Darren Henderson v. J. Lewis, et al
Defendant: KIM KUMAR, B. MARSHALL and W. L. MUNIZ
Defendant / Appellee: J. RODRIGUEZ, LVN, L. GAMBOA, M.D., J. LEWIS, K. KUMAR and C. WATSON
Plaintiff / Appellant: DARREN HENDERSON
Case Number: 19-16958
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Appellees L. Gamboa, M.D., C. Watson, J. Rodriguez, J. Lewis and K. Kumar reply to response to Court order dated 10/16/2019. Date of service: 11/26/2019. [11513878] [19-16958] (Ruhparwar, Nasstaran) [Entered: 11/26/2019 04:08 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellees L. Gamboa, M.D., C. Watson, J. Rodriguez, J. Lewis and K. Kumar Motion to extend time to file a response until 12/02/2019. Date of service: 11/12/2019. [11495882] [19-16958] (Ruhparwar, Nasstaran) [Entered: 11/12/2019 11:40 AM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 Filed Appellant Darren Henderson statement that appeal should go forward. Served on 10/29/2019. [11493061] (RL) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:48 PM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 Filed Appellant Darren Henderson FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/29/2019. [11493054] (RL) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:47 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 10/15/2019. [Case Number 19-16958: Partially Paid] [11474966] (RL) [Entered: 10/23/2019 02:18 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Filed Appellant Darren Henderson FORM 24 motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/17/2019. [11471969] (RL) [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:03 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the district courts docket reflects that on October 7, 2019, the district court denied appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal because it found that the appeal was frivolous. Accordingly, this courts October 9, 2019 order directing appellant to sign and return the prisoner authorization form to this court is vacated [ # 4 ]. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If the court dismisses the appeal as frivolous, this appeal may be counted as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellee may file a response within 10 days after service of appellants statement. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk will serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [11466518] (CKP) [Entered: 10/16/2019 02:30 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 19-16958: Due] ). [11461895] (CO) [Entered: 10/11/2019 11:31 AM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Received copy of District Court order filed on 10/10/2019 ORDER denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re: Dkt. No. 67. [11460935] (RL) [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:40 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Received copy of District Court order filed on 10/07/2019 ORDER denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re: Dkt. No. 63. [11460932] (RL) [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:38 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11459640] (CKP) [Entered: 10/09/2019 02:19 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [11459501] (CKP) [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:39 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [11459241] (CKP) [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:28 AM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Darren Henderson opening brief due 12/02/2019. Appellees L. Gamboa, K. Kumar, J. Lewis, J. Rodriguez and C. Watson answering brief due 01/02/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11454047] (HC) [Entered: 10/04/2019 09:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darren Henderson v. J. Lewis, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM KUMAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. L. MUNIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. RODRIGUEZ, LVN
Represented By: Nasstaran Ruhparwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: L. GAMBOA, M.D.
Represented By: Nasstaran Ruhparwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. LEWIS
Represented By: Nasstaran Ruhparwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: K. KUMAR
Represented By: Nasstaran Ruhparwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. WATSON
Represented By: Nasstaran Ruhparwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARREN HENDERSON
Represented By: Darren Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?