Donald J. Trump for President,, et al v. Alex Padilla
Petitioner: JEFFREY S. KOENIG and JERRY GRIFFIN
Plaintiff / Appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his capacity as a private citizen and DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: ALEX PADILLA, Secretary of State of California, in his official capacity
Case Number: 19-17002
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Appellees Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. and Donald J. Trump in 19-17002 response opposing motion ([ # 20 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 20 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction). Date of service: 11/27/2019. [11515122] [19-17002, 19-17000, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (McCarthy, Thomas) [Entered: 11/27/2019 02:27 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex Padilla in 19-17000, 19-17002, Appellants Gavin Newsom and Alex Padilla in 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 11/21/2019. [11508172] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 11/21/2019 06:03 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 14 ] and excerpts of record [ # 15 ] submitted by Appellants Gavin Newsom and Alex Padilla are filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11491041] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (LA) [Entered: 11/06/2019 12:25 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 Added Attorney(s) T. Russell Nobile for party(s) Appellee Michelle Bolotin Appellee Michael Sienkiewicz Appellee Jerry Griffin Appellee James B. Oerding, in case 19-17000. [11490894] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (CW) [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:09 AM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of T. Russell Nobile (Judicial Watch Inc., 425 Third Street, SW, Suite 800, Washington, DC 20024) for Appellees Michelle Bolotin, Jerry Griffin, Michael Sienkiewicz and James B. Oerding in 19-17000. Date of service: 11/06/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11490890] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (Nobile, T.) [Entered: 11/06/2019 11:06 AM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 COURT DELETED DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 15 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) further excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Alex Padilla in 19-17000, 19-17002, Appellants Alex Padilla and Gavin Newsom in 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009. Date of service: 11/05/2019. [11490305] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:45 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Alex Padilla in 19-17000, 19-17002, Appellants Gavin Newsom and Alex Padilla in 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009. Date of service: 11/05/2019. [11490298] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDFs of Vols 1-2. 11/06/2019 by LA] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:42 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Alex Padilla in 19-17000, 19-17002, Appellants Gavin Newsom and Alex Padilla in 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009. Date of service: 11/05/2019. [11490295] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF (corrected cover). 11/06/2019 by LA] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:40 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Defendants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 11469876-2 ]) to consolidate is granted. Nos. 19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009 are consolidated. Defendants supplemental motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 11471938-2 ]) requesting leave to file oversized opening and reply briefs is denied without prejudice to filing a renewed motion accompanied by a copy of the proposed brief. See 9th Cir. R. 32-2(a) The briefing schedule established on October 10, 2019 at Docket Entry No. [ # 11460846-2 ] in No. 19-17000 shall govern these consolidated appeals. Defendants consolidated opening brief is due no later than November 5, 2019. Plaintiffs answering briefs are due December 3, 2019 or 28 days after service of the consolidated opening brief, whichever is earlier; and defendants optional consolidated reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the last-served answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). The court encourages separately represented parties to file joint briefs to avoid burdening the court with repetitive presentations of common facts and issues. See Circuit Advisory Committee Note to 9th Cir. R. 32-2. [11474870] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (AF) [Entered: 10/23/2019 01:39 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 Added Attorney Stefan Charles Passantino for party(s) Appellee The California Republican Party Appellee The Republican National Committee Appellee Bilal Ali Essayli Appellee Charles McDougald Appellee Melissa Melendez, in case 19-17004 Attorney(s) Stefan Charles Passantino for party(s) - Bilal Ali Essayli - The California Republican Party - The Republican National Committee - Charles McDougald - Melissa Melendez, in case 19-17007. [11474854] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (CW) [Entered: 10/23/2019 01:35 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stefan Charles Passantino (Michael Best & Friedrich LLP, 1000 Maine Avenue SW, Suite 400, Washington, D.C. 20024) for Appellees Melissa Melendez, Bilal Ali Essayli, Charles McDougald, The Republican National Committee and The California Republican Party in 19-17004. Date of service: 10/23/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11474821] [19-17004, 19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17007, 19-17009] (Passantino, Stefan) [Entered: 10/23/2019 01:23 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Added Attorney Justin R. Clark for party(s) Appellee The California Republican Party Appellee The Republican National Committee Appellee Bilal Ali Essayli Appellee Charles McDougald Appellee Melissa Melendez, in case 19-17004 Attorney(s) Justin R. Clark for party(s) - Bilal Ali Essayli - The California Republican Party - The Republican National Committee - Charles McDougald - Melissa Melendez, in case 19-17007. [11474528] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (CW) [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:21 AM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Justin Reilly Clark (Michael Best & Friedrich LLP, 1000 Maine Avenue SW, Suite 400, Washington, D.C. 20024) for Appellees Melissa Melendez, Bilal Ali Essayli, Charles McDougald, The Republican National Committee and The California Republican Party in 19-17004. Date of service: 10/23/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11474513] [19-17004, 19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17007, 19-17009] (Clark, Justin) [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:18 AM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex Padilla Supplemental Motion to consolidate cases 19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009. Date of service: 10/21/2019. [11471913] [19-17002] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:48 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex Padilla Motion to consolidate cases 19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009. Date of service: 10/18/2019. [11469898] [19-17002] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:24 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding these appeals, including requests for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's office [11466206] [19-17000, 19-17002, 19-17004, 19-17007, 19-17009] (BLS) [Entered: 10/16/2019 12:59 PM]
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/14/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11463118][19-17002] (AD) [Entered: 10/14/2019 12:44 PM]
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex Padilla Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/14/2019. [11463110] [19-17002] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 10/14/2019 12:20 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed October 8, 2019 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than November 5, 2019; the answering brief is due December 3, 2019 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11460862] (JPD) [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:07 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Added Attorney(s) Paul Evan Stein for party(s) Appellant Alex Padilla, in case 19-17002. [11460543] (RT) [Entered: 10/10/2019 11:07 AM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows:.to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [11460470] (RT) [Entered: 10/10/2019 10:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald J. Trump for President,, et al v. Alex Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his capacity as a private citizen
Represented By: Bryan K. Weir
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy
Represented By: William Consovoy
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.
Represented By: Bryan K. Weir
Represented By: Thomas R. McCarthy
Represented By: William Consovoy
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JEFFREY S. KOENIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JERRY GRIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEX PADILLA, Secretary of State of California, in his official capacity
Represented By: Jay Russell
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman Esquire
Represented By: Paul Evan Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?