U.S. Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Defendant: NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC. and SUNRIDGE HEIGHTS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Defendant / Appellant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: U.S. BANK, N.A., Successor Trustee to Wachovia Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the Holders of BANC of America Funding Corporation 2004-B Trust
Case Number: 19-16853
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - FurtherConference, 11/05/2019, 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant's opening brief due 01/21/2020. Appellee's answering brief due 02/21/2020. Appellant'ss optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11481171] (VS) [Entered: 10/29/2019 09:44 AM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain for party(s) Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. [11459698] (RL) [Entered: 10/09/2019 02:32 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1819 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 10/09/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11459621] [19-16853] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 10/09/2019 02:12 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. [11459533] (RL) [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:47 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 10/09/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11459397] [19-16853] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:59 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 10/28/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11451032] (VS) [Entered: 10/02/2019 09:51 AM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/27/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11447354][19-16853] (AD) [Entered: 09/27/2019 06:44 PM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/27/2019. [11446952] [19-16853] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 09/27/2019 03:33 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/27/2019. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 11/20/2019. Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A. answering brief due 12/20/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11439019] (RT) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Represented By: Howard C. Kim
Represented By: Karen Hanks
Represented By: Diana S. Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire
Represented By: Jason Martinez Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: U.S. BANK, N.A., Successor Trustee to Wachovia Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the Holders of BANC of America Funding Corporation 2004-B Trust
Represented By: William Habdas
Represented By: Natalie L. Winslow Esquire
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Jamie Combs
Represented By: Tenesa Susan Powell
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRIDGE HEIGHTS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?