Craig Blades v. S. Boncella, et al
Defendant: GALE STALLWORTH STONE, Acting Inspector General, Office of the Inspector General for Social Security Administration, NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff / Appellant: CRAIG BLADES and CRAIG PHILLIP BLADES
Defendant / Appellee: BARB REIMERS, U.S. Social Security Admin., JASON CURRAN, U.S. Social Security Admin., S. BONCELLA, U.S. Social Security Admin., CHRISTINA LOGGINS, U.S. Social Security Admin. and LISA LAWLER, U.S. Office of Inspector General - Social Security Administration
Case Number: 19-16916
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Streamlined request [4] by Appellant Craig Phillip Blades to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Craig Phillip Blades opening brief due 12/30/2019. Appellees S. Boncella, Jason Curran, Lisa Lawler, Christina Loggins and Barb Reimers answering brief due 01/29/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11513161] (JN) [Entered: 11/26/2019 12:32 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Craig Phillip Blades. New requested due date is 12/30/2019. [11513060] [19-16916] (Blades, Craig) [Entered: 11/26/2019 11:52 AM]
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 10/25/2019. [11479999] (RT) [Entered: 10/28/2019 01:39 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11456052] (CKP) [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:01 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Craig Blades opening brief due 11/29/2019. Appellees S. Boncella, Jason Curran, Lisa Lawler, Christina Loggins and Barb Reimers answering brief due 12/30/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11449029] (RT) [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig Blades v. S. Boncella, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CRAIG BLADES
Represented By: Craig Blades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CRAIG PHILLIP BLADES
Represented By: Craig Phillip Blades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARB REIMERS, U.S. Social Security Admin.
Represented By: Peter Michael Lantka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON CURRAN, U.S. Social Security Admin.
Represented By: Peter Michael Lantka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. BONCELLA, U.S. Social Security Admin.
Represented By: Peter Michael Lantka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTINA LOGGINS, U.S. Social Security Admin.
Represented By: Peter Michael Lantka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LISA LAWLER, U.S. Office of Inspector General - Social Security Administration
Represented By: Peter Michael Lantka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GALE STALLWORTH STONE, Acting Inspector General, Office of the Inspector General for Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?