State of California, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MARK T. ESPER, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Defense, DAVID BERNHARDT, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Interior, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER WILSON, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Air Force, RICHARD V. SPENCER, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Navy, STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Department of the Treasury, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, senior official performing the duties of the Secretary of the Army, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States of America and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Plaintiff / Appellant: STATE OF CALIFORNIA and STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Amicus Curiae: ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES FEDERAL RELATIONS COMMITTEE, DUANE MORELY COX, TOHONO O'ODHAM NATION, FORMER U.S. GOVERNMENT OFFICIALS, SABINE DURDEN, DON ROSENBERG, BRIAN McCANN, JUDY ZEITO, MAUREEN MULRONEY, MAUREEN LAQUERRE, DENNIS BIXBY, Angel Families, ADVOCATES FOR VICTIMS OF ILLEGAL ALIEN CRIMES, 75 RELIGIOUS ORGANIZATIONS, FORMER MEMBERS OF CONGRESS, FEDERAL COURTS SCHOLARS, ANDY BARR, U.S. Representative and U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Case Number: 19-16336
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2019 Filing 77 Filed (ECF) Appellants Doctor Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Steven Terner Mnuchin and Donald J. Trump in 19-16102 Motion to file substitute or corrected brief. Date of service: 09/02/2019. [11417834] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Murphy, Anne) [Entered: 09/02/2019 11:41 AM]
September 1, 2019 Filing 76 Notice of Oral Argument on Tuesday, November 12, 2019 - 09:30 A.M. - Courtroom 1 - San Francisco CA. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to arrive (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). If you are the specific attorney or self-represented party who will be arguing, use the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE filing type in CM/ECF no later than 21 days before Tuesday, November 12, 2019. No form or other attachment is required. If you will not be arguing, do not file an acknowledgment of hearing notice.[11417745][Array,19-16102,19-16299,19-16300,19-16336] (AW) [Entered: 09/01/2019 06:12 AM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 75 Submitted (ECF) further excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Doctor Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Steven Terner Mnuchin and Donald J. Trump in 19-16102, Appellants David Bernhardt, DOD, Doctor Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of the Treasury, USA, USDHS, USDOI and Heather Wilson in 19-16299, 19-16300, Appellees David Bernhardt, DOD, Doctor Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of the Treasury, USA, USDHS, USDOI and Heather Wilson in 19-16336. Date of service: 08/30/2019. [11417660] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Murphy, Anne) [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:43 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 74 Submitted (ECF) Third Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellants Doctor Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Steven Terner Mnuchin and Donald J. Trump in 19-16102, Appellants DOD, Doctor Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of the Treasury, USA, USDHS, USDOI and Heather Wilson in 19-16299, 19-16300, Appellees DOD, Doctor Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of the Treasury, USA, USDHS, USDOI and Heather Wilson in 19-16336. Date of service: 08/30/2019. [11417659] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Murphy, Anne) [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:39 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 73 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 63 ] filed by Tohono O'odham Nation (sent to panel). [11412699] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (DB) [Entered: 08/27/2019 05:03 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 72 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 57 ] filed by Former U.S. Government Officials. (sent to panel) [11411117] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SD) [Entered: 08/26/2019 05:45 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 71 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 25 ] filed by Arizona House of Representatives Federal Relations Committee. (sent to panel) [11410610] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SD) [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:51 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 70 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 54 ] filed by Federal Courts Scholars. (sent to panel) [11410588] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SD) [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:43 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 69 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 58 ] filed by 75 Religious Organizations. (sent to panel) [11410551] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SD) [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:36 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 68 Received 7 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 33 ] filed by Sierra Club and Southern Border Communities Coalition. (sent to panel) [11410519] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SD) [Entered: 08/26/2019 02:28 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 67 Filed 4 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [ # 34 ] in 1 volume filed by Appellees Sierra Club and Southern Border Communities Coalition. (sent to panel) [11409849] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:46 AM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 66 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Samuel Franklin Daughety (Dentons US LLP, 1900 K Street, NW, Washington, DC 20006) for Amicus Curiae Tohono O'odham Nation in 19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336. Substitution for Attorney Samuel F Daughety for Amicus Curiae Tohono O'odham Nation in 