Jose Bello Reyes v. Kevin McAleenan, et al
Respondent / Appellee: MARK MORGAN, Acting Director, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, ERIK BONNAR, Field Office Director, San Francisco Field Office, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Petitioner / Appellant: JOSE OMAR BELLO REYES
Amicus Curiae: PEN AMERICA
Case Number: 19-16441
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 14, 2021 Summary Bello-Reyes v. Gaynor

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion [ # 13 ] (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant Jose Omar Bello Reyes; Appellant Jose Omar Bello Reyes opening brief due 12/19/2019. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Erik Bonnar, Kevin K. McAleenan and Mark Morgan answering brief due 01/21/2020. The optional reply brief is due February 10, 2020. [11431408]--[Edited: updated docket text to reflect correct due date for reply brief. 09/13/2019 by SLM] (GS) [Entered: 09/13/2019 02:58 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellant Jose Omar Bello Reyes Joint Motion for miscellaneous relief [Joint Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule]. Date of service: 09/12/2019. [11429956] [19-16441] (Wells, Jordan) [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:02 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 Attorneys Benjamin Joseph Wolinsky substituted by Attorneys Michael Anthony Celone [11390456] (JFF) [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:04 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael Anthony Celone (U.S. Department of Justice; Civil Division, Office of Immigration Litigation P.O. Box 868-Ben Franklin Station, Washington, DC 20044) for Appellees William P. Barr, Erik Bonnar, Kevin K. McAleenan and Mark Morgan. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Benjamin Joseph Wolinsky for Appellees William P. Barr, Erik Bonnar, Kevin K. McAleenan and Mark Morgan. Date of service: 08/07/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11389343] [19-16441] (Celone, Michael) [Entered: 08/07/2019 06:27 AM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 7 ] submitted by PEN America is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11384858] (LA) [Entered: 08/01/2019 05:33 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Filed order (MARY M. SCHROEDER, WILLIAM C. CANBY and MORGAN B. CHRISTEN) The motion for leave to submit an amicus filing in support of the emergency motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ]) is granted. The filing has been submitted. The emergency motion for release pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is denied. See Winter v. Natural Res. Def. Council, Inc., 555 U.S. 7, 20 (2008). The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11384249] (WL) [Entered: 08/01/2019 01:39 PM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae - Pending PEN America. [11382327] (SML) [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:15 AM]
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by PEN America. Date of service: 07/31/2019. [11382092] [19-16441] (Risher, Michael) [Entered: 07/31/2019 08:31 AM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 7 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) PEN America Motion to become amicus curiae. Date of service: 07/29/2019. [11379993] [19-16441] (Risher, Michael) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:31 PM]
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellant Jose Omar Bello Reyes reply to response (). Date of service: 07/26/2019. [11378749] [19-16441] (Wells, Jordan) [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:50 PM]
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellees William P. Barr, Erik Bonnar, Kevin K. McAleenan and Mark Morgan response opposing motion ([ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 07/25/2019. [11377354] [19-16441] (Wolinsky, Benjamin) [Entered: 07/25/2019 06:19 PM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SLL): The court has received the emergency motion filed at Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]. The opposition to the emergency motion is due on Thursday, July 25, 2019. The reply in support of the emergency motion is due on Friday, July 26, 2019. [11374291] (OC) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:34 PM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Jose Omar Bello Reyes EMERGENCY Motion for miscellaneous relief [Emergency Motion for Release from ICE Custody pending Appeal]. Date of service: 07/23/2019. [11374046] [19-16441] (Wells, Jordan) [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:27 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jose Omar Bello Reyes opening brief due 09/20/2019. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Erik Bonnar, Kevin K. McAleenan and Mark Morgan answering brief due 10/21/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11371566] (RT) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jose Bello Reyes v. Kevin McAleenan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MARK MORGAN, Acting Director, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Wolinsky
Represented By: Michael Anthony Celone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ERIK BONNAR, Field Office Director, San Francisco Field Office
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Wolinsky
Represented By: Michael Anthony Celone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Wolinsky
Represented By: Michael Anthony Celone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Wolinsky
Represented By: Michael Anthony Celone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JOSE OMAR BELLO REYES
Represented By: Jordan Wells
Represented By: Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PEN AMERICA
Represented By: Michael Temple Risher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?