Christopher Slaight, et al v. Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd
Plaintiff: BRIAN BUCHANAN and STEVEN HELDT
Petitioner: APPLE, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: NOBEL MANDILI, CHRISTOPHER SLAIGHT and SEYED AMIR MASOUDI
Defendant / Appellee: TATA CONSULTANCY SERVICES, LTD.
Case Number: 19-16806
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11459215] (VS) [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:12 AM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/09/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11443129] (BLS) [Entered: 09/25/2019 10:37 AM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/23/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11440653][19-16806] (AD) [Entered: 09/23/2019 12:44 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/23/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11440652][19-16806] (AD) [Entered: 09/23/2019 12:44 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants Nobel Mandili, Seyed Amir Masoudi and Christopher Slaight Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/23/2019. [11440575] [19-16806] (Low, Daniel) [Entered: 09/23/2019 12:08 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellee Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/23/2019. [11440473] [19-16806] (Hepler, Laurie) [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:40 AM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/23/2019. Transcript ordered by 10/15/2019. Transcript due 11/12/2019. Appellants Nobel Mandili, Seyed Amir Masoudi and Christopher Slaight opening brief due 12/23/2019. Appellee Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd. answering brief due 01/23/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11432219] (RT) [Entered: 09/16/2019 09:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Slaight, et al v. Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN BUCHANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN HELDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NOBEL MANDILI
Represented By: Daniel L. Low Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER SLAIGHT
Represented By: Daniel L. Low Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SEYED AMIR MASOUDI
Represented By: Daniel L. Low Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TATA CONSULTANCY SERVICES, LTD.
Represented By: Laurie J. Hepler Esquire
Represented By: Laura Ann Wytsma Esquire
Represented By: Erin M. Smith
Represented By: Michelle La Mar
Represented By: Bernard R. Given II
Represented By: Patrick Downes
Represented By: William Michael Brody Esquire I
Represented By: Laurie J. Hepler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: APPLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?