Bank of America, NA, et al v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Defendant: SANTA BARBARA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION and ABSOLUTE COLLECTION SERVICES, LLC
Not Yet Classified: KATY L. LEE, individually, and Trustee or her successors in trust, under the Klee Living Trust, dated August 10, 2006, BANK OF AMERICA, NA, successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION and SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Case Number: 19-16922
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11511206] (CL) [Entered: 11/25/2019 01:20 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - FurtherConference, 11/22/2019, 1:30 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant's opening brief due 12/20/2019. Appellees' answering brief due 01/21/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11495405] (VS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 09:16 AM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Terminated Vatana Lay for Bank of America, NA in 18-16057, Bank of America, NA in 18-16596, Nationstar Mortgage LLC in 19-15725, The Bank of New York Mellon in 19-16281, Bank of America, NA in 19-16447, Capital One, N.A. in 19-16656, FNMA/Fannie Mae and Bank of America, NA in 19-16922, Bank of New York Mellon in 19-17013, Nationstar Mortgage LLC in 19-17043 and Bank of America, NA in 19-17221 [11495219] (Counsel no longer with firm, contact information no longer valid, other counsel remain on cases) [18-16057, 18-16596, 19-15725, 19-16281, 19-16447, 19-16656, 19-16922, 19-17013, 19-17043, 19-17221] (ASW) [Entered: 11/12/2019 07:15 AM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 11/08/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11481848] (VS) [Entered: 10/29/2019 01:59 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Added Attorney(s) Richard Aaron Chastain for party(s) Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae Appellee Bank of America, NA, in case 19-16922. [11474322] (RR) [Entered: 10/23/2019 10:26 AM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellees Bank of America, NA and FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 10/23/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11474124] [19-16922] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:02 AM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Stephen Colmery Parsley for party(s) Appellee FNMA/Fannie Mae Appellee Bank of America, NA, in case 19-16922. [11473581] (RR) [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:09 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellees Bank of America, NA and FNMA/Fannie Mae. Date of service: 10/22/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11473333] [19-16922] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:09 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/08/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11458688][19-16922] (AD) [Entered: 10/08/2019 06:44 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/08/2019. [11458389] [19-16922] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 10/08/2019 03:34 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/08/2019. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 11/29/2019. Appellees Bank of America, NA and Federal National Mortgage Association answering brief due 12/30/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11449765] (JBS) [Entered: 10/01/2019 10:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of America, NA, et al v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KATY L. LEE, individually, and Trustee or her successors in trust, under the Klee Living Trust, dated August 10, 2006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BANK OF AMERICA, NA, successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: William Habdas
Represented By: Vatana Lay Esquire
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Darren T. Brenner
Represented By: Jamie Combs
Represented By: Tenesa Susan Powell
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: William Habdas
Represented By: Vatana Lay Esquire
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Darren T. Brenner
Represented By: Jamie Combs
Represented By: Tenesa Susan Powell
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Represented By: Karen Hanks
Represented By: Diana S. Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTA BARBARA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABSOLUTE COLLECTION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?