Ikemefula Ibeabuchi v. Eggleston, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JOHN F. KERRY, Former U.S. Secretary of State, 44th Administrative Regime, THOMPSON, Deportation Officer; DHS, Phoenix Field Office, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, NATIONAL RECORDS CENTER MISSOURI, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and EGGLESTON, Director of Operation, FOIA/PA, Missouri Branch
Plaintiff / Appellant: IKEMEFULA CHARLES IBEABUCHI, AKA Charles Ikemefula Ibeabuchi
Case Number: 19-16963
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 11/27/2019. [Case Number 19-16963: Partially Paid] [11517118] (RL) [Entered: 12/02/2019 11:21 AM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): A review of the district court docket reflects that appellant was permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court, and that such permission has not been revoked to date. Consequently, appellants forma pauperis status continues in this court. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 3 ] is therefore denied as unnecessary. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2), however, appellant must pay the full amount of the filing and docketing fees for this appeal when funds are available in appellant's account. Consequently, within 21 days after the filing date of this order, appellant shall complete and file with this court the enclosed authorization form, which directs the prison officials at appellants institution to assess, collect, and forward to the court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal on a monthly basis whenever funds exist in appellant's trust fund account. These fees will continue to be collected regardless of the date or manner of disposition of this appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) and (e)(2). Appellant is not responsible for payment when the funds in appellants prison trust account total less than $10.00, but payments must resume when additional deposits are made or funds are otherwise available. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal may be dismissed by the Clerk. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. Because there is no appearance by appellee, briefing will be completed upon the filing of the opening brief once appellant returns a completed prisoner authorization form. [11507287] (CKP) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:17 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Ikemefula Charles Ibeabuchi letter dated 11/20/2019 re: Proof of service Qua FRAP 31; additioanal statements concerning case. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11506831] (RL) [Entered: 11/21/2019 10:26 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Ikemefula Charles Ibeabuchi opening brief (Informal: Yes) 12 pages. Served via ECF on 10/17/2019. Major deficiencies: motion for IFP pending. [11468609] (SML) [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:19 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Ikemefula Charles Ibeabuchi FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/16/2019. [11468348] (RL) [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:06 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11456210] (CKP) [Entered: 10/07/2019 12:56 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ikemefula Charles Ibeabuchi opening brief due 12/02/2019. (No appearance for Appellees, no answering brief deadlines set) [11454139] (HC) [Entered: 10/04/2019 09:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ikemefula Ibeabuchi v. Eggleston, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN F. KERRY, Former U.S. Secretary of State, 44th Administrative Regime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMPSON, Deportation Officer; DHS, Phoenix Field Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL RECORDS CENTER MISSOURI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EGGLESTON, Director of Operation, FOIA/PA, Missouri Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IKEMEFULA CHARLES IBEABUCHI, AKA Charles Ikemefula Ibeabuchi
Represented By: Ikemefula Charles Ibeabuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?