Eric Bates, et al v. Arnold Schwarzenegger, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JESSE LEWELLING, JOHNSON MANDAZ, JOHNNY O. SANCHEZ, WILLIAM MILTON, JAMES CARR, MACK PAGE, PAUL BLEVINS, SOKHA HINN, DARRELL BRADFORD, CLEOFAS LEWIS, THEODORE PARKER, RICKY CARTER, MANUEL EDUARDO ACOSTA QUIROGA, DANNY TERRY, MANNING MICHAEL, DANIEL JONES, JAMES MCGINLEY, DARNELL HUGHES, TYRONE SANDERS, JESSE JOHNSON, Jr., MARCO DEL AGUILA, JASON HOCKLEY, EMMANUEL FRANCO, MICHAEL FREDERICKSON, FINLEY WIMBERLEY, JOHNNY BRIONES, KEVIN HARDIN, JOSE ISLAS, RICHARD ROBERTSON, PATRICK WALLACE, KEITH L. DEAN, CHARLES ROBERTSON, CLIFFORD HAYTER, KEVIN LEWIS, ALONZO WILLIAMS, ANTONIO FRANCO, ERIC BATES, VICKTER ESTRADA, MIKHIEL LIENWEBER, JOHN EVERHART, JAMES JAMIL GARRETT, JULIO TARAMONA, GERALD JEROME YOUNG, MICHAEL BLUE and CEDRIC PARKER
Defendant / Appellee: MATTHEW CATE, Former Secretary of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, CARL WOFFORD, Warden, Avenal State Prison, ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, Former Governer of the State of California, FELIX IGBINOSA, Dr., Medical Director, Pleasant Valley State Prison, JAMES A. YATES, Warden, Former Warden, Pleasant Valley State Prison, TERESA SCHWARTZ, Former Director, Division of Adult Institutions, TANYA ROTHCHILD, Former Chief of the Classification Services Unit, DWIGHT WINSLOW, Former Medical Director, CDCR, DEBORAH HYSEN, Chief Deputy Secretary, Facilities Planning, Construction & Management, SUSAN L. HUBBARD, Former Director, Division of Adult Operations, SCOTT FRAUENHEIM, Warden, Warden, Pleasant Valley State Prison, JEFFREY A. BEARD, Secretary California Dept. of Corrections and Rehabilitation, PAUL BRAZELTON, Former Warden Pleasant Valley State Prison, SCOTT KERNAN, Former Chief Deputy Secretary of Adult Institutions, CHRIS MEYER, Senior Chief, Facilities Planning, Construction & Management and JAMES D. HARTLEY, Warden, Former Warden Avenal State Prison
Case Number: 19-17094
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellees Paul Brazelton, Matthew Cate, Scott Frauenheim, Chris Meyer, Tanya Rothchild, James A. Yates and Arnold Schwarzenegger Motion to consolidate cases 19-17094, 19-17099, 19-17103, 19-17105, 19-17106. Date of service: 12/20/2019. [11540440] [19-17094] (Allin, Jon) [Entered: 12/20/2019 02:50 PM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Streamlined request [6] by Appellants Eric Bates, Paul Blevins, Michael Blue, Darrell Bradford, Johnny Briones, James Carr, Ricky Carter, Keith L. Dean, Marco Del Aguila, Vickter Estrada, John Everhart, Antonio Franco, Emmanuel Franco, Michael Frederickson, James Jamil Garrett, Kevin Hardin, Clifford Hayter, Sokha Hinn, Jason Hockley, Darnell Hughes, Jose Islas, Jesse Johnson, Jr., Daniel Jones, Jesse Lewelling, Cleofas Lewis, Kevin Lewis, Mikhiel Lienweber, Johnson Mandaz, James McGinley, Manning Michael, William Milton, Mack Page, Cedric Parker, Theodore Parker, Manuel Eduardo Acosta Quiroga, Charles Robertson, Richard Robertson, Johnny O. Sanchez, Tyrone Sanders, Julio Taramona, Danny Terry, Patrick Wallace, Alonzo Williams, Finley Wimberley and Gerald Jerome Young to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamlined requests allow for a 30 day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants' opening brief due 01/21/2020. Appellees Jeffrey A. Beard, Paul Brazelton, Matthew Cate, Scott Frauenheim, Warden, James D. Hartley, Warden, Susan L. Hubbard, Deborah Hysen, Felix Igbinosa, Scott Kernan, Chris Meyer, Tanya Rothchild, Teresa Schwartz, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Dwight Winslow, Carl Wofford and James A. Yates, Warden answering brief due 02/20/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11536993] (JN) [Entered: 12/18/2019 11:34 AM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Eric Bates, Paul Blevins, Michael Blue, Darrell Bradford, Johnny Briones, James Carr, Ricky Carter, Keith L. Dean, Marco Del Aguila, Vickter Estrada, John Everhart, Antonio Franco, Emmanuel Franco, Michael Frederickson, James Jamil Garrett, Kevin Hardin, Clifford Hayter, Sokha Hinn, Jason Hockley, Darnell Hughes, Jose Islas, Jesse Johnson, Jr., Daniel Jones, Jesse Lewelling, Cleofas Lewis, Kevin Lewis, Mikhiel Lienweber, Johnson Mandaz, James McGinley, Manning Michael, William Milton, Mack Page, Cedric Parker, Theodore Parker, Manuel Eduardo Acosta Quiroga, Charles Robertson, Richard Robertson, Johnny O. Sanchez, Tyrone Sanders, Julio Taramona, Danny Terry, Patrick Wallace, Alonzo Williams, Finley Wimberley and Gerald Jerome Young. New requested due date is 01/17/2020. [11536357] [19-17094] (Pavone, Benjamin) [Entered: 12/17/2019 08:32 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: These cases are RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11511313] [19-17094, 19-17099, 19-17103, 19-17105, 19-17106] (CL) [Entered: 11/25/2019 01:55 PM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 11/21/2019, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedules previously set by the court remain in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11492154] [19-17094, 19-17099, 19-17103, 19-17105, 19-17106] (VS) [Entered: 11/07/2019 09:38 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/30/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11484177][19-17094] (AD) [Entered: 10/30/2019 06:44 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Eric Bates Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/30/2019. [11484128] [19-17094] (Pavone, Benjamin) [Entered: 10/30/2019 05:11 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Eric Bates, Paul Blevins, Michael Blue, Darrell Bradford, Johnny Briones, James Carr, Ricky Carter, Keith L. Dean, Marco Del Aguila, Vickter Estrada, John Everhart, Antonio Franco, Emmanuel Franco, Michael Frederickson, James Jamil Garrett, Kevin Hardin, Clifford Hayter, Sokha Hinn, Jason Hockley, Darnell Hughes, Jose Islas, Jesse Johnson Jr., Daniel Jones, Jesse Lewelling, Cleofas Lewis, Kevin Lewis, Mikhiel Lienweber, Johnson Mandaz, James McGinley, Manning Michael, William Milton, Mack Page, Cedric Parker, Theodore Parker, Manuel Eduardo Acosta Quiroga, Charles Robertson, Richard Robertson, Johnny O. Sanchez, Tyrone Sanders, Julio Taramona, Danny Terry, Patrick Wallace, Alonzo Williams, Finley Wimberley and Gerald Jerome Young Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/29/2019. Appellants