19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336. Date of service: 08/22/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11407717] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Daughety, Samuel) [Entered: 08/22/2019 06:12 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 65 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 63 ] submitted by Tohono O'odham Nation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11407701] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/22/2019 05:45 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 64 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Tohono O'odham Nation. [11407700] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/22/2019 05:43 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 63 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by AMICUS BRIEF OF TOHONO OODHAM NATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS-APPELLEES. Date of service: 08/22/2019. [11407677] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Daughety, Samuel) [Entered: 08/22/2019 05:27 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 62 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 57 ] submitted by Former U.S. Government Officials is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11407661] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/22/2019 05:08 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 61 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 58 ] submitted by 75 Religious Organizations is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11407454] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/22/2019 03:46 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 60 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae 75 Religious Organizations in 19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, and 19-16336. [11407453] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/22/2019 03:45 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 59 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Former U.S. Government Officials in 19-16299, 19-16300, and 19-16336. [11407417] [19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/22/2019 03:35 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 58 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by 75 Religious Organizations. Date of service: 08/22/2019. [11407337] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Zalesin, Steven) [Entered: 08/22/2019 03:03 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 57 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Former U.S. Government Officials. Date of service: 08/22/2019. [11407298] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of brief, removed unnecessary motion, updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 08/22/2019 by LA] (Hartnett, Kathleen) [Entered: 08/22/2019 02:56 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 56 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 54 ] submitted by Federal Courts Scholars is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11407085] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/22/2019 02:06 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 55 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Federal Courts Scholars in 19-16299, 19-16300, and 19-16336. [11407080] [19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/22/2019 02:05 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 54 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Federal Courts Scholars. Date of service: 08/22/2019. [11406944] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Wydra, Elizabeth) [Entered: 08/22/2019 12:47 PM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 53 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 47 ] filed by Former Members of Congress. [11406062] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SD) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:50 PM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 52 Received 7 paper copies of Second Brief on Cross-Appeal [ # 35 ] filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants State of California and State of New Mexico. [11406030] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SD) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:38 PM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 51 Filed 4 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [ # 36 ] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants State of California and State of New Mexico. (sent to panel) [11405939] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/21/2019 04:01 PM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 50 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 43 ] filed by U.S. House of Representatives. [11405177] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SD) [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:25 AM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 49 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 47 ] submitted by Former Members of Congress is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11404280] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/20/2019 04:03 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 48 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Former Members of Congress in 19-16299, 19-16300, and 19-16336. [11404275] [19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/20/2019 04:02 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 47 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Former Members of Congress. Date of service: 08/20/2019. [11404163] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Winthrop, Douglas) [Entered: 08/20/2019 03:10 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 46 Received Appellees Sierra Club and Southern Border Communities Coalition supplemental excerpts of record [ # 34 ] in 1 volumes. Deficiencies: excerpts do not match the electronic version, excerpts of record pages are double-sided. Notified counsel (See attached notice). [11404016] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (KWG) [Entered: 08/20/2019 02:15 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 45 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 43 ] submitted by U.S. House of Representatives