Emma Nation v. Donald Trump, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP, BEN CARSON, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES, SCOTT GOTTLIEB, U.S. FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Plaintiff / Appellant: EMMA NATION
Case Number: 19-16443
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11413235] (LW) [Entered: 08/28/2019 10:26 AM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 08/27/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11393948] (LW) [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:33 AM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/08/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11391259][19-16443] (AD) [Entered: 08/08/2019 12:44 PM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Emma Nation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/08/2019. [11391217] [19-16443] (Fletcher, Frederic) [Entered: 08/08/2019 12:13 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/29/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/19/2019. Transcript due 09/16/2019. Appellant Emma Nation opening brief due 10/28/2019. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Ben Carson, Scott Gottlieb, Office of the President of the United States, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, U.S. Food & Drug Administration, United States Department of Justice and United States of America answering brief due 11/29/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11371652] (RT) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emma Nation v. Donald Trump, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEN CARSON
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT GOTTLIEB
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. FOOD & DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMMA NATION
Represented By: Frederic R. Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?