoenix, Does, Emilio Luna, Tom McKee, Charles Morin and Jeri Williams answering brief due 09/18/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11343990] (JBS) [Entered: 06/25/2019 02:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan Venable v. City of Phoenix, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, Unknown Parties named as John Does 1-10 and Black Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF PHOENIX, a municipality
Represented By: Kathleen L. Wieneke
Represented By: Christina Retts Esquire
Represented By: Tara Zoellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES MORIN, Commander, Phoenix Police Department
Represented By: Kathleen L. Wieneke
Represented By: Christina Retts Esquire
Represented By: Tara Zoellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMILIO LUNA, Badge No. 10074, in his individual capacity as an officer with the Phoenix Police Department
Represented By: Kathleen L. Wieneke
Represented By: Christina Retts Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERI WILLIAMS, Police Chief, Phoenix Police Department
Represented By: Kathleen L. Wieneke
Represented By: Christina Retts Esquire
Represented By: Tara Zoellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOM MCKEE, Badge No. 9214, in his individual capacity as an officer with the Phoenix Police Department
Represented By: Kathleen L. Wieneke
Represented By: Christina Retts Esquire
Represented By: Tara Zoellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUSH, Badge No. 9316, in his individual capacity as an officer with the Phoenix Police Department
Represented By: Kathleen L. Wieneke
Represented By: Christina Retts Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JORDAN DUKE VENABLE
Represented By: Jordan Duke Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?