Gladys Jahn, et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: DOES, Unknown Parties named as ABC Corporations 1-5, XYZ Limited Liability Companies 1-5, CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC., a foreign corporation, individually and as a servicer of LSF9 Master Participation Trust and LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST, trustee of Christina Harper
Plaintiff / Appellant: GLADYS JAHN and TIMOTHY BUSH
Case Number: 19-17198
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 11/22/2019. [11509301] (RT) [Entered: 11/22/2019 02:40 PM]
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11487667] (CKP) [Entered: 11/04/2019 12:03 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 11/29/2019. Transcript due 12/30/2019. Appellants Timothy Bush and Gladys Jahn opening brief due 02/06/2020. Appellees Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Does and LSF9 Master Participation Trust answering brief due 03/09/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11483272] (JBS) [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gladys Jahn, et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, Unknown Parties named as ABC Corporations 1-5, XYZ Limited Liability Companies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC., a foreign corporation, individually and as a servicer of LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Randal McDonald
Represented By: Brian C. Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST, trustee of Christina Harper
Represented By: Randal McDonald
Represented By: Brian C. Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLADYS JAHN
Represented By: Gladys Jahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY BUSH
Represented By: Timothy Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?