is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11402662] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/19/2019 04:12 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 44 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae U.S. House of Representatives in 19-16299, 19-16300, and 19-16336. [11402653] [19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/19/2019 04:10 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 43 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by U.S. House of Representatives. Date of service: 08/19/2019. [11402597] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:52 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 42 Added Attorney(s) Carter Glasgow Phillips, Joseph R. Guerra, Virginia A. Seitz for party(s) Amicus Curiae U.S. House of Representatives, in case 19-16102. [11402325] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (CW) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:35 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 41 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Virginia A. Seitz (Sidley Austin LLP, 1501 K Street NW, Washington, DC 20005) for Amicus Curiae U.S. House of Representatives in 19-16102. Date of service: 08/19/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11402283] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Seitz, Virginia) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:26 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 40 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joseph R. Guerra (Sidley Austin LLP, 1501 K Street, NW, Washington DC 20005) for Amicus Curiae U.S. House of Representatives in 19-16102. Date of service: 08/19/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11402273] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Guerra, Joseph) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:23 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 39 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Carter Glasgow Phillips (Sidley Austin LLP, 1501 K Street, NW, Washington, DC 20005) for Amicus Curiae U.S. House of Representatives in 19-16102. Date of service: 08/19/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11402257] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Phillips, Carter) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:18 PM]
August 16, 2019 Filing 38 Filed clerk order: The second brief on cross-appeal [ # 35 ] submitted by State of California and State of New Mexico is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [ # 36 ] submitted by State of California and State of New Mexico. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11399715] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/16/2019 10:40 AM]
August 16, 2019 Filing 37 Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 33 ] submitted by Sierra Club and Southern Border Communities Coalition is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [ # 34 ] submitted by Sierra Club and Southern Border Communities Coalition. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11399708] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/16/2019 10:37 AM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 36 Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees State of California and State of New Mexico in 19-16299. Date of service: 08/15/2019. [11399244] [19-16299, 19-16102, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Zahradka, James) [Entered: 08/15/2019 08:51 PM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 35 Submitted (ECF) Second Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellees State of California and State of New Mexico in 19-16299, Appellants State of California and State of New Mexico in 19-16336. Date of service: 08/15/2019. [11399243] [19-16299, 19-16102, 19-16300, 19-16336]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct brief type and all party filers. 08/16/2019 by LA] (Zahradka, James) [Entered: 08/15/2019 08:48 PM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 34 Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellees Sierra Club and Southern Border Communities Coalition in 19-16102, 19-16300. Date of service: 08/15/2019. [11399237] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Ladin, Dror) [Entered: 08/15/2019 07:11 PM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 33 Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees Sierra Club and Southern Border Communities Coalition in 19-16102, 19-16300. Date of service: 08/15/2019. [11399236] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Ladin, Dror) [Entered: 08/15/2019 07:08 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 32 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 22 ] filed by U.S. Representative Andy Barr. [11395967] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SD) [Entered: 08/13/2019 01:40 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 31 Received 7 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 28 ] filed by Angel Families Sabine Durden, et al. and Advocates for Victims of Illegal Alien Crimes. [11394371] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SD) [Entered: 08/12/2019 01:24 PM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 30 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 28 ] submitted by Angel Families Sabine Durden, et al. and Advocates for Victims of Illegal Alien Crimes is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11391606] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/08/2019 02:56 PM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 29 Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Sabine Durden, et al. and Advocates for Victims of Illegal Alien Crimes. [11391586] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/08/2019 02:49 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 28 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Angel Families, Sabine Durden, Don Rosenberg, Boni Driskill, Brian McCann, Judy Zeito, Maureen Mulroney, Maureen Laquerre, Dennis Bixby, and Advocates for Victims of Illegal Alien Crimes. Date of service: 08/07/2019. [11390622] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF. 08/08/2019 by LA] (Hutchison, Richard) [Entered: 08/07/2019 07:06 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 27 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 