Christopher Andrews, et al v. Panasonic Corporation, et al
Defendant / Appellee: NEC TOKIN CORPORATION, LG CHEM, LTD., HITACHI MAXWELL, LTD., SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, LG CHEM AMERICA, INC., SANYO ELECTRIC CO, LTD, HITACHI, LTD., SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION, TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC., PANASONIC CORPORATION, SONY CORPORATION, TOSHIBA CORPORATION, SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD., SONY ELECTRONICS, INC., MAXWELL CORPORATION OF AMERICA and NEC CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Not Classified By Court: In re: LITHIUM ION BATTERIES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Not Yet Classified: CHRISTOPHER ANDREWS
Case Number: 19-16803
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Rhys Davies (Allen & Overy LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020) for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Substitution for Dylan I. Ballard for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Gary Halling, Esquire for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Nadezhda Nikonova for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., James McGinnis for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. and Michael W. Scarborough for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Date of service: 11/11/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11495120] [19-16803] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 11/11/2019 12:51 PM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Roberti (Allen & Overy LLP, 1101 New York Avenue NW, Washington, DC, 20005) for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Substitution for Dylan I. Ballard for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Gary Halling, Esquire for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., James McGinnis for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Nadezhda Nikonova for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. and Michael W. Scarborough for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Date of service: 11/11/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11495113] [19-16803] (Roberti, John) [Entered: 11/11/2019 12:40 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Terminated Nancy L. Fineman for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 19-16803 (no longer with firm) [11435519] (JBS) [Entered: 09/18/2019 10:56 AM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 10/09/2019. Transcript due 11/08/2019. Appellant Christopher Andrews opening brief due 12/18/2019. Appellees Hitachi Maxwell, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd., Maxwell Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. and Toshiba Corporation answering brief due 01/21/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11431758] (RT) [Entered: 09/13/2019 05:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Andrews, et al v. Panasonic Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEC TOKIN CORPORATION
Represented By: George Arnold Nicoud III
Represented By: George Charles Nierlich III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LG CHEM, LTD.
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI MAXWELL, LTD.
Represented By: Craig Philip Seebald
Represented By: Lindsey R. Vaala
Represented By: Jason Alan Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Gary Halling Esquire
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: Dylan I. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LG CHEM AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANYO ELECTRIC CO, LTD
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI, LTD.
Represented By: Craig Philip Seebald
Represented By: Lindsey R. Vaala
Represented By: Jason Alan Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew Michael Brown Esquire
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC.
Represented By: Jerry Frank Hogue
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONY CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew Michael Brown Esquire
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA CORPORATION
Represented By: Jerry Frank Hogue
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD.
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Gary Halling Esquire
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: Dylan I. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONY ELECTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Michael Brown Esquire
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAXWELL CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Craig Philip Seebald
Represented By: Lindsey R. Vaala
Represented By: Christopher Walter James
Represented By: Jason Alan Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEC CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert Bernard Pringle Esquire
Represented By: Dana Lynn Cook-Milligan
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Richard M. Heimann
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Brendan P. Glackin
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: LITHIUM ION BATTERIES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHRISTOPHER ANDREWS
Represented By: Christopher Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?