Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, et al v. Panasonic Corporation, et al
Defendant / Appellee: LG CHEM, LTD., HITACHI MAXWELL, LTD., SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, LG CHEM AMERICA, INC., SANYO ELECTRIC CO, LTD, HITACHI, LTD., SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION, TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC., PANASONIC CORPORATION, SONY CORPORATION, NEC TOKIN CORPORATION, TOSHIBA CORPORATION, SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD., SONY ELECTRONICS, INC., MAXWELL CORPORATION OF AMERICA and NEC CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Not Classified By Court: In re: LITHIUM ION BATTERIES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Not Yet Classified: GORDON B. MORGAN
Case Number: 19-16855
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 Attorneys Dylan I. Ballard, Gary Halling, James McGinnis, Nadezhda Nikonova, Michael W. Scarborough substituted by Attorneys John Roberti and Andrew Rhys Davies. [11495723] (RL) [Entered: 11/12/2019 10:59 AM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Rhys Davies (Allen & Overy LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020) for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Substitution for Dylan I. Ballard for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Gary Halling, Esquire for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., James McGinnis for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Nadezhda Nikonova for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. and Michael W. Scarborough for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Date of service: 11/11/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11495118] [19-16855] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 11/11/2019 12:46 PM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Roberti (Allen & Overy LLP, 1101 New York Avenue NW, Washington, DC 20005) for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Substitution for Dylan I. Ballard for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Gary Halling, Esquire for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., James McGinnis for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Nadezhda Nikonova for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. and Michael W. Scarborough for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Date of service: 11/11/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11495112] [19-16855] (Roberti, John) [Entered: 11/11/2019 12:36 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11472424] (VS) [Entered: 10/22/2019 09:04 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/16/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11450989] (VS) [Entered: 10/02/2019 09:33 AM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/24/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11442654][19-16855] (AD) [Entered: 09/24/2019 06:44 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Robert Clore for party(s) Appellant Gordon B. Morgan. [11442244] (RL) [Entered: 09/24/2019 03:02 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Christopher Andres Bandas for party(s) Appellant Gordon B. Morgan. [11442237] (RL) [Entered: 09/24/2019 03:00 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher Andres Bandas (Bandas Law Firm, 500 North Shoreline Blvd. Suite 1020, Corpus Christi, Texas 78401) for Appellant Gordon B. Morgan. Date of service: 09/24/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11441947] [19-16855] (Bandas, Christopher) [Entered: 09/24/2019 01:54 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Gordon B. Morgan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/24/2019. [11441828] [19-16855] (Clore, Robert) [Entered: 09/24/2019 01:29 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert William Clore (Bandas Law Firm, P.C., 500 North Shoreline Blvd. Suite 1020, Corpus Christi, Texas 78401) for Appellant Gordon B. Morgan. Date of service: 09/24/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11441495] [19-16855] (Clore, Robert) [Entered: 09/24/2019 11:54 AM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/27/2019. Transcript ordered by 10/21/2019. Transcript due 11/18/2019. Appellant Gordon B. Morgan opening brief due 12/30/2019. Appellees Hitachi Maxwell, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd., Maxwell Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. and Toshiba Corporation answering brief due 01/30/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11439601] (RT) [Entered: 09/20/2019 04:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, et al v. Panasonic Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LG CHEM, LTD.
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI MAXWELL, LTD.
Represented By: Craig Philip Seebald
Represented By: Lindsey R. Vaala
Represented By: Jason Alan Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Gary Halling Esquire
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: Dylan I. Ballard
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LG CHEM AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANYO ELECTRIC CO, LTD
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HITACHI, LTD.
Represented By: Craig Philip Seebald
Represented By: Lindsey R. Vaala
Represented By: Jason Alan Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew Michael Brown Esquire
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC.
Represented By: Jerry Frank Hogue
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PANASONIC CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Amato
Represented By: James F. Lerner
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONY CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew Michael Brown Esquire
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEC TOKIN CORPORATION
Represented By: George Arnold Nicoud III
Represented By: George Charles Nierlich III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOSHIBA CORPORATION
Represented By: Jerry Frank Hogue
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD.
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: Gary Halling Esquire
Represented By: Nadezhda Nikonova
Represented By: James McGinnis
Represented By: Dylan I. Ballard
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Andrew Rhys Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONY ELECTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Michael Brown Esquire
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAXWELL CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Craig Philip Seebald
Represented By: Lindsey R. Vaala
Represented By: Christopher Walter James
Represented By: Jason Alan Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEC CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert Bernard Pringle Esquire
Represented By: Dana Lynn Cook-Milligan
Represented By: Sean D. Meenan
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Jeff D. Friedman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Represented By: Richard M. Heimann
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Brendan P. Glackin
Represented By: Steve Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: LITHIUM ION BATTERIES ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GORDON B. MORGAN
Represented By: Christopher Andres Bandas
Represented By: Robert Clore
Represented By: Timothy R. Hanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?