Yogeshkumar Patel v. Kenneth Cuccinelli, et al
Defendant / Appellee: LAURA B. ZUCHOWSKI, in her official capacity, Vermont Service Center Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, in his official capacity, Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, in the official capacity, U.S. Department of Justice and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in the official capacity, Acting Director, Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff / Appellant: YOGESHKUMAR PATEL
Case Number: 19-17095
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian C. Ward (U.S. Department of Justice, P.O. Box 868 Ben Franklin Station, Washington D.C. 20044) for Appellees William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan and Laura B. Zuchowski. Date of service: 12/02/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11518267] [19-17095] (Ward, Brian) [Entered: 12/02/2019 05:08 PM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11516839] (CL) [Entered: 12/02/2019 09:30 AM]
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 11/15/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11486640] (CL) [Entered: 11/01/2019 03:28 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/29/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11482536][19-17095] (AD) [Entered: 10/29/2019 06:44 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Yogeshkumar Patel Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/29/2019. [11482508] [19-17095] (Nightingale, Zachary) [Entered: 10/29/2019 05:28 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Yogeshkumar Patel Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/29/2019. Transcript ordered by 11/21/2019. Transcript due 12/23/2019. Appellant Yogeshkumar Patel opening brief due 01/30/2020. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan and Laura B. Zuchowski answering brief due 03/02/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11473402] (JBS) [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yogeshkumar Patel v. Kenneth Cuccinelli, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURA B. ZUCHOWSKI, in her official capacity, Vermont Service Center Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, in his official capacity, Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, in the official capacity, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in the official capacity, Acting Director, Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Brian C. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YOGESHKUMAR PATEL
Represented By: Zachary Miller Nightingale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?