25 ] submitted by Arizona House of Representatives Federal Relations Committee is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11390587] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/07/2019 05:31 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 26 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Arizona House of Representatives Federal Relations Committee. [11390586] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/07/2019 05:30 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Brief of Amicus Curiae State of Arizona House of Representatives Federal Relations Committee in Support of Defendants-Appellants. Date of service: 08/07/2019. [11390572] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Howard, John) [Entered: 08/07/2019 05:06 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 24 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 22 ] submitted by U.S. Representative Andy Barr is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11390126] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/07/2019 01:59 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 23 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Andy Barr in 19-16299, 19-16300, and 19-16336. [11390123] [19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/07/2019 01:58 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 22 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Rep. Andy Barr. Date of service: 08/07/2019. [11389953] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Joseph, Lawrence) [Entered: 08/07/2019 12:30 PM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): The motion of Duane Morely Cox (Docket Entry No. [ # 17 ]) to file an amicus brief, and any responses thereto, are referred to the panel that will consider the merits of these cases. The previously established briefing schedule remains in place. [11388752] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (AF) [Entered: 08/06/2019 01:13 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 Received 7 paper copies of First Brief on Cross-Appeal [ # 10 ] filed by appellants/cross-appellees. [11387803] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SD) [Entered: 08/05/2019 04:44 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 Received notice of appearance for Amicus Curiae - Pending Duane Morely Cox. [11387614] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:45 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 Received original and 0 copies of Amicus Curiae - Pending Duane Morely Cox' proposed amicus brief of 16 pages. Served on 07/30/2019. Major deficiency: motion to file amicus brief pending. [11387605] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:42 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 Filed Amicus Curiae - Pending Duane Morely Cox' motion to file amicus curiae brief. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/30/2019. [11387589] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/05/2019 03:37 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 Filed 4 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 11 ] in 3 volumes filed by appellants/cross-appellees. [11386645] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/05/2019 10:26 AM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 Filed order (RICHARD R. CLIFTON, N. RANDY SMITH and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND): The unopposed motion to expedite (Docket Entry No. [ # 9 ] in 19-16102) is granted in part. The request for an expedited briefing schedule is granted. Defendants opening brief has been filed. Sierra Club Case plaintiffs response brief, and States Case plaintiffs response brief and opening brief on cross-appeal, are due August 15, 2019. Defendants reply brief and response brief to States Case plaintiffs cross-appeal is due August 30, 2019. States Case plaintiffs reply brief on cross-appeal is due September 13, 2019. The request for expedited calendaring is granted in part. The Clerk shall place these appeals on the calendar for November 2019. See 9th Cir. Gen Order 3.3(f). [11384808] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (AF) [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:49 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 Filed clerk order: The first brief on cross-appeal [ # 10 ] submitted by appellants/cross-appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 11 ] submitted by appellants/cross-appellees. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11384309] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LA) [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:01 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 Added Attorney(s) Steven C. Wu for party(s) Appellee State of New York, in case 19-16299 Attorney(s) Steven C. Wu for party(s) Amicus Curiae State of New York, in case 19-16102. [11383611] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (CW) [Entered: 08/01/2019 07:51 AM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Steven Chiajon Wu (Office of the Attorney General of New York, 28 Liberty St., 23rd Floor, New York, NY 10005) for Amicus Curiae State of New York in 19-16102, Appellee State of New York in 19-16299. Date of service: 08/01/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11383588] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Wu, Steven) [Entered: 08/01/2019 07:37 AM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Steven Terner Mnuchin and Donald J. Trump in 19-16102, Appellants David Bernhardt, DOD, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of the Treasury, USA, USDHS, USDOI and Heather Wilson in 19-16299, 19-16300. Date of service: 07/31/2019. [11383519] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts. 08/01/2019 by LA] (Murphy, Anne) [Entered: 07/31/2019 08:19 PM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 Submitted (ECF) First Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellants Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Steven Terner Mnuchin and Donald J. Trump in 19-16102, Appellants David Bernhardt, DOD, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, United States Department of the Treasury, USA, USDHS, USDOI and Heather Wilson in 19-16299, 19-16300. Date of service: 07/31/2019. [11383517] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of brief, updated docket text to reflect correct brief type. 08/01/2019 by LA] (Murphy, Anne) [Entered: 07/31/2019 08:09 PM]
