Mike Rose's Auto Body, Inc. v. Applied Underwriters Captive R
Plaintiff / Appellee: MIKE ROSE'S AUTO BODY, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 19-16410
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: RGA) Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [11411789] (AF) [Entered: 08/27/2019 11:07 AM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 08/21/2019. [11404976] [19-16410] (Wall, Travis) [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:25 AM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 08/12/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11379396] (VS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 11:37 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/23/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11373584][19-16410] (AD) [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:44 PM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/23/2019. [11373575] [19-16410] (Wall, Travis) [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:41 PM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/24/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/15/2019. Transcript due 09/16/2019. Appellant Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. opening brief due 10/24/2019. Appellee Mike Rose's Auto Body, Inc. answering brief due 11/25/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11366724] (RT) [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mike Rose's Auto Body, Inc. v. Applied Underwriters Captive R
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MIKE ROSE'S AUTO BODY, INC.
Represented By: Horace Wade Green Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Travis R. Wall Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?