Philadelphia Indemnity Insuran v. City of Fresno
Plaintiff / Appellant: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF FRESNO, a Municipal corporation
Case Number: 19-17138
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Streamlined request [6] by Appellant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company opening brief due 01/22/2020. Appellee City of Fresno answering brief due 02/21/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11517340] (JN) [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:42 PM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. New requested due date is 01/22/2020. [11517009] [19-17138] (Katibah, Daniel) [Entered: 12/02/2019 10:32 AM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The dial-in assessment conference previously scheduled for November 19, 2019, is canceled. This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11484986] (BLS) [Entered: 10/31/2019 01:38 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/19/2019, 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11482997] (BLS) [Entered: 10/30/2019 10:47 AM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/29/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11481609][19-17138] (AD) [Entered: 10/29/2019 12:44 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/29/2019. [11480962] [19-17138] (Katibah, Daniel) [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:08 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/01/2019. Appellant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company opening brief due 12/23/2019. Appellee City of Fresno answering brief due 01/23/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11477692]--[Edited: removed letter about registering. All attorneys are registered. 10/25/2019 by SLM] (RT) [Entered: 10/25/2019 09:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insuran v. City of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Pennsylvania corporation
Represented By: James C. Nielsen
Represented By: Daniel Nicholas Katibah
Represented By: Thomas H. Nienow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF FRESNO, a Municipal corporation
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?