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellees Sierra Club and Southern Border Communities Coalition in 19-16102, 19-16300 Unopposed Motion to expedite case. Date of service: 07/30/2019. [11380974] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300, 19-16336] (Ladin, Dror) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:13 AM]
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Received copy of Supreme Court of the United States Opinion of Breyer, J. filed on 07/26/2019. (No. 19A60) [11378645] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (RL) [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:41 PM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/16/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11365097][19-16336] (AD) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:44 PM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Filed order MEDIATION (LW): The courts order at docket entry [ # 4 ] is VACATED. [11364962] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (SB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:46 AM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellants State of California and State of New Mexico in 19-16336 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/16/2019. [11364761] [19-16336, 19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16300] (Leslie, Heather) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:47 AM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants in these consolidated appeals have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11364608] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (LW) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:02 AM]
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filed order (RICHARD R. CLIFTON, N. RANDY SMITH and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND): We grant Defendants Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Establish Briefing Schedule. Appeal Nos. 19-16102, 19-16300, 19-16299, and 19-16336 are consolidated. In accordance with Defendants proposed briefing schedule: Defendants opening brief is due July 31, 2019. Sierra Club Case plaintiffs response brief, and States Case plaintiffs response brief and opening brief on cross-appeal, are due August 30, 2019. Defendants reply brief and response brief to States Case plaintiffs cross-appeal is due September 20, 2019. States Case plaintiffs reply brief on cross-appeal is due October 11, 2019. We request that the parties promptly inform this Court of any developments affecting this appeal. In particular, if there are developments that may moot any or all of the issues, this Court should be notified immediately. [11364018] [19-16102, 19-16299, 19-16336, 19-16300] (AF) [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:23 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants David Bernhardt, DOD, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of the Treasury, USA, USDHS, USDOI and Heather Wilson in 19-16299, Appellees David Bernhardt, DOD, Mark T. Esper, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ryan D. McCarthy, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Richard V. Spencer, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of the Treasury, USA, USDHS, USDOI and Heather Wilson in 19-16336 Unopposed Motion to consolidate cases 19-16102, 19-16300, 19-16299, 19-16336, Motion for miscellaneous relief [Establish briefing schedule]. Date of service: 07/08/2019. [11357246] [19-16299, 19-16336] (Byron, H. Thomas) [Entered: 07/08/2019 06:25 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/15/2019 for State of California and State of New Mexico. Briefing is stayed in these appeals pending further order. [11356849] [19-16336, 19-16299] (JBS) [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK T. ESPER, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Defense
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID BERNHARDT, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Interior
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEATHER WILSON, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Air Force
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD V. SPENCER, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Navy
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Department of the Treasury
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN D. MCCARTHY, senior official performing the duties of the Secretary of the Army
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States of America
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Lee I. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: Tania Maestas Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES FEDERAL RELATIONS COMMITTEE
Represented By: John W. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DUANE MORELY COX
Represented By: Duane Morely Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TOHONO O'ODHAM NATION
Represented By: Samuel F. Daughety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FORMER U.S. GOVERNMENT OFFICIALS
Represented By: Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SABINE DURDEN, DON ROSENBERG, BRIAN McCANN, JUDY ZEITO, MAUREEN MULRONEY, MAUREEN LAQUERRE, DENNIS BIXBY, Angel Families
Represented By: Richard Peter Hutchison Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ADVOCATES FOR VICTIMS OF ILLEGAL ALIEN CRIMES
Represented By: Richard Peter Hutchison Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 75 RELIGIOUS ORGANIZATIONS
Represented By: Steven A. Zalesin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FORMER MEMBERS OF CONGRESS
Represented By: Douglas Winthrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FEDERAL COURTS SCHOLARS
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANDY BARR, U.S. Representative
Represented By: Lawrence John Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Megan Barbero
Represented By: Virginia A. Seitz Esquire
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter Esquire
Represented By: Joseph R. Guerra Esquire
Represented By: Kristin Ann Shapiro
Represented By: Carter Glasgow Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?