HSBC Bank USA, N.A. v. Suzannah R. Noonan IRA, LLC, et al
Defendant: SUNRISE BAY OWNERS' ASSOCIATION and NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: HSBC BANK USA, N.A., as Trustee, In Trust for the Registered Holders of Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2006-FM2, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates
Defendant / Appellant: SUZANNAH R. NOONAN IRA, LLC
Case Number: 19-17181
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 01/10/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11522045] (CL) [Entered: 12/05/2019 10:00 AM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 12/04/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11502859] (CL) [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:29 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/06/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11491840]. [19-17181] (AD) [Entered: 11/06/2019 06:44 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Suzannah R. Noonan IRA, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/06/2019. [11491306] [19-17181] (Beede, Michael) [Entered: 11/06/2019 02:31 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Suzannah R. Noonan IRA, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/06/2019. Transcript ordered by 11/29/2019. Transcript due 12/30/2019. Appellant Suzannah R. Noonan IRA, LLC opening brief due 02/06/2020. Appellee HSBC Bank USA, N.A. answering brief due 03/09/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11482747] (JBS) [Entered: 10/30/2019 09:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC Bank USA, N.A. v. Suzannah R. Noonan IRA, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HSBC BANK USA, N.A., as Trustee, In Trust for the Registered Holders of Ace Securities Corp., Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2006-FM2, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates
Represented By: Robert Anthony Riether
Represented By: Matthew Scott Carter
Represented By: Edgar C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE BAY OWNERS' ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SUZANNAH R. NOONAN IRA, LLC
Represented By: Michael N. Beede Esquire
Represented By: James W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?