Eric Bates, Paul Blevins, Michael Blue, Darrell Bradford, Johnny Briones, James Carr, Ricky Carter, Keith L. Dean, Marco Del Aguila, Vickter Estrada, John Everhart, Antonio Franco, Emmanuel Franco, Michael Frederickson, James Jamil Garrett, Kevin Hardin, Clifford Hayter, Sokha Hinn, Jason Hockley, Darnell Hughes, Jose Islas, Jesse Johnson Jr., Daniel Jones, Jesse Lewelling, Cleofas Lewis, Kevin Lewis, Mikhiel Lienweber, Johnson Mandaz, James McGinley, Manning Michael, William Milton, Mack Page, Cedric Parker, Theodore Parker, Manuel Eduardo Acosta Quiroga, Charles Robertson, Richard Robertson, Johnny O. Sanchez, Tyrone Sanders, Julio Taramona, Danny Terry, Patrick Wallace, Alonzo Williams, Finley Wimberley and Gerald Jerome Young opening brief due 12/20/2019. Appellees Jeffrey A. Beard, Paul Brazelton, Matthew Cate, Scott Frauenheim, Warden, James D. Hartley, Warden, Susan L. Hubbard, Deborah Hysen, Felix Igbinosa, Scott Kernan, Chris Meyer, Tanya Rothchild, Teresa Schwartz, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Dwight Winslow, Carl Wofford and James A. Yates, Warden answering brief due 01/21/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11473814] (RT) [Entered: 10/22/2019 04:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Eric Bates, et al v. Arnold Schwarzenegger, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JESSE LEWELLING
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHNSON MANDAZ
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHNNY O. SANCHEZ
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM MILTON
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES CARR
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MACK PAGE
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL BLEVINS
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SOKHA HINN
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARRELL BRADFORD
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLEOFAS LEWIS
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THEODORE PARKER
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICKY CARTER
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MANUEL EDUARDO ACOSTA QUIROGA
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANNY TERRY
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MANNING MICHAEL
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL JONES
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES MCGINLEY
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARNELL HUGHES
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TYRONE SANDERS
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JESSE JOHNSON, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARCO DEL AGUILA
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON HOCKLEY
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMMANUEL FRANCO
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL FREDERICKSON
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FINLEY WIMBERLEY
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHNNY BRIONES
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEVIN HARDIN
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSE ISLAS
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD ROBERTSON
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICK WALLACE
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEITH L. DEAN
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES ROBERTSON
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLIFFORD HAYTER
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEVIN LEWIS
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALONZO WILLIAMS
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONIO FRANCO
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC BATES
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICKTER ESTRADA
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIKHIEL LIENWEBER
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN EVERHART
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES JAMIL GARRETT
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIO TARAMONA
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GERALD JEROME YOUNG
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL BLUE
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CEDRIC PARKER
Represented By: Benjamin L. Pavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW CATE, Former Secretary of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL WOFFORD, Warden, Avenal State Prison
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER, Former Governer of the State of California
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FELIX IGBINOSA, Dr., Medical Director, Pleasant Valley State Prison
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman Esquire
Represented By: Kristina Doan Strottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES A. YATES, Warden, Former Warden, Pleasant Valley State Prison
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERESA SCHWARTZ, Former Director, Division of Adult Institutions
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TANYA ROTHCHILD, Former Chief of the Classification Services Unit
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DWIGHT WINSLOW, Former Medical Director, CDCR
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman Esquire
Represented By: Kristina Doan Strottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBORAH HYSEN, Chief Deputy Secretary, Facilities Planning, Construction & Management
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN L. HUBBARD, Former Director, Division of Adult Operations
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT FRAUENHEIM, Warden, Warden, Pleasant Valley State Prison
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY A. BEARD, Secretary California Dept. of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL BRAZELTON, Former Warden Pleasant Valley State Prison
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT KERNAN, Former Chief Deputy Secretary of Adult Institutions
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS MEYER, Senior Chief, Facilities Planning, Construction & Management
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES D. HARTLEY, Warden, Former Warden Avenal State Prison
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler Esquire
Represented By: Jon S. Allin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?